Depot: Shoeburyness
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1939 | 1129 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/08/1939 | 1129 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 19/01/1943 | 5274 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 22/01/1943 | 5343 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1943 | 1274 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1943 | 1286 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1944 | 1274 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1944 | 1286 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/12/1945 | 5274 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 12/05/1946 | 5274 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2222 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2223 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2224 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/02/1947 | 9062 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/02/1947 | 9051 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/04/1947 | 9062 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/04/1947 | 9051 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1991 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1992 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2116 | Snapshot | 13C | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2119 | Snapshot | 13C | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2123 | Snapshot | 13C | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2149 | Snapshot | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2150 | Snapshot | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2153 | Snapshot | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2160 | Snapshot | 13C | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2222 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2222 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2223 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2223 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2224 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2224 | Snapshot | 13D | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2512 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2521 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2153 | Transfer out to: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44063 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48045 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48046 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48555 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 44063 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48045 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48046 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48555 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 17/02/1951 | 41968 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 41967 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 14/05/1951 | 69062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 37 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41959 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41985 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42522 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42523 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42524 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42525 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42526 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42527 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42528 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42529 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42531 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41934 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41937 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41941 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41978 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41992 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42222 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42223 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 42224 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 37 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41959 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41985 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 42531 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 37 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41959 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 41985 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 42531 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 37 | 4-4-2T | on | 28/09/1951 | 41959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 41944 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 41944 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 41944 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 41990 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42530 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 65545 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 41991 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 41985 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 41944 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65545 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/08/1954 | 69052 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 41969 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42532 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42533 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42534 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42535 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42536 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42678 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42679 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42681 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42684 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 42687 | Transfer in from: | PLS | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Tilbury tanks | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 41990 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42218 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42219 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42220 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42221 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42223 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42224 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41969 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42226 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42227 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 80133 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 26/11/1960 | 42512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 42076 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 20/05/1961 | 42507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 42075 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 26/08/1961 | 42506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 26/08/1961 | 42510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/09/1961 | 42524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/09/1961 | 42531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 42282 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 42283 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 03/11/1961 | 42521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/12/1961 | 42534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1961 | 42220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 11/04/1962 | 42514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42538 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42593 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42672 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42677 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42593 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1962 | 42687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42218 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42221 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42224 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42226 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42227 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42681 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42075 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42076 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42282 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42283 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80133 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock |