Depot: Bescot
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7612 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2982 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 2982 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 2963 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 2965 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 2967 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2961 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2968 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1937 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1937 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2961 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2963 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2967 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 2968 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1938 | 2981 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1938 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1939 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1940 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1943 | 2963 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1943 | 2966 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 2963 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1943 | 2966 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2779 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2851 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4061 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5417 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5418 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5433 | Snapshot | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7612 | Snapshot | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8905 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8917 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9022 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9025 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9034 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9036 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9039 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9044 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9045 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9050 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9063 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9078 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9081 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9083 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9084 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9089 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9096 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9097 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9099 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9131 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9160 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9175 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9177 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9180 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9189 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9195 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9245 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9259 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9265 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9274 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9279 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9286 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9294 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9328 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9335 | Snapshot | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9354 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9425 | Snapshot | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4942 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 9316 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9216 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8907 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 3725 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/04/1948 | 9274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9369 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 4061 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9195 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9211 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 8936 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9103 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3725 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 9384 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9329 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9360 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9377 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 49177 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 5418 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 8896 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9034 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 9334 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9259 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/09/1948 | 9165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 49425 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 9106 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9359 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 49316 | Transfer out to: | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1948 | 9384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 04/12/1948 | 46425 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 04/12/1948 | 46426 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 04/12/1948 | 46427 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49223 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9359 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49431 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9359 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49223 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49223 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 9081 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1949 | 48909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 25390 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 49059 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 9044 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 49093 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9402 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 48895 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42891 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42894 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42929 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 45417 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 4913 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 5144 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42891 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42894 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42929 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49332 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42891 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42894 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 42929 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49103 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 49084 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5310 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48950 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 49071 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 49071 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 49071 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1949 | 49294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 48896 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 49113 | Transfer in from: | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 9246 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 49039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/01/1950 | 49083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 9009 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 49059 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 49279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 49371 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 49097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 49369 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 48335 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 48175 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 48325 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48175 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48325 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48335 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 48518 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 48895 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 9377 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48318 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48375 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48686 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8120 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 49050 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 49160 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9335 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 49301 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48120 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48318 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48686 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48120 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48318 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 48686 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 49332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 48556 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 48674 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1950 | 49334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 48930 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 49098 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58273 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 48930 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49098 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58273 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 48930 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49098 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58122 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58273 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 49078 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 47519 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48953 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49088 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49212 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 47294 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48686 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/01/1951 | 49071 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42891 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 48953 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 49088 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 49212 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 9021 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9021 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 49092 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 9021 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 48936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 49022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 9116 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 49098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 48964 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49117 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 49020 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48250 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 49020 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 48477 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8310 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8602 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 48907 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 49093 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 49142 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1951 | 12091 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48477 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8310 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8602 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48477 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 49089 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8310 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 8602 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12090 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1951 | 12092 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 12091 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 49131 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 42851 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 42894 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48705 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48713 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48722 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48725 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48733 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48752 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48755 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48766 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48769 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12090 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45433 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49025 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49096 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49180 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49371 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 9116 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 48366 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49117 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48705 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48713 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48722 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48725 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48733 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48752 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48755 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48766 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48769 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48705 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48713 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48722 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48725 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48733 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48752 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48755 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48766 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48769 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48905 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48917 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 45322 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 49113 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45439 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48453 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 48767 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49092 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/02/1952 | 49359 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1952 | 49265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 58277 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45402 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58122 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 48514 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 48297 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 49278 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 48297 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 48297 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48674 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48259 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48674 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 58125 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 58169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 58174 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 49189 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 49106 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 48259 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46425 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 49354 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 58125 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 46425 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 58273 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45310 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45439 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45402 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 49266 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 49009 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 49245 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/11/1954 | 78038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 49009 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 48679 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 49125 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 58174 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 58169 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 48766 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1955 | 58277 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48766 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 58135 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48679 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48930 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 49021 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45046 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46421 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46426 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45046 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48930 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 49021 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48556 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 48556 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 46459 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 49275 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 78038 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48366 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1957 | 49282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 48727 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42782 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42921 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42853 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42929 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 48120 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49275 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45114 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 45385 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 49045 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 49063 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1957 | 49223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 48767 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42935 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 43022 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48767 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 49387 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 78055 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 58135 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42935 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 43022 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 78055 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1957 | 49202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/11/1957 | 49367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42853 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48139 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48950 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48139 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40080 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40083 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40173 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40692 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42441 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42560 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44078 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44448 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44488 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44512 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44873 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45419 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 47296 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49114 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49343 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49373 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58169 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58174 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58181 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58283 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48297 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 42853 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42853 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42441 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42560 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 48752 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 47385 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49045 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49063 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 49275 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 48318 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 43760 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 47349 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 47354 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 44078 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 49009 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 43189 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 43822 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 49308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42779 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42782 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42853 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 42921 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45114 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 29/08/1959 | 49063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 49411 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 49278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 40678 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44027 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47310 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48408 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48511 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 12/12/1959 | 47296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 47310 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 47382 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 47210 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 47294 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 48250 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 48722 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 40646 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 40694 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44875 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44910 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45064 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45387 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48250 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48755 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 48511 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45287 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 43189 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 44766 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 44840 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 48408 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 45060 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 90170 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 90706 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 47385 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45060 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 90170 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 90706 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49081 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49126 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49377 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 49430 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48310 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48366 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48453 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48705 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44484 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 49081 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12013 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12030 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3841 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 47349 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 47354 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12004 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12012 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12092 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D3841 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48734 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 58181 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48250 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 58218 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1961 | 58169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 58283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 48250 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 58123 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44110 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 43822 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 45410 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 49078 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 48250 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48256 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44110 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 44766 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 43760 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 44766 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 47396 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 40678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 44302 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 44358 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 48726 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 49373 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 45419 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1961 | 40692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 44910 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1961 | 58122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46456 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 49021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 45385 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49275 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 49411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 49246 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 12095 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 58174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 49313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 58185 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 46442 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 40080 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 40173 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 48529 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 48555 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 48269 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 49078 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 49106 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 40083 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 46428 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 46448 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 49045 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12056 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 58124 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 46428 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 46448 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 49099 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 48964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 46429 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 46430 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49045 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49079 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49373 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49377 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 40646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42957 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42966 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42974 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42979 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44340 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44348 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44440 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44442 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48522 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48705 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48747 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48762 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 46421 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 58123 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 58124 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 58185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 58218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 48555 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 46421 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 42966 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 46430 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 49125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 46430 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48680 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 49361 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 49452 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 40694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 49406 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 49216 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46442 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 49328 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 44340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 48930 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 49452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 49361 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 49045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 43022 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 45064 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 42972 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 42980 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44440 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44448 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44512 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45387 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46527 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 42975 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 46430 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 46459 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46445 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46522 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42980 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 49406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 44512 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 49407 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 44442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 44440 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 44448 | Transfer in from: | 66F | Beattock | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44027 | Transfer out to: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44302 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44348 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44358 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44484 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44512 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48602 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 48762 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 48269 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 43940 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 44179 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 49361 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 49407 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44516 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 49361 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 45064 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 45089 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48101 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48724 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 49407 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 44440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 43940 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44179 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44516 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | D3871 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12012 | Transfer out to: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/1964 | 42957 | Transfer out to: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1964 | 12030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D3088 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45067 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48007 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48478 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48659 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48729 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D3115 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | D3116 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 48895 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 12095 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 48734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1964 | 49407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44580 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44808 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 45493 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48719 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 48752 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 44580 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 43022 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42972 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42974 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42975 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44035 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44155 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44188 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44210 | Transfer in from: | 15E | Coalville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44377 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 05/12/1964 | 42979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 48895 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 49361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 49430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44139 | Transfer in from: | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 44035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76036 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76042 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76047 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76086 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76087 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 76088 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 44808 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 44873 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 45410 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 12012 | Transfer in from: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 12091 | Transfer in from: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 12093 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D3090 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D3867 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 47437 | Transfer in from: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44377 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45410 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48035 | Transfer in from: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48061 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 48478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48769 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 44139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 46425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 46456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 46509 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48203 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48336 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48449 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48517 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45089 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45287 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45493 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 44155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 44210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 46527 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D300 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D313 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D315 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D381 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 47437 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 12077 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1965 | 48366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 76036 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 76042 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 44057 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 44188 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/01/1966 | D212 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D210 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D214 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D226 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D229 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D232 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D268 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D269 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D299 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D301 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D302 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D307 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D308 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D310 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D321 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D325 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D326 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D327 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D369 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D372 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D373 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D374 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D375 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D376 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D379 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D382 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D383 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5015 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5020 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5021 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5022 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5023 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5024 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5026 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5029 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5141 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 44840 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 44914 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 46509 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48035 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48061 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48101 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48375 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48522 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48725 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 48729 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48713 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48747 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48766 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 48767 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 48477 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 12012 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 12013 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D3871 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D2603 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3111 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 46522 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8041 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8042 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8043 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48203 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48256 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48449 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48514 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/03/1966 | D8134 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 76047 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/03/1966 | D8135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D5012 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 44766 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 44875 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 45048 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 45064 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 45067 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 45410 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46421 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46429 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 46445 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48336 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48517 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48529 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48556 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48659 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48674 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48680 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48705 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48724 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48726 | Transfer out to: | 2H | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48752 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 76086 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 76087 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 76088 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12004 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12056 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12077 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12087 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12091 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12093 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3088 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3090 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3111 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3112 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3115 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3116 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3867 | Transfer out to: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D210 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D212 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D214 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D226 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D229 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D232 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D268 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D269 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D299 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D300 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D301 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D302 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D307 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D308 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D310 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D313 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D315 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D321 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D325 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D326 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D327 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D369 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D372 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D373 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D374 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D375 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D376 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D379 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D381 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D382 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D383 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5012 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5015 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5020 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5021 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5022 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5023 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5024 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5026 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5029 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5141 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8042 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8043 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8134 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8135 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D2603 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2220 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2386 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2387 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2395 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D2396 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12056 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12092 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12094 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15101 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15102 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15103 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15104 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15105 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15106 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3021 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3025 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3027 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3029 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3034 | Transfer in from: | 2H | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3036 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3037 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3038 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3039 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3088 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3089 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3090 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3091 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3111 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3115 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3116 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3191 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3192 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3752 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3755 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3757 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3780 | Transfer in from: | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3781 | Transfer in from: | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3839 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3840 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3841 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3867 | Transfer in from: | 2G | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3871 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3977 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3978 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3979 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3980 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3981 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3982 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3995 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3996 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3997 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Kidderminster | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 12092 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/07/1967 | 15102 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/07/1967 | 15104 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1967 | D3024 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/08/1967 | 15101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 12065 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 12112 | Transfer in from: | D14 | London (Midland) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D3023 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1967 | 15103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1967 | 15105 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1967 | 15106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | 12094 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3027 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D3039 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1967 | D2396 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3996 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3997 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | D2384 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/02/1968 | D2220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D3364 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D3397 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D2384 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3364 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3397 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D2386 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D2387 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D2395 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 12065 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3023 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3024 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3089 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1968 | D3025 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1968 | D3034 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D3021 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1968 | D3029 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3036 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3037 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D3038 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1968 | 12112 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/07/1969 | D3192 | Transfer out to: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3106 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3108 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3112 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1969 | D3191 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1969 | D3538 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1969 | D3191 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1970 | D3090 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1971 | 12087 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1971 | D4131 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3538 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1971 | 12056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1972 | D3925 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1972 | D3914 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3933 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3914 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3981 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3091 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D3106 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1553 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1554 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1623 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1630 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5188 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5189 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5190 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D1560 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D1569 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/06/1973 | D1681 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1564 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1634 | Transfer in from: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1658 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1956 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1560 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1569 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/07/1973 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1962 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | 47261 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5293 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D5295 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1554 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D1564 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/08/1973 | D7601 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D1582 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D1964 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/09/1973 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/09/1973 | D1716 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1554 | Transfer in from: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1594 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47021 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47092 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5297 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7614 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7626 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1623 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D7539 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D7620 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1630 | Transfer out to: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1634 | Transfer out to: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1964 | Transfer out to: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1973 | 08073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | 47437 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/12/1973 | D5297 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1813 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D3426 | Transfer in from: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 25256 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7607 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47462 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/03/1974 | D7537 | Transfer in from: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/03/1974 | 25189 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/03/1974 | D1636 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 47057 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47463 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47473 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47475 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47476 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25264 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 08704 | Transfer out to: | LR | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/06/1974 | 47073 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/06/1974 | 25270 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 47067 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 25206 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 25207 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47071 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47260 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47063 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47154 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47531 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47531 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1974 | 47476 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1974 | 47476 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47084 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47473 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1974 | 47473 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 47062 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47463 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47468 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47531 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47063 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47463 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47468 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47531 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25325 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47202 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47203 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47535 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25257 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47432 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47433 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47059 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47546 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47002 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1974 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/12/1974 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/12/1974 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47109 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47143 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47178 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47424 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47434 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/12/1974 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1974 | 08125 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25104 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25105 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25106 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25107 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25302 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1975 | 47107 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1975 | 08647 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/02/1975 | 25184 | Transfer in from: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/02/1975 | 08812 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08125 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25083 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08125 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25206 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25207 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47059 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08841 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08928 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08091 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08810 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 03/05/1975 | 08783 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 03/05/1975 | 08647 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25184 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25302 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25104 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25105 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25106 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/08/1975 | 25091 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 02/08/1975 | 08125 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 02/08/1975 | 25083 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25274 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25275 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 23/08/1975 | 25091 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47262 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47332 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25280 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 47201 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 47332 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25070 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47438 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 08086 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 08090 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/01/1976 | 08788 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/01/1976 | 08928 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25157 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1976 | 08124 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 25157 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 47203 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25251 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25256 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/07/1976 | 08466 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47249 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | 08474 | Transfer in from: | NH | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 25107 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 25280 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1976 | 08757 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1976 | 08811 | Transfer out to: | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 25101 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47012 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47200 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47317 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47318 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47378 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08827 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1976 | 25070 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47002 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47143 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47144 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47201 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47202 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 25032 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1976 | 08025 | Transfer in from: | HD | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1976 | 08814 | Transfer out to: | HD | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | 47229 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 27/11/1976 | 47378 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1976 | 08005 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1976 | 08041 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1977 | 08025 | Transfer out to: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1977 | 47249 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 06/1977 | 25290 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 06/1977 | 25299 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 25090 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 25147 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 25150 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 25151 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 25289 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08025 | Transfer in from: | CH | Chester West | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47064 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47293 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47295 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47298 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1977 | 25090 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1977 | 25101 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 20/11/1977 | 25141 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1977 | 08025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1978 | 08041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1978 | 08005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1979 | 08703 | Transfer in from: | AN | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/10/1979 | 47532 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/03/1980 | 25147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/11/1980 | 25040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/01/1981 | 47482 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/05/1981 | 25038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/05/1981 | 25039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/06/1981 | 25144 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1981 | 08489 | Transfer in from: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1981 | 25269 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1981 | 08674 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47294 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47473 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47536 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1981 | 25290 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1981 | 25299 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1981 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1981 | 25101 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47324 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1981 | 25141 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1981 | 25145 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 11/1981 | 47318 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47295 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1982 | 25275 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/05/1982 | 25274 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/06/1982 | 25150 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/09/1982 | 25151 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1982 | 08356 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/11/1982 | 25093 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/11/1982 | 25143 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/11/1982 | 25187 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/01/1983 | 25101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/04/1983 | 25144 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/01/1984 | 25289 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1984 | 08083 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/12/1985 | 25325 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/03/1986 | 25032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/04/1986 | 25269 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1986 | 08474 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/03/1987 | 25903 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/08/1987 | 47109 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31271 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47012 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47095 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47107 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47200 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47293 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47468 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47475 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47534 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47535 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47537 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47538 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47545 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47705 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31230 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31248 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31252 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31255 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31288 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31289 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31420 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31430 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31433 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31435 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31437 | Transfer in from: | MC | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31445 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31446 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31465 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31469 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47332 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47463 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31248 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1990 | 08841 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1991 | 47852 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/04/1991 | 31288 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1991 | 47533 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/03/1992 | 31289 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/07/1992 | 47324 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1992 | 08672 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/02/1993 | 08614 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1993 | 08590 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1993 | 08613 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1993 | 08809 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1994 | 08788 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1995 | 08673 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/02/1995 | 31569 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/07/1995 | 31533 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1995 | 31435 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1995 | 31546 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/05/1997 | 31271 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/05/1997 | 31545 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1998 | 08901 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/03/2000 | 31252 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/01/2001 | 31420 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/2001 | 08700 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/07/2001 | 47531 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2004 | 47476 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2006 | 47229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/04/2007 | 47298 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 47489 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08489 | Condemned |