Depot: Monument Lane
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 8261 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1936 | 2982 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 2982 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1937 | 5301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1937 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1937 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1937 | 5297 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5434 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5301 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1947 | 28261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1111 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1116 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1153 | Snapshot | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1172 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2263 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2264 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2265 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2567 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2579 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4057 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4592 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 46922 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5297 | Snapshot | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5433 | Snapshot | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5434 | Snapshot | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6878 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 46920 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5495 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 46876 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4361 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2267 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2677 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2450 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2451 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 28/02/1948 | 6878 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 46924 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/05/1948 | 46920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4365 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2488 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 4019 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 4365 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 5418 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 46931 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 28616 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 1154 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5310 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 42659 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 4506 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 58908 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 58927 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 6900 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6900 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 6900 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1949 | 46931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 58908 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 41166 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 5493 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41115 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 41166 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5493 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41115 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41122 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 08/1949 | 46876 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42674 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 46906 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | m/e | 10/1949 | 58927 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 41122 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 42677 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5310 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 58928 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1949 | 46924 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44019 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 43231 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 42567 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43231 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43231 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 28616 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 42469 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 44829 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45015 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45390 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42469 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44829 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45015 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45390 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42469 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44829 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45015 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45390 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41111 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41116 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 41172 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45015 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46427 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 42469 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 51218 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 58286 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 58286 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 58286 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 51218 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | on | 27/01/1951 | 58928 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 58900 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 58900 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 58900 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 44360 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 46427 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44360 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44360 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44829 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1951 | 46906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1951 | 46922 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 40900 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40936 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 41090 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40900 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 41122 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40926 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40936 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41090 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 40936 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41090 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 40926 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40933 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 58908 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 58908 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 42538 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 44490 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 44360 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 58932 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 44512 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 46899 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 58185 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 58932 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44942 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 45418 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 58932 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1952 | 58932 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1952 | 46899 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42538 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40018 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40018 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40018 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 58117 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 1560 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/02/1953 | 46900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40129 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41163 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40018 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 41163 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 42419 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 42420 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 42421 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 42422 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 58900 | Transfer out to: | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 42262 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 42263 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 42264 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 42265 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40108 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40129 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40118 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 43187 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44361 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 41223 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41224 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1955 | 58286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44592 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 44059 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 58220 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42489 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42552 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42601 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42658 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 41223 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 41224 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42419 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42420 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 42421 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44512 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44942 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45390 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/03/1956 | 58117 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 58306 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 44059 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45034 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45308 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 42601 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42601 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45257 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1957 | 58306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 43240 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41119 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41167 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45071 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 43240 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45150 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41119 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41153 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41167 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45308 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44807 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44840 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45308 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42552 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42601 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42658 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 42674 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45150 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 40129 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 47494 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 47561 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42422 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40933 | Transfer out to: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 43187 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 43231 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42601 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41168 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42674 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44115 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44444 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41090 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44807 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45257 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 42488 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 44807 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45052 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 43973 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 58135 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 58271 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44766 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42601 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42674 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 43973 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44115 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 40129 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 44840 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 40129 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44686 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 44842 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 45111 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 44686 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 45180 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45188 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44807 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 44766 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45180 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45038 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45052 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 47561 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45188 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 47385 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45188 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44842 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45071 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45188 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45308 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 58220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 58123 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45034 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45111 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12004 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 12012 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3839 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3840 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44490 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12092 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D3841 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12004 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 12012 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 40108 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 40936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1961 | 58123 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | D2387 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 40108 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D5146 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1961 | 58271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 44897 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 45071 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 47385 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/07/1961 | D5146 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 41168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 44910 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1961 | D2396 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 44897 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 44910 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1961 | 58135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 45071 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 42069 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 40108 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | D2386 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 42544 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 42069 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 58185 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | D3089 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42267 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42488 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42544 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 44444 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 44514 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47341 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 47494 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | D2395 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 12049 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | D2396 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | D3956 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | D3034 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 12049 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1966 | D3956 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 48726 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48726 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2386 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2387 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2395 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12092 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3034 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3089 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3839 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3840 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3841 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot |