Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 187 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 2332 Week
» 16589 Month
» 244473 Year
» 1466038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Slough


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 03/11/1945 4270 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 03/11/1945 5229 Transfer in from:        
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 01/12/1945 4270 Transfer out to: 76 Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 4w/e 01/12/1945 5229 Transfer out to: 76 Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/12/1945 4617 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/12/1945 7791 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/04/1946 7791 Transfer out to: PDN Old Oak Common    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 18/05/1946 7214 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 18/05/1946 7228 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 18/05/1946 7252 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 30/10/1948 7228 Transfer out to: LLY Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 30/10/1948 7252 Transfer out to: NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1949 2076 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/05/1950 4617 Transfer out to: 84K Chester West    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 31/08/1950 9424 1st Allocation        
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 1448 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1950 3697 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1950 3715 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1950 9722 Transfer in from: RDG Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/03/1951 3715 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 30/04/1951 1450 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 19/05/1951 9406 Transfer in from:        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 31/07/1951 6132 Transfer in from:        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 31/07/1951 6153 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 2021 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1951 2076 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 17/05/1952 3740 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 17/05/1952 4638 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1953 4680 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 6664 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1954 1411 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 8w/e 26/03/1955 6153 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 6132 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/02/1956 5755 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/02/1956 5766 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1956 3740 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 10/1956 1411 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1956 6115 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1956 6122 Transfer in from:        
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 1465 Transfer in from:        
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 1465 Transfer out to: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1957 6109 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/04/1957 6126 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/08/1957 4680 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 07/09/1957 6160 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 7214 Transfer out to: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 6117 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 6123 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/09/1958 3608 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1958 6664 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9463 Transfer in from: 83G Penzance    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 4606 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1959 5153 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/03/1959 5153 Transfer out to: 83A Newton Abbot    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/05/1959 6122 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1959 9463 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 05/09/1959 1447 Transfer in from: 89A Oswestry    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 05/09/1959 1450 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 6655 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/11/1959 5410 Transfer in from:        
Steam 54xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/12/1959 5410 Transfer out to: 82D Westbury    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 1444 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 6655 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T w/e 05/04/1960 1453 Transfer in from: SDN Swindon    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 23/04/1960 1453 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 23/04/1960 1453 Transfer out to: 81B Slough    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1960 D3756 Transfer in from: 87C Danygraig    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T m/e 06/1960 1448 Condemned      
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 18/06/1960 1444 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/06/1960 6123 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1960 5755 Condemned      
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/07/1960 6410 Transfer in from: 83D Laira    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1960 D3756 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1960 6109 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/08/1960 8770 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 10/09/1960 9424 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 31/12/1960 D4010 1st Allocation        
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1960 6126 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 1474 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1961 D4010 Transfer out to: 83E St Blazey    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/02/1961 6115 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/03/1961 8770 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 1447 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 17/06/1961 1474 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1961 1445 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/12/1961 9422 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 02/12/1961 1453 Transfer out to: 84C Banbury    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1962 6128 Transfer in from: 85D Kidderminster    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1962 8486 Transfer in from: 83F Truro    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1962 3697 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/04/1962 4606 Transfer out to: 81E Didcot    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1962 5766 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 9495 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1962 1474 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 9722 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/07/1962 1622 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/07/1962 3665 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/07/1962 9495 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 13/11/1962 6410 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 1654 Transfer in from: 81C Southall    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 3665 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 5w/e 31/08/1963 1474 Transfer out to: 85C Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 31/08/1963 8486 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 3608 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 4638 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 9406 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 28/09/1963 9422 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 1445 Transfer out to: 85C Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1964 6117 Transfer out to: 81C Southall    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6128 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1964 1622 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1964 1654 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6160 Transfer out to: 81C Southall