Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 425 Today
» 1522 Yesterday
» 8162 Week
» 19867 Month
» 351356 Year
» 427943 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Thornaby


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63340 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63349 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63355 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63360 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63364 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63368 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63369 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63370 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63371 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63373 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63375 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63380 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63388 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63389 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63393 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63396 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63401 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63403 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63405 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63409 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63411 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63417 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63420 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63424 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63426 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63428 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63430 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63435 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63442 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63445 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63447 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/06/1958 63452 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69830 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69831 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69834 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69842 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69860 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69866 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69869 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69882 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 01/06/1958 69891 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13139 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13140 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13141 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13142 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13143 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13144 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13147 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13148 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13149 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13150 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 13151 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 D3145 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 D3146 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43054 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43057 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43071 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43072 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43073 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 43102 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65720 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65730 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65732 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65734 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65736 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65737 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65738 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65740 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65741 Transfer in from:        
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65742 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65743 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65744 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65745 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65746 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65749 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65750 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65751 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65752 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65753 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65754 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65755 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65756 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65757 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65758 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65759 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65760 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65761 Transfer in from:        
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65762 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65763 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65765 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65766 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65767 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65768 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65769 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65770 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65772 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65773 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65774 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65775 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65776 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65777 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65778 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65779 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J27 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65870 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67754 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67759 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67764 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67765 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67766 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 14/06/1958 68011 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 14/06/1958 68023 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 14/06/1958 68049 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 14/06/1958 68060 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 14/06/1958 68062 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68245 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68260 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68290 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68312 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68684 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68688 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68689 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68690 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68712 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68721 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68740 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68908 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68942 Transfer in from: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68948 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 69006 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 69019 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90014 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90016 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90027 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90074 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90076 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90081 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90090 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90091 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90098 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90132 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90240 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90273 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90373 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90409 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90426 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90434 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90435 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90446 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90451 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90452 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90459 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90461 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90462 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90465 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90481 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90488 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90500 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90517 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90603 Transfer in from: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90605 Transfer in from:        
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/07/1958 67754 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/07/1958 67766 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J26 0-6-0 19/07/1958 65746 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 19/07/1958 65752 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 19/07/1958 65754 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 19/07/1958 65765 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 19/07/1958 65767 Condemned      
Steam J50 0-6-0T m/e 09/1958 68942 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T 16/09/1958 69891 Condemned      
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67759 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam L1 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 67765 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/10/1958 68011 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/10/1958 68049 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J26 0-6-0 14/10/1958 65734 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 26/10/1958 63340 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 26/10/1958 63403 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 29/10/1958 69842 Condemned      
Steam A5 4-6-2T 11/11/1958 69834 Condemned      
Diesel 10 0-6-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 D3138 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 18/11/1958 69830 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T 18/11/1958 69866 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T 19/11/1958 69882 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 43054 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 43057 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 43071 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam A5 4-6-2T 27/11/1958 69831 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 30/11/1958 61031 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 06/12/1958 67759 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 13/12/1958 68948 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 68260 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 01/1959 65730 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 01/1959 65740 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 01/1959 65758 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 01/1959 65759 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 01/1959 68290 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 01/1959 68712 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68272 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68729 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J50 0-6-0T w/e 31/01/1959 68908 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65738 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65742 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65744 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65750 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65766 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65770 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1959 65775 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 02/1959 68312 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 w/e 07/02/1959 65773 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 65865 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 65868 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 65790 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 65835 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 28/02/1959 65839 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 03/1959 65749 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1959 43073 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/03/1959 90016 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/03/1959 90076 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 04/1959 68245 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 90488 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61018 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61021 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61024 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61030 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61032 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61034 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61037 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61173 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61220 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61255 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 14/06/1959 61303 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62001 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62003 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62041 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam K1 2-6-0 14/06/1959 62042 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63341 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63343 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63344 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63347 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63361 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63367 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63374 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63382 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63416 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63432 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63450 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 14/06/1959 63451 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 46478 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J26 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65747 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J26 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65773 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65787 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65788 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65853 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 65884 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 67754 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 67766 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/06/1959 68049 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/06/1959 68060 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/06/1959 68078 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1959 68696 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90086 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90397 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90479 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 20/06/1959 68060 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1959 90605 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam K1 2-6-0 26/07/1959 62041 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/08/1959 90048 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/08/1959 90698 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 25/08/1959 D2067 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1959 60911 Transfer in from: 38C Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 06/09/1959 60915 Transfer in from: 15E Leicester (G.C.)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/09/1959 60946 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 13/09/1959 60960 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1959 61018 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1959 61021 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1959 61024 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1959 61030 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 20/09/1959 61032 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 10/1959 65737 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1959 90233 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1959 90377 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1959 90406 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/10/1959 90593 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 11/1959 65732 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 01/11/1959 61062 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 01/11/1959 61240 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 01/11/1959 61257 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/11/1959 64730 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/11/1959 64758 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 01/11/1959 64850 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90233 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90397 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 90698 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam V2 2-6-2 08/11/1959 60885 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/11/1959 63399 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/11/1959 63368 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64706 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64818 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/11/1959 64857 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64725 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64821 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64835 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64845 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64855 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64859 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64861 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 13/12/1959 64870 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 24/12/1959 D2078 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 07/01/1960 D2079 1st Allocation        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 09/01/1960 68060 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 D3137 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90022 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90072 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90503 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 46478 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 19/03/1960 D3873 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 26/03/1960 D3875 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 01/04/1960 D3876 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 03/04/1960 61068 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 03/04/1960 62003 Transfer out to: 51J Northallerton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60806 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 12/06/1960 60967 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A8 4-6-2T 13/06/1960 69869 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T 14/06/1960 69860 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 D2069 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 90014 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 90373 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 19/06/1960 60846 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 D2077 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 23/07/1960 D2099 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 06/08/1960 D2100 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 06/08/1960 D2155 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 09/1960 65777 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1960 60808 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1960 60809 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1960 60859 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1960 60901 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/09/1960 60916 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61031 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61037 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61062 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61068 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 11/09/1960 61240 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 11/09/1960 64835 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 17/09/1960 68039 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43072 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43102 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 15/10/1960 68688 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/10/1960 64757 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 61818 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 61844 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 61986 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 01/1961 65762 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 01/1961 68696 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 02/1961 65736 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 02/1961 68272 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 02/1961 68690 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/02/1961 61218 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 05/02/1961 61259 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/02/1961 43057 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/02/1961 43070 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 25/02/1961 68675 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 25/02/1961 68688 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 03/1961 65779 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 03/1961 68684 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1961 43075 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1961 43101 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 11/03/1961 68049 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 11/03/1961 68062 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 25/03/1961 68078 Transfer out to: 41J Langwith Junction    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 15/04/1961 D5151 1st Allocation        
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 05/1961 65753 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 m/e 05/1961 65868 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 01/05/1961 D5152 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 10/05/1961 D5153 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 20/05/1961 D5154 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1961 D2320 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 03/06/1961 D5155 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 05/06/1961 61844 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 11/06/1961 60809 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 17/06/1961 D5156 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61818 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61986 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 07/1961 65760 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 07/1961 65774 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 07/1961 65778 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 07/1961 68740 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 07/07/1961 D5157 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 09/07/1961 64850 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 10/07/1961 D5158 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/07/1961 64845 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 27/07/1961 D5159 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 08/1961 68721 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 19/08/1961 D5160 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/08/1961 69004 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 09/1961 68675 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 02/09/1961 D5161 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 09/09/1961 D5162 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 09/09/1961 68754 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60911 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 10/09/1961 60967 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 29/09/1961 D5163 1st Allocation        
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 10/1961 65741 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 m/e 10/1961 65769 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1961 68688 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1961 68689 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 10/1961 68729 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 07/10/1961 D5164 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/10/1961 69002 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam N7 0-6-2T w/e 07/10/1961 69717 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 19/10/1961 D5165 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 22/10/1961 64725 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 02/11/1961 D5166 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 04/11/1961 69016 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 04/11/1961 67766 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 25/11/1961 D5167 1st Allocation        
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 67635 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 67640 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67754 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67759 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam L1 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 67764 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1961 64861 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 01/12/1961 D5168 1st Allocation        
Steam J26 0-6-0 11/12/1961 65745 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 15/12/1961 D5169 1st Allocation        
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 16/12/1961 D5112 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 16/12/1961 D5113 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/12/1961 64818 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/12/1961 64855 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 24/12/1961 64859 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 29/12/1961 D5170 1st Allocation        
Steam J26 0-6-0 08/01/1962 65751 Condemned      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 17/01/1962 D5370 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 18/01/1962 64870 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 21/01/1962 64706 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 22/01/1962 65839 Condemned      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 24/01/1962 D5372 1st Allocation        
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 29/01/1962 D5371 1st Allocation        
Steam J26 0-6-0 29/01/1962 65763 Condemned      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 31/01/1962 D5373 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 03/02/1962 D5171 1st Allocation        
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 07/02/1962 D5374 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 12/02/1962 90603 Condemned      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 14/02/1962 D5375 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 17/02/1962 D5172 1st Allocation        
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 21/02/1962 D5376 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 90426 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 90435 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 90461 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/02/1962 60960 Condemned      
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 28/02/1962 D5377 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2107 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2153 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2154 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2306 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2307 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2317 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2338 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 68754 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 69002 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 69004 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 03/03/1962 69006 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/03/1962 61255 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 04/03/1962 61303 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo 07/03/1962 D5378 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/03/1962 90481 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 17/03/1962 D5173 1st Allocation        
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 30/03/1962 D5174 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 31/03/1962 69019 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/04/1962 63347 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 01/04/1962 63361 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65788 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65853 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65865 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 65870 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63341 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63343 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63380 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63382 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63432 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63450 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 08/04/1962 63451 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J25 0-6-0 09/04/1962 65720 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 77001 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 77010 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J26 0-6-0 16/04/1962 65747 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 16/04/1962 65757 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 21/04/1962 D5175 1st Allocation        
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 21/04/1962 65787 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 03/06/1962 63355 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 03/06/1962 63373 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J26 0-6-0 04/06/1962 65743 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 04/06/1962 65755 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 04/06/1962 65756 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 04/06/1962 65768 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 17/06/1962 62042 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 17/06/1962 64857 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam J26 0-6-0 18/06/1962 65761 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 18/06/1962 65772 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 18/06/1962 65773 Condemned      
Steam J26 0-6-0 18/06/1962 65776 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 43015 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 65818 Transfer in from: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 65820 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 76024 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 90240 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 90409 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 90465 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/07/1962 60808 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 01/07/1962 60915 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 17/07/1962 D6769 1st Allocation        
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 30/07/1962 65818 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 43070 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 43101 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 17/08/1962 D6770 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 22/08/1962 D6771 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 04/09/1962 D6772 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 10/09/1962 D6773 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 17/09/1962 D6774 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 21/09/1962 D6755 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 24/09/1962 D6775 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 28/09/1962 D6756 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/09/1962 D398 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 29/09/1962 D399 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 05/10/1962 D6757 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 08/10/1962 D6776 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 10/10/1962 D6758 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 12/10/1962 D6759 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 12/10/1962 D6777 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 19/10/1962 D6760 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 21/10/1962 77011 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 24/10/1962 D6761 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 26/10/1962 D6762 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 27/10/1962 77014 Transfer in from: SBH Blyth (South)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 29/10/1962 D6778 1st Allocation        
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 31/10/1962 90022 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co 07/11/1962 D6763 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 07/11/1962 D6764 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 11/11/1962 63370 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 11/11/1962 63424 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 14/11/1962 D6765 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 16/11/1962 D6766 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/11/1962 64730 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/11/1962 64758 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 16/11/1962 64821 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co 21/11/1962 D6767 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 23/11/1962 D6768 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 25/11/1962 60916 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61034 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61173 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61218 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 25/11/1962 61259 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 25/11/1962 63374 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 26/11/1962 64757 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 90377 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 90503 Transfer out to: 55C Farnley Junction    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 90517 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63360 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63389 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63393 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63399 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63409 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63411 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63420 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/12/1962 63426 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 90074 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam B1 4-6-0 09/12/1962 61257 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 16/12/1962 63417 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 16/12/1962 63445 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 65820 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 65835 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 43075 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam V2 2-6-2 24/02/1963 60846 Transfer out to: 64A St Margarets    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 10/03/1963 63375 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/03/1963 D397 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90086 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90090 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 90500 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam B1 4-6-0 24/03/1963 61220 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 06/04/1963 D392 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K1 2-6-0 07/04/1963 62001 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 13/04/1963 D393 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 20/04/1963 D394 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 27/04/1963 D395 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 27/04/1963 77010 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63364 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63396 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63428 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63430 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63447 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 w/e 29/04/1963 63452 Condemned      
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 05/1963 90027 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 04/05/1963 D396 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/05/1963 90098 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1963 90048 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/05/1963 D250 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 43057 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 18/05/1963 D251 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/05/1963 D256 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/06/1963 90479 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2316 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2331 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6780 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6781 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6782 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6783 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1963 60806 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1963 60885 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 16/06/1963 60901 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1963 90434 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1963 90452 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1963 90459 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 23/06/1963 63349 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 23/06/1963 63388 Transfer out to: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 23/06/1963 63435 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 07/07/1963 63367 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 07/07/1963 63371 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 15/07/1963 63369 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 15/07/1963 63416 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 15/07/1963 63442 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 21/07/1963 63405 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 18/08/1963 63401 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90091 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90132 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90273 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90462 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90072 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90081 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90406 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90451 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 15/09/1963 77011 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 21/09/1963 68023 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 21/09/1963 68039 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 77001 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 77014 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 28/09/1963 67640 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 05/10/1963 69016 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 43135 Transfer in from: 65D Dawsholm    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 m/e 11/1963 90446 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 76024 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam J27 0-6-0 m/e 12/1963 65884 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 43140 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/12/1963 90588 Transfer in from: 55G Huddersfield    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/01/1964 90082 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/01/1964 90445 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/01/1964 60884 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam V2 2-6-2 26/01/1964 60952 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/02/1964 63361 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/02/1964 63398 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/02/1964 63443 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 02/02/1964 63446 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 29/02/1964 65817 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 29/02/1964 65892 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 20/03/1964 D8588 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D394 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D395 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D396 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D397 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D398 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/04/1964 D399 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 04/05/1964 D8589 1st Allocation        
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 12/05/1964 D8590 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 17/05/1964 63361 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1964 90082 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1964 90445 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/05/1964 43135 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1964 65892 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/05/1964 90593 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 07/06/1964 63344 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1964 43140 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 21/06/1964 63398 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/07/1964 60859 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/07/1964 60884 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/07/1964 60946 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 05/07/1964 60952 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 08/07/1964 D8591 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/08/1964 D6779 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 19/09/1964 D5156 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 19/09/1964 D5157 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/09/1964 D6755 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/09/1964 D6756 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 27/09/1964 63446 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/10/1964 D237 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/10/1964 D240 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/10/1964 D246 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/10/1964 D273 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 65817 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam WD 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/10/1964 90588 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 15/11/1964 63443 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 27/03/1965 D238 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 27/03/1965 D239 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 65790 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1965 D2070 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1965 D2076 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 25/09/1965 D1868 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 02/10/1965 D1889 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 09/10/1965 D1889 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5248 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5249 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5250 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5251 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5252 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5253 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5254 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5255 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5370 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5371 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5372 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5373 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5374 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5375 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5376 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5377 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 27 Bo-Bo w/e 11/12/1965 D5378 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5251 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5252 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5253 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5254 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5255 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 01/01/1966 D5256 Transfer in from: D16 Nottingham Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5248 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5249 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5250 Transfer in from: D15 Leicester Division    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5251 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5252 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5253 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5254 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5255 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 29/01/1966 D5256 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 08/10/1966 D6821 Transfer in from: 64B Haymarket    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 08/10/1966 D6822 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 08/10/1966 D6829 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 31/12/1966 D5176 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 31/12/1966 D5178 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 28/01/1967 D242 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 25/03/1967 D241 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8310 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8311 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8312 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8313 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8314 1st Allocation        
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo 20/05/1967 D8315 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6785 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6786 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6787 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 01/07/1967 43015 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2046 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2067 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2068 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2070 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2076 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2077 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2078 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2093 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2099 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2149 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2153 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2204 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2205 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D2340 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D3137 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1967 D3672 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/10/1967 D5154 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 07/10/1967 D5155 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 07/10/1967 D6780 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 07/10/1967 D6786 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 07/10/1967 D6787 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1967 D2057 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 04/11/1967 D6797 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 04/11/1967 D6797 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 04/11/1967 D6798 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 04/11/1967 D6798 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D3942 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D3943 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/12/1967 D5166 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/12/1967 D5167 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/12/1967 D5168 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo 4w/e 02/12/1967 D5169 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1968 D3182 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/01/1968 D6758 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/01/1968 D6775 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2061 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2065 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2243 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2315 Transfer in from: 98W      
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 24/02/1968 D8601 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 24/02/1968 D8602 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 24/02/1968 D8604 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 24/02/1968 D8605 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/03/1968 D3401 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/03/1968 D3406 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/03/1968 D3503 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 27/04/1968 D3405 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/04/1968 D6794 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/04/1968 D6795 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/04/1968 D8599 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/04/1968 D8600 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 17 Bo-Bo 4w/e 27/04/1968 D8603 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D1103 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D1104 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D1106 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D1107 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D1108 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1968 D3504 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/05/1968 D3913 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D6792 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/05/1968 D6793 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 22/06/1968 D1105 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 20/07/1968 D1101 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 20/07/1968 D1102 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3321 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D3915 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 03/08/1968 D1769 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/09/1968 D3242 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 21/09/1968 D2155 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 21/09/1968 D2243 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 21/09/1968 D6821 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 21/09/1968 D6831 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1758 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1759 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1770 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1790 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1797 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1880 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D1881 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D6824 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D6951 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/10/1968 D6952 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/10/1968 D6712 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/10/1968 D6711 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/11/1968 D6822 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/11/1968 D6823 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/11/1968 D6820 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/11/1968 D6827 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 28/12/1968 D6829 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 25/01/1969 D1582 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 01/02/1969 D1579 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/03/1969 D1785 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/03/1969 D1788 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/03/1969 D1789 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/03/1969 D6872 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 05/04/1969 D6832 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 05/04/1969 D6834 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/04/1969 D6874 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 17/05/1969 D6826 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 17/05/1969 D6871 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 14/06/1969 D6866 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 21/06/1969 D1797 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/07/1969 D3317 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/07/1969 D6830 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/07/1969 D6779 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/07/1969 D6780 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/07/1969 D6785 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/08/1969 D3687 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1883 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D1884 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/10/1969 D6741 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D1792 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D1795 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D1796 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D1799 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6712 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6731 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6786 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6791 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6828 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6832 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6871 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6874 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6893 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6894 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6895 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6897 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6898 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6899 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6902 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 31/01/1970 D6911 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 21/02/1970 D6777 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 21/03/1970 D5165 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/04/1970 D6794 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/04/1970 D6896 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/04/1970 D6913 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 02/05/1970 D1879 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/05/1970 D6866 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 09/05/1970 D5166 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 09/05/1970 D5167 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 09/05/1970 D5168 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6701 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6702 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6703 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6704 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6705 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6706 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/05/1970 D6707 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 11/07/1970 D3241 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1970 D3195 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1970 13078 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 14/11/1970 D6901 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 23/01/1971 D5170 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 23/01/1971 D5171 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 30/01/1971 D6828 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 30/01/1971 D6829 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 30/01/1971 D6830 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/03/1971 D2048 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/04/1971 D3073 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 08/05/1971 D6732 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 08/05/1971 D6920 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 29/05/1971 D5534 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 17/07/1971 D3322 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 07/08/1971 D5550 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/08/1971 D3657 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 31140 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5542 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5543 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5544 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5558 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 09/10/1971 D5559 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6700 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6721 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6801 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6802 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6809 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6810 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6812 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6813 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/10/1971 D6814 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 30/10/1971 D1894 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 30/10/1971 D1895 Transfer in from: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 30/10/1971 D3935 Transfer in from: 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 13/11/1971 D5167 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 13/11/1971 D5170 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 13/11/1971 D5172 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1971 D3938 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/01/1972 D1791 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/01/1972 D5548 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/01/1972 D5606 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/01/1972 D5696 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 08/01/1972 D5850 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/01/1972 D3917 Transfer in from: 66A Polmadie    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 w/e 18/03/1972 D4054 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/05/1972 D6709 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/05/1972 D6710 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/05/1972 D6755 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1972 D3091 Transfer in from: 2F Bescot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/06/1972 D3799 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/07/1972 D1894 Transfer in from: D05 Stoke Division    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 08/07/1972 D6768 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 29/07/1972 D5541 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 12/08/1972 D5807 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/08/1972 D6760 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 12/08/1972 D6818 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D1989 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D1990 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D1991 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D1992 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 07/10/1972 D6731 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/11/1972 D5804 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/11/1972 D5805 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/11/1972 D5845 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 25/11/1972 D5810 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 25/11/1972 D5811 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1972 D6770 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1972 D6772 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1972 D6777 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1972 D6795 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 02/12/1972 D6873 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/12/1972 D3285 Transfer in from: 66C Hamilton (West)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 10/03/1973 31303 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 10/03/1973 37059 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 10/03/1973 37160 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 10/03/1973 37216 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3504 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 37041 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 37057 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 19/05/1973 37067 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1878 Transfer in from: 55G Knottingley    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1880 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1881 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 D1882 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31137 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A 4w/e 06/10/1973 31138 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37008 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37009 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37121 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37122 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37161 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37163 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37167 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37168 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37200 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 06/10/1973 37212 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 13/10/1973 37219 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 12/01/1974 31141 Transfer in from: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 12/01/1974 31285 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 12/01/1974 31292 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 12/01/1974 31296 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/02/1974 37253 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37013 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37015 Transfer in from: MR March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37016 Transfer in from: MR March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37024 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37025 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37082 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 16/02/1974 37117 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31132 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 09/03/1974 31284 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37032 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37074 Transfer in from: MC March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37085 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37164 Transfer in from: IM Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37165 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 09/03/1974 37250 Transfer in from: MR March    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31130 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31143 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31152 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31282 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31283 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31297 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 11/05/1974 31306 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1974 37010 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1974 37238 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 11/05/1974 37242 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 18/05/1974 31299 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 18/05/1974 31300 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 06/07/1974 31153 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/07/1974 37036 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 27/07/1974 08310 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington (Bank Top)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 10/08/1974 37097 Transfer in from: IM Immingham    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 3w/e 21/09/1974 03010 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A 2w/e 12/10/1974 31139 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 37094 Transfer in from: IM Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 12/10/1974 47360 Transfer in from: ED Eastfield    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/10/1974 37092 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 26/10/1974 37093 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1974 03171 Transfer in from: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 11/01/1975 31278 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 2w/e 11/01/1975 31290 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 37084 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 37087 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 47039 Transfer in from: HO Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 11/01/1975 47050 Transfer in from: HO Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 18/01/1975 37082 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co w/e 08/03/1975 47052 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 3w/e 10/05/1975 31287 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 3w/e 10/05/1975 37166 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 3w/e 10/05/1975 37199 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 3w/e 12/07/1975 47052 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel Brush Type 4 Co-Co 2w/e 11/10/1975 47298 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 18/10/1975 37079 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 18/10/1975 37080 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 18/10/1975 37100 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 18/10/1975 37249 Transfer in from: GD Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1975 08771 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1975 08212 Transfer in from: 66C Hamilton (West)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 29/02/1976 37055 Transfer in from: MR March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 29/02/1976 37056 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 29/02/1976 37119 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 29/02/1976 37131 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 29/02/1976 37160 Transfer in from: SF Stratford    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 10/04/1976 03075 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 10/04/1976 03159 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 2w/e 25/07/1976 03096 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 15/08/1976 08772 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 20/11/1976 08211 Transfer in from: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 20/11/1976 08373 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 20/11/1976 08608 Transfer in from: 36A Doncaster    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 20/11/1976 08864 Transfer in from: 41C Wath    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 04/12/1976 08860 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 2w/e 17/02/1979 37042 Transfer in from: HM Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co m/e 30/11/1979 37095 Transfer in from: TI Tinsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co m/e 30/11/1979 37098 Transfer in from: HM Healey Mills    
Diesel 37 Co-Co m/e 30/11/1979 37119 Transfer in from: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co m/e 30/11/1979 37161 Transfer in from: TE Thornaby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 m/e 30/11/1979 40193 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 15/05/1988 20083 Transfer in from: ED Eastfield    
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo w/e 15/05/1988 20086 Transfer in from: HA Haymarket    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31105 Transfer in from: SF Stratford    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31131 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel 30 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31215 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31229 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31260 Transfer in from: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31264 Transfer in from: FP Finsbury Park    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A w/e 15/05/1988 31286 Transfer in from: OC Old Oak Common    
Diesel 31 A1A-A1A 05/06/1988 31184 Transfer in from: FP Finsbury Park    
Diesel 60 Co-Co 30/10/1990 60017 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 30/10/1990 60018 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 08/11/1990 60023 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 09/11/1990 60028 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 21/11/1990 60030 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 26/11/1990 60029 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 12/12/1990 60025 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 12/12/1990 60034 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 17/12/1990 60024 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 21/01/1991 60022 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 31/01/1991 60020 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 04/03/1991 60038 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 08/03/1991 60050 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 04/04/1991 60037 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 25/04/1991 60005 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 02/05/1991 60031 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 25/06/1991 60036 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 05/07/1991 60059 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 14/12/1991 60021 1st Allocation        
Diesel 60 Co-Co 05/02/1992 60007 1st Allocation