Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 158 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 158 Week
» 11451 Month
» 276084 Year
» 1497649 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Warrington Dallam


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1935 2955 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/10/1935 13252 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/10/1935 2951 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1935 2979 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/11/1935 13274 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1936 2967 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/05/1936 2964 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/05/1936 2962 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1936 2951 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1936 2967 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 03/10/1936 2971 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/11/1936 2972 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/03/1937 2955 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 27/03/1937 2964 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2971 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/11/1937 2974 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/11/1937 2979 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/12/1937 2982 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 29/04/1939 2953 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/08/1940 2952 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/07/1941 2982 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1942 2953 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1942 2962 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1942 2972 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12100 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12140 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12175 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12250 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12330 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 207 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2583 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2606 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3207 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3283 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3314 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3357 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3389 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3398 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3615 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3657 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4897 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5001 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5026 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5032 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5035 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5095 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5109 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5149 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5196 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52118 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5252 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5321 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6603 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6663 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6688 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6710 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6718 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6906 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6920 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6924 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7268 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7352 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7376 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7387 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7591 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7652 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7654 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7657 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 80 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 81 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 84 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8944 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9008 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9075 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9085 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9136 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9178 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9247 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9302 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9338 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9411 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 24/01/1948 6718 Condemned      
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/05/1948 6920 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 3618 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 43237 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45026 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 48944 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 52100 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 52175 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 52330 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 3w/e 11/12/1948 6710 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9302 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 04/1949 49338 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42607 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/07/1949 46663 Condemned      
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T m/e 12/1949 46924 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 8926 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 49075 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 28 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52598 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 28 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52608 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 43207 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 3282 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 12/08/1950 49085 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48689 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 45095 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 43633 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 43787 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40207 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 52598 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45495 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 02/12/1950 50687 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 52608 Transfer out to: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 46727 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T m/e 04/1951 46688 Condemned      
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T m/e 05/1951 46906 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 05/1951 49178 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49247 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 49093 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 49249 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45001 Transfer out to: 7C Holyhead    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T w/e 21/07/1951 46603 Condemned      
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 46643 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90122 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90126 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90140 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90163 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90197 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90204 Transfer in from: 38A Colwick    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90702 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48689 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 40001 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49024 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52140 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 27/10/1951 52250 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/12/1951 40080 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48142 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48188 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48348 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48349 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48531 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48714 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48715 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90122 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90126 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90140 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90163 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90197 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90204 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 90702 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 02/1952 41321 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 02/1952 41322 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1952 40084 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 03/1952 41323 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44897 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 46727 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45255 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 49113 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45109 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45149 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 46643 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 52118 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 29/11/1952 47362 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40081 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 49113 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 48154 Transfer in from: 19D Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50644 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50644 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 48520 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 05/1953 50687 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45271 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 48154 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1953 40202 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52225 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52432 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 43357 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 43389 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 29/08/1953 43283 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 40143 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 40001 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 45271 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 45271 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 45354 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 28/11/1953 50643 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 28/11/1953 50643 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 48491 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 48673 Transfer in from: 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 1210 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 41210 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 48247 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 48634 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam G2 0-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 49411 Transfer out to: 2D Coventry    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 48634 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 44237 Transfer in from: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 44261 Transfer in from: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 44356 Transfer in from: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/11/1954 41322 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 45255 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 49024 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/01/1955 41322 Transfer in from: 2C Warwick    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 45255 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44384 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44261 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41211 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41212 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41224 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41321 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41322 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41323 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 41224 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 48441 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 49093 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 49249 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 48094 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 28/04/1956 43633 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 48142 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 48673 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 49323 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48683 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48693 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 45328 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 45271 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 45271 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 40143 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 40202 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 41211 Transfer out to: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43308 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43619 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43615 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43618 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 48693 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 48349 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 41235 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 41901 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 48349 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 41212 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45328 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 07/09/1957 41212 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45328 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 4w/e 07/09/1957 41901 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45271 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/10/1957 40125 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/10/1957 40156 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45271 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/10/1957 41235 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43387 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 48655 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 43231 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49121 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 48655 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 44593 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 48188 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48106 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48188 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48296 Transfer in from: 9G Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48720 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 48349 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 52225 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 52432 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 41213 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 48373 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45032 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 48746 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 30/09/1958 49121 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 10/1958 50643 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 10/1958 50643 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 11/10/1958 43231 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48491 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48720 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 25/10/1958 50644 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 25/10/1958 50644 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 01/11/1958 41212 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 44593 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 08/11/1958 49008 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 08/11/1958 49323 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 29/11/1958 47659 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 10/01/1959 43787 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 17/01/1959 43615 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 17/01/1959 43651 Transfer in from: 9G Northwich    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 30/05/1959 43237 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41324 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 48348 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 48441 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45546 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45549 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45550 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45252 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 45255 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 04/07/1959 45503 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 04/07/1959 45546 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 25/07/1959 43651 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1959 48247 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1959 48714 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 29/08/1959 43619 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 29/08/1959 48926 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1959 52225 Transfer in from: Crewe Works    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1959 48408 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1959 D3851 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/10/1959 47401 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/10/1959 40156 Transfer out to: 16C Mansfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 17/10/1959 43308 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43257 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43295 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45256 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45276 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45343 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45380 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45398 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45410 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47392 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47376 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48408 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48531 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48683 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/11/1959 D3795 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/11/1959 D3796 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/11/1959 40125 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 D3797 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 43398 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42583 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 43387 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/12/1959 47387 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/01/1960 D3834 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/01/1960 D3835 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/01/1960 47392 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/01/1960 47401 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/01/1960 47659 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D2911 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 30/01/1960 D2911 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 45516 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 45518 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1960 48188 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47406 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47352 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/03/1960 47591 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 02/04/1960 41324 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 02/04/1960 41324 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/04/1960 45196 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 02/04/1960 43314 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 45380 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 45398 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45501 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45511 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45546 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/05/1960 48188 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/06/1960 41324 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 43189 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45503 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45518 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45550 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 45196 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1960 47652 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 45196 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 23/07/1960 1210 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 23/07/1960 41210 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/07/1960 45276 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 44208 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 44451 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 44750 Transfer in from:        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45524 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45544 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45501 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45511 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43410 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1960 47669 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 44827 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/10/1960 48505 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 44750 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/10/1960 48296 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 43240 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 43514 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 44986 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/10/1960 48268 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 44208 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 44451 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/10/1960 48505 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/10/1960 1210 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/10/1960 41210 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/10/1960 45410 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 44061 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 D3851 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 44063 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 D3851 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 43189 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1960 42081 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45380 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45381 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 52225 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/01/1961 42081 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45050 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/01/1961 42606 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 48268 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1961 48268 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1961 48106 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 08/04/1961 41211 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 08/04/1961 41288 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/04/1961 42607 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1961 48106 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1961 48129 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 45524 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 17/06/1961 84000 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 17/06/1961 84001 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 48520 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45050 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45271 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 22/07/1961 45516 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/07/1961 45271 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 29/07/1961 47594 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 08/1961 47268 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45550 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45321 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45321 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45150 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45414 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84024 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 43257 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 43257 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 43514 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 49137 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 45583 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 45638 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 on 25/10/1961 D2864 1st Allocation        
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 28/10/1961 45655 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 28/10/1961 45671 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 28/10/1961 43295 Condemned      
Diesel 02 0-4-0 on 01/11/1961 D2865 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 44232 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 44494 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 44589 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 45544 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 23/12/1961 12075 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/12/1961 D3797 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 06/01/1962 84024 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/01/1962 41217 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/02/1962 47669 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 24/02/1962 12076 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D3796 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 47594 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 12078 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 45197 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 D3835 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 24/03/1962 43410 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 12100 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 D3795 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 12070 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 D3834 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 44986 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 48509 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 48512 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45197 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 45550 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 48188 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 48746 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/05/1962 48554 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/05/1962 44827 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/05/1962 48129 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45546 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 45549 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48326 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45256 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45354 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45380 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 44219 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 44239 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 44491 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 44522 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 44524 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 28/07/1962 45018 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45414 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/08/1962 47406 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45414 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/08/1962 90315 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/08/1962 90466 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/09/1962 90125 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 45354 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 45380 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90369 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90392 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90566 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/09/1962 90227 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/09/1962 48509 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/09/1962 48554 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/09/1962 48094 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/09/1962 48326 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/09/1962 48373 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/09/1962 48512 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 43240 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 43257 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 44553 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 44524 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 08/10/1962 44491 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 43282 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 43615 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 43657 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/10/1962 44553 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 03/11/1962 41288 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 01/12/1962 84001 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 1210 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 41210 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 41213 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 48676 Transfer in from: 19D Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 48727 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 44061 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90125 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90315 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90466 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90566 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/02/1963 47654 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 48727 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90227 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90369 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90392 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/03/1963 48676 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/03/1963 45380 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/04/1963 84000 Transfer out to: 89D Oswestry    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1963 48557 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1963 48676 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45156 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45018 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 D3851 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/06/1963 47531 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45580 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45730 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45035 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45156 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45354 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 D2392 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 07/1963 44494 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 D2391 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45652 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45700 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/07/1963 44076 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 45633 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 27/07/1963 D2864 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 27/07/1963 D2865 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45261 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45338 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45563 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45590 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45663 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45664 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44239 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 05/10/1963 45730 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/10/1963 44237 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/10/1963 47657 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/11/1963 44181 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/11/1963 41262 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/11/1963 41264 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44115 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44294 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44349 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44232 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 09/11/1963 45671 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 45663 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 16/11/1963 45664 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45666 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45726 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 48106 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44219 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/12/1963 48515 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/01/1964 48045 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/01/1964 48536 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 11/01/1964 41262 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 45261 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 45338 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 45414 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/02/1964 45321 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/02/1964 48297 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/02/1964 48543 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 44356 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 44356 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 07/03/1964 41211 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 48108 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 48139 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 48500 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 48045 Transfer out to: 16D Nottingham    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 14/03/1964 45638 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/03/1964 48301 Transfer in from: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/04/1964 48301 Transfer out to: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/04/1964 48050 Transfer in from: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1964 44076 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 48421 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 48451 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 48558 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41217 Transfer out to: 8M Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41264 Transfer out to: 8M Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 44063 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45150 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45271 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45328 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45343 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45381 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45495 Transfer out to: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1964 47362 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1964 47531 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 04/07/1964 45700 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45663 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45664 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/07/1964 48536 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 25/07/1964 45604 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 25/07/1964 45703 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 44730 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 44731 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 44819 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 44930 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 45078 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 45238 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 45256 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 45303 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 45436 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 48297 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 44356 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 45580 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 44384 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 24/10/1964 45583 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 24/10/1964 45663 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 43954 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44589 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 44935 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 45041 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 45109 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 45129 Transfer in from: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 21/11/1964 43954 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 21/11/1964 45703 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 12070 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 12075 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 12076 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 12078 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 12100 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 D2391 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 D2392 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 44358 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 44195 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 44358 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 16/01/1965 45652 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/01/1965 44930 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/01/1965 44935 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/03/1965 48163 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 44195 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92048 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92049 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92053 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92055 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92058 Transfer in from: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92059 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92070 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92078 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92086 Transfer in from: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92116 Transfer in from: 15C Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92119 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92124 Transfer in from: 15C Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92126 Transfer in from: 15C Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92156 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92160 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/03/1965 92163 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/03/1965 48515 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/03/1965 48543 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/03/1965 48557 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 20/03/1965 45726 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/03/1965 48221 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/03/1965 48704 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 28/03/1965 45664 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48050 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48108 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48139 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48163 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48268 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48421 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48451 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48500 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48558 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48676 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/04/1965 48715 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 44658 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 44930 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 44935 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48221 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/04/1965 48704 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 17/04/1965 45655 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 17/04/1965 45666 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 24/04/1965 45604 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/05/1965 92048 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/05/1965 92059 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/05/1965 92070 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 19/06/1965 92086 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 19/06/1965 92163 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 44779 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45070 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45221 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45375 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45068 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45323 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 44349 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44115 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 44963 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/08/1965 44181 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/10/1965 44522 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 16/10/1965 45633 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/10/1965 45078 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/11/1965 44294 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 27/11/1965 45563 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 12/1965 45068 Condemned      
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 on 11/12/1965 45590 Condemned      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 05/02/1966 D8128 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 45312 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 19/02/1966 92049 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 19/02/1966 92160 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 19/02/1966 92053 Condemned      
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 26/02/1966 D8128 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/03/1966 45232 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 05/1966 44731 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 28/05/1966 92095 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 44934 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 45133 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/08/1966 92132 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/08/1966 92224 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/08/1966 44920 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1966 45129 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 01/10/1966 92095 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/10/1966 92218 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/10/1966 92227 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 44935 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/11/1966 92116 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/12/1966 92124 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1966 44779 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/12/1966 45238 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1966 44963 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1966 45232 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 44730 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 45436 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/03/1967 92218 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 11/03/1967 92227 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/04/1967 45109 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/05/1967 92078 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 45055 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 45330 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44658 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44819 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44920 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44930 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 45070 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 06/1967 45256 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 45303 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44809 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 44816 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/06/1967 92058 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/06/1967 92119 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 22/07/1967 D5273 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/07/1967 92156 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 05/08/1967 92126 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/08/1967 92008 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/08/1967 92050 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/09/1967 44934 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/09/1967 45323 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 30/09/1967 92050 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 30/09/1967 92224 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 44809 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 44816 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45041 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45055 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45133 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45221 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45312 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45330 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45375 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 07/10/1967 D5273 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 07/10/1967 92055 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 07/10/1967 92132 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 07/10/1967 92008 Condemned