Depot: Perth (LNER)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1944 | 8303 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1946 | 1061 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2215 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2427 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2714 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2725 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4588 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5213 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5297 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8469 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2436 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 62215 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2498 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61002 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61061 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 62426 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1950 | 61263 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 61263 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 65309 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 67455 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 68469 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62427 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62436 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62457 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62466 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 64536 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 64591 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 5213 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 5297 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 62714 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 62725 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 64588 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/05/1960 | 60823 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/05/1960 | 60973 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60970 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/03/1962 | 60823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/07/1962 | 60973 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60970 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill |