Depot: Thornton Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/03/1923 | 2263 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/05/1923 | 2253 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/05/1923 | 2263 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1923 | 1185 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/10/1923 | 2253 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/11/1923 | 1185 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1924 | 6288 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1924 | 6346 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/08/1924 | 6290 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/08/1924 | 6352 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1928 | 6550 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/03/1929 | 6543 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1941 | 757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Z4 | 0-4-2T | m/e | 03/1942 | 6844 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Z4 | 0-4-2T | m/e | 04/1942 | 6844 | Transfer out to: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1943 | 6524 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1943 | 6633 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1943 | 5393 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/07/1943 | 6290 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/07/1943 | 6288 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/09/1943 | 6550 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/10/1943 | 6352 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/10/1943 | 6524 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1943 | 5393 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1943 | 6633 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/10/1943 | 6543 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/08/1944 | 5385 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1944 | 6601 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1946 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1946 | 4784 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/08/1946 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/09/1946 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1946 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1946 | 4784 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1946 | 1103 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1947 | 1118 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1947 | 1262 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2429 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2430 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2442 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2467 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2475 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2492 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2716 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2717 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2729 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4474 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4521 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4549 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4553 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4564 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4597 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4598 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4602 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5218 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5291 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5345 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5901 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5902 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5903 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5904 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5907 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5908 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5910 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5911 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5913 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5921 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5925 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5931 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5932 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7476 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8323 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8332 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8335 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8351 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8453 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8456 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8459 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8467 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9132 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9223 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9224 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 2729 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 2729 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2436 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/02/1948 | 1292 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 1072 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1948 | 1292 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1072 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 1072 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | D32 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 62446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 3610 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1949 | 3806 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63184 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 63192 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 63192 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1949 | 61146 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 61146 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 61146 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63184 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 62406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 62401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 62410 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 62411 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 62410 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/01/1950 | 61148 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 8351 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64598 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62418 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 62418 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 62418 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62713 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1950 | 65291 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62713 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62713 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 8341 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1951 | 62717 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 65252 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 65252 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 65252 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 8341 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/10/1951 | 61147 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 61147 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 61147 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/12/1951 | 61741 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61731 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1952 | 61770 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/01/1952 | 61755 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61755 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61770 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 69143 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61755 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61770 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64514 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/02/1952 | 69012 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/02/1952 | 69013 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1952 | 68550 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/02/1952 | 68555 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69012 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69013 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90441 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69012 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69013 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 61770 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67461 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67471 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64597 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 14/11/1952 | 62411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/11/1952 | 61734 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 61734 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 61734 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 04/12/1952 | 67471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 64495 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 64500 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 61739 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 61766 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 42708 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 42871 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 42878 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/03/1953 | 61739 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/03/1953 | 61766 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42708 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42871 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42878 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1953 | 61734 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90020 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1953 | 61148 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 61148 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42733 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42866 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 42733 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 42866 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 90199 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 68535 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 15/09/1954 | 67476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/11/1954 | 68341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 18/12/1954 | 67461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 68334 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67493 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1955 | 61403 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 64612 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 90199 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/11/1955 | 68337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/12/1955 | 90513 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/01/1956 | 61134 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/01/1956 | 68504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 10/02/1956 | 67452 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/02/1956 | 13210 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/02/1956 | 13211 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/03/1956 | 55217 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 13/04/1956 | 67493 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/10/1956 | 68323 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1956 | 61401 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 68467 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 13275 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65900 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65905 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 68331 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 90117 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 90705 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 64516 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/01/1957 | 62430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 64464 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 64477 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1957 | 61755 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/03/1957 | 61741 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62728 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62744 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1957 | 13337 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/03/1957 | 13338 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/03/1957 | 13339 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1957 | 13340 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1957 | 13341 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1957 | 61330 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1957 | 61358 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1957 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62677 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62678 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62679 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 62706 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 13210 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 13211 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/08/1957 | 62429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69150 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69224 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 09/09/1957 | 62713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/09/1957 | 62419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 69013 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 03/02/1958 | 62706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62712 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 62733 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/02/1958 | 68451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 20/06/1958 | 68321 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1958 | 62442 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1958 | D2576 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1958 | D2577 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 18/08/1958 | 62704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1958 | 61072 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 03/09/1958 | 62468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 10/09/1958 | 62679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/09/1958 | 69153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/10/1958 | 62431 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1958 | D2578 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1958 | D2579 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1958 | D2580 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/12/1958 | D2581 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/12/1958 | 68322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1959 | 64522 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1959 | D2582 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1959 | D2583 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1959 | D2584 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/03/1959 | 68331 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 03/03/1959 | 62678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 69211 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1959 | 61343 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1959 | 64521 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1959 | D2585 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 04/05/1959 | 62708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | 61993 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | 61996 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/06/1959 | 68334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 11/06/1959 | 62492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1959 | 61731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 29/06/1959 | 62475 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 62677 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/07/1959 | 64466 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | 62418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64790 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64792 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64600 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64602 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 68453 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 68456 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 29/10/1959 | 62728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 15/12/1959 | 62478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69136 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69204 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 55217 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 68335 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69132 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69143 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69223 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1960 | 61132 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 90705 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 68458 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/04/1960 | 61403 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62712 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62729 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 62744 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1960 | 61401 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61134 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61262 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1960 | 65252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 62716 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 62733 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 65218 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 10/08/1960 | 62467 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/08/1960 | 68332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1960 | 61146 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1960 | 61146 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 62484 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 62484 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 64478 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 64491 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 65903 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/02/1961 | 69012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1961 | 64596 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65916 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/05/1961 | 68459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/05/1961 | 69136 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/06/1961 | D5347 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/07/1961 | D5348 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | D5347 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 27 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | D5348 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 61993 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 61996 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 64474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 64488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 64565 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1961 | 61340 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1961 | 61401 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1961 | 61340 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1961 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1961 | 64986 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1962 | 64792 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 90004 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 76111 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65931 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 65307 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 69204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 90513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 90193 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1962 | 64794 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1962 | 64478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 61332 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 64550 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1962 | 61346 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64790 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64986 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64557 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64576 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64577 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64586 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64588 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64603 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64605 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65918 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65934 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64557 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64576 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64577 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64603 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64605 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65918 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65934 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 90444 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 65932 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 65307 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/08/1963 | 90193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 90468 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1963 | 64629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1963 | 65900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64595 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90319 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90727 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/12/1963 | 61358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 65932 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 90705 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 65921 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 64616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 65902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 90004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1964 | 61221 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1964 | 61146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/04/1964 | 61401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1964 | 64546 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 61346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 64564 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1964 | 90319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 64625 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 90628 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 64586 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1964 | 64549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1964 | 61118 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/07/1964 | 65904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1964 | 90705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1964 | 61261 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/08/1964 | 65913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 64632 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65909 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 65917 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/09/1964 | 65908 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | D3342 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 64572 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 64591 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65922 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65917 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1964 | 61400 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 64591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 64570 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 64569 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 64606 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 65914 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76111 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/12/1964 | 61400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61221 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 65920 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1965 | 61147 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1965 | 65915 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | 65327 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | D2585 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 90727 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1965 | 64625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1965 | 65916 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1965 | 65327 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 65921 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 65930 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/12/1965 | 64632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 90600 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | D2584 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | 65930 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3275 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 65345 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1966 | 61343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1966 | 64595 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1966 | 65932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1966 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1966 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61099 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61344 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61347 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61349 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 90596 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 90640 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1966 | 65905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1966 | 64588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 61103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 64606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 65910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1966 | 90600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1966 | 90640 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/08/1966 | 61407 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1966 | 61349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 64602 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1966 | 65907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1966 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 61099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 61132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 61148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1966 | 61261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1966 | 61344 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1966 | 65922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1966 | 90441 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1966 | 61029 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 61308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 61330 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 64570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 64618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1966 | 65925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64569 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64602 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 65345 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8072 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8075 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8076 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8077 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8106 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | D8110 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | 90117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | 90444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | 90628 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2575 | Transfer in from: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1967 | 65911 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2574 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2575 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8072 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8075 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8076 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8077 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8106 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D8110 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2574 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1967 | 61347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/04/1967 | 90596 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61407 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 65901 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 90468 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | 12107 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1967 | 90020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1967 | 65345 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | D2577 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1967 | D2578 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D2585 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D2589 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1967 | D3737 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | 12107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | D2589 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D2595 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D3733 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D3734 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D3340 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D2426 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D2430 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D2437 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D2439 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D2440 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D2438 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D2442 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2576 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2579 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2580 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2581 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2582 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2583 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2585 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2595 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/06/1968 | D2430 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3411 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3549 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3554 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3892 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3337 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3338 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3339 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3182 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1968 | D3342 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3891 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3182 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3411 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D3211 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/01/1969 | D2426 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3411 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3560 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/03/1969 | D3547 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D3549 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D3547 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/05/1969 | D3547 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3554 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D3411 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1969 | D3560 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D3547 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1969 | D3733 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3211 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2437 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2438 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2439 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2440 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2442 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3341 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3734 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3737 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3891 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D3892 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill |