Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 501 Today
» 1059 Yesterday
» 501 Week
» 17301 Month
» 333532 Year
» 844634 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Canklow


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Canklow Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4232       4w/e 22/06/1946 19C 01/01/1948 19C Canklow
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4457       4w/e 22/06/1946 19C 01/01/1948 19C Canklow
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7546       01/01/1948 19C w/e 28/02/1959 26A Newton Heath
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 7547       01/01/1948 19C w/e 28/02/1959 26A Newton Heath
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3906       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 22/03/1952 20C Royston
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3950       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 20/04/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4013       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 20/04/1957 17D Rowsley
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4015       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 01/01/1955 22A Bristol Barrow Road
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4036       01/01/1948 19C 5w/e 15/11/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4071       01/01/1948 19C w/e 15/09/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4127       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 23/03/1957 8E Brunswick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4128       01/01/1948 19C 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4173       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 23/02/1952 18B Westhouses
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4232 4w/e 22/06/1946 19C Canklow 01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 23/03/1957 8E Brunswick
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4457 4w/e 22/06/1946 19C Canklow 01/01/1948 19C 8w/e 29/11/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4477       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 04/11/1950 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1797       01/01/1948 19C 3w/e 24/01/1953 20B Stourton
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1813       01/01/1948 19C m/e 05/1954 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1835       01/01/1948 19C w/e 12/03/1960 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 1869       01/01/1948 19C m/e 01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-2T 2099       01/01/1948 19C m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 2P 4-4-2T 2109       01/01/1948 19C m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8026       01/01/1948 19C w/e 08/12/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8065       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 06/11/1954 18C Hasland
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8209       01/01/1948 19C 19/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8407       01/01/1948 19C w/e 04/06/1960 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8430       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 21/04/1956 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8434 8w/e 26/03/1946 LA Laira 01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 13/08/1955 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8450       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 13/08/1955 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8548       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 28/12/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8682       01/01/1948 19C 3w/e 14/01/1950 19D Heaton Mersey
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3813       01/01/1948 19C 2w/e 14/01/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3814       01/01/1948 19C 15/10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 4-4-0 726       01/01/1948 19C m/e 09/1952 Withdrawn
Steam 3P 4-4-0 727       01/01/1948 19C m/e 05/1950 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3180       01/01/1948 19C 17/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3181       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 03/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3208       01/01/1948 19C 09/08/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3243       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 23/04/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3300       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 24/04/1954 9D Buxton (LNWR)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3325       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 03/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3660       01/01/1948 19C 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3664       01/01/1948 19C 12/03/1960 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3669       01/01/1948 19C 4w/e 03/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3747       01/01/1948 19C 10/11/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2140       01/01/1948 19C m/e 12/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Tilbury Tanks 4-4-2T 2144       01/01/1948 19C m/e 02/1951 Withdrawn
Steam G2A 0-8-0 9055       01/01/1948 19C m/e 03/1949 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44576 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 5w/e 24/12/1949 19C 17/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48055 01/01/1948 20H Lancaster Green Ayre 5w/e 24/12/1949 19C 4w/e 14/08/1954 20D Normanton
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44089 01/01/1948 18A Toton 3w/e 14/01/1950 19C m/e 12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44290 01/01/1948 20D Normanton 3w/e 14/01/1950 19C 4w/e 07/10/1950 20C Royston
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43037 15/06/1949 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) 4w/e 04/11/1950 19C w/e 07/05/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48508 01/01/1948 25A Wakefield 4w/e 02/12/1950 19C w/e 08/12/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48083 01/01/1948 18B Westhouses 4w/e 16/06/1951 19C 4w/e 30/01/1954 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48391 4w/e 19/05/1951 21A Saltley 4w/e 16/06/1951 19C w/e 25/05/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48402 01/01/1948 21A Saltley 4w/e 06/10/1951 19C 4w/e 16/07/1955 84C Banbury
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41660 01/01/1948 14B Kentish Town 4w/e 22/03/1952 19C m/e 05/1953 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43225 8w/e 14/06/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 8w/e 29/11/1952 19C 29/04/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43463 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses 8w/e 29/11/1952 19C 09/02/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44002 01/01/1948 17B Burton 5w/e 03/01/1953 19C m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44037 8w/e 29/11/1952 18A Toton 3w/e 24/01/1953 19C m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47238 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 3w/e 24/01/1953 19C w/e 28/02/1959 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41795 01/01/1948 17A Derby 4w/e 21/02/1953 19C 4w/e 21/03/1953 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43978 01/01/1948 22B Gloucester Barnwood 4w/e 21/03/1953 19C 18/01/1958 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43872 01/01/1948 17C Coalville 4w/e 08/08/1953 19C 4w/e 10/08/1957 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48397 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 08/08/1953 19C w/e 08/12/1962 26F Patricroft
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48216 4w/e 16/05/1953 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 05/09/1953 19C w/e 20/02/1960 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48470 01/01/1948 24B Rose Grove 4w/e 31/10/1953 19C 4w/e 30/01/1954 17A Derby
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44245 3w/e 24/01/1953 20G Hellifield 4w/e 24/04/1954 19C 17/05/1962 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78026       06/1954 (New) 19C w/e 27/01/1962 67C Ayr
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78027       06/1954 (New) 19C w/e 04/08/1962 30A Stratford
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41875 4w/e 09/10/1954 18C Hasland 4w/e 06/11/1954 19C w/e 19/08/1961 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48011 4w/e 26/01/1952 17A Derby 4w/e 01/01/1955 19C w/e 09/01/1960 16B Kirkby in Ashfield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48138 8w/e 19/06/1954 21A Saltley 4w/e 01/01/1955 19C w/e 29/08/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48075 01/01/1948 18A Toton 4w/e 23/04/1955 19C w/e 29/08/1959 56A Wakefield
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48144 4w/e 16/05/1953 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 23/04/1955 19C 4w/e 31/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48150 01/01/1948 31D Grangemouth 8w/e 16/07/1955 19C w/e 08/12/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48151 01/01/1948 31D Grangemouth 8w/e 16/07/1955 19C w/e 05/01/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48396 4w/e 09/10/1954 20A Holbeck (MR) 8w/e 16/07/1955 19C w/e 25/05/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48181 01/01/1948 15A Wellingborough 4w/e 13/08/1955 19C w/e 05/08/1961 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43857 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 03/12/1955 19C 30/03/1957 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48176 4w/e 19/05/1956 18B Westhouses m/e 16/06/1956 19C w/e 04/06/1960 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44082 m/e 16/06/1956 16B Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 11/08/1956 19C m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44206 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield 4w/e 06/10/1956 19C m/e 06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43369 01/01/1948 16A Nottingham 4w/e 20/04/1957 19C 08/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43371 2w/e 17/06/1950 16A Nottingham 4w/e 20/04/1957 19C 26/08/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 44944 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 10/08/1957 19C 4w/e 17/05/1958 16A Nottingham
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43753 01/01/1948 15C Leicester Midland 4w/e 08/03/1958 41D 05/12/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43361 4w/e 08/03/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 12/04/1958 41D w/e 05/09/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43395 4w/e 08/03/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe 4w/e 12/04/1958 41D w/e 05/09/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73002 4w/e 03/10/1953 16A Nottingham 4w/e 10/05/1958 41D w/e 09/01/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48178 4w/e 30/11/1957 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe 5w/e 15/11/1958 41D w/e 20/06/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90051 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction w/e 20/06/1959 41D w/e 12/09/1959 40E Colwick
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90162 4w/e 22/01/1955 40E Langwith Junction w/e 20/06/1959 41D w/e 12/09/1959 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 4w/e 19/06/1954 40E Langwith Junction w/e 20/06/1959 41D w/e 12/09/1959 40B Immingham
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90414       w/e 29/08/1959 41D 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90719       w/e 29/08/1959 41D w/e 03/04/1965 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90145 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B Immingham w/e 12/09/1959 41D w/e 29/04/1961 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90368       w/e 12/09/1959 41D w/e 25/01/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90471 4w/e 24/10/1953 40B Immingham w/e 12/09/1959 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90391 5w/e 21/01/1956 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 05/12/1959 41D m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47620 8w/e 19/06/1954 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 26/12/1959 41D m/e 09/1961 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61312 20/09/1959 41H Staveley (G.C.) 03/01/1960 41D 10/09/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam B1 4-6-0 61334 28/10/1956 41A Sheffield Darnall 03/01/1960 41D 29/04/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48029 01/01/1948 16C Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 09/01/1960 41D w/e 02/04/1960 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90162 w/e 12/09/1959 40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1960 41D m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90411 w/e 12/09/1959 40B Immingham w/e 09/01/1960 41D w/e 13/08/1960 41J Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61138 26/06/1955 41A Sheffield Darnall 31/01/1960 41D 23/04/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47626 01/01/1948 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 13/02/1960 41D m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47637 4w/e 19/04/1952 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 13/02/1960 41D m/e 05/1961 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90202 4w/e 19/05/1951 38A Colwick w/e 20/02/1960 41D m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90085 w/e 27/02/1960 41J Langwith Junction w/e 26/03/1960 41D w/e 25/01/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90276 w/e 26/03/1960 41H Staveley (G.C.) w/e 02/04/1960 41D m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61370 14/06/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall 03/04/1960 41D 28/03/1965 40B Immingham
Steam 4F 0-6-0 43882 8w/e 29/11/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 07/05/1960 41D w/e 15/12/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48515 4w/e 08/09/1951 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 04/06/1960 41D w/e 15/09/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48772 4w/e 16/08/1958 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 04/06/1960 41D w/e 25/05/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam J69 0-6-0T 68621 w/e 02/04/1960 41J Langwith Junction w/e 13/08/1960 41D w/e 28/01/1961 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90290 w/e 07/05/1960 41J Langwith Junction w/e 13/08/1960 41D m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 41835 w/e 12/03/1960 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 08/10/1960 41D w/e 27/01/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73000 4w/e 10/05/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 07/01/1961 41D w/e 06/01/1962 17A Derby
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48178 w/e 20/06/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 07/01/1961 41D w/e 08/09/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43234 w/e 05/09/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 07/01/1961 41D 04/02/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73043 4w/e 10/05/1958 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 15/04/1961 41D w/e 08/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73074 w/e 10/01/1959 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 15/04/1961 41D w/e 08/12/1962 70A Nine Elms
Steam Crab 2-6-0 42904 4w/e 16/05/1953 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 15/04/1961 41D w/e 22/07/1961 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73002 w/e 09/01/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 29/04/1961 41D w/e 08/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73046 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 29/04/1961 41D w/e 08/12/1962 70A Nine Elms
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48642 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 29/04/1961 41D w/e 15/09/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48179 01/01/1948 19D Heaton Mersey w/e 13/05/1961 41D w/e 26/01/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48216 w/e 05/03/1960 41B Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 13/05/1961 41D w/e 08/09/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48765 4w/e 08/09/1951 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 13/05/1961 41D w/e 08/12/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 47548 01/01/1948 14A Cricklewood East w/e 16/09/1961 41D m/e 08/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44174 4w/e 04/10/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 16/06/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44212 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 26/05/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44265 4w/e 29/01/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 16/06/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44287 8w/e 29/11/1952 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 26/05/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44426 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 16/06/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44437 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 26/05/1962 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4F 0-6-0 44568 01/01/1948 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43254 4w/e 04/12/1954 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 11/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43637 4w/e 05/11/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 11/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam 3F 0-6-0 43669 4w/e 03/12/1955 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe w/e 16/09/1961 41D w/e 11/11/1961 17B Burton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61083 24/05/1959 41F Mexborough 31/12/1961 41D 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61093 14/06/1959 41F Mexborough 31/12/1961 41D 28/03/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73016 4w/e 21/03/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 08/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73065 10/1954 19B Sheffield Millhouses (New) w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 08/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73155 4w/e 10/05/1958 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 08/12/1962 71A Eastleigh
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46131 w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46147 w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 1A Willesden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46148 w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 1A Willesden
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46151 w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 46164 w/e 12/09/1959 5A Crewe North w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45570 4w/e 16/06/1957 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45576 4w/e 06/09/1952 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45590 4w/e 19/05/1951 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45594 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45602 8w/e 05/10/1957 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 26A Newton Heath
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45607 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45627 w/e 17/09/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 27A Bank Hall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45654 4w/e 07/10/1950 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45656 01/01/1948 17A Derby w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45664 01/01/1948 19G Trafford Park (LMS) w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 03/03/1962 26B Agecroft
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45683 01/01/1948 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 45725 01/01/1948 8A Edge Hill w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 45536 w/e 06/02/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 23/06/1962 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41209 4w/e 05/09/1953 19B Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 07/07/1962 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41245       w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 07/07/1962 82B St Philips Marsh
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41246       w/e 06/01/1962 41D 16/09/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43037 w/e 07/05/1960 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 29/09/1962 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46450 w/e 01/04/1961 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 21/04/1962 41D Canklow
Steam K3 2-6-0 61820 w/e 15/07/1961 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 09/06/1962 40E Colwick
Steam K3 2-6-0 61822 w/e 15/07/1961 41C Sheffield Millhouses w/e 06/01/1962 41D w/e 09/06/1962 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61165 14/06/1947 MEX Mexborough 11/03/1962 41D 01/11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61316 15/05/1960 41F Mexborough 11/03/1962 41D 29/12/1962 Withdrawn
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 46450 w/e 06/01/1962 41D Canklow w/e 21/04/1962 41D 4w/e 19/05/1962 68B Dumfries
Steam B1 4-6-0 61033 04/11/1962 40A Lincoln 02/12/1962 41D 25/03/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61112 24/05/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 09/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61155 12/06/1960 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 09/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61169 19/06/1949 SHF Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 09/12/1962 41F Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 61327 19/06/1949 SHF Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 14/02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61334 29/04/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 01/12/1963 9G Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 61399 31/01/1960 41A Sheffield Darnall 02/12/1962 41D 22/09/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90064 w/e 20/06/1959 41F Mexborough w/e 08/12/1962 41D m/e 01/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90136 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 08/12/1962 41D m/e 04/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90139 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 08/12/1962 41D m/e 05/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90153 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 08/12/1962 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61004 09/09/1962 41F Mexborough 09/12/1962 41D 28/12/1963 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61104 09/09/1962 41F Mexborough 09/12/1962 41D 18/04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61194 20/11/1949 MEX Mexborough 09/12/1962 41D 10/11/1963 34E New England
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90358 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough w/e 05/01/1963 41D m/e 11/1963 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90311       w/e 05/01/1963 41D m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90700       w/e 05/01/1963 41D m/e 02/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90052 w/e 20/06/1959 41F Mexborough w/e 26/01/1963 41D m/e 03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90069 w/e 08/12/1962 36A Doncaster w/e 26/01/1963 41D w/e 03/04/1965 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90685 w/e 08/12/1962 36A Doncaster w/e 26/01/1963 41D m/e 11/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61044 07/06/1953 39B Sheffield Darnall 07/04/1963 41D 17/03/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90203 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 25/05/1963 41D w/e 19/06/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90211       w/e 25/05/1963 41D w/e 19/06/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90220 4w/e 19/06/1954 36B Mexborough w/e 25/05/1963 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61050 10/06/1956 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 28/03/1965 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61051 10/06/1956 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 28/03/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam B1 4-6-0 61094 16/08/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 13/06/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61105 13/07/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 10/11/1963 34E New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61109 27/11/1960 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 10/11/1963 34E New England
Steam B1 4-6-0 61153 10/09/1961 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 17/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61249 24/05/1959 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 04/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61313 03/10/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 13/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61315 03/10/1948 SHF Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 13/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam B1 4-6-0 61372 27/11/1960 41A Sheffield Darnall 16/06/1963 41D 13/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90313 w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough w/e 28/09/1963 41D m/e 04/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90330 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough w/e 28/09/1963 41D w/e 19/06/1965 36A Doncaster
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 D144 w/e 02/11/1963 16A Toton w/e 30/11/1963 41D w/e 11/01/1964 16C Derby
Steam B1 4-6-0 61039 10/11/1962 9G Gorton 01/12/1963 41D 28/03/1965 36A Doncaster
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5183 08/04/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 04/01/1964 41D w/e 15/02/1964 16A Toton
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo D5184 30/04/1963 18A Toton (New) w/e 15/02/1964 41D w/e 06/06/1964 16A Toton
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90149 w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough w/e 22/02/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90384 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 22/02/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90401       w/e 22/02/1964 41D w/e 03/04/1965 41H Staveley (G.C.)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61167 04/10/1953 36B Mexborough 01/03/1964 41D 06/12/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61394 16/06/1963 41F Mexborough 01/03/1964 41D 13/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90521       w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 21/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90529 w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 21/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90544 w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 21/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90567 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 14/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90573 w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 14/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90579 w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D m/e 02/1965 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90580 4w/e 14/02/1953 36B Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 20/06/1964 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90587       w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 09/10/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90190 w/e 26/01/1963 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 25/07/1964 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90410       w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90485 w/e 08/12/1962 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D m/e 08/1964 Withdrawn
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90491 4w/e 19/07/1958 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 21/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90668 3w/e 14/05/1955 40B Immingham w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 14/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90519 w/e 20/06/1959 41F Mexborough w/e 07/03/1964 41D w/e 21/03/1964 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90557 5w/e 24/12/1949 24B Rose Grove w/e 12/09/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 36A Doncaster
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90558 w/e 01/06/1963 9G Gorton w/e 12/09/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90658 w/e 14/12/1963 10F Rose Grove w/e 12/09/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41J Langwith Junction
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90697 w/e 08/08/1964 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 12/09/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43064 w/e 05/01/1963 40E Colwick w/e 31/10/1964 41D m/e 06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43091 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 31/10/1964 41D 06/06/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43093 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 31/10/1964 41D 17/01/1965 Withdrawn
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43149 w/e 11/01/1964 40E Colwick w/e 31/10/1964 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam B1 4-6-0 61145 30/12/1962 40B Immingham 10/01/1965 41D 28/03/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61190 18/06/1950 40B Immingham 10/01/1965 41D 13/06/1965 40E Colwick
Steam B1 4-6-0 61392 14/06/1964 40B Immingham 10/01/1965 41D 13/06/1965 40E Colwick
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43108 w/e 09/01/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 13/03/1965 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 43109 w/e 30/11/1963 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 13/03/1965 41D w/e 19/06/1965 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6959 13/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 11/05/1968 41A Tinsley
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6960 15/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 15/07/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6961 21/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 09/09/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6962 22/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 30/09/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6963 27/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 14/10/1967 30A Stratford
Diesel 37 Co-Co D6964 29/01/1965 41A Tinsley (New) w/e 24/07/1965 41D w/e 28/10/1967 30A Stratford