Depot: Oxford
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1919 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1919 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1919 | 4037 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1920 | 4037 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 1159 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3589 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4961 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1813 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 1836 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4961 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2637 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4021 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4004 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 6320 | Transfer in from: | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1939 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1939 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1813 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/1939 | 1836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1939 | 5055 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1939 | 5055 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4826 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6103 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 4118 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1159 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 517 | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1159 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1426 | Snapshot | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1450 | Snapshot | oxf | Abingdon | ||
Steam | 645 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | on | 15/06/1947 | 1742 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 1935 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2579 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Aberdare | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2637 | Snapshot | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2861 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3583 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3585 | Snapshot | rdg | Henley on Thames | ||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3588 | Snapshot | oxf | Fairford | ||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3589 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | on | 15/06/1947 | 3589 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3715 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 3741 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3835 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3836 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3838 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3847 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3848 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3862 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3866 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4004 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4004 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4021 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4021 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4049 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4052 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4118 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4645 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 4676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4902 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4903 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4921 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4928 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4938 | Snapshot | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4973 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5323 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5904 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5960 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6103 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6103 | Snapshot | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6122 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6138 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6320 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 6682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6925 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6933 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6937 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 7412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77058 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9316 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 9317 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 9654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3562 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4511 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 4513 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4558 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 4004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5413 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 2579 | Transfer out to: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 4052 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7008 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 7010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 7010 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 7010 | Transfer out to: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/10/1948 | 3618 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/10/1948 | 3659 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2861 | Transfer out to: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3618 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 3836 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4973 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6870 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 3848 | Transfer out to: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 3838 | Transfer out to: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1912 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6662 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 6682 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4680 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 3687 | Transfer out to: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6313 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 5616 | Transfer out to: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6622 | Transfer in from: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6662 | Transfer out to: | SED | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 7760 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 1912 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6622 | Transfer out to: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5414 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 14/12/1949 | 1617 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5414 | Transfer out to: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 02/1950 | 1742 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1950 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 2076 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | T1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 12 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 3741 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2823 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 2860 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 9416 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2845 | Transfer in from: | PPRD | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5965 | Transfer in from: | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2823 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4049 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2845 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 5965 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2845 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 5965 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 4513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 6953 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 9640 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 4645 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 6953 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 9640 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 6953 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 9640 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 1448 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 2845 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 3715 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 2858 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1950 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2858 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6990 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2858 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6990 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1442 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 1442 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 1442 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 2858 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 1450 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 2579 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5960 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 2803 | Transfer in from: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2803 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 2803 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1951 | 2076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 9403 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 1935 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 1935 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5960 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 7911 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5904 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6925 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6990 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 7900 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5960 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 7911 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5960 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 7911 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 7900 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 7900 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 3866 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 2202 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6104 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6300 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2202 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6104 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 2249 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 6104 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6104 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 4969 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 4933 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 4969 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 4969 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 7010 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 4021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 3846 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6933 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 1462 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 2815 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90312 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 28/11/1952 | 9028 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 2292 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9018 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9028 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1462 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9028 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1952 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5012 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5012 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 6113 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 02/03/1953 | 5808 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5322 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5803 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 90573 | Transfer in from: | 86J | Aberdare | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 3846 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5994 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 6920 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4105 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4147 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4945 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 9311 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 9653 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1617 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5994 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6313 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90573 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 9317 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 7212 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Duffryn Yard | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 7239 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 7246 | Transfer in from: | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9302 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2202 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2292 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2803 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2815 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3847 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4105 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4945 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9018 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9028 | Transfer out to: | 84J | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 4680 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1420 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 1425 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 2860 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 2236 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9015 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1442 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4511 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 11/1953 | 1935 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4558 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 1442 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 3862 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1954 | 2579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 3217 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6379 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 7249 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 7252 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 7249 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 7252 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9316 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 5323 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 2289 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6922 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 75001 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 75004 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3835 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4928 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5322 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6336 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1954 | 7008 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 2262 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1955 | 7008 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 75027 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 2262 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4965 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6854 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6862 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6864 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6379 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4907 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5966 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6924 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 2294 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 3217 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 5803 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6834 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 75004 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4933 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9416 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 8432 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 6834 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 5190 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 02/1956 | 1425 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 4969 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 5969 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 2289 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3857 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90251 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90284 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5945 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6870 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7212 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 7246 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90529 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 9015 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5322 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 90312 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5969 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6122 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 9311 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5413 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 02/1957 | 5808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 06/02/1957 | 5811 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 05/1957 | 5811 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 5816 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 07/1957 | 5816 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 2206 | Transfer in from: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5818 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 2206 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6113 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 4148 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2289 | Transfer in from: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6163 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6336 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8424 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5026 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 2880 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 3814 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6821 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6822 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6920 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6304 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5969 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4979 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4987 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4995 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6927 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4125 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1435 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1958 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4125 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9450 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 4987 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3823 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 6664 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 3608 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6848 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6858 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 75007 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1420 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6304 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 7324 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 75008 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 2236 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 2289 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 2294 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5198 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 2836 | Transfer in from: | ABDR | Aberdare | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 75024 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 5198 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 75027 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 1447 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5965 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 6924 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 75024 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 05/1959 | 7411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 6859 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 1447 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 2880 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1959 | 9403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/06/1959 | 7445 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1959 | 8432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 90251 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 90284 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6859 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6864 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1959 | 5818 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 1450 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 4103 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 5697 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 2836 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1444 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5942 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6973 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 8494 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5907 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5957 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6133 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6139 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6821 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 6848 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4902 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4903 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4921 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4938 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5907 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5942 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6922 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6973 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 3843 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 7218 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6133 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6163 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 6822 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 5933 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 8761 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 3843 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 4995 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6854 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6858 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 6937 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 1444 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5697 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 6139 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6952 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6664 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5933 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 6952 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 1444 | Transfer in from: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6154 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3959 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3960 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3963 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3964 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3967 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3971 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | D3972 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 3722 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 4147 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 4147 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8761 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9611 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1960 | 4092 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 75021 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1960 | 3857 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5933 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5955 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5989 | Transfer in from: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 6129 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 75029 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7218 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 7238 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1960 | 9640 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 3653 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 4649 | Transfer in from: | DID | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 8494 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9450 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 01/1961 | 8424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6150 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5190 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 75029 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 6956 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 75000 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1961 | 9455 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | 4147 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 6168 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1961 | 4125 | Transfer out to: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6149 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6956 | Transfer out to: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6156 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1961 | 5989 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 5918 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 75022 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 6168 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 4908 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5922 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5923 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1961 | 7760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/12/1961 | 4092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | 4103 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 01/1962 | 1435 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 1468 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 2221 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 6124 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 4148 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 03/1962 | 1468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 9450 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 9450 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1962 | 5012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1962 | 5038 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1962 | 5068 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6144 | Transfer in from: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 75021 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D3949 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1450 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2221 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 6138 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 75000 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 1627 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 4908 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 7445 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5918 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5960 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1962 | 5966 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1962 | 5033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 6129 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1962 | 5068 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4919 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 4951 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5945 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 5956 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 6910 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 92001 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 92245 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | 7239 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1630 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92220 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92224 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92244 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 1442 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1962 | 5038 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 92245 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 9455 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 7035 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 92001 | Transfer out to: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | 92244 | Transfer out to: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1962 | 5025 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 1627 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 1627 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4919 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1963 | 5956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1963 | 7035 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 6106 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/03/1963 | 7008 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1963 | 5945 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 4976 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6923 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 75001 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 75007 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | 6124 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 4922 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 4975 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 5987 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 7906 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1963 | 4922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1963 | 7412 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3195 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3949 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3959 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3960 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3963 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3964 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3967 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3971 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3972 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5985 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3949 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3959 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3960 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3963 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3964 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3967 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3971 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | D3972 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 6960 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 92220 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1963 | 92224 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 4975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1963 | 5985 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4976 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4981 | Transfer in from: | 87J | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4988 | Transfer in from: | 87F | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1963 | 3653 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1963 | 4981 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3794 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 4966 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6824 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6849 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6868 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6874 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 3823 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 8486 | Reinstated | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6967 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 6144 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 4979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 5923 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1963 | 7911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 5932 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 1444 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 6149 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | 74xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 7404 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1964 | 5922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1964 | 5987 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 4951 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 6966 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1964 | 4988 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6974 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1964 | 6936 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1964 | 6824 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D3804 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 5932 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1964 | 4976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6126 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 6812 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 3814 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 75022 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 1627 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 06/1964 | 1630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 4951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1964 | 6960 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5933 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5933 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 5955 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1964 | 5957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6841 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 6156 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 75008 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 6974 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 7906 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | 8486 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1964 | 4649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1964 | 6966 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 10/1964 | 9654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 6108 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73023 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73024 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73037 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73049 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 73164 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | 7906 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 9773 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1964 | 73024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 6924 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 6974 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1964 | 7910 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1964 | 3794 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 73164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1964 | 7900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 5971 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 3751 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 73044 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 73162 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 5971 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/01/1965 | 6953 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | 6910 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 6812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1965 | 7910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 03/1965 | 6150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 73044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 73049 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1965 | 7906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6927 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6947 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | 6927 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 6110 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | 9789 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D3804 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1965 | 73037 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 6974 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1965 | 73162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 6862 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 6932 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 6999 | Transfer in from: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 6110 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 6154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1965 | 6841 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 26/06/1965 | 6145 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 07/1965 | 9653 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 4962 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6910 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6921 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6937 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6953 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6956 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6961 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6963 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6983 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6991 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 6993 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73003 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73021 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73030 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73031 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 73166 | Transfer in from: | 83E | Yeovil Town | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7909 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 7919 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D3963 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D3972 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 5933 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1965 | 6108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 6983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | 7917 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 7922 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1965 | 73021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1965 | 73023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1965 | 73030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 09/1965 | 3751 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6874 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 6961 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 73031 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 3677 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6132 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6135 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6161 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6931 | Transfer in from: | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6959 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | 6998 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 4962 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1965 | 6161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6868 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | 6957 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 6143 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 6156 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 7925 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 7927 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 18/11/1965 | 6143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1965 | 6947 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1965 | 7909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1965 | 3677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6136 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1965 | 6145 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6849 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6923 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6937 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6967 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6991 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6993 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6998 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 6999 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 73003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 73166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1965 | 7925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 12/1965 | 9773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | on | 03/12/1965 | 6156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1965 | 7927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | on | 03/12/1965 | 9789 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D3949 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3964 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3195 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2178 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2186 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D4171 | Transfer in from: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D3960 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1969 | D2178 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1969 | D2186 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D4178 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3959 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3761 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D4176 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D3761 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D3807 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1973 | D4176 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1973 | D4003 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1973 | D4178 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D3763 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 08596 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 08640 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 08803 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 08835 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 08941 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08799 | Transfer out to: | MG | Margam |