Depot: Parkhead
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/06/1929 | 2733 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/06/1929 | 2734 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1931 | 2733 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1931 | 2734 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1943 | 1804 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 1804 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1947 | 1729 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4559 | Snapshot | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4584 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5274 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5298 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5324 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7480 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7487 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7613 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7643 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7674 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8567 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9143 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9145 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9171 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9193 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9195 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9198 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9199 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9209 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9210 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9213 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9217 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9564 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 4621 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 7603 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 4548 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 9553 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 7488 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 67665 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 67665 | Transfer out to: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 61341 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67676 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7681 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 64610 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 65335 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 69157 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/11/1949 | 61729 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 61772 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 61341 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1950 | 44791 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 44791 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 44791 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69165 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69166 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69165 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69166 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69165 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69166 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1950 | 65274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/01/1951 | 61733 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/01/1951 | 61735 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61733 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61735 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61733 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61735 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/02/1951 | 64548 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/03/1951 | 65298 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 65295 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 61067 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 61277 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65295 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65295 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65295 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 65295 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 44791 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69508 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69509 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69511 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69507 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69510 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 69553 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67482 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Coal Engine Saddle Tank | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 7500 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67454 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67480 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64461 | Transfer in from: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64514 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 69143 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/02/1952 | 69015 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1952 | 68567 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69015 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 69015 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1952 | 61722 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1952 | 61769 | Transfer in from: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61722 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61769 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61722 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61769 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 69171 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 69214 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 69507 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 69510 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 69553 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69509 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69511 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69553 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67679 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1952 | 65283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 69563 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67487 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67487 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Forfar | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 29/01/1954 | 67479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 06/12/1954 | 67470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/09/1955 | 61722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/09/1955 | 69514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1955 | 61117 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/01/1956 | 69562 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/02/1956 | 13212 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1956 | 13213 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1956 | 13214 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1956 | 13277 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/01/1957 | 68503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/01/1957 | 61735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69510 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1957 | 65324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 65211 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64520 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 65270 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 69212 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 69217 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/08/1957 | 69500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69509 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69564 | Transfer out to: | 68E | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1957 | 61733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/10/1957 | 69595 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1957 | 61344 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/10/1957 | 69210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1958 | D3410 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/01/1958 | D3411 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1958 | 65270 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 14/03/1958 | 69195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/04/1958 | 69157 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65273 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3411 | Transfer out to: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/04/1958 | 69565 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67607 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 67608 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/08/1958 | 69193 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1958 | D3562 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67629 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67630 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/02/1959 | 69151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1959 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 67650 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 67675 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1959 | 61404 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1959 | 64584 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 64588 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 65246 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1959 | 64520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 09/10/1959 | 67482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/10/1959 | 69213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/10/1959 | 67487 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 64523 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 65230 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/11/1959 | 61772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/12/1959 | 69508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/12/1959 | 69166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69145 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 69507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 69563 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 65239 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 65320 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/05/1960 | 69165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/06/1960 | 69198 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1960 | 76100 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1960 | D3894 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43135 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43136 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43138 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43140 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43141 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 76102 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 76103 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 76114 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 67604 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1960 | D3895 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1960 | D3896 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/08/1960 | 69161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/08/1960 | 69190 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1960 | D3898 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 25/08/1960 | D2768 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1960 | D3899 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/09/1960 | 61769 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 05/09/1960 | D2769 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 05/09/1960 | D2770 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1960 | D3900 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/09/1960 | D3901 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/10/1960 | 69194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/10/1960 | 69209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/10/1960 | 69509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67604 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2769 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2770 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3894 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3895 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3896 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3898 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3899 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3900 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3901 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67623 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67630 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67676 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 65335 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67607 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67616 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67633 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67674 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67679 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 76102 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1961 | 65239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67613 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67617 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67648 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67660 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67665 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67669 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 76090 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 76091 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 76093 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 76094 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67613 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 67648 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 21/01/1961 | 67612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42074 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42426 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42462 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42578 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 42664 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42426 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42462 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67623 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67633 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 76113 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42426 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42462 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67617 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1961 | 76100 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/02/1961 | 64523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67607 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67630 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67661 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67676 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67679 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67681 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 76095 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 42426 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 42664 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67660 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 67669 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 69015 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 76103 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1961 | 65295 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67623 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67648 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67665 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/05/1961 | 69199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 10/08/1961 | 67650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 76074 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 64461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 43135 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 43136 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 43138 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67608 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67613 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67661 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67675 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67679 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 67681 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76074 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76091 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76093 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76094 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 76114 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42074 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42462 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 42578 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 43140 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 65214 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67604 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 67628 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 76113 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 43141 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67614 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 67676 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76095 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1962 | 65246 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 67607 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1962 | 64514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/03/1962 | 67622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/03/1962 | 67631 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/03/1962 | 67655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65273 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67614 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67676 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 64626 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 67633 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1962 | 65320 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/05/1962 | 67629 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 65335 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1962 | 65211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1962 | 67614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1962 | 67676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61117 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61344 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1962 | 61404 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 64573 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 64588 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 65335 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 76090 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 65230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D2768 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3212 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3213 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3214 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3277 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3410 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3562 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67643 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67662 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67678 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64559 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64563 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 61333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64609 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64610 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64621 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth |