Depot: Wakefield
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1343 | Snapshot | M18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 91 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12715 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 91 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12741 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12823 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12833 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 12933 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 4478 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9666 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1343 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10764 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10777 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10806 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10852 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10869 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11358 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11415 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11457 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12046 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12047 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12092 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12182 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12284 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12305 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12369 | Snapshot | 23E | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12386 | Snapshot | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12433 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12435 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12561 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4478 | Snapshot | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4780 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4949 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50748 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50755 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50800 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50801 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50804 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50813 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 51468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5204 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5205 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5206 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8386 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8512 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8521 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8725 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8726 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8727 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8730 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9526 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9529 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9543 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9545 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9558 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9561 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9574 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9584 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9588 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9589 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9638 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9643 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9645 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9666 | Snapshot | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10715 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10788 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 12046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 10715 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 10788 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 10806 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 50804 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 50813 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10695 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1948 | 52568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8191 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8318 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8320 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8559 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8673 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8518 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8519 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8520 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8521 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8522 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 11503 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 10788 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 50813 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 4780 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 4949 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9504 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9589 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45261 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4824 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8147 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8398 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8191 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8517 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 12583 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 52043 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9511 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9533 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9613 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9642 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9515 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9529 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9541 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9546 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9550 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9559 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 9671 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 12235 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 12351 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9514 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9532 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9543 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9605 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9609 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9623 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 07/08/1948 | 50800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 47572 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7573 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7580 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 7582 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 11358 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 11390 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 11415 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 11457 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 11484 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 51500 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9530 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9646 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 49536 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 49631 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 9641 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8142 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 8386 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 50735 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 52181 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 52454 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/12/1948 | 50801 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 52181 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 52454 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9530 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9646 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 52181 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 52454 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 49524 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9571 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 12182 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 51468 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 5209 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 5221 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 48705 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 50886 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8469 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 8707 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49633 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 49630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 49669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 48507 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 48508 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 10715 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 48312 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8416 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 8479 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 52092 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 49562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 48017 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49644 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 05/1949 | 50813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 49523 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 49534 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9585 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8448 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 8491 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 49530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 49604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 50804 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 50898 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49523 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49534 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49576 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 77027 | Reinstated | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90212 | Reinstated | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90361 | Reinstated | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90362 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90370 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90396 | Reinstated | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90415 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 90643 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 52181 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 48502 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 49519 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 49570 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 49575 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 49621 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8504 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8506 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8511 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8514 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90212 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90361 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 90396 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 49613 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 49670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 90163 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 8448 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 8491 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90337 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90353 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90651 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90667 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90710 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90163 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 48017 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 48312 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8142 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8147 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90163 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 9585 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 52454 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 48705 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 8707 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 49526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 49584 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 90333 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 48500 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 48501 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 48503 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 49505 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8416 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8469 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8479 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 50762 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 50873 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 49531 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 49574 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 49625 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 48724 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 48725 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 49545 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 48726 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 49524 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 9506 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 49513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 52345 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 52353 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48505 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48509 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48512 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48513 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48727 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48730 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 49511 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 49516 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 49558 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 49561 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 49578 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8510 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8516 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 8732 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 9571 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49588 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49627 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49631 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49634 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49635 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49638 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 9648 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 41253 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 41254 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 48515 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 48673 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 12521 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 49641 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 49643 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 50804 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12521 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12521 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48320 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48559 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8398 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8318 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 52047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 52041 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 52044 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 6409 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 46438 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 46439 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 50748 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 50735 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 10777 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 50755 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 10799 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 52583 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 49536 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90642 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90723 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 52120 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 47572 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 47572 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 49603 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/09/1950 | 50764 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 50852 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90642 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90723 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 50898 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 52041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 50788 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 41283 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 41284 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90163 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52133 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90277 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90385 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90406 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90620 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90724 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 50650 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 52133 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90141 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90277 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90385 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90406 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90620 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90724 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 52133 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90277 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90385 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90406 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90620 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90724 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 52037 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 52056 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 90141 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 50656 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 90141 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 77027 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 10799 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 50873 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 52154 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 52351 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 50712 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 50712 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 50762 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 50886 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 52561 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 52319 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 52369 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90127 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90142 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90164 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90234 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90247 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41283 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1951 | 52056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90236 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 90260 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90236 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90260 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90236 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90260 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 52433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52243 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52376 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 90256 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 90265 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 41284 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45205 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45206 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45209 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 52284 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42717 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52243 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52376 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90265 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90556 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42716 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 50869 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52243 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52376 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90265 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 52521 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 45201 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1951 | 52353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90101 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90237 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90604 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 44928 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 45077 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42716 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42717 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90604 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44928 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45077 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44928 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45435 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 52244 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44019 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44928 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45077 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52244 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44928 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45435 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52244 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45077 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/08/1952 | 52037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52053 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 52053 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 52053 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1952 | 52386 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 52345 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44987 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45218 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 44987 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52305 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1953 | 52243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90581 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1953 | 52043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 52411 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41259 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 46415 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 90610 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 90237 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 90667 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 44062 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 51240 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 90639 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 90679 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 51240 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41254 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41259 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90101 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90127 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90141 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90142 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90164 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1954 | 52435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 52154 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 90643 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46439 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44062 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45218 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45261 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 90397 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46413 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46435 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46483 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 52120 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 52150 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 52235 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1955 | 52053 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 45218 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 45261 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 44462 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 45204 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 44462 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90256 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 52154 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 90260 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 90385 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45435 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 52244 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 52576 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42700 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42712 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 90385 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 90724 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 90652 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 90679 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 90404 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 90679 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 42700 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 42712 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 44019 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44019 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90556 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42861 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42862 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42863 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45101 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1956 | 61320 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 44928 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45201 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45218 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45261 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45339 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 52411 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90234 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90236 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90265 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90277 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90397 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90406 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 80086 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45101 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45435 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1956 | 61320 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 80086 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 90633 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 41251 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1957 | 52376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 43579 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61267 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61268 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61296 | Transfer in from: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48055 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48076 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48084 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48123 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48130 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48160 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48202 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48274 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48352 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48357 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48394 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 48702 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90337 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90362 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90610 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 90652 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1957 | 52186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61267 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 40155 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 40169 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 43075 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90089 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90100 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90382 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90429 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90470 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90503 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90625 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48055 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48076 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48084 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48123 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48130 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44824 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90607 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 40155 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90247 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90497 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90503 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 90363 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 64203 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41251 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41253 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 46483 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61015 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61319 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61321 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90112 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90124 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90321 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90326 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90348 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43075 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43579 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48160 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48202 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48274 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48352 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48357 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48394 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48702 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 64203 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 14/09/1958 | 41264 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 90061 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61319 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61321 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 52355 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 90047 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 90056 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 90116 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 40169 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90333 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40117 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40139 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47271 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47567 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47571 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 46415 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 61011 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 61017 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 61385 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 63588 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 63864 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1959 | 63920 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 40155 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 40169 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 47463 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 47538 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 68904 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 68910 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 68939 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/03/1959 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 90470 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/03/1959 | 61040 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1959 | 61011 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1959 | 61040 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 90016 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 90076 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 10/06/1959 | 47538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 43075 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 43101 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68897 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68898 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68909 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 568 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1959 | 52044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 46483 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 68959 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 48075 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 48138 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 48075 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 48138 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 90054 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 04/10/1959 | 41264 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 23/10/1959 | 40169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/10/1959 | 40139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 43579 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 43705 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 47580 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 90068 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90200 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90230 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90236 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90405 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90445 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90543 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 61020 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 90068 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1959 | D2587 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 42073 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 42622 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46413 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46435 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46438 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46483 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 90200 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 90236 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/11/1959 | D2588 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1959 | D2589 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1959 | D2591 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1959 | D2590 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1959 | D2592 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1959 | D2593 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/01/1960 | 68898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 44485 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/04/1960 | 68909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 68933 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 68959 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61018 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61021 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61024 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 64705 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1960 | 44019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42649 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42650 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 48138 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 48202 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90016 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90405 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90445 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 42622 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61018 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61020 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61021 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47255 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47266 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47405 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 42073 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47271 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47463 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47582 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1960 | 47567 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/11/1960 | 68897 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 52133 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 52355 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 90126 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 90678 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 48138 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 48202 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 46413 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 52413 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 52461 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1960 | 43579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1960 | 43705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 47571 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 47572 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 23/12/1960 | 47573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 90135 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 90642 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 90655 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 90707 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 43075 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 43101 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1961 | 64705 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44097 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44457 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1961 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/06/1961 | 63864 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90126 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90135 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90655 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90678 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90707 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 40074 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 40147 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 40190 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 90230 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 90642 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60861 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60884 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61040 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61161 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1961 | 47255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1961 | 47405 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 17/11/1961 | 40074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 40190 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 44097 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 12/12/1961 | 68933 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 44062 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 40117 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | D2590 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 52413 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 52461 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 46413 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 46438 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 46483 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 90426 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 44951 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 45207 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 45208 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42150 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44951 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45207 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45208 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 90100 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 90625 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 43070 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 43072 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 43101 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 44457 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 44485 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/08/1962 | 63588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/08/1962 | 63920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 43072 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 44062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/10/1962 | 68939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/11/1962 | 90607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 19/11/1962 | 40147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 61015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 61296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/11/1962 | 60861 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/11/1962 | 60884 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61017 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61024 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61268 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 61385 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/11/1962 | 68910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1962 | 42862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1962 | 61274 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1962 | 61387 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 68908 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 68922 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 68977 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 90054 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90155 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90373 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 90430 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 08/02/1963 | 46438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1963 | 90497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1963 | 61024 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1963 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 73161 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 73162 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 73168 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 73169 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 42152 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 42406 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 73161 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 73162 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90329 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90360 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90412 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73168 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73169 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68977 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90336 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90407 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90511 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90610 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90611 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90684 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 43132 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 47266 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1963 | 90326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 46483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 47379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 42861 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 42863 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90016 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 90074 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61034 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61123 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61129 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61173 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 61320 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 90068 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 44039 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90054 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90113 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90122 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90200 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90210 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90233 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90281 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90300 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90322 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90457 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90470 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90622 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90678 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90698 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90707 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90721 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2587 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2588 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2589 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2591 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2592 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | D2593 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43070 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43101 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43132 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 90426 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 90333 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 44039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1964 | 61224 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1964 | 61338 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1964 | 61353 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 90511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 42639 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 45589 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 45739 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 90160 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 90482 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1964 | 90322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/09/1964 | 42639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 45602 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 45661 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 73163 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 73165 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 42194 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 42269 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1964 | 90412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 45602 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 45661 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 73163 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 73165 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 42194 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/11/1964 | 61274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1964 | 90581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/12/1964 | 61034 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1965 | 61338 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42108 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42165 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42204 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1965 | 61022 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 31/01/1965 | 42165 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 31/01/1965 | 42649 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1965 | 90710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 42161 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 42181 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1965 | 90353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1965 | 90543 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45565 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45694 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 90016 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1965 | 45589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45565 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1965 | 90124 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | 90135 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1965 | 90409 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1965 | 61353 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1965 | 61320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 28/08/1965 | 42406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90056 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90361 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90405 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90642 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | 90056 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1965 | 61129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1965 | 90122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1965 | 90329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90345 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90347 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90357 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90395 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90619 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90664 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 42152 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1965 | 90333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/10/1965 | 90619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61013 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61030 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61237 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61240 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 43070 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90126 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90236 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 90625 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 42204 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 42204 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 42161 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90254 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90347 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 90395 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1966 | 90457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 90336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48357 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 48358 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 42108 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 90233 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 90679 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | 42108 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1966 | 61024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1966 | 61040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/07/1966 | 90068 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90054 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90642 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90721 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1966 | 61224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | 48357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | 48358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | 90113 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | 90622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 42177 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 42664 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 90711 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 90723 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 90200 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 90210 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | 90357 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1966 | 90373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1966 | 90651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90482 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 23/10/1966 | 42181 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92001 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92030 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92135 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92150 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 92215 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/10/1966 | 90664 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 90731 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 92006 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 92205 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 92206 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 92211 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 90074 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 90348 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 90711 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 42235 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 42267 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 42287 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 42574 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61115 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61189 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61309 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61388 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61173 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 90731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1966 | 90723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1966 | 61022 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 12/1966 | 42664 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42235 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42267 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42287 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42574 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92135 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92150 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92201 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92215 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92230 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42177 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42235 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42267 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42287 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 42574 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90061 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90112 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90116 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 90370 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92135 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92150 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 92215 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 06/12/1966 | 42150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 06/12/1966 | 42204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1966 | 61013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1966 | 61131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1966 | 61161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1966 | 61237 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1966 | 61240 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 12/12/1966 | 42108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1966 | 90470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 44946 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 44951 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 44990 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 42235 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90056 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90135 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90321 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90361 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90382 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 90698 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1967 | 90126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1967 | 45694 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1967 | 45739 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1967 | 90639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1967 | 90707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1967 | 90089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1967 | 90155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1967 | 90684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1967 | 61189 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1967 | 90415 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 17/01/1967 | 92001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1967 | 61030 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/01/1967 | 61123 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1967 | 61309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48055 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48202 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48265 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48276 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90233 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90351 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90397 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90655 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90633 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1967 | 90385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 43070 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 27/02/1967 | 92030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1894 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1895 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1994 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1995 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1996 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1997 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/04/1967 | 92006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/04/1967 | 92150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1967 | 90429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1967 | 90655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1967 | 90625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 03/05/1967 | 42267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/05/1967 | 61115 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 09/05/1967 | 92206 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1967 | 90397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1967 | 90407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1967 | 90610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 42072 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 42152 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 42189 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43050 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43084 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43117 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43125 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 20/05/1967 | D1994 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43050 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43084 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 43117 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 22/05/1967 | 44946 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 22/05/1967 | 92211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1967 | 90233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 06/06/1967 | 42650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 48265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 90047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 90160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 90404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 90620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 92135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 92205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/06/1967 | 92215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 48202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 61388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90300 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 90678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 07/1967 | 42269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 07/1967 | 42287 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 42072 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 42152 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 42189 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 42574 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 43125 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 44990 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48055 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48276 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90076 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90236 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90351 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90360 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90405 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90430 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 90611 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1995 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1996 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1997 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D1894 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D1895 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby |