Depot: Bournville
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1272 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1279 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1280 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1281 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1729 | Snapshot | 10 | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1730 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1731 | Snapshot | 7S | Stroud | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1732 | Snapshot | 7S | Stroud | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1733 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1272 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1272 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1279 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1279 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1280 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1280 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1281 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1281 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1729 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1729 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1730 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1730 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1731 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1731 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1732 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1732 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1733 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1733 | Snapshot | 3B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1246 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1253 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1254 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1255 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1322 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1323 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1324 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1325 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1326 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2106 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2327 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2339 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1061 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1064 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1073 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 173 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 179 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2106 | Snapshot | 13C | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2327 | Snapshot | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2327 | Snapshot | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2338 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2339 | Snapshot | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2339 | Snapshot | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2342 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3359 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3583 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3668 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3968 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4138 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4289 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4333 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 917 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 934 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 179 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 2339 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 2373 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 162 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 3562 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 40173 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 43203 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 43263 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3968 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 4289 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 58138 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44811 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45274 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 4852 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 40517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 40463 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40463 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40463 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 40934 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/09/1950 | 42050 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42342 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 41035 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 41046 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 44852 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45274 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41035 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41046 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41035 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41046 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 44520 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 44333 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 48523 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 41117 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42685 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40168 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 41061 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 40105 | Transfer out to: | 86K | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 42685 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 43277 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 43521 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 43822 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/05/1952 | 41035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 43277 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 43822 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 41156 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42327 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43263 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43521 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43263 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43521 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44138 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44520 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43263 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43521 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43263 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 43521 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 41156 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 41156 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 41194 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 41194 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 41194 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/01/1953 | 41046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40099 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40928 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42685 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42824 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42825 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 43246 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 43520 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 43568 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44520 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44821 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45269 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48420 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48669 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42824 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42825 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44520 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48420 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48669 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40099 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40928 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 42685 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43246 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44821 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 45269 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 46400 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 43520 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 43568 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46400 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 41117 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43837 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43932 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43989 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42334 | Transfer in from: | 14C | St Albans | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 40917 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 44981 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 44811 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 42340 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 42050 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 40463 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 58167 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/01/1957 | 41064 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 41089 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 40541 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 43855 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40144 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40495 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1957 | 40495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/07/1957 | 41089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40935 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/08/1957 | 41073 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41153 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 41062 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1957 | 43837 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/11/1957 | 41153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40925 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 43523 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 44203 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43203 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/03/1958 | 40541 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 41165 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1958 | 40935 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42334 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42338 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40537 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43989 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 41165 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42340 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1958 | 41156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44516 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44571 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 43932 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44203 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 43186 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bromsgrove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/01/1959 | 43186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 41165 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43012 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43027 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43033 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43040 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 48002 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43355 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 40925 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 41062 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 40568 | Transfer in from: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 40537 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1959 | 41165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48002 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48523 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44463 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43027 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43040 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44981 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1959 | 58167 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 43523 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43263 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43359 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43855 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/12/1959 | 43675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 43583 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 40439 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43012 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43033 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43521 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43668 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43687 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 44463 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 44516 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 44571 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 58138 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 40144 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden |