Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 453 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3041 Week
» 32539 Month
» 369385 Year
» 1590950 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Neville Hill


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 12/1899 2006 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 05/1900 2008 1st Allocation        
Steam A6 4-6-2T m/e 12/1907 686 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1908 743 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 11/1908 750 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 12/1908 753 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 03/1909 762 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 10/1912 819 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1913 1257 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 04/1913 1261 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 10/1913 2143 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 12/1913 2147 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 06/1920 1518 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 06/1920 1531 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1920 2280 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1920 2282 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 12/1920 2298 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 02/1921 929 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 03/1921 931 1st Allocation        
Steam H1 4-4-4T m/e 02/1922 1326 1st Allocation        
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 23/06/1923 686 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 14/11/1923 688 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/11/1923 1380 1st Allocation        
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 13/02/1924 688 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A7 4-6-2T m/e 08/1924 1185 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 20/01/1925 1180 Transfer in from: SHI Shildon    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 20/01/1925 1183 Transfer in from: SHI Shildon    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/07/1925 924 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 10/10/1925 1719 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam A5 4-6-2T m/e 02/1926 1767 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 07/02/1926 1766 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 23/02/1926 743 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A5 4-6-2T m/e 03/1926 1719 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam A5 4-6-2T m/e 03/1926 1766 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam A5 4-6-2T on 20/05/1926 1767 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 14/08/1926 1520 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 14/08/1926 1531 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 09/1926 743 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam A7 4-6-2T m/e 01/1927 1195 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/12/1927 1176 Transfer in from: TSK Thirsk    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 02/02/1928 689 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 05/02/1928 691 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T m/e 06/1928 689 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 23/06/1928 691 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam C1 4-4-2 on 29/09/1928 4419 Transfer in from: KX Kings Cross    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 05/11/1928 762 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam C1 4-4-2 on 29/04/1929 4419 Transfer out to: KX Kings Cross    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 25/09/1929 1176 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 09/10/1929 762 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 31/10/1929 914 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/11/1929 1383 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 31/12/1929 2008 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 05/05/1930 739 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 06/05/1931 430 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1931 2280 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 10/06/1931 2006 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 03/05/1932 743 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/06/1932 848 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/06/1932 849 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/06/1932 824 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 01/07/1932 739 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 31/08/1932 1453 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/09/1932 1195 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/10/1932 1469 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 01/11/1932 750 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 27/03/1933 759 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 22/05/1933 1518 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 12/06/1933 2143 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 31/08/1933 2147 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 03/10/1933 1136 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 11/10/1933 2147 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 11/10/1933 759 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 12/12/1933 430 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 05/1934 758 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 11/05/1934 759 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 27/06/1934 2147 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 28/06/1934 2148 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 1379 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 24/10/1934 1501 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 12/03/1935 1326 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 22/05/1935 1520 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 30/09/1935 1530 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 21/10/1935 753 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 31/10/1935 1436 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/11/1935 1460 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/11/1935 1464 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/11/1936 1533 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/11/1936 1544 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/11/1936 1536 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/11/1936 1533 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/11/1936 1536 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/11/1936 1544 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 05/12/1936 759 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/01/1937 2253 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 18/01/1937 1180 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 27/05/1937 762 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/07/1937 1460 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 27/07/1937 715 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/10/1937 1464 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/12/1937 2267 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 14/12/1937 715 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 10/04/1939 820 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 10/04/1939 1183 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 10/04/1939 1185 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 14/04/1939 813 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 14/04/1939 821 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 14/04/1939 822 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/06/1939 2228 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/07/1939 1294 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 12/08/1939 824 Transfer out to:        
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 16/10/1939 1136 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 02/12/1939 2573 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 02/12/1939 2580 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 02/12/1939 2597 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 28/02/1940 2573 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 28/02/1940 2580 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 29/02/1940 2597 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 1375 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 928 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 820 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 821 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/09/1940 1501 Transfer out to: MAL Malton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/11/1940 843 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/11/1940 847 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/03/1942 1501 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 05/03/1942 692 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 28/03/1942 2155 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 11/07/1942 686 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam H1 4-4-4T on 13/10/1942 2148 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 19/10/1942 1501 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 19/10/1942 1530 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/11/1942 2155 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1252 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1253 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1262 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1278 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1284 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1362 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 1696 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2213 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2217 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2220 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2227 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2229 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2239 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2244 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2250 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2254 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2257 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2261 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2264 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2274 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2280 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2283 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2295 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1375 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1379 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1380 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1383 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1436 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1453 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1469 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 813 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 819 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 822 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 843 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 847 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 848 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 849 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 914 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 924 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 928 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 929 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 931 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 1252 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 1253 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2227 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2229 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2244 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2250 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2254 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2261 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2274 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2298 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/06/1943 1261 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/06/1943 2213 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/06/1943 2239 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/06/1943 2217 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/06/1943 2280 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/06/1943 2283 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/06/1943 1262 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/06/1943 2253 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/06/1943 2267 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 26/06/1943 2295 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/07/1943 1257 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/07/1943 1362 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/07/1943 2264 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 10/07/1943 1284 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 10/07/1943 1294 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/07/1943 1278 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/07/1943 2220 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/07/1943 2228 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/07/1943 2257 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/07/1943 2282 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 31/07/1943 694 Transfer in from: MAL Malton    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 31/07/1943 692 Transfer out to: MAL Malton    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 08/01/1944 690 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 08/01/1944 694 Transfer out to: AUK West Auckland    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/07/1944 8310 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 18/08/1944 8309 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/08/1944 1262 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/08/1944 2257 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/08/1944 2283 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/09/1944 2279 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1944 2220 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1944 1254 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1944 1363 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1944 2299 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1944 1278 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1944 1311 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1944 2265 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1944 2292 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/09/1944 2272 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/09/1944 2293 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/09/1944 2294 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/10/1944 1362 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/10/1944 2253 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 03/01/1945 8309 Transfer out to: PKS Parkeston Quay    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 03/01/1945 8310 Transfer out to: PKS Parkeston Quay    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 12/03/1945 686 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 12/03/1945 690 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1254 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1262 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1278 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1311 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1362 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1363 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1696 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 2220 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 27/09/1945 2507 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 29/09/1945 2570 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 29/09/1945 2577 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/05/1946 739 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/05/1946 743 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/05/1946 747 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/05/1946 756 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/05/1946 539 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/05/1946 546 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/05/1946 577 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/08/1946 1060 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/08/1946 1062 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/08/1946 1065 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 23/08/1946 1068 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 26/08/1946 1069 1st Allocation        
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/09/1946 739 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/09/1946 747 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/09/1946 756 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/09/1946 843 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 13/04/1947 9794 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/05/1947 3410 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/05/1947 3414 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/05/1947 3422 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/08/1947 1218 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/09/1947 1237 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3429 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3436 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3440 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3449 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3450 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3451 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3456 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 05/10/1947 9794 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/11/1947 1256 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 19/11/1947 1257 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 21/11/1947 1258 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/11/1947 1259 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 29/11/1947 1034 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2746 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2748 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2756 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2758 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2765 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2769 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2770 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2772 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2774 Snapshot        
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2775 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5036 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5037 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5041 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5049 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5077 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5094 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5097 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5107 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5109 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5116 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5118 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5861 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5883 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5885 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5888 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5894 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7240 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7274 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7278 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7290 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7319 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7337 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7645 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7646 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7647 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7656 Snapshot        
Steam V1 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 7657 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8672 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8681 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8746 Snapshot        
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9114 Snapshot        
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9115 Snapshot        
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9117 Snapshot        
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9118 Snapshot        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 04/01/1948 3314 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 04/01/1948 3315 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 18/01/1948 522 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 18/01/1948 524 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 18/01/1948 526 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 25/03/1948 3315 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/04/1948 1035 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/04/1948 3300 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 1239 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 1240 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 1068 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61060 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 23/05/1948 1216 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 23/05/1948 1239 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 30/05/1948 1017 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 30/05/1948 1018 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 30/05/1948 3443 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 30/05/1948 3445 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 30/05/1948 3300 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 30/05/1948 3314 Transfer out to: 20D Normanton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 30/05/1948 522 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 02/06/1948 5049 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 13/06/1948 3285 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 11/07/1948 3278 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/08/1948 61337 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 20/08/1948 61338 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 29/08/1948 3255 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 29/08/1948 61337 Transfer out to: STM St Margarets    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 08/09/1948 61339 1st Allocation        
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 26/09/1948 524 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 26/09/1948 60526 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/11/1948 63362 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/02/1949 60036 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/02/1949 60074 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/02/1949 60081 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 06/02/1949 60086 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63280 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63450 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/02/1949 1034 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3443 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3445 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/02/1949 61017 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/02/1949 61018 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63255 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 04/1949 65109 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 16/05/1949 65107 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 06/1949 65118 Transfer out to: MAL Malton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 10/07/1949 63278 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 10/07/1949 63280 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 10/07/1949 63285 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1411 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1412 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1416 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1427 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1429 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1431 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 1445 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61400 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61401 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61402 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61408 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61409 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61410 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61413 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61414 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61415 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61428 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61430 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61432 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61440 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61441 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61442 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61446 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/08/1949 61447 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/08/1949 1425 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/08/1949 1433 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 04/09/1949 60084 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1416 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61408 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61430 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61441 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 12/1949 68677 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T m/e 12/1949 67278 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 12/12/1949 65036 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/01/1950 64791 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/01/1950 64850 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/01/1950 64921 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 29/01/1950 64943 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 02/1950 65094 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 02/1950 65116 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/02/1950 4934 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/02/1950 64863 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/02/1950 64920 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 04/1950 65037 Condemned      
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 30/06/1950 67647 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1950 64949 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 27/08/1950 4819 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/09/1950 64710 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/09/1950 64933 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/09/1950 65041 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 23/09/1950 65041 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/10/1950 64919 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/10/1950 64922 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 62742 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/10/1950 68677 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 19/11/1950 69882 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 19/11/1950 61065 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 19/11/1950 61338 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 27/11/1950 60501 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 27/11/1950 60503 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 27/11/1950 60074 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 03/12/1950 63362 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 17/12/1950 60074 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 17/12/1950 60501 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 17/12/1950 60503 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/01/1951 61065 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/01/1951 61338 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/01/1951 64935 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/02/1951 65041 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 24/03/1951 67337 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 1419 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61416 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61422 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61424 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61426 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61436 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61441 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61443 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61451 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61452 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61456 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61458 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61459 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61460 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61462 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61465 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61466 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61473 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/05/1951 61474 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/05/1951 64867 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1951 64867 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 01/07/1951 69877 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/07/1951 61445 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/07/1951 64710 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/07/1951 64919 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/07/1951 64921 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/07/1951 62764 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 21/07/1951 62756 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 18/08/1951 67289 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 62746 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 65883 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 18/08/1951 65888 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64835 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64886 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 02/09/1951 61338 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 02/09/1951 61339 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 62774 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/10/1951 61416 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/10/1951 61426 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/10/1951 61441 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/10/1951 61456 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/10/1951 61459 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 21/10/1951 69877 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/11/1951 61451 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/11/1951 64730 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 27/01/1952 61086 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 27/01/1952 61258 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/01/1952 63450 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/02/1952 61419 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/02/1952 61436 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/02/1952 61443 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/02/1952 61460 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 11/05/1952 69877 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 26/05/1952 69118 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/07/1952 64758 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/07/1952 62389 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/07/1952 62397 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T 5w/e 17/01/1953 69113 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 25/01/1953 63348 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 25/01/1953 63436 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 14/02/1953 76021 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 76021 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T w/e 04/05/1953 69113 Condemned      
Steam N13 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/05/1953 69116 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/06/1953 61422 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/06/1953 61442 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 07/06/1953 69877 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 19/07/1953 69882 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 25/07/1953 67240 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 23/08/1953 61017 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 24/08/1953 65077 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 20/09/1953 69882 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/10/1953 69119 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61015 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61020 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61424 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61452 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61458 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61462 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61465 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61466 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61473 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1953 61474 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 21/02/1954 61015 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 21/02/1954 61020 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61424 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61452 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61458 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61462 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61465 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61466 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61473 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/03/1954 61474 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/03/1954 67293 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67293 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 06/06/1954 69882 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64860 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64819 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64949 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 65861 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 65885 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/06/1954 67289 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 29/06/1954 69858 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61424 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61458 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61462 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61465 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61466 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61473 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1954 61474 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 06/09/1954 62389 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 19/09/1954 69882 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/09/1954 64730 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/09/1954 64850 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/09/1954 64922 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1954 65097 Condemned      
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 20/12/1954 69116 Condemned      
Steam N10 0-6-2T 5w/e 22/01/1955 69098 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 23/04/1955 67319 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/05/1955 61442 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/05/1955 61478 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 18/05/1955 69115 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65650 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65654 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1955 64870 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/06/1955 64922 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 05/07/1955 69117 Condemned      
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 05/07/1955 69119 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62359 Transfer in from: 51J Northallerton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62372 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65683 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65714 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/08/1955 64850 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/08/1955 64860 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61410 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61413 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61414 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61415 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61440 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61447 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61469 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 90082 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 90467 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 90663 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 65714 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 26/10/1955 62359 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 20/11/1955 61017 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 62749 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 65656 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 17/12/1955 68681 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 65648 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 65656 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 27/03/1956 67290 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 10/06/1956 61414 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 10/06/1956 61415 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 10/06/1956 61447 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 10/06/1956 69858 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 10/06/1956 69882 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 16/06/1956 40045 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 16/06/1956 40059 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62755 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62772 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam D20 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62372 Transfer out to: 53D Bridlington    
Steam D20 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62397 Transfer out to: 53D Bridlington    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 62772 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 m/e 21/07/1956 62740 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 m/e 21/07/1956 62761 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 23/09/1956 61433 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 62755 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 62761 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 62772 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 62775 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam N13 0-6-2T on 22/10/1956 69114 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 26/10/1956 11212 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 26/10/1956 11213 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 12/11/1956 11214 1st Allocation        
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 12/11/1956 11215 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 40045 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 40059 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 06/12/1956 11216 1st Allocation        
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 09/12/1956 69881 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 09/12/1956 69885 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/04/1957 67657 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/04/1957 68672 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/05/1957 61016 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/05/1957 61038 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 67656 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1957 63348 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/06/1957 63436 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 16/06/1957 69881 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 16/06/1957 69885 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 43096 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62773 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62774 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67325 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90026 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 90045 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65648 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65654 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65683 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67274 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 68746 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/09/1957 64725 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/09/1957 64730 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69877 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 15/09/1957 69885 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/09/1957 61065 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/09/1957 61256 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/09/1957 64791 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/09/1957 64886 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 43096 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 24/09/1957 69098 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 30/09/1957 65650 Condemned      
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/11/1957 67645 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 11/12/1957 62758 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 90230 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 90082 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 17/12/1957 62748 Condemned      
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 08/04/1958 69877 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 08/06/1958 69885 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65663 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65685 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65726 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 80116 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 80117 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 80118 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 80119 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 80120 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90230 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 02/07/1958 62749 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 05/08/1958 62773 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 12/09/1958 62769 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 4w/e 13/09/1958 62702 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 10/10/1958 67325 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42073 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42411 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42477 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42553 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/10/1958 42639 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 12/11/1958 62702 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 12/11/1958 62742 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 13/11/1958 62764 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 13/11/1958 62774 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 06/12/1958 62740 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/01/1959 64943 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/01/1959 61069 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/01/1959 61086 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 31/01/1959 41247 Transfer in from: 20E Manningham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42073 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42411 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42477 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42553 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/01/1959 42639 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/03/1959 43051 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/03/1959 43054 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 14/03/1959 65663 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 14/03/1959 65685 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 06/04/1959 77004 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 06/04/1959 77013 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 43051 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 43054 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 65726 Transfer out to: 50D Starbeck    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 43051 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 43054 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 77004 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 23/05/1959 77013 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41252 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41281 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 41282 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 D2245 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62765 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62770 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90467 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90663 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/07/1959 61452 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/07/1959 64725 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43057 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43071 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 43096 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43057 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43071 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 43096 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/11/1959 61062 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/11/1959 61240 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/11/1959 61257 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64730 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64758 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/11/1959 64850 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 21/11/1959 41247 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 23/11/1959 61470 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/12/1959 63348 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/12/1959 63436 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/12/1959 63449 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90026 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90045 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64944 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64835 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64870 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/02/1960 61442 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/02/1960 61425 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 14/02/1960 61431 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/03/1960 61427 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 41259 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 05/09/1960 61471 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64910 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64947 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42188 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 31/10/1960 61428 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/12/1960 D301 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/12/1960 61411 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/12/1960 61412 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/12/1960 61414 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/12/1960 61447 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 24/12/1960 D301 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 31/12/1960 D11 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D302 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/01/1961 D11 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61016 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61035 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61038 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61216 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/01/1961 61237 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/01/1961 64910 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/01/1961 61446 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/02/1961 61218 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/02/1961 61259 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 11/02/1961 D302 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/02/1961 D11 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/02/1961 D12 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/02/1961 D14 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/02/1961 D15 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 25/02/1961 D16 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 01/04/1961 D13 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/04/1961 D17 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/04/1961 D18 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 17/05/1961 D345 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 24/05/1961 D346 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 31/05/1961 D347 1st Allocation        
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 07/06/1961 D348 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/06/1961 61030 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 11/06/1961 60036 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D19 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D20 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D26 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D29 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D30 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 17/06/1961 D31 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 73162 Transfer in from: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 73169 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 03/07/1961 61432 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D21 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D25 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/07/1961 D27 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D23 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D28 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D14 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/09/1961 D18 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/09/1961 D14 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 09/09/1961 D18 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D32 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/09/1961 D30 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1961 61415 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/09/1961 61429 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1961 73168 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/11/1961 64920 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/11/1961 64861 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/12/1961 D144 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 31/01/1962 64863 Condemned      
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D151 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 44170 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 05/05/1962 41282 Transfer out to: 55C Farnley Junction    
Steam J39 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1962 64947 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/06/1962 64857 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 19/06/1962 41259 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D22 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D24 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D28 Transfer in from: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D30 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 73161 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 23/06/1962 D28 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/07/1962 D13 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 14/07/1962 D144 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D11 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 21/07/1962 D151 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 28/07/1962 D12 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 01/10/1962 60081 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/11/1962 63370 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/11/1962 63424 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 23/11/1962 41252 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/11/1962 64922 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/11/1962 61030 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/12/1962 63420 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/12/1962 63426 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64857 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64861 Condemned      
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D14 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D15 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D16 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D17 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D18 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D19 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D20 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D21 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D22 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D23 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D24 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D25 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D26 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D27 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D28 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D29 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D30 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D31 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 45 1Co-Co1 w/e 08/12/1962 D32 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/12/1962 64933 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/12/1962 64944 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/12/1962 63417 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/12/1962 63445 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/12/1962 64934 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/12/1962 64935 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1963 D2150 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D345 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D346 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D347 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 12/01/1963 D348 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/02/1963 42188 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Steam A3 4-6-2 w/e 08/04/1963 60074 Condemned      
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 13/04/1963 D1515 Transfer in from: 34G Finsbury Park    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 16/06/1963 60038 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 16/06/1963 60070 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 16/06/1963 60080 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/06/1963 61224 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/06/1963 61338 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/06/1963 61353 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 22/06/1963 D1515 Transfer out to: 34G Finsbury Park    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 22/06/1963 67646 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 73161 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 73162 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 73168 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 73169 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 80116 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/07/1963 63449 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 28/07/1963 60118 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 28/07/1963 60131 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 28/07/1963 60134 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 28/07/1963 60146 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 28/07/1963 60154 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 13/10/1963 60146 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/10/1963 63436 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/10/1963 63445 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 2196 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42123 Transfer in from: 67D Ardrossan    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42196 Transfer in from: 67B Hurlford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42689 Transfer in from: 68B Dumfries    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42699 Transfer in from: 68B Dumfries    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/11/1963 80117 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/11/1963 80118 Transfer out to: 66E Carstairs    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/11/1963 80119 Transfer out to: 66E Carstairs    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/11/1963 80120 Transfer out to: 66E Carstairs    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 09/11/1963 D1549 Transfer in from: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 18/11/1963 41281 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 18/11/1963 60038 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 18/11/1963 60086 Condemned      
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 08/12/1963 60070 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 08/12/1963 60080 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 08/12/1963 60084 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 47 Co-Co w/e 28/12/1963 D1549 Transfer out to: 41A Sheffield Darnall    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 43051 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 44170 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/01/1964 63424 Condemned      
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 25/01/1964 D7578 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 28/02/1964 42123 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 43043 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 43075 Transfer in from: 55B Stourton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45063 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45204 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/03/1964 42618 Transfer in from: 16B Annesley    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/06/1964 63370 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/06/1964 63344 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/06/1964 42618 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/06/1964 61224 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/06/1964 61338 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/06/1964 61353 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 13/06/1964 D2267 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1964 45063 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 25 Bo-Bo w/e 13/06/1964 D7578 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/06/1964 63348 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 28/06/1964 62007 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2247 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D3375 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D2267 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 43043 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 45204 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 D3657 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42184 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 27/02/1965 D1766 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 47 Co-Co 4w/e 27/03/1965 D1766 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 29/04/1965 43075 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D2065 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/08/1965 42689 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 03/10/1965 63387 Transfer in from: 52G Sunderland    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 03/10/1965 62007 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 04/10/1965 60118 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 04/10/1965 60131 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 04/10/1965 60134 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 04/10/1965 60154 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/02/1966 63417 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D241 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D249 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D250 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D270 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D280 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D286 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1966 43054 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D241 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D249 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D250 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D270 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D280 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 4w/e 26/02/1966 D286 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/06/1966 63344 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/06/1966 63387 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/06/1966 63420 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/06/1966 63426 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 2196 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 42184 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 42196 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/06/1966 42699 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1966 D2246 Transfer out to: 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam J27 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1966 65894 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 D2101 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2263 Transfer in from: 55D Royston    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D2264 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1967 D2045 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 06/11/1967 D2263 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2065 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2101 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2243 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 30/03/1968 D3365 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 20/07/1968 D2150 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 23/11/1968 D2112 Transfer in from: 50D Goole    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 23/11/1968 D2170 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1968 D3916 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1968 D2045 Transfer out to: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1968 D3365 Transfer out to: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 14/12/1968 D2248 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 14/12/1968 D2247 Transfer out to: 55B York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/06/1969 D3001 Transfer in from: 81A Old Oak Common    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/07/1969 D4042 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/07/1969 D4043 Transfer in from: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 30/08/1969 D2170 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/10/1969 D2112 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/10/1969 D3001 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1969 D2244 Transfer out to: 55F Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1969 D2248 Transfer out to: 55F Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 31/12/1969 D2242 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 31/12/1969 D2264 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/08/1971 D3704 Transfer in from: 34D Hitchin (GNR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/08/1971 D3375 Transfer out to: 55G Knottingley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/08/1971 D3657 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 25/01/1976 08243 Transfer in from: 55C Healey Mills    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 25/01/1976 08540 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/02/1986 08243 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 03/05/1991 08875 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 14/02/1992 08874 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/01/1994 08748 Condemned