Depot: Rugby
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5601 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1107 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1113 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1153 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7733 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9400 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9401 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5588 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9244 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25675 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1936 | 25675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1936 | 5291 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1938 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1939 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 16/09/1939 | 6207 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 21/10/1939 | 6207 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 9200 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1090 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1107 | Snapshot | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1113 | Snapshot | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1152 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1153 | Snapshot | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 144 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 3 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 425 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4354 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4392 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4395 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4456 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4831 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4866 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4867 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4909 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4910 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4997 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4998 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4999 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5000 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5002 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5003 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5004 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5033 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5034 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5052 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5057 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 515 | Snapshot | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 52 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5291 | Snapshot | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5391 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5394 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5430 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5441 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5588 | Snapshot | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5601 | Snapshot | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8901 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8926 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9049 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9061 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9069 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9070 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9133 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9137 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9200 | Snapshot | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9200 | Snapshot | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9229 | Snapshot | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9244 | Snapshot | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9397 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9400 | Snapshot | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9401 | Snapshot | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9413 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9433 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9434 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9441 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 25375 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 25379 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 25394 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4909 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4909 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4511 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4997 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4998 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 9013 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9213 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 49158 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9004 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 433 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4836 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9042 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 45282 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 9332 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 9337 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 49223 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 40438 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 40655 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 49442 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 49200 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 433 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 433 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 40438 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 413 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4455 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9135 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 49426 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 49069 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 49407 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 48901 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 9319 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | on | 02/10/1948 | 58907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 49425 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 9162 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 5187 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 49278 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9445 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 2266 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49431 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 49223 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5379 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9445 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49431 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 49431 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 49416 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9061 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 49411 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 49158 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 40007 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 40144 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 49133 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 9415 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 49404 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 49042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 49133 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 49004 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 49373 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9423 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 40450 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45404 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 49332 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 49410 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 52 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49082 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49205 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9070 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9116 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49133 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49135 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49213 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9070 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 48950 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 8943 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 48950 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8943 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 40433 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 48950 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8943 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8479 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42673 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 45150 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 4915 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 413 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45404 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45431 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5493 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 48505 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 49373 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48509 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48736 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48950 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8943 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 48085 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 48729 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 49082 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 9070 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 48016 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 49205 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 8926 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 9116 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48016 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48085 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48320 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48372 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48437 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48559 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48729 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8036 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8173 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 8398 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48016 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48085 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48729 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 9049 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44058 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 49229 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48039 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48320 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48372 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48437 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48559 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 5374 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8036 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8173 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8398 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48320 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48372 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48437 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48559 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 49442 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8036 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8173 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 8398 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44058 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48039 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48165 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5374 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 40522 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44058 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48039 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5374 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 9441 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 49407 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 49446 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 48343 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 9399 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 48427 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 48020 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 49397 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 49434 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44710 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44711 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44712 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44713 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44714 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44715 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44716 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44860 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44862 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44863 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 44870 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45092 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 42266 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 44915 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44915 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40515 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48016 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48020 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 48036 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 42541 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 42585 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 49392 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 49426 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 425 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 46459 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40003 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40007 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41172 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42615 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 41278 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41172 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42615 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 41172 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 42615 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46459 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58280 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 44392 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49401 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49392 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 49401 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58280 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45004 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 49401 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58280 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44712 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44712 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 48309 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44712 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44712 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48686 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45092 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 49408 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 49423 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 41162 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 48248 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 48757 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 49172 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 49244 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 9120 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 41152 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 49401 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 41162 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48248 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48757 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49172 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49244 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 9120 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 41162 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48248 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 48757 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49172 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49244 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 9120 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45017 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45181 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44710 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 44770 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45017 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45181 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45017 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45181 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44770 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45017 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45033 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45181 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45057 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 41090 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 9120 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 49172 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 9116 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44503 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49117 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 44072 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 44354 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 45322 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 58290 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 58308 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 49113 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45322 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 46712 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 44503 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45000 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/02/1952 | 49137 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45000 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 46757 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 49397 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 46712 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48736 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/02/1952 | 49117 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45430 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 48505 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9116 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1952 | 49244 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 42446 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45430 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42446 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45430 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42446 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45430 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 41113 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45404 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 48320 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 49416 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 48914 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44058 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44456 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 48039 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 48914 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 48914 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49107 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1953 | 58280 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 48479 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 02/1953 | 46757 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 42468 | Transfer in from: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 47622 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 58218 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48165 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 41211 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48165 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 49417 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 49444 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 47378 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 49415 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 49425 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44064 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 46601 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 42468 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42673 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41211 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42673 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46601 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 48343 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 48372 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 47360 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 45250 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 46601 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45003 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45325 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45371 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 45403 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 46601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 46604 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 45391 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 48165 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 42669 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 44072 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 45371 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 48729 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/02/1954 | 41174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 45034 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 41076 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 41214 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 45325 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 46604 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 49446 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 48248 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 49411 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 13053 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 13054 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 14/08/1954 | 13055 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 47622 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1954 | 58290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 49245 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 58135 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 44388 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80083 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 80085 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42541 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42669 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 10800 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42061 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42062 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42541 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 80083 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 80085 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 41214 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/05/1955 | 41076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41214 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 49249 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 42487 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 49049 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 48509 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1955 | 13169 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 45431 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 42673 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 45441 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 49113 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 41903 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 41214 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 42446 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44388 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 49431 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 49444 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 49446 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 58135 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Market Harborough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42393 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12045 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12046 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12047 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12048 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12056 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12057 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 12070 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 49405 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 49435 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 42393 | Transfer out to: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45310 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48930 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 49021 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45372 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48398 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 48686 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42320 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42673 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 49377 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44714 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45000 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45002 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45150 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45310 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 41214 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45378 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45487 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 41903 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 44713 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45394 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 42573 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45310 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45048 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45310 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45378 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45403 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45394 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 42320 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48930 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 49021 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45187 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45375 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45394 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45430 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1956 | 40012 | Transfer in from: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1956 | 12070 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13177 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 13178 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40017 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40056 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40057 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40059 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40060 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42489 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42669 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/02/1957 | 12056 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49070 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49109 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49330 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49448 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 58157 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40004 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 48693 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40060 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 49377 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49304 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48693 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49070 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49109 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49330 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49448 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40061 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 41093 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 48035 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 13178 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40004 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40012 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40017 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40056 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40057 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40059 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40061 | Transfer out to: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12053 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12054 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1957 | 48914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48668 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13177 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45419 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41165 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/09/1957 | 41105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42375 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42378 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44938 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 49304 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48131 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48365 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42375 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42378 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48659 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49249 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49397 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49413 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49433 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42234 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42362 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42571 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42602 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 48136 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 48548 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 48646 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41093 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42362 | Transfer out to: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42571 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42602 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 49049 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 48203 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 49417 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 49452 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 13053 | Transfer out to: | Rugby TS | |||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45072 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45148 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 45240 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 41113 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42544 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | D3055 | Transfer out to: | R.T.S. | |||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48548 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42429 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | D8002 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45072 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45148 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45240 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 45420 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 42429 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/08/1958 | D2908 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 45420 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/09/1958 | D2909 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/09/1958 | D2910 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48423 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48526 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 49266 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 49377 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | D8002 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 41167 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 13053 | Transfer in from: | Rugby TS | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | D3055 | Transfer in from: | R.T.S. | |||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1958 | 58157 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41227 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41228 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41285 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41321 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41902 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 41909 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 46420 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 49442 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 41321 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42615 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44712 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 47677 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 41227 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 41228 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 41285 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 58199 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 41122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 46472 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 46446 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 49405 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 49435 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 48012 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42585 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48018 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 49245 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 49377 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 12053 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 12054 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 44315 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 58308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 48120 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 58171 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 44064 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 44315 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 44395 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46445 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48252 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48345 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48411 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 42673 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/08/1959 | 10800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42777 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42782 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42787 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 42467 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41278 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1959 | 58171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 41227 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 44678 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 44862 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44862 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45184 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 58221 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42467 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44678 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49266 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45533 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45537 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 45541 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 41902 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 41909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 58199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 46472 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42950 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42951 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42953 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42777 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42782 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 42787 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41228 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42467 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44712 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | D2911 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | D2912 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | D2913 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 12048 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 12057 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 41285 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 42478 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 42564 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5080 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 45548 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/04/1960 | D5084 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 48437 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5081 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5082 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 41285 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/06/1960 | 41162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 58215 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 48136 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44117 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45024 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45139 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42478 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46420 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 42564 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/07/1960 | D5082 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 42061 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 41227 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 41228 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D5079 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D5081 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/09/1960 | D5080 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45191 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44117 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48085 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48252 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48423 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48646 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/09/1960 | D5079 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45284 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45375 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45404 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 48062 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 42381 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 42562 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 42811 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 42923 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45284 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45375 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45404 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 48131 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 48757 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42103 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42104 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42811 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42923 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 42977 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 42978 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 45024 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 48062 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5084 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42955 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42975 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45533 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45537 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45541 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 45548 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45599 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45670 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45684 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42951 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42953 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42955 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42975 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42977 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 42978 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42950 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 45184 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 45191 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 58218 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1961 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 58215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 58221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 58120 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 58182 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 45624 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 45438 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 42381 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45603 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45669 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45672 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45438 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48203 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48427 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48668 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 44867 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 08/07/1961 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 45419 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 58120 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 58182 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 44897 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45130 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1961 | 46206 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/10/1961 | 42467 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/10/1961 | 42669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 08/10/1961 | 41214 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45487 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 45599 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 45669 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 45184 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 42544 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 48122 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1962 | 46206 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 42541 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 12099 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D3053 | Transfer out to: | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 42541 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 48365 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5002 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5003 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5005 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5010 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5011 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5017 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42544 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42562 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42573 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42577 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48526 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/06/1962 | D5014 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48074 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48287 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48365 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48526 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48736 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/07/1962 | D5013 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 45139 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 44831 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44831 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 42575 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42079 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42575 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 48736 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70022 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70023 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46442 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 45722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48754 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 42541 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45027 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45031 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/01/1963 | D5017 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45231 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45418 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45599 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 45723 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70022 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70023 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 46442 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 48074 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3169 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | D4106 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 45599 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 46430 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 46459 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42114 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42287 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42079 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46445 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46446 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44711 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44712 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44897 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45031 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45130 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45184 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45231 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45419 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45493 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 48723 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 45044 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 47590 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 47598 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D4111 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D4112 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44837 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5006 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 48755 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 45270 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 45044 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/1963 | 42947 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 42958 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 42969 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 42981 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 45670 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 45684 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 45672 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 47590 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 47598 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | D4144 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 45270 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 15/02/1964 | 42234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | D2909 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | D2911 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 42104 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45027 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48445 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | D3956 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44813 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 44814 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44862 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45418 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48723 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48754 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | D2910 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 48018 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 45723 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | D3956 | Transfer out to: | 2H | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 42062 | Transfer out to: | 2K | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/1964 | 42969 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45001 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45448 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48122 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48345 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42947 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42958 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/1964 | 42981 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 12088 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 46430 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 46459 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D4111 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D4112 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42114 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 42103 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/12/1964 | D5134 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/12/1964 | D5014 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D215 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D231 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D234 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D235 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D287 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D290 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D298 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D314 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D343 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D381 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5012 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5144 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5145 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48012 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48035 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48120 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48173 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48287 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48411 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48755 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44814 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44837 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44863 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44870 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44909 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44915 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 44938 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 48649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | D4111 | Transfer in from: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42287 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 44813 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5014 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5134 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44715 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44716 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44836 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | D3111 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44831 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 44866 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 45001 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 45448 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48365 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48445 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48526 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48559 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D288 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D289 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D4111 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D315 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D340 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D5002 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D5003 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D5005 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D5010 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/07/1965 | D5011 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5006 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D3797 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 12009 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D2907 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D3066 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D3068 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5004 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5006 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D315 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D340 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D343 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D381 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/11/1965 | D5134 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/11/1965 | D5014 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5008 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5017 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5027 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 12089 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D3174 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 12009 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3859 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3111 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D3053 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D3174 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D5002 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D5012 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D215 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D231 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D234 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D235 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D287 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D288 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D289 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D290 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D298 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D314 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5002 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5004 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5006 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5008 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5013 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5017 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5027 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5134 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5145 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | D2510 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12047 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | D3068 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/10/1966 | D5144 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 12089 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | D2907 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | D2913 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 12009 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 12019 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2908 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2912 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12049 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 12009 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 12019 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D2380 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1967 | D2510 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1968 | D2380 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D4106 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1968 | D3054 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D4144 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12045 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12046 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12049 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12088 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12099 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D3053 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D3055 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D3066 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D3797 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D3859 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley |