Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 370 Today
» 1006 Yesterday
» 3961 Week
» 14096 Month
» 330327 Year
» 841429 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: York (North)


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam A7 4-6-2T m/e 10/1910 1113 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T m/e 05/1911 1192 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 06/1912 799 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 10/1912 817 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 11/1912 820 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 11/1912 821 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 11/1912 822 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 12/1912 823 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 12/1919 844 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 03/1920 847 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 04/1920 845 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 04/1920 848 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 04/1920 849 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 08/1920 908 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 08/1920 911 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 09/1920 915 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 10/1920 921 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 11/1920 923 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 12/1920 925 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 12/1920 927 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 03/1921 933 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 04/1921 936 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 06/1921 942 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 11/1922 2364 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/01/1923 2366 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 19/02/1923 2368 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 12/03/1923 2370 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/04/1923 2372 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 05/1923 915 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/05/1923 2373 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 19/05/1923 2374 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/05/1923 2376 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/05/1923 2368 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/06/1923 2378 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 31/07/1923 2380 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 31/08/1923 2382 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/09/1923 2368 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/09/1923 1371 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 23/10/1923 1374 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/11/1923 1377 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 12/1923 1447 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B15 4-6-0 01/1924 813 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/03/1924 1247 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/03/1924 1361 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/03/1924 2223 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam B15 4-6-0 09/03/1924 787 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 09/03/1924 788 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 09/03/1924 797 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 22/03/1924 2233 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam C1 4-4-2 04/1924 1424 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/04/1924 1276 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/05/1924 1384 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/05/1924 924 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 07/1924 775 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B13 4-6-0 01/07/1924 1077 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 01/07/1924 2005 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 07/07/1924 757 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 07/07/1924 761 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 07/07/1924 766 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 15/07/1924 1149 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/07/1924 845 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B7 4-6-0 22/09/1924 5473 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 22/09/1924 911 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/10/1924 845 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 01/10/1924 1149 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B14 4-6-0 27/02/1925 2115 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B7 4-6-0 28/02/1925 5473 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/03/1925 911 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 19/03/1925 1129 Transfer in from: SHI Shildon    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 20/03/1925 1195 Transfer in from: SHI Shildon    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 23/05/1925 1129 Transfer out to: SHI Shildon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/07/1925 2228 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/07/1925 942 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B13 4-6-0 07/07/1925 744 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/07/1925 1384 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/07/1925 924 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam K2 2-6-0 11/08/1925 4678 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B15 4-6-0 11/08/1925 820 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam B15 4-6-0 11/08/1925 823 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 28/08/1925 4688 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/09/1925 942 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 30/10/1925 1195 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 11/12/1925 1767 1st Allocation        
Steam A5 4-6-2T 14/12/1925 1766 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 04/01/1926 2228 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 02/1926 1767 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 07/02/1926 1766 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 22/02/1926 1195 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam B13 4-6-0 23/02/1926 757 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 03/1926 2233 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 01/04/1926 820 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B15 4-6-0 01/04/1926 823 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 01/04/1926 4678 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam K2 2-6-0 02/04/1926 4688 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam B15 4-6-0 06/09/1926 782 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 06/09/1926 815 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 22/09/1926 757 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam B15 4-6-0 22/09/1926 782 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 22/09/1926 815 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 01/1927 1195 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 21/02/1927 1110 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 21/02/1927 785 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 21/02/1927 1247 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 21/02/1927 2223 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 06/05/1927 761 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 06/05/1927 766 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 22/10/1927 933 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/11/1927 925 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/04/1928 6576 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 05/05/1928 6617 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 12/05/1928 6579 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/05/1928 2228 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/05/1928 923 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 19/05/1928 6580 Transfer in from:        
Steam B14 4-6-0 21/05/1928 2115 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 26/05/1928 6631 Transfer in from:        
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/06/1928 921 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 15/06/1928 6610 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 15/06/1928 6611 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/06/1928 936 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/06/1928 942 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 19/07/1928 744 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 19/07/1928 757 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/10/1928 2711 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/10/1928 2712 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 21/11/1928 2005 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1928 2713 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1928 2714 1st Allocation STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1928 2712 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1928 2715 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 27/11/1928 2716 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/11/1928 2717 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/11/1928 2718 1st Allocation STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 03/12/1928 2711 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 03/12/1928 2713 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 03/12/1928 2714 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 04/12/1928 2719 1st Allocation STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 05/12/1928 2715 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 06/12/1928 2720 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/12/1928 2716 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/12/1928 2718 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 14/12/1928 2720 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/01/1929 2717 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/01/1929 2719 Transfer out to: PKS Parkeston Quay    
Steam O4 2-8-0 15/03/1929 6576 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/03/1929 2721 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 30/03/1929 6549 Transfer in from:        
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/04/1929 2722 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/04/1929 2721 Transfer out to: PKS Parkeston Quay    
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/04/1929 2723 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/04/1929 2724 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/04/1929 2722 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/04/1929 2723 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 20/04/1929 2724 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/04/1929 2725 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/04/1929 2726 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/04/1929 2727 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/05/1929 2726 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 02/05/1929 2725 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/05/1929 2728 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/05/1929 2729 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/05/1929 2727 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam O4 2-8-0 13/05/1929 6576 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 13/05/1929 1110 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 13/05/1929 785 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/05/1929 2730 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/05/1929 2729 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/05/1929 2730 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/05/1929 1371 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/05/1929 1374 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/05/1929 2380 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/05/1929 2732 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/05/1929 2731 1st Allocation STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/05/1929 2732 Transfer out to: EFD Eastfield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/05/1929 2731 Transfer out to: EFD Eastfield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/06/1929 2728 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam B16 4-6-0 22/07/1929 921 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 22/07/1929 926 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B15 4-6-0 22/07/1929 788 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 22/07/1929 823 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/08/1929 2770 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 04/09/1929 2771 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/09/1929 2770 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/09/1929 2771 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/09/1929 2772 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/09/1929 2772 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam J39 0-6-0 20/09/1929 2774 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/09/1929 2774 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/09/1929 2773 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 30/09/1929 2775 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 03/10/1929 923 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 03/10/1929 908 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 05/10/1929 6576 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 05/10/1929 6580 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/10/1929 2776 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/10/1929 2773 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/10/1929 2775 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/10/1929 2776 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/10/1929 2777 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/10/1929 2778 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/10/1929 2777 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam J39 0-6-0 25/10/1929 2779 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/10/1929 2778 Transfer out to: STR Stratford    
Steam O4 2-8-0 29/10/1929 6611 Transfer out to: BUL Bullcroft Junction    
Steam J39 0-6-0 31/10/1929 2779 Transfer out to: ANN Annesley    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/11/1929 908 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 04/11/1929 2780 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 04/11/1929 6610 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/11/1929 2781 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/11/1929 2780 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/11/1929 2782 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 15/11/1929 2781 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/11/1929 2782 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/11/1929 2783 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/11/1929 2783 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1929 2784 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/11/1929 2785 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 05/12/1929 2784 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam J39 0-6-0 10/12/1929 2785 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/01/1930 1276 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/01/1930 1361 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/01/1930 1470 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/01/1930 845 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/01/1930 1487 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 06/02/1930 6549 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 06/02/1930 6617 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 03/03/1930 1174 Transfer in from: BUL Bullcroft Junction    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/08/1930 6579 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 21/08/1930 6631 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 23/06/1931 1373 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 23/06/1931 2371 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 23/06/1931 848 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B16 4-6-0 23/06/1931 849 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/10/1931 911 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/10/1931 921 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 06/11/1931 1077 Condemned      
Steam Q7 0-8-0 03/09/1932 628 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 13/07/1933 2374 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam B16 4-6-0 19/01/1934 2374 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A2 4-6-2 09/02/1934 2401 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A2 4-6-2 26/04/1934 2403 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 04/05/1934 1193 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A2 4-6-2 07/05/1934 2400 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A2 4-6-2 13/08/1934 2402 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 16/10/1934 1372 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 16/10/1934 911 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 16/10/1934 921 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam A2 4-6-2 07/11/1934 2404 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam C1 4-4-2 17/06/1936 4447 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/06/1936 2381 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/06/1936 920 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A2 4-6-2 03/07/1936 2401 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 25/07/1936 2402 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/08/1936 4772 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 15/08/1936 775 Condemned      
Steam C1 4-4-2 29/08/1936 4447 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B15 4-6-0 08/09/1936 797 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam V2 2-6-2 03/10/1936 4773 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/11/1936 2570 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 17/11/1936 2576 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B13 4-6-0 05/12/1936 759 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/12/1936 2568 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 11/12/1936 2576 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 07/01/1937 2577 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 19/01/1937 1373 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A2 4-6-2 06/02/1937 2404 Condemned      
Steam Q7 0-8-0 19/03/1937 633 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A2 4-6-2 13/04/1937 2400 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 06/05/1937 759 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A2 4-6-2 21/05/1937 2403 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 31/05/1937 2363 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 22/06/1937 1113 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/07/1937 4776 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/08/1937 4777 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 31/08/1937 4780 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1937 4782 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 28/09/1937 817 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/09/1937 932 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/10/1937 1487 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 28/10/1937 1470 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 25/11/1937 799 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 10/02/1938 764 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/02/1938 1535 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1938 4799 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 07/04/1938 1560 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 18/04/1938 2569 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 19/06/1938 1290 Transfer in from: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 19/06/1938 2783 Transfer in from: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam J39 0-6-0 12/08/1938 2783 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam J39 0-6-0 23/08/1938 1290 Transfer out to: RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 31/08/1938 4804 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1938 4799 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 23/09/1938 4806 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 27/09/1938 4804 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 03/10/1938 787 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/10/1938 4808 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/10/1938 4810 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 30/12/1938 4814 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/03/1939 4818 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T 10/04/1939 1180 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 10/04/1939 1183 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 10/04/1939 820 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 14/04/1939 813 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 14/04/1939 821 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 14/04/1939 822 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/05/1939 4827 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/05/1939 934 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/06/1939 1373 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/06/1939 2379 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 17/06/1939 2228 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 23/06/1939 2116 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 24/06/1939 1176 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/06/1939 4835 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 31/07/1939 4839 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/08/1939 4839 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/10/1939 1534 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 21/10/1939 1174 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 23/10/1939 1477 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1939 2735 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A3 4-6-2 02/12/1939 2505 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/12/1939 2501 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 09/12/1939 2505 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/01/1940 1262 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/01/1940 2261 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 27/02/1940 1477 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/02/1940 2573 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/02/1940 2580 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A3 4-6-2 29/02/1940 2597 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/02/1940 1534 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/02/1940 1535 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/02/1940 1560 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 29/02/1940 2735 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/03/1940 4872 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T 01/04/1940 1192 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 03/04/1940 4875 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/04/1940 4878 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/05/1940 4881 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/05/1940 1371 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 18/05/1940 1362 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 20/05/1940 2116 Transfer out to: MAL Malton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/05/1940 925 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/05/1940 2369 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/05/1940 942 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 01/06/1940 1126 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/06/1940 1385 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/06/1940 843 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/06/1940 922 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 05/07/1940 943 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 31/08/1940 6514 Transfer in from: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam O4 2-8-0 11/09/1940 6574 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 16/09/1940 5395 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 19/09/1940 5378 Transfer in from: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam O4 2-8-0 02/10/1940 6617 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 02/10/1940 6632 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/11/1940 843 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/11/1940 847 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V4 2-6-2 19/04/1941 3401 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V4 2-6-2 05/05/1941 3401 Transfer out to: HAY Haymarket    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/07/1941 3656 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/08/1941 4889 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 20/09/1941 725 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 23/10/1941 3660 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 04/12/1941 4896 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 07/01/1942 3661 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 04/03/1942 3643 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 21/05/1942 3648 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 13/06/1942 925 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/09/1942 3666 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/11/1942 3672 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1942 3673 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 23/12/1942 3674 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1374 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1375 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1376 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1378 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1379 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1380 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1381 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1382 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1383 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 1384 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 2365 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 2367 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 2375 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 2377 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 2380 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2572 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2576 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 840 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 841 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 842 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 843 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 845 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 846 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 847 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 848 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 849 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 906 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 909 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 914 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 915 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 924 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 928 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 929 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 930 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 931 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 933 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 936 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/03/1943 937 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 28/03/1943 1262 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 28/03/1943 1362 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 28/03/1943 2261 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2501 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2568 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2573 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2580 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 28/03/1943 2597 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4772 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4773 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4776 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4777 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4780 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4782 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4806 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 28/03/1943 4881 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/03/1943 5378 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/03/1943 5395 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 28/03/1943 628 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 28/03/1943 633 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/03/1943 6574 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/03/1943 6617 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 28/03/1943 6632 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 28/03/1943 764 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/04/1943 3680 1st Allocation        
Steam C1 4-4-2 01/07/1943 4424 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam C1 4-4-2 01/07/1943 4447 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/08/1943 3686 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 20/09/1943 3687 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 07/10/1943 3688 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 27/10/1943 3689 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 09/12/1943 3690 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 20/01/1944 3691 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 20/04/1944 3693 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 21/06/1944 3694 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 24/11/1944 4835 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 29/09/1945 2570 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A1 4-6-2 29/09/1945 2577 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A1 4-6-2 06/05/1946 538 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 06/05/1946 541 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 06/05/1946 545 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/05/1946 739 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/05/1946 743 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/05/1946 747 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/05/1946 756 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1946 840 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1946 842 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1946 911 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1946 936 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1946 942 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 28/07/1946 9772 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 28/07/1946 9778 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 28/07/1946 9780 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 28/07/1946 9783 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T 28/07/1946 9788 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/09/1946 739 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/09/1946 747 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/09/1946 756 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/09/1946 843 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/09/1946 1446 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/09/1946 915 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/01/1947 1015 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 10/01/1947 1115 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/01/1947 1016 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 28/01/1947 1017 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/02/1947 1018 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/07/1947 1216 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/07/1947 1415 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/07/1947 1430 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/07/1947 1446 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 16/08/1947 522 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 24/08/1947 1413 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 31/08/1947 1402 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 31/08/1947 1432 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 26/09/1947 524 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 02/10/1947 1239 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 03/10/1947 1034 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/10/1947 1240 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/10/1947 1400 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 31/10/1947 1035 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 29/11/1947 1034 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam D20 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2379 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2740 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2751 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 2761 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5027 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5044 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5051 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5056 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5059 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5060 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5068 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5073 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5076 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5079 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5108 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5121 Snapshot        
Steam J25 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5656 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5700 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 01/01/1948 5723 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam D17 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62111 Snapshot        
Steam D17 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62112 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62755 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62759 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62760 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 01/01/1948 62763 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8031 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8032 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8042 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8043 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8044 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8045 Snapshot        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 8046 Snapshot        
Steam Y1 0-4-0T 01/01/1948 8152 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8230 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8231 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8238 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8240 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8246 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8250 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8253 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8268 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8275 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8280 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8282 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8286 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8292 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8293 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8294 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8297 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8298 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8310 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8677 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8695 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8699 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8715 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8722 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8726 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8735 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8739 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8741 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 01/01/1948 8745 Snapshot        
Steam A2 4-6-2 09/01/1948 526 1st Allocation        
Steam J24 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 5619 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J24 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 65621 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J24 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 65631 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J24 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1948 65639 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A2 4-6-2 18/01/1948 522 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 18/01/1948 524 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 18/01/1948 526 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam D17 4-4-0 07/02/1948 62111 Condemned      
Steam D17 4-4-0 07/02/1948 62112 Condemned      
Steam J24 0-6-0 07/02/1948 65639 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 21/02/1948 5679 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 21/02/1948 1423 Transfer out to: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 28/02/1948 62763 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A2 4-6-2 25/03/1948 60532 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/04/1948 1035 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 23/04/1948 60534 1st Allocation        
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 01/05/1948 5093 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 01/05/1948 5120 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam A2 4-6-2 05/05/1948 60535 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/05/1948 61071 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/05/1948 61084 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/05/1948 1239 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 16/05/1948 1240 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 23/05/1948 1239 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 23/05/1948 1216 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1948 70839 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1948 77013 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1948 78526 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1948 78538 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1948 78684 Transfer in from:        
Steam A2 4-6-2 30/05/1948 522 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/05/1948 1017 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/05/1948 1018 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 05/06/1948 62726 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 19/06/1948 8313 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/06/1948 62751 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/06/1948 62755 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 19/06/1948 8268 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 21/08/1948 5027 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63102 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63128 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63129 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63136 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63138 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 63157 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 77013 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 78526 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/09/1948 78684 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 25/09/1948 5056 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/09/1948 1288 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 26/09/1948 524 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 26/09/1948 60526 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 02/10/1948 524 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 02/10/1948 60526 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 02/10/1948 524 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 02/10/1948 60526 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 09/10/1948 2744 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 09/10/1948 62727 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 09/10/1948 62736 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 31/10/1948 61337 Transfer in from: STM St Margarets    
Steam B1 4-6-0 w/e 06/11/1948 61337 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 w/e 06/11/1948 61337 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/12/1948 60138 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/12/1948 864 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 22/12/1948 60121 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 24/12/1948 60140 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/12/1948 963 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 31/12/1948 60141 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 15/06/1949 60129 1st Allocation        
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 07/1949 65051 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 17/07/1949 1038 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 17/07/1949 61020 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 65059 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 65060 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1411 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1412 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1416 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1427 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1429 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1431 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 1445 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61400 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61401 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61402 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61408 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61409 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61410 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61413 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61414 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61415 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61428 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61430 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61432 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61440 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61441 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61442 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61446 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 07/08/1949 61447 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A1 4-6-2 26/08/1949 60153 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/08/1949 1425 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 28/08/1949 1433 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 09/1949 65093 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/09/1949 60129 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1419 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1426 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1450 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1452 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1456 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1458 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 1466 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61404 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61443 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61451 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61459 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61460 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61462 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/09/1949 61465 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 10/1949 65044 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 10/1949 65108 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/10/1949 60140 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 09/10/1949 60141 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 11/1949 65079 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 12/11/1949 68677 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60501 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60502 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60503 Transfer in from: HAY Haymarket    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60532 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60534 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1949 60535 Transfer out to: 64B Haymarket    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 63129 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90478 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60501 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60502 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60503 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60501 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60502 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 w/e 03/12/1949 60503 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1416 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1419 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1423 Transfer in from: 19B Sheffield Millhouses    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1426 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1450 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1456 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1458 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 1466 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61404 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61408 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61430 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61441 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61443 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61451 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61452 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61459 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61460 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61462 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 04/12/1949 61465 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 1416 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 1419 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61404 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61408 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61430 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61441 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61443 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61451 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61452 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61459 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61460 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61462 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61465 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 65075 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 1416 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 1419 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61404 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61408 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61430 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61441 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61443 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61451 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61452 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61459 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61460 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61462 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1949 61465 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 17/12/1949 65708 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 26/12/1949 65121 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 02/1950 65073 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 02/1950 65120 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60140 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/06/1950 60146 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 09/1950 65621 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 23/09/1950 62397 Transfer in from: NLN Northallerton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/09/1950 65075 Transfer out to: 51J Northallerton    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62730 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62731 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62732 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62734 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62735 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/10/1950 68677 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62397 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62727 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62736 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62740 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62761 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J24 0-6-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 65631 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 65656 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 65708 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 27/11/1950 60074 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1950 60501 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1950 60503 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 12/1950 68310 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 17/12/1950 60501 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 17/12/1950 60503 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam A3 4-6-2 17/12/1950 60074 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 01/1951 69016 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 01/1951 69020 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 90411 Transfer out to: 38B Annesley    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 65118 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 70839 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 11/03/1951 63270 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 65874 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 24/03/1951 68042 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 24/03/1951 68042 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 68715 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam D20 4-4-0 m/e 04/1951 62379 Condemned      
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/04/1951 68051 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65723 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 05/1951 65679 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 1419 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61416 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61422 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61424 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61426 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61436 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61441 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61443 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61451 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61452 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61456 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61458 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61459 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61460 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61462 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61465 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61466 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61473 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 06/05/1951 61474 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 19/05/1951 68029 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 65076 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 90485 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 07/1951 68231 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 62732 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 62734 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 10/08/1951 63270 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 62345 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 62746 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 65887 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/08/1951 90485 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam B1 4-6-0 02/09/1951 61053 Transfer in from: IPS Ipswich    
Steam B1 4-6-0 02/09/1951 61338 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 02/09/1951 61339 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 62774 Transfer in from:        
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 65650 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 65691 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 65883 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90423 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90449 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 65675 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 65683 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam B16 4-6-0 21/10/1951 61416 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 21/10/1951 61426 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 21/10/1951 61441 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 21/10/1951 61456 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 21/10/1951 61459 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 11/1951 65118 Condemned      
Steam J24 0-6-0 m/e 11/1951 65619 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/11/1951 61002 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1951 68238 Transfer out to: 20D Normanton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1951 68292 Transfer out to: 20D Normanton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1951 68294 Transfer out to: 20D Normanton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 65677 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/02/1952 61419 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/02/1952 61436 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/02/1952 61443 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/02/1952 61451 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 17/02/1952 61460 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 62744 Transfer out to: 62B Dundee Tay Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42083 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 62702 Transfer in from: STM St Margarets    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 62702 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/04/1952 42083 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 62702 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1952 65675 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1952 65683 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 06/1952 68286 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/07/1952 61022 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/07/1952 61024 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/07/1952 61039 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/07/1952 61040 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/07/1952 60901 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/07/1952 60907 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/07/1952 60929 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 19/07/1952 62731 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/09/1952 60901 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/09/1952 60907 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/09/1952 60929 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1952 61022 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1952 61024 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1952 61039 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/09/1952 61040 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 30/11/1952 60933 Transfer out to: 64A St Margarets    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/1952 76021 1st Allocation        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 62746 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/12/1952 60512 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 14/12/1952 60515 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 62343 Transfer in from:        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 62731 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 76021 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 17/05/1953 61015 Transfer out to: 91S To Southern Region    
Steam B1 4-6-0 19/05/1953 61338 Transfer out to: 91S To Southern Region    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 90047 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 90500 Transfer in from:        
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/06/1953 61015 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/06/1953 61338 Transfer in from: 91S To Southern Region    
Steam B1 4-6-0 19/07/1953 61176 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 19/07/1953 61224 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/07/1953 60981 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/07/1953 60982 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/07/1953 60895 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 19/09/1953 62726 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1953 61239 Transfer out to: 68E Carlisle Canal    
Steam V2 2-6-2 27/09/1953 60981 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 27/09/1953 60982 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 10/1953 68282 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 65654 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/10/1953 68724 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/10/1953 68741 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61424 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61452 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61458 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61462 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61465 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61466 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61473 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61474 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61015 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 15/11/1953 61020 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/02/1954 61015 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 21/02/1954 61020 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61424 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61452 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61458 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61462 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61465 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61466 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61473 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/03/1954 61474 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 24/04/1954 62735 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 06/1954 65068 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 90424 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61424 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61458 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61462 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61465 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61466 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61473 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1954 61474 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 24/07/1954 90044 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 24/07/1954 90517 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 24/07/1954 90603 Transfer in from:        
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 65793 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 65837 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/11/1954 68686 Transfer in from:        
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 13/11/1954 62343 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/11/1954 68745 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 18/12/1954 62759 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 18/12/1954 62774 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 65648 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 65656 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 65675 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 65714 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 65723 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 03/1955 65723 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 62731 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 04/05/1955 80116 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/05/1955 60837 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/05/1955 61422 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam V2 2-6-2 29/05/1955 60837 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/05/1955 61474 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65650 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65654 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 18/06/1955 80116 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/06/1955 61021 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/06/1955 61023 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/06/1955 61274 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/06/1955 61291 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/06/1955 60837 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/06/1955 60941 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/06/1955 60946 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/06/1955 60982 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62731 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62745 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65714 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/09/1955 60941 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/09/1955 60946 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/09/1955 60982 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61015 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61020 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61021 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61023 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61176 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61224 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61274 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61291 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/09/1955 61338 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65647 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65685 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65714 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 69910 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 69915 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 69916 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 69922 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 22/10/1955 68051 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 68230 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 12/11/1955 90044 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/11/1955 61017 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 20/11/1955 61451 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 20/11/1955 61456 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 20/11/1955 61458 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 68681 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 90021 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 90210 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 90409 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 65656 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 65700 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 09/02/1956 13237 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 15/02/1956 13238 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 17/02/1956 13239 1st Allocation        
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 62345 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 65648 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 18/02/1956 68275 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 19/02/1956 69890 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 24/02/1956 13240 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 02/03/1956 13241 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 06/03/1956 13242 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 09/03/1956 13243 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 15/03/1956 13244 1st Allocation        
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 65677 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 26/05/1956 65647 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T 26/05/1956 68297 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62046 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62047 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62048 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62049 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62050 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62056 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62057 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62061 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62062 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 10/06/1956 62063 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/06/1956 60901 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/06/1956 60962 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/06/1956 60978 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/06/1956 60979 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 10/06/1956 69890 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62747 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62771 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 65675 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 3w/e 16/06/1956 68699 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90021 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90047 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90210 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90409 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90424 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90500 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90517 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 90603 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 25/06/1956 13313 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 03/07/1956 13314 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 05/07/1956 13315 1st Allocation        
Steam T1 4-8-0T m/e 21/07/1956 69915 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 76051 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 08/1956 76052 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 09/1956 68240 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 09/1956 68293 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 09/1956 68313 Condemned      
Steam T1 4-8-0T m/e 10/1956 69922 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 09/10/1956 13318 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 11/10/1956 13319 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 16/10/1956 13320 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 76051 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 76052 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 21/10/1956 69877 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 4w/e 17/11/1956 51235 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 17/11/1956 69913 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 17/11/1956 68681 Transfer out to:        
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 15/12/1956 62395 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 15/12/1956 68253 Transfer out to:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 19/01/1957 68695 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 02/1957 73162 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 02/1957 73163 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 02/1957 73164 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 02/1957 73165 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 16/02/1957 90457 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 03/1957 73166 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 03/1957 68298 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T 03/03/1957 69877 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 04/1957 73167 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 04/1957 73168 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 04/1957 73169 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 04/1957 73170 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 m/e 05/1957 73171 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 05/1957 68280 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/05/1957 61016 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/05/1957 61038 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/06/1957 61419 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/06/1957 61459 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65683 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 68273 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 68687 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90012 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90021 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90068 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90309 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90405 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90424 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90445 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90475 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90487 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90503 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90611 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90625 Transfer in from:        
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62395 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62731 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65685 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65691 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 20/07/1957 68031 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 20/07/1957 68042 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam T1 4-8-0T m/e 08/1957 69916 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60848 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60887 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60939 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 15/09/1957 60952 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/09/1957 61419 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 68698 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/09/1957 68729 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/09/1957 68029 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/09/1957 68044 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 73171 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90012 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90021 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90309 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90487 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90503 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90625 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 65793 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 65837 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 14/11/1957 68273 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/12/1957 47421 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/12/1957 47448 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/12/1957 47581 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 08/01/1958 69913 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 09/02/1958 61466 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 47403 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 68726 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 47239 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/05/1958 68686 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 06/1958 65683 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61410 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61413 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61440 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61451 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60843 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60848 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60904 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60929 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60934 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60952 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/06/1958 60976 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61017 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61115 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 08/06/1958 61339 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 42073 Transfer in from: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 42477 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 42553 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 42639 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 47607 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65698 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90230 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90236 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90543 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90578 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 62760 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68729 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90459 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 47254 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 47418 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 47436 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68698 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68722 Transfer out to: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68724 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/08/1958 42411 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 16/08/1958 46480 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 16/08/1958 46481 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 2w/e 13/09/1958 77004 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 13/09/1958 62702 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 13/09/1958 62730 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 13/09/1958 62745 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/09/1958 62047 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST m/e 10/1958 51235 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1958 68735 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 3w/e 04/10/1958 77004 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42073 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42411 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42477 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42553 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42639 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 17/10/1958 62771 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 11/1958 68246 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/11/1958 60828 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/11/1958 60855 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/11/1958 60876 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/11/1958 60877 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/11/1958 60878 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 08/11/1958 62747 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 73162 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 73163 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 73164 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 73165 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 73166 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam T1 4-8-0T w/e 22/11/1958 69910 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 06/12/1958 62740 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 13/12/1958 77012 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 47334 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 68736 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 69016 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 47403 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 47581 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 68739 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 69016 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/01/1959 61069 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/01/1959 61086 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 47556 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/01/1959 90200 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 73167 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 73168 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 73169 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 73170 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T m/e 03/1959 53 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 04/1959 68250 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 11/04/1959 41252 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/04/1959 42083 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/04/1959 42085 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1959 47403 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1959 68309 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 90611 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61273 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61276 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61291 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61319 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61433 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61456 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61458 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61459 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61478 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62060 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60864 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60877 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60939 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60946 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 14/06/1959 60960 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 D2046 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42477 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42553 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42639 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90467 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90663 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41252 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62740 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/06/1959 68032 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 D2062 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 D2245 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 14/07/1959 D2063 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1959 D2270 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 18/07/1959 61452 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 23/07/1959 D2064 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/07/1959 42083 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 11/08/1959 D2065 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 17/08/1959 D2066 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/08/1959 61198 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/08/1959 61388 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62005 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62009 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62047 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam K1 2-6-0 30/08/1959 62065 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 09/1959 65698 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1959 60831 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1959 60842 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1959 60879 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 13/09/1959 61466 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 13/09/1959 61469 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 13/09/1959 63348 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 13/09/1959 63436 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 13/09/1959 63449 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64706 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64725 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64818 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64821 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64845 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64847 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64855 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64857 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64859 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64861 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64866 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64904 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64942 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/09/1959 64944 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43057 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43071 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43096 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1959 47438 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1959 47462 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1959 47581 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62738 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62753 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62770 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65685 Transfer in from:        
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65861 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65881 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65888 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 65891 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1959 68686 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam T1 4-8-0T w/e 19/09/1959 69910 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam T1 4-8-0T w/e 19/09/1959 69912 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 77004 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 77013 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1959 90518 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1959 47403 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 21/09/1959 62738 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 22/09/1959 62753 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 23/09/1959 62770 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 D2269 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43057 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43071 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43096 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/09/1959 61426 Condemned      
Steam T1 4-8-0T m/e 10/1959 69910 Condemned      
Steam T1 4-8-0T m/e 10/1959 69912 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/10/1959 61430 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 65861 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 65881 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 65888 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 65891 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/10/1959 47438 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/10/1959 47462 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/10/1959 47581 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 D2268 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43057 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43071 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43096 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 27/10/1959 61441 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/11/1959 60837 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/11/1959 60864 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/11/1959 60877 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/11/1959 60939 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 01/11/1959 62048 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 01/11/1959 62050 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 01/11/1959 62060 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 01/11/1959 62062 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/11/1959 61458 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43014 Transfer in from: 20B Stourton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43055 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43056 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43070 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90068 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90200 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90230 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90236 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90405 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90445 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90543 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/11/1959 64847 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 08/11/1959 64866 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 77004 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64706 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64818 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64857 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64904 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A2 4-6-2 27/11/1959 60503 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 30/11/1959 61433 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/12/1959 63348 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/12/1959 63436 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 06/12/1959 63449 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90026 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90045 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64725 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64821 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64845 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64855 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64859 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64861 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64944 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 21/12/1959 D252 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 30/12/1959 D251 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 31/12/1959 D254 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 08/01/1960 D253 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/01/1960 D253 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/01/1960 61465 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 29/01/1960 D256 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 30/01/1960 D2595 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 30/01/1960 D250 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 01/02/1960 D257 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/02/1960 61477 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 03/02/1960 D258 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 05/02/1960 D259 1st Allocation        
Steam A2 4-6-2 08/02/1960 60501 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/02/1960 61425 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 14/02/1960 61431 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 27/02/1960 D253 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 69003 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 69008 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47334 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 69020 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 12/03/1960 D3872 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/03/1960 D258 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/03/1960 D259 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 16/03/1960 D3940 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 19/03/1960 D3874 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 19/03/1960 D257 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Steam J39 0-6-0 20/03/1960 64942 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 26/03/1960 D254 Transfer in from: 64H Leith Central    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 02/04/1960 D3946 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 14/04/1960 68309 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 16/05/1960 D275 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 19/05/1960 D2147 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 23/05/1960 D276 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 24/05/1960 D2148 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 30/05/1960 D277 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 10/06/1960 D2150 1st Allocation        
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/06/1960 60516 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/06/1960 60518 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60810 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 15/06/1960 D2095 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 16/06/1960 D2096 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 16/06/1960 D2151 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 18/06/1960 D2097 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 D2075 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42477 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42639 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 90475 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 20/06/1960 D281 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 22/06/1960 D2152 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 27/06/1960 D2153 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 27/06/1960 D282 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 28/06/1960 D2094 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 30/06/1960 D2598 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 01/07/1960 D2154 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 02/07/1960 D2098 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 04/07/1960 D283 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 08/07/1960 D2599 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D3070 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D3071 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 11/07/1960 D284 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 13/07/1960 D2600 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 15/07/1960 D2099 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 18/07/1960 D285 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 20/07/1960 D2601 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 26/07/1960 D2155 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 27/07/1960 D2100 1st Allocation        
Diesel 05 0-6-0 28/07/1960 D2602 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 01/08/1960 61456 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 08/08/1960 D2156 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 09/08/1960 D2101 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/08/1960 61440 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 16/08/1960 D2157 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 17/08/1960 D2102 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 22/08/1960 D2158 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 27/08/1960 D2103 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 29/08/1960 D2159 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 05/09/1960 D2160 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61018 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61020 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61021 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61031 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61039 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61049 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61062 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61068 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61240 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 13/09/1960 D2161 1st Allocation        
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 65885 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 21/09/1960 D2162 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 24/09/1960 D2104 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03/10/1960 D2163 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 03/10/1960 61410 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 05/10/1960 61424 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 06/10/1960 D2105 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 07/10/1960 D2164 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 15/10/1960 D2106 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 77013 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 17/10/1960 D2165 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 19/10/1960 61469 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 22/10/1960 D2107 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 18/11/1960 D2110 1st Allocation        
Steam A1 4-6-2 20/11/1960 60150 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 20/11/1960 60154 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 25/11/1960 D2111 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1960 47254 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1960 47436 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 09/12/1960 D2112 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 D3235 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/12/1960 61413 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 11/12/1960 61416 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 12/12/1960 61478 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 23/12/1960 D2113 1st Allocation        
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 65691 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 01/1961 65714 Condemned      
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 07/01/1961 68045 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/02/1961 43057 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/02/1961 43070 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1961 65691 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 13/05/1961 D2151 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 13/05/1961 D2268 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 29/05/1961 61462 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 06/1961 47418 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 14/06/1961 D349 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 43056 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 43096 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 21/06/1961 D350 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 28/06/1961 D351 1st Allocation        
Steam A2 4-6-2 03/07/1961 60502 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 05/07/1961 D352 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 12/07/1961 D353 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 19/07/1961 D354 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 22/07/1961 68736 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 24/07/1961 61466 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 08/1961 68686 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 16/08/1961 D355 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 23/08/1961 D356 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1961 47239 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1961 47421 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1961 47448 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 09/1961 68687 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/09/1961 60124 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 10/09/1961 60126 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60848 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60911 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60967 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61449 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61461 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61464 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61468 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 10/09/1961 61476 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 15/09/1961 61460 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 43126 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 76024 Transfer in from: 52G Sunderland    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90030 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90078 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90217 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90571 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90623 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 65883 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 65885 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61419 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61422 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61423 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61425 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61431 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61436 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61443 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61450 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61451 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61452 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61459 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 25/09/1961 61473 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1961 68677 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/10/1961 69008 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 04/11/1961 69003 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 04/11/1961 69016 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/11/1961 D278 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 11/11/1961 65874 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 18/11/1961 D354 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 42085 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 42553 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 65887 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/02/1962 60977 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 28/03/1962 D385 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 04/04/1962 D386 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 11/04/1962 D387 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 18/04/1962 D388 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 02/05/1962 D389 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 09/05/1962 D390 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 16/05/1962 D391 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 w/e 28/05/1962 60907 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 17/06/1962 62042 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 76024 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam V2 2-6-2 w/e 16/07/1962 60848 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 43097 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 46481 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 06/08/1962 61039 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 46480 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 20/08/1962 61439 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 03/09/1962 61417 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/10/1962 60918 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 22/10/1962 60839 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 22/10/1962 60842 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 22/10/1962 60878 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 02/11/1962 60153 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 04/11/1962 60155 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/11/1962 60515 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/11/1962 60516 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/11/1962 60518 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 12/11/1962 60526 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61068 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61240 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61291 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61388 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/11/1962 61020 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 90517 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60519 Transfer in from: 64A St Margarets    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60531 Transfer in from: 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60536 Transfer in from: 64A St Margarets    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60805 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60833 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60886 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60929 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60932 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60942 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 02/12/1962 60945 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60512 Transfer out to: 64A St Margarets    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60522 Transfer out to: 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill    
Steam A2 4-6-2 02/12/1962 60524 Transfer out to: 64A St Margarets    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61418 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61420 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61435 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61437 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61438 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61444 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61453 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61463 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61467 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 02/12/1962 61472 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V2 2-6-2 03/12/1962 60879 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 03/12/1962 60911 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 03/12/1962 61086 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 10/12/1962 47556 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 10/12/1962 60531 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 17/12/1962 60536 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 18/12/1962 60519 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D345 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D346 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D347 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D348 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 13/01/1963 61475 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/02/1963 61071 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 23/02/1963 D5096 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/02/1963 61053 Condemned      
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 02/03/1963 D5099 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 16/03/1963 D5098 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 30/03/1963 D5100 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 w/e 15/04/1963 60981 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/04/1963 41251 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 46473 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 65854 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 65859 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 65888 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/04/1963 82027 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/04/1963 82028 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/04/1963 82029 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 27/04/1963 77004 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 27/04/1963 77013 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 07/05/1963 61273 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 12/05/1963 61275 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam V2 2-6-2 20/05/1963 60968 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 D3076 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/06/1963 D5176 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/07/1963 60146 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam A1 4-6-2 28/07/1963 60154 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam K1 2-6-0 18/08/1963 62058 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 18/08/1963 62062 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 25/08/1963 62007 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 26/08/1963 61069 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60120 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60141 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60143 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60145 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 08/09/1963 60147 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam K1 2-6-0 08/09/1963 62010 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 08/09/1963 62028 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 08/09/1963 62029 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 08/09/1963 62060 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 09/09/1963 61455 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92005 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92006 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92205 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92206 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92211 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0 w/e 14/09/1963 92221 Transfer in from: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam Standard Class 9 2-10-0