Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 444 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3032 Week
» 32530 Month
» 369376 Year
» 1590941 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Radyr


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 45 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1949 433 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1949 6634 Transfer in from:        
Steam 45 0-6-2T m/e 02/1951 433 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 19/05/1951 6634 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3400 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3401 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3402 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3403 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3404 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3405 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3406 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3407 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3408 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3409 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 3727 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 5648 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 5684 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1958 5687 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 6704 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 25/01/1958 6707 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 5527 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1958 6704 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 6635 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82032 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82033 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82034 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 82036 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6416 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6744 Transfer in from: 48 Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6751 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 82037 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6751 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4143 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4152 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4160 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4163 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4164 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 6699 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82032 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82033 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82034 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82036 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 82037 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 4616 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 7751 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 8419 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 8420 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 8438 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 8460 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 9425 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 4575 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 5527 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 5684 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/06/1958 5687 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/06/1958 6707 Transfer out to: 86B Newport Pill    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1958 6744 Condemned      
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/08/1958 6416 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/09/1958 6411 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 06/09/1958 8455 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1958 4152 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 5615 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 4164 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/11/1958 5669 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 7717 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 7766 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 3400 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 3405 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 3406 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 4616 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/11/1958 5615 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 3405 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 3406 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/12/1958 5692 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7717 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7751 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/12/1958 7766 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1959 5640 Transfer in from: 58 Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1959 5663 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1959 5675 Transfer in from: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1959 4163 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8419 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/03/1959 9425 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1959 5615 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 8780 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/05/1959 3727 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 05/09/1959 7252 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 4163 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 5618 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 5663 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 5663 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1959 5675 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1959 8460 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1960 8455 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1960 6657 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1960 5697 Transfer in from: 81E Didcot    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 5618 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1960 6108 Transfer in from: 87H Neyland    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1960 5640 Transfer out to: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1960 5692 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1960 6639 Transfer in from: 82C Swindon    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1960 4143 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5635 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 4163 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1961 6411 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/03/1961 6639 Transfer out to: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 1447 Transfer in from: 81B Slough    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/09/1961 6430 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1961 6688 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1961 5615 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 07/10/1961 6438 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 14xx 0-4-2T 4w/e 04/11/1961 1447 Transfer out to: 89B Croes Newydd    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 02/12/1961 4166 Transfer in from: 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/12/1961 6637 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 3400 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 9711 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 6430 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/05/1962 6438 Transfer out to: 83D Laira    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/06/1962 8420 Transfer out to: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 3404 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 8780 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 08/1962 5663 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 11/08/1962 4637 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1962 6621 Transfer in from: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 11/08/1962 7250 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1962 3408 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 6656 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1962 6669 Transfer in from: 85D Kidderminster    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT on 05/10/1962 3407 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT on 05/10/1962 8438 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 7239 Transfer in from: 81F Oxford    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 03/11/1962 7209 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/11/1962 8479 Transfer in from: 82B St Philips Marsh    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/11/1962 9480 Transfer in from: 83C Exeter    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 17/11/1962 3716 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 2w/e 17/11/1962 7239 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T on 05/12/1962 6669 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5625 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5651 Transfer in from: 84J Croes Newydd    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 7209 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 8466 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 8497 Transfer in from: 86C Cardiff Canton    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9472 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 5669 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/02/1963 6688 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 9711 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 3716 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 04/1963 5697 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 4160 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/04/1963 4160 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 6116 Transfer in from: 87J Fishguard Goodwick    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 6638 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 6657 Transfer out to: 88H Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/06/1963 5651 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7217 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7219 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 7231 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 6621 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 9456 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 9457 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 27/07/1963 9466 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 6656 Transfer out to: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 7217 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 7231 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 7252 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1963 5672 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 5633 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/09/1963 5673 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1963 5625 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 6605 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 6695 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 81xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 8103 Transfer in from: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 81xx 2-6-2T on 28/11/1963 8103 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 4143 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 6113 Transfer in from: 83B Taunton    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1963 6699 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 5623 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 5624 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 6672 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 6680 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 01/1964 6605 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 01/1964 7219 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1964 6606 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 02/1964 5623 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 4w/e 22/02/1964 7245 Transfer in from: 86F Aberbeeg    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 04/1964 6680 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1964 9456 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 13/04/1964 5694 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1964 4637 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1964 5635 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 5692 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6124 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6169 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6657 Transfer in from: 88H Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6661 Transfer in from: 86J Aberdare    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6690 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 9472 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 04/05/1964 9480 Transfer out to: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 06/1964 4143 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 06/1964 4166 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 5624 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6124 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6635 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6637 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6638 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6690 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 5669 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 5676 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6681 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 7w/e 22/06/1964 9711 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 6169 Transfer out to: 85A Worcester    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1964 6695 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1964 8466 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1964 8497 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1964 9457 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1964 9466 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 4132 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 4169 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 5602 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 6621 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 6697 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/07/1964 8475 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/07/1964 8495 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/07/1964 9480 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 20/07/1964 9488 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 3403 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1964 5602 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1964 5648 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1964 5669 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 09/1964 7245 Condemned      
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T m/e 09/1964 7250 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 8475 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 12/09/1964 5676 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 12/09/1964 6681 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 12/09/1964 6697 Transfer out to: 2L Leamington    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1964 3409 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1964 8479 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 3644 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 3738 Transfer in from: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 3784 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T 6w/e 12/10/1964 4268 Transfer in from: 86D Llantrisant    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4620 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4662 Transfer in from: 86D Llantrisant    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4674 Transfer in from: 16 Aberbeeg    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 5660 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 5689 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6650 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 7245 Transfer in from:        
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 7252 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9426 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9430 Transfer in from: 85D Bromsgrove    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9461 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9778 Transfer in from: 88G Llantrisant    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 4160 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6108 Transfer out to: 81F Oxford    
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T 6w/e 12/10/1964 6113 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9711 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 3400 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 3401 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 3402 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 3405 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 3406 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 4674 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 11/1964 5694 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 8495 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 9778 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 1612 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 1613 Transfer in from: 86C Hereford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 3728 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 4110 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 4623 Transfer in from: 86C Hereford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 4650 Transfer in from: 86F Aberbeeg    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 4679 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 5691 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 5699 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 6654 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 8484 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9437 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9611 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9622 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9667 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9682 Transfer in from: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 42xx 2-8-0T w/e 08/11/1964 4268 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT w/e 22/11/1964 9430 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1964 6621 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 01/1965 6606 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6661 Transfer in from: 88B Radyr    
Steam Grange 4-6-0 2w/e 10/01/1965 6876 Transfer in from: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 6661 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 72xx 2-8-2T 2w/e 10/01/1965 7252 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 23/01/1965 9780 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 07/02/1965 9446 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 07/02/1965 9464 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 07/02/1965 9475 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1965 1613 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 03/1965 5673 Condemned      
Steam Grange 4-6-0 2w/e 07/03/1965 6876 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 1655 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 9615 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1965 3728 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1965 9480 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1965 9488 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 04/1965 9611 Condemned      
Steam 5101 2-6-2T m/e 05/1965 4169 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 4679 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 5633 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 5689 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 6650 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 9426 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 9446 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 9461 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 05/1965 9475 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 3717 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 9644 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 9656 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 9675 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 3738 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 5w/e 16/05/1965 4110 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 4620 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 5w/e 16/05/1965 4623 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3644 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3717 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 3784 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 5691 Condemned      
Steam 61xx 2-6-2T m/e 06/1965 6116 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 6654 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 6657 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 6661 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 8484 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9437 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9464 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9644 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 06/1965 9667 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 1612 Condemned      
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 1655 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 4650 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1965 5692 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1965 6672 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 9615 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 9622 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1965 9780 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 08/1965 9682 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1965 4662 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1965 9656 Transfer out to: 86E Severn Tunnel Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 08/08/1965 9675 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)