Depot: Accrington
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 10442 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1198 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2205 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2546 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1100 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1101 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1102 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1185 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1198 | Snapshot | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1198 | Snapshot | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12216 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12441 | Snapshot | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12524 | Snapshot | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12822 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12825 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12831 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2205 | Snapshot | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2433 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2546 | Snapshot | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2548 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4460 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5101 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 2490 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8463 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8448 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 8705 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 681 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 2549 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 1185 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 12524 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 52288 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4038 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 42153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4221 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 44464 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4486 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 51410 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 4038 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 4221 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 51410 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 51410 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 12445 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 682 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 41188 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 1198 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 12445 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 52238 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 48769 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8461 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 4460 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 52821 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 4460 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 48706 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 48769 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 8526 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 8528 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 12822 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 52825 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 52831 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 680 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8448 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8491 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 52216 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 52441 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8416 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8479 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 677 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 684 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90333 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90335 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90402 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 90632 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8448 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8491 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12412 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 52452 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8526 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8528 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 8448 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 8491 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42716 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8461 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8463 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 51361 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 48722 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 684 | Transfer out to: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 90333 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42437 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42661 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41100 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41101 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41102 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41187 | Transfer out to: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 42869 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 90171 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 90335 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90206 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90416 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90713 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 90171 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 48491 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 8448 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 42843 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90206 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90416 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90713 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90206 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90416 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 90713 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 42643 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42643 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42843 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42643 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42843 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 45367 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48706 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 44464 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1950 | 50442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 41194 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45396 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45396 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40683 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42796 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44486 | Transfer out to: | 26G | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 42729 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 41188 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 42729 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 42729 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45335 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 42731 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 51390 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44921 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 51390 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 42731 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44460 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44479 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45335 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 51390 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 44697 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 40676 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45396 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 48453 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 48710 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 48765 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90206 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90402 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90632 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90713 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48453 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48710 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48765 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48453 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48710 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48765 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 48711 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 48767 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 90416 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48711 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48767 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48711 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 48767 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 42551 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 42898 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90278 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90306 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90555 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42551 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42898 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90278 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90306 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90555 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42551 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42898 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 44697 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48710 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48711 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48765 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90278 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90306 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90555 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 44921 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45205 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45206 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45209 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42716 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45205 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45206 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45209 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45205 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45206 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45209 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 40586 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 45226 | Transfer in from: | 26G | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 40586 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90267 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42551 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48453 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48767 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90555 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44932 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44947 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45061 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90267 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90278 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90306 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42294 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44947 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45200 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90348 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90399 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90610 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42796 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42843 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42898 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90112 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40586 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40690 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42796 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40677 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42706 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42733 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42821 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42828 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42843 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42898 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45061 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45206 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45209 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45226 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40586 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40680 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40690 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 52300 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 42898 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 42898 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 52300 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44889 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42733 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 40681 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45226 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1953 | 75049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45209 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44889 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45200 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 40937 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 41085 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75040 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75041 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75042 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75043 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 75044 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 90610 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 51464 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42706 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42716 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42729 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42796 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42821 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42828 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42843 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42869 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42898 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45205 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45209 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 03/04/1954 | 51410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51474 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45078 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 51474 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 51497 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42110 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42619 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42620 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44889 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 75040 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 75041 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 75042 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 75043 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 75044 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 41188 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40937 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 41085 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 41188 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44689 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44692 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45068 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45227 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45415 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 51390 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 75049 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90266 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90374 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90112 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90348 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45101 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 75034 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 44689 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 44689 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 75034 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 06/10/1956 | 51464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 51474 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 44932 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 90266 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 08/06/1957 | 51474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 51371 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42634 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47201 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47562 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 51371 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 51497 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42480 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42548 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42548 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42437 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 40192 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 40192 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 42548 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 42549 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42480 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 43880 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 43976 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 43880 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 43976 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42433 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42619 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42661 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45078 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45227 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 45415 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 90399 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 42620 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 90374 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90374 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 42662 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44889 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 45226 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42662 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 47571 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 42110 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 42153 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 42294 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 42295 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 42643 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 44689 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 44692 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 45068 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 47201 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 47562 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 47571 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 90374 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove |