Depot: Lower Darwen
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 12860 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12172 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12415 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12464 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 10675 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 10687 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 10799 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/09/1946 | 77151 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 77151 | Snapshot | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10675 | Snapshot | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10687 | Snapshot | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10781 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10799 | Snapshot | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10893 | Snapshot | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11336 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11499 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12172 | Snapshot | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12260 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12289 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12363 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12415 | Snapshot | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12464 | Snapshot | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12526 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2485 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3897 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4240 | Snapshot | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4291 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4398 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50945 | Snapshot | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50950 | Snapshot | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50951 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 51467 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52253 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 690 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 2490 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 11503 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 52268 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 588 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8342 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1948 | 52253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 12460 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 12524 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 21/08/1948 | 50950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 50945 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 50953 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4042 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 42439 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12159 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12579 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 12608 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 4042 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 50735 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 690 | Transfer out to: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 13/11/1948 | 51467 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 10781 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 48721 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 52441 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 11415 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 677 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 684 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 50953 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 48472 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 8436 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 11336 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 90374 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8342 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 12262 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 52445 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 12524 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 52268 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12262 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 52523 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12159 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12262 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1950 | 50951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52268 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52445 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52445 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52523 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 52608 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 42558 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 12203 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 42147 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50893 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50953 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 10765 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 10799 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 52529 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 10765 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 10799 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44460 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44479 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 52388 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 77040 | Transfer in from: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44105 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44220 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 77040 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 77040 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 52579 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 52268 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 52444 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 43952 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 52262 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 43952 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 43952 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 52289 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 52460 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 50831 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 50831 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 50831 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 52216 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 52236 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 52311 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 52399 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 43952 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 44105 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 44220 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 44225 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 44240 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 44291 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50746 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50746 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50746 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52299 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Bacup | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52299 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40588 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 52299 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 90112 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 52236 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 52363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 52194 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 52447 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 52300 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 52220 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 52522 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50831 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 52431 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90112 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 52299 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 52300 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 90135 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52272 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 52272 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 52300 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 52272 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52160 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52311 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 52441 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 51503 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42439 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 52529 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 40681 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52431 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52203 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42729 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42796 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42821 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 52300 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 52388 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 52431 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 52399 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 52445 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 50746 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 52272 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 51419 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1955 | 52220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 51498 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 51419 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1955 | 52522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 52179 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 41188 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1955 | 52194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 52413 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 19/11/1955 | 41188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 90374 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1955 | 52447 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 52431 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40681 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 52179 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 51499 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1957 | 76082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 52216 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 52526 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1957 | 76084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52160 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 52431 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40120 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40162 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40163 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 40183 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 84011 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 84012 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 42484 | Transfer out to: | 24H | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 51415 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 51498 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 51506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 52413 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 52260 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 41518 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 1134 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 15/02/1958 | 41518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42490 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 76084 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42722 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 76084 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42551 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | D3780 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1959 | D3781 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 40183 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/11/1959 | 40163 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42722 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1960 | 43897 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 44119 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 43976 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42821 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 40183 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 40192 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 42732 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 42838 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3780 | Transfer out to: | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3781 | Transfer out to: | 21F | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 47582 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 47582 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 47300 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 47306 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 47512 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 47512 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 47300 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 47306 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84011 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84012 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 42728 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 42485 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 42551 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 42558 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 42559 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40099 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90297 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90316 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90375 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90592 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 90556 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 28/10/1961 | 40162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 28/10/1961 | 40183 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 40072 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 40164 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 40192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/09/1962 | 40072 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42147 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 42838 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 40099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 40120 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 40164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 90316 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 42728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 90297 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42907 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 44347 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 44398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1963 | 42729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1963 | 42796 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 42754 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 42722 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44753 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44756 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44757 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44460 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44753 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44756 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 44757 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 43952 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 44119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 44548 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44192 | Transfer in from: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44462 | Transfer in from: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 44192 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1964 | 43976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 44263 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 42896 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 44479 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 90592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 90187 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 47631 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 90398 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 90375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 47631 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 90123 | Transfer in from: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90398 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 44125 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 44263 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 42754 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44222 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44125 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 31/10/1964 | 42907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42716 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42727 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42828 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42841 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42869 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 42898 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 90261 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 43952 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44222 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44462 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 44548 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 90123 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 90152 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 90268 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 90626 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 30/01/1965 | 42722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 43019 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 43118 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 43041 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 43119 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 06/03/1965 | 42841 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 06/03/1965 | 42896 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 76082 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 76084 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 42886 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 42892 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 90556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 44347 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 90626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 90204 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 03/04/1965 | 42886 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 10/04/1965 | 42716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 90268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 90148 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 42844 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 08/05/1965 | 42892 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 48062 | Transfer in from: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 48262 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 48691 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 90152 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 42878 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48441 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 48684 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 90148 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 90187 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1965 | 42732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 43046 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48423 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48262 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90204 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 10/07/1965 | 42869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 90261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 42844 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 42727 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 42828 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 42878 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 11/09/1965 | 42898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 48062 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 43019 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 43041 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 43046 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 43118 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 43119 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48423 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48441 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48684 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48691 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey |