Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 899 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6875 Week
» 13009 Month
» 240893 Year
» 1462458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Southport


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 05/06/1946 2230 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 05/06/1946 2231 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 12/06/1946 2232 1st Allocation        
Steam 6 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10893 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10893 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10950 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 10950 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 12588 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2347 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10678 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10687 Snapshot 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10746 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10752 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10778 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1085 Snapshot        
Steam 6 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 10893 Snapshot 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 01/01/1948 11490 Snapshot        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1193 Snapshot 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 01/01/1948 1196 Snapshot 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12161 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12197 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12271 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12272 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12381 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12400 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12523 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12588 Snapshot 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2230 Snapshot 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2231 Snapshot 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2232 Snapshot 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2291 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2292 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2293 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2294 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2347 Snapshot 5C Stafford    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4056 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4062 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4471 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 01/01/1948 4474 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 4887 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 4926 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 4989 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5061 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50696 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50728 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50743 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50849 Snapshot        
Steam 6 2-4-2T 01/01/1948 50950 Snapshot 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5200 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52256 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5334 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5415 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 01/01/1948 5435 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 21/02/1948 52256 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 07/08/1948 50728 Condemned      
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T w/e 21/08/1948 50950 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 12278 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 41196 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 02/1949 50696 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 52582 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 52523 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 14/01/1950 40196 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 14/01/1950 40197 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 3w/e 14/01/1950 50752 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 02/1950 50849 Condemned      
Steam 6 Rbld 2-4-2T w/e 29/04/1950 50893 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 06/1950 50743 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 41102 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 41102 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 50678 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 50687 Transfer out to: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 52271 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 44474 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44062 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 41101 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45061 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45200 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 45061 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 45200 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41101 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 40937 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 41193 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45061 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45334 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41186 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41189 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41194 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 46435 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1951 50640 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 46435 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 08/09/1951 50746 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 50806 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 40937 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 12/1951 75015 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 01/1952 75016 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 01/1952 75017 1st Allocation        
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 23/02/1952 50806 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 03/1952 75018 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 03/1952 75019 1st Allocation        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41102 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1952 42294 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 45200 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 19/04/1952 50640 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50777 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50777 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 44926 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45415 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45435 Transfer out to:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 41189 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41085 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41187 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45415 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41085 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41194 Transfer out to: 21B Bournville    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 45078 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 50721 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 50721 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41085 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41102 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41186 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41187 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 52278 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 52272 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 07/03/1953 50778 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41102 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41193 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45078 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45078 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45415 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 15/08/1953 51490 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 05/09/1953 51425 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 50781 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 50781 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41102 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41193 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 50777 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 50777 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41101 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41186 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41187 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 41189 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45078 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 45061 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 45077 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 50712 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 50712 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 41189 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 50746 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 50746 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 41101 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42537 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 84014 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/04/1955 51425 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 28 0-6-0 m/e 06/1955 52582 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 41101 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 52123 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 45077 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45228 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 40090 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 84014 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 18/02/1956 52381 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 44471 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 41101 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1956 41187 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45218 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1956 52197 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 41186 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 41101 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 41189 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42290 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 50712 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 50712 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 50721 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 50721 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 07/09/1957 52123 Condemned      
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 41189 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 41101 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 50781 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 50781 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42435 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42475 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 52161 Transfer out to: Horwich Works    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42621 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42291 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 18/10/1958 75029 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/10/1958 42475 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 24/01/1959 75029 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 07/02/1959 40178 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 14/02/1959 40178 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 28/02/1959 40178 Transfer in from: Horwich Works    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42063 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42451 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42367 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42422 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/08/1959 42366 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/08/1959 42368 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/08/1959 40145 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42368 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1959 42366 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1959 42422 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/09/1959 42367 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/09/1959 42621 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 13/06/1960 50850 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 13/06/1960 50850 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40090 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42662 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40090 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/07/1960 42645 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 23/07/1960 40586 Transfer in from: 24G Skipton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 29/10/1960 40586 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 10/11/1960 52400 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 31/12/1960 41277 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 31/12/1960 41328 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 45105 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 18/02/1961 50746 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 18/02/1961 50746 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/04/1961 42551 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42132 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42485 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44689 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44692 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 08/07/1961 40090 Transfer out to: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41328 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 28/10/1961 40178 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 11/1961 50850 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T m/e 11/1961 50850 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 02/12/1961 40090 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 02/12/1961 40191 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44742 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44743 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44744 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44745 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44767 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44692 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 44887 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45061 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45228 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/07/1962 40090 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/07/1962 40197 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 22/09/1962 40145 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 22/09/1962 40191 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/09/1962 42537 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42290 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 01/12/1962 41277 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/12/1962 42061 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 29/12/1962 40196 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 45218 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/01/1963 42451 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45105 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/02/1963 84012 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/02/1963 42063 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/04/1963 42293 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44809 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 45083 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44689 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 44744 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44816 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75032 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75033 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44989 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75016 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75018 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 08/06/1963 42485 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45375 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 45017 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 45055 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 75032 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 75033 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/08/1963 42682 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/08/1963 45135 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 45109 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 45337 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44686 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44687 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/10/1963 45109 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 12/10/1963 84012 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 26/10/1963 84017 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44753 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44756 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44757 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75015 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75017 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75019 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1964 42369 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42675 Transfer in from: 8P Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 02/05/1964 44742 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 16/05/1964 42292 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41217 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41264 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42078 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 44816 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45017 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45083 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 84017 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 25/07/1964 42682 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 m/e 09/1964 44756 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/10/1964 42369 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 24/10/1964 44745 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1964 42435 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44743 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44753 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44767 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45135 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45337 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 12/12/1964 42551 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 12/12/1964 42662 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/02/1965 41217 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 13/02/1965 41264 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/02/1965 45375 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 44056 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 44809 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/09/1965 44809 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 11/09/1965 42645 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 18/09/1965 42675 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 25/09/1965 42061 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/10/1965 42665 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/10/1965 44686 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/11/1965 44757 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/11/1965 42233 Transfer in from: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 22/01/1966 44687 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1966 45055 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1966 42078 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1966 42132 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1966 42665 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1966 42233 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1966 44809 Transfer out to: 8K Bank Hall