Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1253 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 8994 Week
» 29436 Month
» 366282 Year
» 1587847 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Stoke


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/07/1939 2961 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/07/1939 2966 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 30/09/1939 2961 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 30/09/1939 2966 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 122 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 125 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 126 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 127 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 128 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 157 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2231 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2232 Snapshot 23C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2233 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2234 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2235 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2236 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2237 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2320 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2343 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2344 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2360 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2364 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2375 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2376 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2378 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2469 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2494 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2543 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2584 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2585 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2603 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2605 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2607 Snapshot 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2609 Snapshot 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2663 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2664 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2665 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2666 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2667 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2668 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2669 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2670 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2671 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2672 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2673 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2674 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2675 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2676 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4067 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4068 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4093 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4310 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4343 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4349 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4353 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4363 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4369 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4373 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4377 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4378 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4380 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4383 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4388 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4391 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4393 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4448 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4478 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4484 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4489 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4496 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4498 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4499 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4500 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4502 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4503 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4508 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4513 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5114 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5257 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5278 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5324 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5325 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5326 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5352 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5381 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7320 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7338 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7370 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7587 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7596 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7599 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 76 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7609 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7610 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7647 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7648 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7658 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 78 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42349 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 44118 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42231 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42232 Transfer out to: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42237 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 11/12/1948 42666 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42113 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42114 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42115 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42116 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 2683 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42155 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42156 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42157 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42159 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42479 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 16/07/1949 42607 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42113 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42114 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42115 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42116 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42113 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42114 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42115 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/07/1949 42116 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42156 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/12/1949 40127 Transfer out to: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 24/12/1949 42156 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/01/1950 42155 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/01/1950 42157 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/01/1950 42323 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 44596 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 14/01/1950 85 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/01/1950 42155 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 14/01/1950 42157 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/05/1950 42323 Transfer out to: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42156 Transfer out to: 7B Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42157 Transfer out to: 7B Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42469 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 40088 Transfer in from: 19G Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 44077 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 42155 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 42155 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40085 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/11/1950 42155 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 04/11/1950 47320 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/12/1950 42155 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 58389 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/12/1950 42061 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 15/12/1950 42062 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 20/12/1950 42063 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/12/1950 42064 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 29/12/1950 42065 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1950 42378 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44448 Transfer out to: 4B Northampton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/01/1951 40144 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 44308 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 44421 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/01/1951 42667 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 44118 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 44448 Transfer in from: 4B Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/02/1951 42155 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42378 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 40144 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42064 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42065 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42584 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 40144 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 40088 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 40126 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 40128 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42063 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42376 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/06/1951 42063 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/06/1951 42061 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 40201 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 40205 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 44503 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42303 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42348 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 44503 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42062 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1952 40143 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1952 40047 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1952 40068 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44405 Transfer in from: 20H Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1952 47344 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44067 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44343 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44363 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1952 47338 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44075 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44374 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 44385 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45114 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45325 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 45326 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42494 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42590 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42593 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 14/06/1952 47472 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 40143 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42479 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42494 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42664 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42676 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 14/06/1952 42683 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 44391 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40143 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40202 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 44871 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45149 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40047 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40068 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40122 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40125 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1952 42234 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42061 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42584 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42159 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42600 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42667 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42061 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 44503 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42234 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1952 40143 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42584 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42663 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40081 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 29/11/1952 42360 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 58376 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 29/11/1952 42360 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 44448 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 58389 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5w/e 03/01/1953 40143 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 43980 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5w/e 03/01/1953 40081 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 44489 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 44074 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1953 40201 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1953 42670 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 44075 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/04/1953 42449 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/04/1953 42670 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1953 40205 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44024 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44246 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 47269 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 16/05/1953 47270 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/05/1953 42349 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44378 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44380 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 11/07/1953 42389 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 11/07/1953 42672 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 11/07/1953 42673 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45352 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/08/1953 42323 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/08/1953 40202 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/08/1953 42364 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/08/1953 47269 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/09/1953 42672 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47451 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 40143 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/09/1953 42375 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/09/1953 42605 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/09/1953 42675 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47472 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/10/1953 42063 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 44871 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 45381 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44432 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44871 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 45381 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42113 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42114 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42115 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 44369 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/11/1953 42389 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 43864 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 58375 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 58427 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/01/1954 42669 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 43980 Transfer out to: 11D Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/03/1954 42400 Transfer in from: 27B Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/04/1954 42236 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42119 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42582 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42343 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/07/1954 42233 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 43864 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 43864 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 43915 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 44024 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 11/09/1954 44421 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/10/1954 42233 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 42344 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 46429 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 46430 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 45278 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 45324 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 45381 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 58375 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 58376 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 58427 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 44388 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42669 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42659 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42669 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42389 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 43915 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 44385 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 44032 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42419 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42420 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42421 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42320 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 44596 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1956 42419 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45185 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45301 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 16/06/1956 42303 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 40157 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/08/1956 42421 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42315 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42344 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42366 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42367 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45301 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/11/1956 42315 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/01/1957 42375 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 44459 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 45257 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 26/01/1957 47658 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/02/1957 42358 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/02/1957 42348 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 45185 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/03/1957 42454 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/03/1957 42663 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 40144 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/03/1957 42119 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/03/1957 42235 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42418 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42421 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 45189 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42323 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42389 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 44473 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 44807 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42449 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/09/1957 42449 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 44517 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42368 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44363 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44517 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 46433 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42358 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42375 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42378 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42449 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42494 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42674 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44517 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44807 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45189 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42375 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42378 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42435 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42475 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46445 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47658 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42360 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42366 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42367 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42368 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 46433 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42494 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42233 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42234 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42435 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42475 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 46445 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42362 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42375 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42494 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 44871 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 45149 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42315 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45093 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45311 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 44363 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 44373 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 44374 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42344 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42400 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 44405 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45093 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45311 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 44307 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 44593 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1958 40076 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1958 40078 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/11/1958 42323 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/11/1958 42346 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/11/1958 44271 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/01/1959 44353 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/02/1959 42344 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1959 42362 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1959 42418 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/02/1959 42420 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/02/1959 42585 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 44064 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 44315 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 44395 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42347 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45003 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45044 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45060 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 44186 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 44344 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/08/1959 44326 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42362 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42418 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42420 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45003 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/10/1959 47370 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 44271 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 44271 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 44424 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 44536 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43840 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44601 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42347 Transfer out to: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42582 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42659 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44349 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44601 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 43864 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44032 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44064 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44383 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 D3798 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 05/12/1959 D3799 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/12/1959 D3800 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 44115 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1959 D3801 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 26/12/1959 D3802 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/12/1959 D3798 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/12/1959 D3799 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 31/12/1959 44326 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 D3800 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1960 43840 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 14/01/1960 D3866 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D3798 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D3799 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/02/1960 D3870 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/02/1960 44315 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/02/1960 D3870 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/02/1960 44308 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47270 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47451 Transfer out to: 11B Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47599 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47647 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44077 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44093 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44459 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44473 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44496 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44498 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44502 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44513 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/03/1960 42464 Transfer in from: 11D Oxenholme    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/03/1960 47451 Transfer in from: 11B Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/03/1960 47610 Transfer out to: 11B Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 09/04/1960 42418 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/04/1960 42459 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/05/1960 44308 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1960 42464 Transfer out to: 12G Oxenholme    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 D3800 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42777 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42782 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42811 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42888 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42891 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42920 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42929 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/06/1960 48500 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44871 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45044 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45390 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42454 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42459 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44186 Transfer out to: 12H Stranraer    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45044 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 45350 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/07/1960 42362 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/07/1960 47330 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/07/1960 47596 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/07/1960 45390 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 30/07/1960 42885 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42160 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42392 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42420 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42421 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/09/1960 45060 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/09/1960 42362 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45060 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 10/09/1960 42346 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42562 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42674 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1960 47648 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 44484 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 08/10/1960 42851 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1960 42851 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/10/1960 45044 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 42923 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/11/1960 42562 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42811 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42923 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 44377 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 42787 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 42887 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 42937 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 44508 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/12/1960 47344 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1960 42315 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/12/1960 42887 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/12/1960 42315 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 07/01/1961 42887 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/01/1961 47310 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/01/1961 47341 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/01/1961 47349 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 D3798 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 D3799 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 D3802 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 11/02/1961 42924 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/03/1961 42663 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1961 47310 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1961 47341 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1961 47349 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/04/1961 42198 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/04/1961 42202 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/05/1961 42443 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/05/1961 42663 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/05/1961 42198 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/05/1961 42202 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/05/1961 42344 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 45003 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 42858 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 42877 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 42894 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 42778 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 42856 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 42877 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/07/1961 44867 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 44842 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 44874 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 44916 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45231 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45295 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45321 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45324 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45375 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 45408 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/08/1961 47280 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/08/1961 47330 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 44842 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 44874 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 44916 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45231 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45295 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45321 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45324 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45375 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 45408 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 44478 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42876 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 23/11/1961 D4108 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 29/11/1961 D4109 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 08/12/1961 D4110 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/12/1961 42564 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 42778 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 42937 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 42885 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/02/1962 47658 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42889 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42925 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44208 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44242 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 78017 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 78056 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 46429 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/04/1962 46430 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 42926 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 42889 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/05/1962 48500 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/06/1962 42362 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/06/1962 42454 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 17/06/1962 42593 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 17/06/1962 42672 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42224 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42226 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44079 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44126 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44299 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44342 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44349 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44352 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 44354 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45225 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/06/1962 47596 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/06/1962 47598 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/06/1962 47633 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42323 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42066 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42358 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/07/1962 42315 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/07/1962 44517 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/07/1962 42378 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 21/07/1962 42777 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 21/07/1962 42894 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44750 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44831 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 44844 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45139 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45306 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45414 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 45437 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 42929 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/08/1962 42564 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 42937 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 44370 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 42926 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 44750 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 44831 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 44844 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45139 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45306 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45414 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 45437 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/09/1962 47280 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/09/1962 47633 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 29/09/1962 47664 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 42887 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 44307 Condemned      
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 20/10/1962 42891 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/10/1962 42358 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 05/11/1962 44393 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44454 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44517 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44246 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44271 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42443 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42600 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42674 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42948 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42949 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42952 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42953 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42959 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42961 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42963 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42972 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42980 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/11/1962 47280 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/11/1962 42670 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/11/1962 42671 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42920 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42924 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42925 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 45225 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/11/1962 47598 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/12/1962 42381 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44454 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44517 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44867 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 44871 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/12/1962 42454 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 42977 Transfer in from: 21C Bushbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 45074 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 42956 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 42965 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 45240 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 45395 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 76020 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 76022 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 76023 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 76051 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/12/1962 45191 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 29/12/1962 42876 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1963 42953 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 45241 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 76075 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/02/1963 42392 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/02/1963 42542 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45146 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 45387 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42782 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42858 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42965 Transfer out to: 21C Bushbury    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42972 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 42980 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44074 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 44370 Transfer out to: 66A Polmadie    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 45020 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 45037 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 45257 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 05/1963 44299 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 11/05/1963 42543 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/05/1963 42603 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42980 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42787 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42856 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42888 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42937 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42952 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45020 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45257 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45387 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 45020 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 45257 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 45387 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44126 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44208 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44308 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44395 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44593 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 44309 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42782 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42858 Transfer in from: 67C Ayr    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 44074 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 44370 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 44309 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/08/1963 45276 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 17/08/1963 42668 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 44126 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/08/1963 47451 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 09/1963 44074 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 09/1963 44126 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 09/1963 44370 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44208 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44308 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44395 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44593 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45132 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45446 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48248 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48453 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48516 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48548 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48555 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 42782 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Crab 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 42858 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 43003 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 43073 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 43112 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 43115 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75014 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75018 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75030 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75031 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75034 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75036 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75037 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75053 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75056 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 76086 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 76088 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/09/1963 43019 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/09/1963 43118 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 28/09/1963 76047 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 28/09/1963 76085 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44068 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44208 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44352 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44354 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44432 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 75040 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 75062 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 44308 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76020 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76022 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76023 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76047 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76085 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76086 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 76088 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 44342 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 44424 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 42956 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 42961 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44115 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44242 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44349 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44395 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44536 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 44593 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 09/11/1963 42949 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/12/1963 42226 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/12/1963 42665 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 42948 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 42977 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/12/1963 42959 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 44310 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 44500 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/01/1964 42226 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/01/1964 47609 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/02/1964 48110 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/02/1964 42069 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/02/1964 42564 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/02/1964 42605 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/02/1964 42665 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/02/1964 44714 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 44714 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45446 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 45268 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/1964 42963 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1964 48131 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1964 48246 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1964 48452 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1964 48697 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1964 48768 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 76044 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45132 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45257 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45395 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 75014 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/06/1964 42226 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/07/1964 42381 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/07/1964 42070 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/08/1964 44179 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/08/1964 43949 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/08/1964 44218 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 44137 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44682 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44713 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 45050 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 45257 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 45270 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 75053 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44499 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 44137 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 43949 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 44179 Transfer out to: 2E Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 44218 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42075 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42104 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42209 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42478 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42488 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42980 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44421 Transfer in from: 15E Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44079 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1964 47587 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/11/1964 47273 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 43022 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 75006 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/12/1964 47649 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 76020 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1964 48291 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1964 42075 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1964 42209 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1964 42478 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 44344 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 44421 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/12/1964 42605 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/12/1964 42104 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48018 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48147 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48354 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1965 48369 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 75020 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 75023 Transfer in from: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 75054 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 76023 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 76089 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 76085 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 76099 Transfer in from: 67D Ardrossan    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 43073 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/01/1965 47664 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/01/1965 42209 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/01/1965 42478 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/01/1965 48012 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/01/1965 48171 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42066 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42069 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42209 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42478 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1965 43019 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/02/1965 43118 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/02/1965 42488 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 13/02/1965 42609 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 13/02/1965 42667 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/02/1965 48147 Transfer out to: 1H Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/02/1965 42590 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 44810 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45422 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/03/1965 45387 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 44714 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 03/04/1965 43021 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48147 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/05/1965 42564 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/05/1965 42160 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 D3802 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 D4111 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 41212 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 41229 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/06/1965 48697 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45146 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42080 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42583 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42616 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42224 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42542 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 26/06/1965 42070 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/07/1965 47596 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/07/1965 47307 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/07/1965 47521 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48207 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/07/1965 75006 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 44813 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 24/07/1965 41212 Transfer out to: 15A Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42080 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42583 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42616 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 31/07/1965 76020 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 48353 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 48738 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 21/08/1965 41229 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42663 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42665 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48171 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48369 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/08/1965 48147 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 45074 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 10/1965 45257 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 43007 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 43018 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/10/1965 48349 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/10/1965 48527 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 09/10/1965 76023 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/10/1965 45322 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/11/1965 45037 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 D3801 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/12/1965 47521 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/12/1965 47649 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 45020 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/01/1966 48248 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/01/1966 75020 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48766 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48767 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48207 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48246 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 15/01/1966 75023 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/01/1966 44760 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/01/1966 44985 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/01/1966 45038 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 29/01/1966 45302 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/01/1966 48452 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/01/1966 48555 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 75032 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 75047 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 75050 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 D3800 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 D3802 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 D3866 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 D4108 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 76051 Transfer out to: 16B Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 76075 Transfer out to: 16B Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 76089 Transfer out to: 16B Colwick    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 15000 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 15001 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 15002 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 15003 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 D3800 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 75031 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/02/1966 48343 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/03/1966 75047 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 43001 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 43088 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48256 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48514 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 75050 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 76044 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 76085 Transfer out to: 16B Colwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 76099 Transfer out to: 16B Colwick    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/03/1966 43002 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 02/04/1966 47280 Condemned      
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 15000 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 15001 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 15002 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel DES1 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 15003 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 D4109 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 D4110 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 D4111 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 75018 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46519 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46520 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75018 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75035 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75050 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 78059 Transfer in from: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/06/1966 75036 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/06/1966 75056 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/07/1966 48291 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/07/1966 48526 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/07/1966 78056 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/08/1966 47521 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/08/1966 44810 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 27/08/1966 75054 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1966 47307 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 09/1966 48526 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 03/09/1966 44813 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 44859 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 45322 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1966 45422 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/09/1966 48353 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1966 44860 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48364 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1966 48368 Transfer in from: 16F Burton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 45299 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 45308 Transfer in from: 2D Banbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/10/1966 47590 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 78017 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 78059 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 46519 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/10/1966 47521 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 46520 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/10/1966 48349 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 22/10/1966 43018 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44760 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/10/1966 48514 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/10/1966 48527 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 45292 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/11/1966 47590 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 19/11/1966 43022 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/11/1966 44714 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/11/1966 48354 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 26/11/1966 75050 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 12/1966 47273 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/12/1966 48085 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/12/1966 48375 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/12/1966 48522 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 44770 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 45405 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 75024 Transfer in from: 6F Machynlleth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/12/1966 48516 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 31/12/1966 48738 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 45240 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 45276 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 28/01/1967 44860 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/02/1967 48343 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/02/1967 48766 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1967 45060 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48061 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48128 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48402 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48729 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 44770 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1967 45350 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48018 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48453 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48548 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48767 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 44661 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 44805 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 44840 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 44876 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1967 45052 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 43088 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/04/1967 48256 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75013 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75046 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75055 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75024 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75032 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75037 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 75062 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 44985 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/05/1967 45268 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 27/05/1967 75035 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 27/05/1967 43115 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/05/1967 48128 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/05/1967 48131 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 27/05/1967 75055 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 06/1967 45003 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 03/06/1967 75002 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 03/06/1967 43021 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/06/1967 48012 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/06/1967 48085 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1967 48669 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1967 48697 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 75006 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 75029 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 75047 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 75052 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1967 75071 Transfer in from: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/06/1967 42116 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 75018 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 44713 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 45038 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75034 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 75040 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 01/07/1967 48110 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1967 45405 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1967 45191 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1967 45302 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43001 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43002 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43003 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43007 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 43112 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44805 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44840 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44859 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44876 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45052 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45241 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45270 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45292 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45299 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48364 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48368 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48402 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48522 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48669 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48697 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48729 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48768 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 44661 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45050 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 45308 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75002 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75006 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75013 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75029 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75046 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75047 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75052 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/08/1967 75071 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/08/1967 44682 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/08/1967 48061 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/08/1967 48375 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/11/1967 D3800 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D3876 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 75030 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/10/1971 D3876 Transfer out to: 55C Healey Mills