Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 434 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3022 Week
» 32520 Month
» 369366 Year
» 1590931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Skipton


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1534 Snapshot 21C Cornbrook Junction    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1535 Snapshot 21C Cornbrook Junction    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1536 Snapshot 21C Cornbrook Junction    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 01/1899 1537 Snapshot 21C Cornbrook Junction    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 06/1900 2611 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 06/1900 2612 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 06/1900 2613 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 06/1900 2614 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 06/1900 2615 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 07/1900 2616 1st Allocation        
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1534 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1534 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1535 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1535 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1536 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1536 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1537 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 1537 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2611 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2611 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2612 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2612 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2613 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2613 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2614 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2614 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2615 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2615 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2616 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1902 2616 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1414 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1416 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 05/1908 1416 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1414 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1416 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 04/1914 1416 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1266 Snapshot 18 Nottingham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1268 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1270 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1271 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1416 Snapshot LTS London, Tilbury and Southend Railway    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1417 Snapshot 32 Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 12/1921 1430 Snapshot 5 Brecon    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/05/1925 1268 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/07/1925 1270 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/11/1927 1271 Condemned      
Steam 6 0-4-4T   03/1930 1235 Snapshot 18 Nottingham    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1263 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1266 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1266 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1412 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1417 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1417 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1430 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 03/1930 1430 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/11/1931 1412 Condemned      
Steam 6 0-4-4T   09/1933 1235 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 6 0-4-4T   09/1933 1235 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1253 Snapshot WD LNWR Western Division    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1263 Snapshot 29 Manningham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1266 Snapshot 25 Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1269 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1275 Snapshot W9 Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1277 Snapshot WD LNWR Western Division    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1298 Snapshot 29 Manningham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1366 Snapshot 20 Buxton (MR)    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1411 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1413 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1414 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1415 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1417 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1417 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1430 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 09/1933 1430 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/12/1934 1414 Condemned      
Steam 6 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/02/1935 1235 Condemned      
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 23/02/1935 1415 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 18/05/1935 1269 Condemned      
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/12/1939 1417 Condemned      
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1253 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1262 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1253 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1275 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1275 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1277 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1277 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1298 Snapshot 22E Highbridge    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1366 Snapshot 30 Skipton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1366 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1411 Snapshot 21A Saltley    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1413 Snapshot 20E Manningham    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T m/e 11/1945 1430 Snapshot 20G Hellifield    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 18/05/1946 1277 Condemned      
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/06/1946 1781 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1262 0-4-4T 4w/e 07/09/1946 1253 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10623 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10671 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10795 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1748 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1767 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1781 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1781 Snapshot 20F Skipton    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1805 Snapshot        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1820 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 323 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3251 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3295 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3337 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3784 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3893 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3904 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3944 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3960 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3984 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3999 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4000 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4007 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4041 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 406 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 409 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 414 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4197 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 422 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4222 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4276 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4277 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4299 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 452 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 484 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8081 Snapshot 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8317 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 326 Transfer in from: 22D Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 44222 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 5w/e 24/12/1949 50623 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 5w/e 24/12/1949 50671 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 25/02/1950 58064 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/04/1950 58041 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 58060 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 43251 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/09/1950 58060 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 58040 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 02/12/1950 58090 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 3904 Transfer out to: 23C Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 01/1951 40406 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 29/03/1951 43112 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 13/04/1951 43113 1st Allocation        
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 58075 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 43984 Transfer out to: 23C Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 44570 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 40326 Transfer out to: 23B Hellifield    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1951 41781 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/07/1951 58045 Transfer in from: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 08/09/1951 41767 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 03/11/1951 58045 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 48404 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1952 41666 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 48404 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 03/1952 41325 1st Allocation        
Steam 1F 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/03/1952 41748 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 04/1952 41326 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 04/1952 41327 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 43257 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 02/08/1952 41820 Condemned      
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 58040 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 43916 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 44431 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 04/10/1952 47454 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 5w/e 03/01/1953 58075 Transfer out to: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 2228 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/03/1953 58090 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 40409 Transfer out to: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T m/e 06/1953 41666 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 8w/e 11/07/1953 47428 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 40484 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 46452 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 17/10/1953 40422 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 40472 Transfer in from: 18C Hasland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 43178 Transfer in from: 22A Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/01/1954 58066 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 43784 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 41273 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 1532 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 58066 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 40452 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 29/01/1955 84009 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 43944 Transfer out to: 20E Manningham    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 84009 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 10/09/1955 40472 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 40409 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 43992 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 1F 0-6-0T w/e 21/04/1956 41805 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 40414 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 09/1956 40323 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/10/1956 41273 Transfer out to:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 41205 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 09/02/1957 43992 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44299 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 48317 Transfer out to: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41280 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41284 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41205 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 15/06/1957 41325 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 15/06/1957 41326 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 15/06/1957 43178 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 13/07/1957 40409 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 40586 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44105 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44119 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 23/11/1957 43916 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 43257 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 43295 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 84015 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 76048 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 76084 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 43112 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 43113 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/11/1958 44220 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 07/02/1959 41280 Transfer out to: 14E Bedford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 07/02/1959 41284 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1959 76084 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1959 47238 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/05/1959 48081 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 76048 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 16/11/1959 50795 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 44000 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 44282 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 44579 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 44119 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/01/1960 47238 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 20/02/1960 43337 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/03/1960 44567 Transfer in from: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 44431 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 46501 Transfer in from: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/07/1960 47577 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 23/07/1960 40586 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84028 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 41327 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/10/1961 44105 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78036 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 78037 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44282 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44567 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46452 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46501 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/09/1962 47428 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/11/1962 44579 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 44061 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 44125 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1963 44041 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1963 44061 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/04/1963 44061 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/05/1963 44220 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78055 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78036 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44149 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44276 Transfer in from: 20F Skipton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44276 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/08/1963 47577 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42492 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/09/1963 42492 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44041 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44486 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 44041 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/01/1964 44486 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 21/03/1964 78037 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 21/03/1964 78055 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44222 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 44240 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 09/05/1964 D5202 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/07/1964 47631 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 44007 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 01/08/1964 D5202 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44061 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44197 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44263 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47201 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44125 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47454 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1964 47631 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44240 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 44188 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/10/1964 47602 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 44211 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 44125 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1964 44222 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 43952 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 43975 Transfer in from: 16D Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44222 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44462 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44527 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44548 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44597 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1964 44149 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 14/11/1964 43960 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44222 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 44063 Transfer in from: 9M Bury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 44188 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 43913 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1964 44456 Transfer in from: 9G Northwich    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1965 44310 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1965 44389 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 44548 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 16/01/1965 43975 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 75051 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 75057 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 75058 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 75059 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75011 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75015 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75017 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75019 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75039 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75041 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75042 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 75044 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 44462 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/03/1965 44597 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 20/03/1965 43952 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 44125 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 44211 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 44263 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 44456 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/03/1965 44527 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 03/04/1965 43913 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/04/1965 44310 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/04/1965 44389 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/05/1965 44310 Transfer in from: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/05/1965 44389 Transfer in from: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/05/1965 44063 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1965 44310 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 22/05/1965 43893 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 22/05/1965 43999 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1965 44276 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/05/1965 44277 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44389 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 21/08/1965 41241 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 21/08/1965 41272 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 25/10/1965 44570 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 11/1965 41272 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84015 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 13/11/1965 84028 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/01/1966 47602 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/01/1966 47317 Transfer in from: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/01/1966 47201 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 75057 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 75044 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1966 47599 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/04/1966 47317 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 23/04/1966 41251 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/09/1966 47667 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/10/1966 75051 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/11/1966 75011 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 75027 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 12/11/1966 41251 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/11/1966 47667 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/11/1966 75026 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/12/1966 47293 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 10/12/1966 41241 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/12/1966 47599 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 31/12/1966 47293 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 75017 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75019 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75027 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 75039 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/02/1967 75015 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75026 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75041 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75042 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75058 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1967 75059 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth