Depot: Selby
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1907 | 647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 12/1910 | 1136 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1911 | 661 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1913 | 1248 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1913 | 1276 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1913 | 1283 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1913 | 1288 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1913 | 1292 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1913 | 1362 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1917 | 2214 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1917 | 2219 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1917 | 2224 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1917 | 2226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1917 | 2228 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1919 | 2251 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1920 | 2273 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1920 | 2283 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1923 | 915 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1923 | 2368 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/09/1923 | 2368 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1924 | 1211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | y/e | 1924 | 1212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/03/1924 | 915 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 1032 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 578 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/04/1924 | 1276 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1924 | 1271 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1924 | 1292 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 1925 | 2256 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/02/1925 | 1149 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/02/1925 | 2228 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/05/1925 | 1136 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1925 | 2113 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/08/1925 | 1032 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/09/1925 | 1271 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1925 | 2113 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/10/1925 | 1250 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/10/1925 | 1248 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/11/1925 | 1280 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/11/1925 | 1283 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2499 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2504 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2505 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2506 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2507 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2508 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2509 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2511 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 1362 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2224 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2226 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2251 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2273 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2283 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/07/1930 | 2225 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/07/1930 | 2245 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/07/1930 | 2284 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/07/1930 | 2286 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 624 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 626 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 628 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 630 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/12/1930 | 2503 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/12/1930 | 2511 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1931 | 2504 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1931 | 2505 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1931 | 2506 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1931 | 2507 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/01/1931 | 2499 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/01/1931 | 2508 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/07/1931 | 2505 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/07/1931 | 2499 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/08/1931 | 2506 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/08/1931 | 2499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/08/1931 | 2505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/08/1931 | 2503 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/08/1931 | 2507 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/08/1931 | 2509 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/08/1931 | 2506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/08/1931 | 2507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/09/1931 | 2509 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/10/1931 | 2509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/10/1931 | 2503 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/10/1931 | 2504 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/10/1931 | 2508 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/10/1931 | 2503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/10/1931 | 2504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/10/1931 | 2508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/09/1932 | 628 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1934 | 1212 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/06/1934 | 2225 | Transfer out to: | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/07/1934 | 2214 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/08/1934 | 905 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/08/1934 | 1149 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1935 | 1211 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/10/1935 | 2249 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1028 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/12/1935 | 2249 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | S | 01/1936 | 4347 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/06/1936 | 4447 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/08/1936 | 4447 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/09/1936 | 797 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1937 | 797 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/02/1938 | 578 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/02/1938 | 631 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1938 | 647 | Transfer out to: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/04/1938 | 661 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/05/1939 | 647 | Transfer in from: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/06/1939 | 1280 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1939 | 1534 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/06/1939 | 650 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1939 | 1110 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/06/1939 | 1250 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/06/1939 | 2245 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/06/1939 | 2256 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/06/1939 | 2284 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/06/1939 | 646 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/06/1939 | 1186 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1939 | 769 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/06/1939 | 1696 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/07/1939 | 1215 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/07/1939 | 1031 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1939 | 1477 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/08/1939 | 443 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/08/1939 | 2219 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/08/1939 | 1288 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/08/1939 | 2286 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 2249 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1939 | 1534 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1939 | 1212 | Snapshot | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1939 | 1477 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1940 | 1477 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 1534 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 1535 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 1560 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 2735 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1940 | 1477 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1940 | 1535 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1940 | 1560 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1940 | 2735 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1941 | 1835 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/09/1941 | 2230 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/09/1941 | 626 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/10/1941 | 1526 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/07/1942 | 1526 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/08/1942 | 1526 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/10/1942 | 1530 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2290 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1031 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1215 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1534 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1696 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1835 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 443 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 624 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 630 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 631 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 905 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/12/1943 | 2225 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/09/1944 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 17/09/1944 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/10/1944 | 644 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/12/1944 | 5044 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1945 | 1526 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1945 | 1530 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/07/1945 | 1696 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/12/1946 | 3329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/07/1947 | 3262 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3408 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3429 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3436 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3440 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3449 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3450 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3451 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1947 | 3456 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2139 | Snapshot | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2348 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2374 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5042 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5043 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5066 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5072 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5075 | Snapshot | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5093 | Snapshot | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5120 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5818 | Snapshot | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5827 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5854 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5858 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5859 | Snapshot | WBY | Whitby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5874 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5881 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5882 | Snapshot | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5890 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5891 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62386 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68143 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8039 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8040 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8156 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8158 | Snapshot | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8356 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8357 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2384 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/02/1948 | 3279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/02/1948 | 3286 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3286 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 3286 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 7250 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5093 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5120 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/06/1948 | 3310 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8268 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8313 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1948 | 3294 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3294 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3294 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2366 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 7286 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 62387 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/10/1948 | 8285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 3336 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 3378 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/11/1948 | 63290 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3336 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 5068 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 68433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 2372 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3336 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 5043 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 62387 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 8039 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 8040 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/12/1948 | 3378 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 3378 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 3378 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 2384 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63255 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 06/02/1949 | 69931 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 06/02/1949 | 69933 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63280 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63447 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 63450 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63255 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 69931 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 69933 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63255 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 65072 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 69931 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 69933 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 9914 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5793 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 65094 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 5068 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/04/1949 | 63286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 2384 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 63278 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 63280 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 63285 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/07/1949 | 65845 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63278 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63280 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63285 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5890 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63278 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63280 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 63285 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1949 | 69879 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/07/1949 | 9867 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 69879 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 9867 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 2384 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 69879 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 9867 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/08/1949 | 63312 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/11/1949 | 63255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/11/1949 | 63294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 63319 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 63348 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 63431 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/11/1949 | 63313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1949 | 65066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1949 | 63448 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63319 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63348 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63431 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63448 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63319 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63348 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63431 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63448 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62363 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/12/1949 | 63395 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 63395 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 63395 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 65075 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 62363 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8158 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 62363 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8158 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/01/1950 | 63290 | Transfer in from: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 63290 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 63290 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 65094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/02/1950 | 63276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 65039 | Transfer in from: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 2395 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/07/1950 | 63290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/08/1950 | 63262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/08/1950 | 63278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 63423 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 63425 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 63453 | Transfer in from: | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/09/1950 | 63285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 62343 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 62384 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 62397 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/10/1950 | 62342 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/10/1950 | 63336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62343 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62384 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62397 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62343 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62384 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 62397 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/10/1950 | 63280 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 19/11/1950 | 69877 | Transfer in from: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62342 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62342 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/11/1950 | 63363 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63363 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69877 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 63363 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69877 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/12/1950 | 63362 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1950 | 43096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 63362 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 63362 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1951 | 43097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 62345 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 31/01/1951 | 43098 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 31/01/1951 | 43099 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62345 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 62345 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 62376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 65874 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/02/1951 | 62340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/02/1951 | 62348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/03/1951 | 62341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 13/03/1951 | 62342 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 13/03/1951 | 62366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/03/1951 | 62363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 5663 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65647 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65698 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65039 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65042 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 65105 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/04/1951 | 63319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5663 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 65647 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 65698 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 5663 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 65647 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 65698 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/1951 | 68433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 62389 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 62392 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62389 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62392 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62389 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62392 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69867 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69877 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69879 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 67293 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 43052 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67293 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67293 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 62343 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 62345 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 28/08/1951 | 43123 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1951 | 69861 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1951 | 69867 | Transfer in from: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1951 | 69877 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/10/1951 | 69885 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69861 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69867 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69877 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69885 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 65827 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69861 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69867 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69877 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 69885 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 63450 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 63408 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 63431 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 63456 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63450 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63450 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68161 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 42083 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/05/1952 | 69861 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/05/1952 | 69877 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65675 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65683 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/05/1952 | 68268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/06/1952 | 69867 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/06/1952 | 69885 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42083 | Transfer out to: | 50E | Scarborough | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 65837 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 65888 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 65647 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 65663 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 65857 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 65888 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62389 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62397 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 65888 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63387 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/08/1952 | 63453 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 63440 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68438 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/12/1952 | 63440 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 63440 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 63440 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 63348 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/01/1953 | 63436 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 76021 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/05/1953 | 63378 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 61422 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 90424 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 76021 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 63363 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/11/1953 | 63378 | Transfer in from: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 68413 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 76021 | Transfer in from: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 67293 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/05/1954 | 68413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 17/05/1954 | 68143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 43125 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 90670 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 65882 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 31/05/1954 | 62392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 03/06/1954 | 68156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 63362 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 65861 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 65885 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 68150 | Transfer in from: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 90424 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 68180 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1954 | 64730 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1954 | 64850 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1954 | 64922 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/10/1954 | 64725 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/10/1954 | 64904 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 14/10/1954 | 62374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68429 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65793 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65837 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 62343 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 65675 | Transfer out to: | 50G | Whitby | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65854 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65858 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65859 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1955 | 61474 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1955 | 61422 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 43125 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 68438 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 64922 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 62349 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 62387 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 62396 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 65683 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/08/1955 | 64860 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/08/1955 | 64850 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/08/1955 | 62384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 26/09/1955 | 68158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67273 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/01/1956 | 68429 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 02/02/1956 | 62349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 62345 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68275 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 21/05/1956 | 68180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43125 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 68182 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62381 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 62396 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76021 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 69915 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1956 | 61433 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 08/10/1956 | 62343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 08/10/1956 | 67286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 11/10/1956 | 62345 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/10/1956 | 62386 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62755 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62761 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62772 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 62775 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 90670 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/11/1956 | 62378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 62395 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 69912 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 05/1957 | 67273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 67311 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 63348 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 63436 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 63378 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 63406 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 63425 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1957 | 61419 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1957 | 61459 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 62731 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 43096 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 62387 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 09/09/1957 | 68362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61419 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 64725 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 64730 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 16/09/1957 | 67250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 43096 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 67311 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 65793 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 65875 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/10/1957 | 63432 | Transfer in from: | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 06/12/1957 | 62761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/01/1958 | 68357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1958 | 61474 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 27/01/1958 | 68182 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1958 | 61466 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68686 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61456 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61458 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 61469 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 63382 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 63432 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 63440 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 47634 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65698 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65857 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 62730 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 24/09/1958 | 62772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 43051 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 12/11/1958 | 62755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 43054 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 43057 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 43071 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 69910 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 26/11/1958 | 69931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 04/12/1958 | 62775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 11/12/1958 | 62730 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 11/12/1958 | 69933 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 68948 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 69921 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65663 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65685 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 43051 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 43054 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | on | 16/03/1959 | 69915 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 03/04/1959 | 62731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 43051 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 43054 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1959 | 65793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 04/05/1959 | 68150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 43052 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 77004 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 77013 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 43051 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 43054 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | D2245 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64818 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64847 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64938 | Transfer in from: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61433 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61456 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61458 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61459 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63395 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63423 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63450 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 63451 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62740 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62765 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 62770 | Transfer in from: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68892 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68941 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43099 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1959 | D2062 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1959 | D2245 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | D2062 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1959 | 64725 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 65885 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 65663 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1959 | 64860 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1959 | 64938 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 61466 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 61469 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63348 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63429 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63436 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63448 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 63449 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 64725 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 64818 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 64847 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1959 | 64904 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1959 | 65685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43057 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43071 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43096 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43097 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43098 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43123 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 43125 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 47634 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 62740 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 62765 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 62770 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 65861 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 65881 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 65888 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 65891 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68275 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68686 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68892 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68941 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 68948 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 69910 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 69912 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 69921 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 77004 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 77013 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 65855 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) |