Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1091 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4951 Week
» 7533 Month
» 272166 Year
» 1493731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Wigan Central (L&Y)


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10945 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10945 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 1193 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 1196 Transfer in from:        
Steam 30 0-8-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 12839 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/09/1947 2472 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10757 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10887 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1193 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1196 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12093 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12169 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12189 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12290 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12312 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12360 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12413 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12588 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12598 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12727 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12839 Snapshot 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 12839 Snapshot 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2362 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2381 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2537 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2554 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2557 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2569 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2592 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2614 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2631 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2632 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2640 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2641 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2642 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50692 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50844 Snapshot        
Steam 6 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50945 Snapshot 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52152 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52602 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52806 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52827 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52828 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52834 Snapshot        
Steam 30 0-8-0 01/01/1948 52837 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 01/01/1948 678 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 01/01/1948 679 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 01/01/1948 680 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/02/1948 2472 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 06/03/1948 52152 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 03/04/1948 52837 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 13/11/1948 52602 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/12/1948 42179 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/12/1948 42180 1st Allocation        
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 12437 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 11/12/1948 42179 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 11/12/1948 42179 Transfer out to: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T m/e 01/1949 50945 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 52834 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 m/e 05/1949 52828 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 m/e 06/1949 52806 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 52390 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 5w/e 16/07/1949 10757 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 12437 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 30 0-8-0 m/e 08/1949 52827 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 10/1949 50692 Condemned      
Steam 30 0-8-0 w/e 29/10/1949 52839 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49585 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49610 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 28 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52598 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 41101 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 31 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 52870 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 31 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 52916 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 52290 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 28 0-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 52588 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 09/1950 50844 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49568 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 41102 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 40679 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 30 0-8-0 14/10/1950 52727 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49612 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49625 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49638 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 31 0-8-0 25/11/1950 52916 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49659 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 52616 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 05/01/1951 49625 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 49511 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 10/02/1951 49585 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49592 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49637 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49664 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 10887 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 41101 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41100 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41101 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 52262 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 52387 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 19/05/1951 49568 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 19/05/1951 49610 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41186 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 52289 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 41100 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 41101 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 41102 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41186 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 41100 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 41101 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 41102 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 43952 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 44105 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 44220 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 44225 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 44240 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 44291 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52554 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49511 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49592 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49659 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 49664 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 52275 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 31 0-8-0 w/e 22/09/1951 52870 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 40588 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49592 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52360 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52189 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 49511 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41100 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41101 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41102 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 52312 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 40678 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 52390 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 52255 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40680 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 25/10/1952 52554 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 20/12/1952 52169 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1953 52262 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52093 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 52095 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 49511 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 40681 Transfer in from: 26E Bacup    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 40691 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 44544 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 40691 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 40680 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 44464 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 40681 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1953 52255 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 05/09/1953 49612 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 49554 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 40588 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1953 52616 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 44221 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90121 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90570 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90671 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49554 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49637 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49638 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44291 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/08/1954 42473 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 14/08/1954 51474 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 90584 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 90599 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42537 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 52413 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 10/09/1955 49592 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 42792 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 40584 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 40584 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 40680 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1956 42381 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 16/06/1956 40587 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 16/06/1956 40680 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 90277 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 90277 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 13/10/1956 78060 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 13/10/1956 78061 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 20/10/1956 78062 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 11/1956 78063 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 11/1956 78064 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 44486 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52095 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52275 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52289 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52387 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 78040 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 90102 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51474 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 90102 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 90671 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44105 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42362 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 90584 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 40681 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/10/1958 42475 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/11/1958 44220 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 24/01/1959 90561 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 29/08/1959 40587 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/09/1959 42621 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 07/11/1959 40680 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 42792 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44225 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 42715 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 42731 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 42734 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 42821 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90121 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90561 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90570 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90599 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 42864 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 44222 Transfer in from: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/04/1960 42697 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/04/1960 42624 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/04/1960 42697 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42555 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 27/08/1960 40681 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 42715 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 78040 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/07/1961 42794 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 22/07/1961 42864 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 07/10/1961 42475 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 40191 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 02/12/1961 40191 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 42715 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 42721 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42711 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42614 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42632 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42640 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 43952 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44221 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78060 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42641 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42642 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/11/1962 42473 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/11/1962 42621 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42624 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/12/1962 42494 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/02/1963 42063 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/03/1963 44464 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/03/1963 42821 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/05/1963 42592 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42135 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42589 Transfer in from: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 78057 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/05/1963 42063 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 42711 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/05/1963 42440 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 42721 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78063 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42715 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 78027 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/07/1963 42634 Transfer in from: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/08/1963 42680 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 17/08/1963 78002 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 78002 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 28/09/1963 42440 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 19/10/1963 42557 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/10/1963 42647 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/11/1963 44486 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 09/11/1963 42794 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 42730 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/11/1963 42180 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 78020 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 25/01/1964 42569 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/02/1964 42675 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 78064 Transfer out to: 16C Derby    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 08/02/1964 42731 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 42878 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 22/02/1964 42135 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45218 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42494 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42554 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42555 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42589 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42631 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42634 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42647 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42675 Transfer out to: 8M Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42680 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 42730 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 42734 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 42878 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44222 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44240 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44544 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 45218 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 78020 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 78027 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 78057 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 78061 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 78062 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 06/03/1965 42179 Condemned