Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1274 |
Snapshot |
WD |
LNWR Western Division |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1276 |
Snapshot |
WD |
LNWR Western Division |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
09/1933 |
1278 |
Snapshot |
W13 |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1934 |
13260 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/11/1934 |
2961 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1935 |
13260 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1935 |
2961 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Precursor Tank |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
6793 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
78 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Precursor Tank |
4-4-2T |
m/e |
01/1936 |
6793 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
4059 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
22/12/1936 |
2608 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
22/12/1936 |
2609 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
5295 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
5296 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
01/01/1938 |
1274 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
26/03/1938 |
1276 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/07/1939 |
6201 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/07/1939 |
6206 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
06/09/1939 |
6209 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
16/09/1939 |
6201 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6207 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
21/10/1939 |
6208 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/12/1939 |
6206 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/12/1939 |
6207 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/12/1939 |
6208 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Princess Royal |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/12/1939 |
6209 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/10/1941 |
2983 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1941 |
2951 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1942 |
2951 |
Transfer out to: |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1942 |
2983 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
1532 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1278 |
Snapshot |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1416 |
Snapshot |
23 |
Hasland |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1945 |
1421 |
Snapshot |
20 |
Buxton (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
106 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
107 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
108 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1113 |
Snapshot |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1122 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1159 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1166 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1168 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
138 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2322 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2350 |
Snapshot |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2351 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2395 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2396 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2397 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2398 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2399 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2401 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2402 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2461 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2467 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2478 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2575 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2580 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2599 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2608 |
Snapshot |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2608 |
Snapshot |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2609 |
Snapshot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2775 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2776 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2778 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2813 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2848 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2849 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2852 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2854 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2858 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2886 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2887 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2889 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2923 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2924 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2925 |
Snapshot |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2930 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2935 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2936 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2937 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3275 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3457 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3717 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4059 |
Snapshot |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4078 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4303 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4308 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4357 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4870 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4871 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4937 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4938 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4969 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4970 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5294 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5295 |
Snapshot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5296 |
Snapshot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
531 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
539 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5530 |
Snapshot |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5552 |
Snapshot |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5556 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5593 |
Snapshot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5631 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5633 |
Snapshot |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5638 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5680 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5703 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5723 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5740 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6114 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6120 |
Snapshot |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6121 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6122 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6129 |
Snapshot |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6131 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6145 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6149 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6150 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6160 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6169 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
674 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
71 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7267 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7341 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7343 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7345 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7347 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7369 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7394 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7400 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7528 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7673 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
78 |
Snapshot |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9002 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9054 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9171 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9183 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9227 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9284 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9285 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9298 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9343 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9363 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
07/02/1948 |
2395 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
5294 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
77 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
51 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
4870 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
25344 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
5387 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
9415 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
2813 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
8935 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
9322 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
2372 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
2542 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
45592 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5500 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5501 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
5520 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
4969 |
Transfer out to: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
4970 |
Transfer out to: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
108 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
4078 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2427 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2430 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2594 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
42386 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2372 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2401 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2402 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
2308 |
Transfer in from: |
11E |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
2396 |
Transfer out to: |
11E |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
2427 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
7394 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
9186 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
8906 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
9363 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
68 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4871 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
4937 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
9227 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
9284 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
1906 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
1907 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
41905 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
106 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
138 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
71 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
136 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
68 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
4937 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
25344 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
45307 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
45545 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
44837 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
44838 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
40693 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
42788 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45536 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
45545 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
531 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
40693 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
42788 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44837 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44838 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45536 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46120 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
40693 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
42788 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44837 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44838 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
45536 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46120 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
46149 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
9285 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
2427 |
Transfer in from: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
42386 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
48935 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
42814 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
49298 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
48906 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
9287 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
9415 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
49054 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
49428 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44935 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45549 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
5445 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
45703 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
2938 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
41122 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
41166 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
45522 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
45549 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
5552 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
46143 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
46120 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
46121 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
539 |
Transfer out to: |
TFD |
Trafford Park (LNER) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
46143 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
46143 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1949 |
49343 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
48500 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
48501 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
49287 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
46115 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
46167 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45387 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45522 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
45536 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
5445 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
48425 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
48429 |
Transfer in from: |
25C |
Goole |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
8389 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
8516 |
Transfer in from: |
25A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1949 |
44349 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
49171 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42978 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42979 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42849 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
42852 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
45578 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
46166 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
45578 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
2772 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
44271 |
Transfer in from: |
19E |
Belle Vue |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
48428 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
49002 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
22/04/1950 |
58082 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
44807 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45503 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45539 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45600 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45603 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45632 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45634 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45688 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45709 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45718 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1950 |
45734 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
49183 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45534 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45536 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45540 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45600 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45634 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
45718 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1950 |
46166 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44759 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44760 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45534 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45536 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45540 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45655 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44938 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45503 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45534 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45536 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45540 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
45592 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
44759 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
44760 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
45655 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
44759 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
44760 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
45655 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
49439 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
08/07/1950 |
49186 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
45617 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
45617 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
45617 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
42351 |
Transfer out to: |
16D |
Mansfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
44807 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45289 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
45307 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/10/1950 |
45742 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45534 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45742 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
48633 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45534 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
45742 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
48633 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
48633 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
44837 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
42925 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
44308 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
44837 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/01/1951 |
42960 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
44303 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
45014 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
42775 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
42788 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
42854 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
44303 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
42960 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45014 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
42960 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
44303 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
45014 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
44763 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
46141 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
46152 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
44759 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
46143 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44763 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
46141 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
46152 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
44763 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
46141 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
46152 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/03/1951 |
49322 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1951 |
46141 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
30/04/1951 |
44686 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/05/1951 |
44687 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
45553 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/06/1951 |
45655 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
45553 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
45553 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45555 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45595 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45718 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
48744 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
44763 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
44837 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45014 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45688 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45734 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/07/1951 |
45742 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/07/1951 |
45593 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45555 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45595 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45718 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
48744 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45555 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45595 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
45718 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1951 |
48744 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
42978 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/07/1951 |
45587 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45587 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45534 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
45587 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
46145 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
46150 |
Transfer out to: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
44760 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
42462 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
46145 |
Transfer in from: |
7C |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/10/1951 |
42350 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
45633 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
46145 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
46145 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
46167 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45678 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
48731 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
48429 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1952 |
45624 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
48680 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
43945 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
44090 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45109 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
41113 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
42772 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
42925 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
44838 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
45678 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
44144 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
44090 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1952 |
45644 |
Transfer in from: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
42772 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
42925 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
44069 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
44941 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45644 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
43945 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
44144 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
44271 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45644 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
45718 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
42932 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
40482 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Spital Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
42932 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
42932 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/12/1952 |
70034 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
40405 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
42391 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
46143 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
70030 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
45617 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
40405 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42391 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
46143 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
70030 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
40405 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
42391 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
46143 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
70030 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
70031 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
70032 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
70033 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46145 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
46152 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
70030 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
46129 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
70030 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/06/1953 |
70043 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/06/1953 |
70044 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1953 |
42979 |
Transfer out to: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
44760 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45294 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45327 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45352 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
46111 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
46130 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
42461 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45603 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
45740 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
70030 |
Transfer out to: |
32A |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
25/07/1953 |
70034 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
42462 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
46111 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
44741 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
44742 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45578 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45689 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
46111 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
46161 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45294 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45352 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
70043 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
44935 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
44935 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
70043 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
02/01/1954 |
80039 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
42580 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
45385 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
46125 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
45327 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
41905 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
42937 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
46125 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
40093 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
46140 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
42776 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
42932 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45385 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45555 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/06/1954 |
45556 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
46120 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
42427 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
45146 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
45505 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
45519 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
45500 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
46120 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
46128 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
46132 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
46138 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
46166 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
46138 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
46166 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/01/1955 |
46132 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
42597 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
45528 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
26/02/1955 |
80039 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
2228 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
26/02/1955 |
58084 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
41906 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
45528 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
46128 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
45520 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
45587 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
45709 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
46114 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
46130 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
48501 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
06/1955 |
40405 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
46153 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
46158 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
41908 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
40084 |
Transfer in from: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
45299 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
45441 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
45520 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
45587 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
48275 |
Transfer in from: |
19D |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
48731 |
Transfer out to: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42319 |
Transfer in from: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42566 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42673 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42677 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
42308 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
46143 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
46143 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
42566 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
42677 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
42677 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/01/1956 |
43275 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
42304 |
Transfer in from: |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
43325 |
Transfer in from: |
19A |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
45528 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
45736 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
45304 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
46120 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
42677 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
45736 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
45113 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
42673 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
45304 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
45113 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
45528 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
42381 |
Transfer in from: |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
44840 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
42467 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
42575 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
41900 |
Transfer in from: |
23C |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
45113 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
45519 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
45553 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46120 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
46161 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
45519 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
46149 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
42542 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
46147 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
48680 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
45519 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1956 |
48680 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
44938 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
45622 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
45628 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
46135 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
45441 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
46147 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1956 |
46149 |
Transfer out to: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45652 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45655 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42391 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42597 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42599 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42608 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
42778 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45113 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45539 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45622 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
45628 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
40433 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45519 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45629 |
Transfer in from: |
19G |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45643 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
45652 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
40143 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
42786 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
42348 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
41900 |
Transfer out to: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
45643 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
46135 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
44061 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
46136 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40143 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40433 |
Transfer out to: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
483 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
40482 |
Transfer out to: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1957 |
44357 |
Transfer out to: |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
41900 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
42542 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/04/1957 |
46136 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/05/1957 |
42931 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1957 |
43717 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
43189 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
41159 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Compound |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1957 |
41168 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42365 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45033 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45150 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45188 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45403 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45613 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
41900 |
Transfer out to: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42430 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42478 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
42935 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45624 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/08/1957 |
45655 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/08/1957 |
42960 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
42935 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
40136 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45150 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45188 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45613 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
45723 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42934 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
45150 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42319 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42348 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
42397 |
Transfer out to: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
44760 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
44840 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
44935 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
44938 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
45033 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
45403 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
45671 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
42594 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
46131 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
46137 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
49144 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
42542 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
40202 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
42320 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
42602 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
49144 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
45416 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
48745 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
40202 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42320 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42602 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42931 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42935 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44069 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
45299 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
45689 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
48275 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
48428 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
48516 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
48428 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
42886 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
48633 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
42360 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
42416 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44746 |
Transfer in from: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44747 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44827 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45004 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45111 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45254 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45302 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45426 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
46106 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
46166 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48165 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48275 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48465 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44941 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45416 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45501 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45519 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45587 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
45629 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
43325 |
Transfer out to: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
45632 |
Transfer out to: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
42400 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
42369 |
Transfer in from: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
42400 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
41217 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
41221 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45587 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
47291 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
42304 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
42360 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
42365 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
43457 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45004 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45254 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/10/1958 |
46131 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/11/1958 |
48425 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
48745 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1958 |
45146 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1958 |
46108 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
43189 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
45146 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
46148 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1959 |
45146 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1959 |
45543 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
24/01/1959 |
47356 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
31/01/1959 |
42322 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
44747 |
Transfer out to: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/02/1959 |
46148 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
40076 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
40078 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
14/03/1959 |
40122 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
49428 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1959 |
49439 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
45530 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
46122 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1959 |
46158 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1959 |
D3765 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/05/1959 |
D3766 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
44747 |
Transfer in from: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
09/05/1959 |
40122 |
Transfer out to: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/05/1959 |
D3767 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/05/1959 |
D3768 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/05/1959 |
D3769 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/05/1959 |
D3770 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
D3766 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
D3767 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
D3768 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
D3769 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/05/1959 |
45587 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1959 |
D3771 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1959 |
45530 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1959 |
46122 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1959 |
46158 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45108 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45372 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
40076 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
40078 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45578 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
45595 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
46122 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
47267 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
47343 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
42304 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1959 |
D3771 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
on |
11/07/1959 |
40693 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
D217 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
40122 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
46151 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1959 |
46169 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1959 |
45587 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1959 |
42848 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
22/08/1959 |
D221 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
24/08/1959 |
D227 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
28/08/1959 |
D228 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
D3764 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
D3764 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
D3766 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
D3767 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1959 |
D3768 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
D3769 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
44827 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45108 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45109 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45150 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45302 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1959 |
45372 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
D214 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
D227 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1959 |
46160 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/09/1959 |
46140 |
Transfer out to: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1959 |
42848 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45037 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45046 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45339 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
42848 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44061 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
44349 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
45540 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
46143 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
46153 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
46158 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47345 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47347 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47356 |
Transfer out to: |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47369 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
21/11/1959 |
40084 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
46108 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
2P |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
40674 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
41907 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2P |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
28/11/1959 |
41908 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
48465 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
47291 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
42416 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45037 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
45046 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1960 |
46108 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Electric |
AL1 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/01/1960 |
E3002 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
44842 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
44855 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
48465 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
70046 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
45536 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
46131 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
46151 |
Transfer out to: |
41C |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
70032 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
70033 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
40077 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Electric |
AL1 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/02/1960 |
E3003 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
46156 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
42542 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/03/1960 |
42304 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
47528 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
46156 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
45623 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
45679 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D214 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D217 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
44686 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
44746 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
44842 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
45111 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
45339 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
46106 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
46137 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
47673 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
48165 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
70031 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
44855 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
45426 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
47400 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D1 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D5083 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
42539 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
40107 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/05/1960 |
40122 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
45736 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
46120 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
46127 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
46135 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
40093 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
48500 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
42583 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44758 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44780 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
45534 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1960 |
45679 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1960 |
13176 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
41217 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
41221 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42137 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42658 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
42398 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/09/1960 |
D289 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
03/09/1960 |
42399 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
13176 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44687 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44741 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44742 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44758 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45505 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45530 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45534 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45638 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45671 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
45736 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46108 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46111 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46115 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46120 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46127 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46135 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
46166 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
47341 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D214 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D218 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D222 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
42081 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
42425 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
48310 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/09/1960 |
D5133 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
45426 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
24/09/1960 |
70031 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1960 |
D5134 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/10/1960 |
D5135 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
D294 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
D5079 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
45680 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
D5079 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/10/1960 |
D5137 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/10/1960 |
D5136 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/10/1960 |
D5138 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/10/1960 |
D5139 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
45034 |
Transfer in from: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
45044 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
45111 |
Transfer in from: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/10/1960 |
47341 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Electric |
AL1 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/10/1960 |
E3001 |
Transfer out to: |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
|
Electric |
AL1 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/10/1960 |
E3002 |
Transfer out to: |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
|
Electric |
AL1 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/10/1960 |
E3003 |
Transfer out to: |
LMW |
London Midland - Western Lines |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/11/1960 |
D5140 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
45282 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
45305 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
45434 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
42923 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/11/1960 |
D5083 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/11/1960 |
D5141 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D220 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D224 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D227 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D5060 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
42381 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D5133 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D5060 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/11/1960 |
D5060 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/11/1960 |
D5142 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D5060 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D5083 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
42369 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
42772 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
42924 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
42925 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45044 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45111 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45282 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45305 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
45434 |
Transfer out to: |
12F |
Workington |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D5060 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
D217 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
D307 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
D308 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
42814 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
42858 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
42887 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
42934 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
42936 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
44780 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
44937 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
45034 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
45426 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
47341 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48275 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48389 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48428 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48465 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48680 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1960 |
48744 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
42887 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
17/12/1960 |
42081 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
42938 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45520 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45543 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45623 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1960 |
45644 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1961 |
42887 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
D313 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42542 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42583 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42658 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42786 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42889 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
CRAB |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
42930 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
14/01/1961 |
D5060 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
D301 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
D304 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
D307 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/02/1961 |
D308 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
11/02/1961 |
42539 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
D5083 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
22/04/1961 |
D321 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
22/04/1961 |
D304 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
D304 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/05/1961 |
D321 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
42363 |
Transfer in from: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45587 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
45631 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
46149 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
46115 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
70031 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
70043 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
70046 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D221 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
D221 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/12/1961 |
45385 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
D221 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
45024 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
45302 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
46110 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
D221 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/12/1961 |
42363 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
D331 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
D332 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
D344 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
45024 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
45302 |
Transfer out to: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/12/1961 |
46110 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
03/01/1962 |
D372 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/01/1962 |
D4113 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
D291 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
42578 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
D344 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
D372 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/01/1962 |
D5134 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
D298 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/01/1962 |
D5142 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
Peak |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/03/1962 |
D1 |
Transfer out to: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
24/03/1962 |
70043 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
31/03/1962 |
70028 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
D5142 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/04/1962 |
D5135 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
70016 |
Transfer in from: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
19/05/1962 |
70018 |
Transfer in from: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70019 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70020 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70022 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70023 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70028 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
16/06/1962 |
70043 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
42137 |
Transfer out to: |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
70028 |
Transfer in from: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1962 |
D5133 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/07/1962 |
D214 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
70044 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
46129 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D289 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D291 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D294 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D298 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D301 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D304 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D313 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D331 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D332 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
D5133 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70016 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70018 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70019 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70020 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70022 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70023 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
70028 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
44916 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
45256 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
13/10/1962 |
42578 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
20/10/1962 |
42357 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42670 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42357 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
44809 |
Transfer in from: |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
45256 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
D269 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/04/1963 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
44747 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44744 |
Transfer in from: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/05/1963 |
44809 |
Transfer out to: |
27C |
Southport |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
D269 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
D269 |
Transfer in from: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
D298 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
45522 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
46140 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
46142 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
42425 |
Transfer out to: |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
42670 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/06/1963 |
45385 |
Transfer out to: |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/08/1963 |
45380 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
46149 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
42670 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
D269 |
Transfer out to: |
1B |
Camden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
D298 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/09/1963 |
D317 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
45404 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/11/1963 |
44744 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
D5202 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/01/1964 |
46142 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D217 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D317 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/03/1964 |
D5142 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/03/1964 |
D5142 |
Transfer in from: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D292 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
D293 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
D5146 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/05/1964 |
D5202 |
Transfer out to: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1964 |
46115 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
on |
06/06/1964 |
46129 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
D292 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
D293 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
D228 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/08/1964 |
D5202 |
Transfer in from: |
10G |
Skipton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
D5202 |
Transfer out to: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
Patriot |
4-6-0 |
on |
19/09/1964 |
45522 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
42670 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
7P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
46140 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
D3770 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
26/12/1964 |
D5014 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/01/1965 |
D223 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
02/01/1965 |
D228 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
44916 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
45380 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
45404 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
D3771 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
D5134 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
D5014 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D3335 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D3686 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D3694 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D3695 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/06/1965 |
D3700 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
D4145 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
D3769 |
Transfer out to: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
48310 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
D3852 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
D3853 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/09/1965 |
D3854 |
Transfer in from: |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
D5014 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/11/1965 |
D5134 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
D5140 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
D5141 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1966 |
D3769 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1966 |
D3770 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1966 |
D3860 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/04/1966 |
D5014 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
D5134 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
D3778 |
Transfer in from: |
16F |
Burton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D218 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D220 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D221 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D222 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D223 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D224 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D227 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
D228 |
Transfer out to: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
D2200 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1966 |
D2240 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/06/1966 |
12081 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
D3699 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/07/1966 |
D3988 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2389 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2390 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1966 |
D2394 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
D2200 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2373 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2391 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
D2392 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1966 |
D3860 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
12081 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
D3686 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
12033 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
D5091 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/12/1966 |
D5134 |
Transfer out to: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1967 |
12033 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/01/1967 |
D3335 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
04 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
D2240 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
D3009 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D5134 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D5091 |
Transfer out to: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1967 |
D2390 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1967 |
D2392 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
D3779 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
D212 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D213 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D5242 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1967 |
D2394 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
14/10/1967 |
D214 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D7586 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D200 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D201 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D202 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D203 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D204 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D205 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5273 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D5293 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D340 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D341 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D342 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D343 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D344 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D5050 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D5062 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D5063 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/01/1968 |
D7558 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D5064 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D225 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D5061 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D5208 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D5209 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/02/1968 |
D5244 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D5210 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D5211 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D370 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D371 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D377 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5197 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5212 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5257 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5263 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5264 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5265 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5274 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5275 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5276 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5277 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5278 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5279 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D7647 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D7648 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D7649 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D7650 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D7651 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D340 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D341 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D342 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D343 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D3852 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5208 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5209 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1968 |
D5210 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
D369 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
23/03/1968 |
D7513 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D226 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D378 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D380 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5052 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5053 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5054 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5055 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5144 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5145 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
D2373 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
D2389 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/04/1968 |
D2391 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D227 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
D5056 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D228 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D293 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D294 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5065 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5066 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5198 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5199 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5200 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7573 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7674 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7675 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7676 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D7677 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5257 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5151 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5152 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5153 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5154 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5155 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5156 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5242 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5244 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5263 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5264 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/05/1968 |
D5265 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7538 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7539 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7540 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7541 |
Transfer in from: |
D14 |
London (Midland) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7542 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7543 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7544 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7545 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7588 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7589 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7590 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7591 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1968 |
D7586 |
Transfer out to: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D7653 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D290 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D291 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D292 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D372 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D373 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D374 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D375 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D376 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D379 |
Transfer in from: |
WL |
Western Lines (LMR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7592 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7594 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7595 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7597 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7629 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7630 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7631 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D200 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D201 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D202 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D203 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D204 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D205 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D212 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D213 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D214 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D225 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D226 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D227 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D228 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D290 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D291 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D292 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D293 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D294 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D344 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D369 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D370 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D371 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D372 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D373 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D374 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D375 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D376 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D377 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D378 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D379 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D380 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5050 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5052 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5053 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5054 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5055 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5056 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5061 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5062 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5063 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5064 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5065 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5066 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5134 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5136 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5137 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5138 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5139 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5142 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5144 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5145 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5146 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5151 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5152 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5153 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5154 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5155 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5156 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5197 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5198 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5199 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5200 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5211 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5212 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5273 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5274 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5275 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5276 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5277 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5278 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5279 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D5293 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7513 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7538 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7539 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7540 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7541 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7542 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7543 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7544 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7545 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7558 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7573 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7588 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7589 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7590 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7591 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7592 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7594 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7595 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7597 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7629 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7630 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7631 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7647 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7648 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7649 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7650 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7651 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7653 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7674 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7675 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7676 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D7677 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12033 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12050 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12051 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12060 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12081 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12095 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
12098 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D2858 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D2864 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D2866 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D2869 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3335 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3372 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3373 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3588 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3589 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3590 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3591 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3592 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3686 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3772 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3784 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3842 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3843 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3844 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3845 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3860 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1968 |
D3868 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1968 |
D4144 |
Transfer in from: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
09 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/09/1968 |
D4113 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/12/1968 |
D3007 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1968 |
D3007 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/01/1969 |
12033 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/02/1969 |
D3007 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1969 |
D4136 |
Transfer in from: |
14B |
Cricklewood West |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/04/1969 |
12095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
D2869 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/05/1969 |
D3868 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/07/1969 |
D3778 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D3778 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/02/1970 |
12098 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
on |
28/02/1970 |
D2858 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
on |
28/02/1970 |
D2864 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
02 |
0-4-0 |
on |
28/02/1970 |
D2866 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1970 |
D3783 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1970 |
D3407 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/06/1970 |
12081 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/07/1970 |
12050 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/08/1970 |
D3783 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/01/1971 |
12051 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/02/1971 |
12060 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D3700 |
Transfer out to: |
14A |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1971 |
12077 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3696 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
12077 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3007 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3768 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3770 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1971 |
D3779 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1971 |
D3009 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3335 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3372 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3373 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D3784 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D3925 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1971 |
D3927 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/11/1971 |
D3407 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1971 |
D3591 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/11/1971 |
D3927 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D3699 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1972 |
D3925 |
Transfer out to: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
06/05/1972 |
D3083 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1972 |
D3083 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1972 |
D3907 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/07/1972 |
D3907 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3694 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3860 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
02/09/1972 |
D3909 |
Transfer in from: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D3024 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
07/10/1972 |
D3736 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/10/1972 |
D3038 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/11/1972 |
D3087 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
23/12/1972 |
D3766 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
23/12/1972 |
D3766 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/12/1972 |
D3038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/01/1973 |
08072 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D3696 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/04/1973 |
D3793 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D300 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D301 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D303 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5025 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5026 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5029 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D5212 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
08017 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3588 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3589 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3590 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3592 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3686 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3695 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3765 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3767 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3793 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3842 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3843 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3844 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D3845 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/06/1973 |
D3909 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D7658 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/07/1973 |
D7659 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D212 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D213 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D295 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D297 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D300 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D301 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D303 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D7658 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/08/1973 |
D7659 |
Transfer out to: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5201 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D210 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D211 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D5027 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D5238 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7653 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D297 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D5029 |
Transfer out to: |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D331 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D325 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D7567 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/12/1973 |
D5297 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
25266 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
25297 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D304 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D295 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D325 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
40131 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/01/1974 |
D5297 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/01/1974 |
D7567 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
40104 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
25086 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
25147 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
25196 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
D5026 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1974 |
08068 |
Transfer in from: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
08298 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25278 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
25297 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25148 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25194 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25195 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25290 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25291 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25292 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25293 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
25294 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40024 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40028 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40043 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40044 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40045 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
06/07/1974 |
40104 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25189 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25208 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25209 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/08/1974 |
25266 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
25043 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
25141 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/09/1974 |
25196 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/09/1974 |
08703 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
25242 |
Transfer in from: |
WN |
Willesden |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40021 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40125 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40137 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
40138 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1974 |
08703 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/11/1974 |
25257 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
25278 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/12/1974 |
08068 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24001 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24004 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24005 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24026 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24029 |
Transfer in from: |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
25056 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40021 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40045 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40137 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
40138 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
40003 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
24001 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
24004 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
22/02/1975 |
25093 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
22/02/1975 |
25094 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
24029 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
25094 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
22/03/1975 |
25042 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/04/1975 |
08605 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
25197 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40017 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40021 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40042 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40045 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40055 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40098 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40099 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40135 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40136 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40140 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
40181 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
24025 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
24026 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/05/1975 |
25093 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08891 |
Transfer in from: |
DY |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
24005 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
24027 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25104 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25105 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25106 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25186 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25089 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25090 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25086 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25150 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25151 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
08569 |
Transfer out to: |
NH |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25062 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
08283 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25196 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25198 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25199 |
Transfer in from: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25249 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25266 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25290 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25291 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25292 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25293 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
25294 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40011 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40017 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40042 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40043 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40098 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40099 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
11/10/1975 |
40140 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
08/11/1975 |
40131 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25100 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25102 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25184 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25185 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25266 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
25303 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40055 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40131 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/01/1976 |
40181 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
24/01/1976 |
40111 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
07/02/1976 |
40045 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
07/02/1976 |
25156 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
25156 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1976 |
25189 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
40021 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
17/04/1976 |
40026 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40011 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40017 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40042 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40087 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40088 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
40144 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25042 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25043 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
08/05/1976 |
25056 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
w/e |
26/06/1976 |
40045 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
40175 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
10/07/1976 |
40136 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
01/08/1976 |
40045 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
40020 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
40106 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25184 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
40095 |
Transfer in from: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
40098 |
Transfer in from: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
01/1977 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25148 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25192 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25299 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25147 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25148 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1977 |
25185 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
06/1977 |
25299 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25206 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25207 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25090 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25150 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25151 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25249 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
25257 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25148 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25186 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25192 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
40010 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
40011 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
10/1977 |
40017 |
Transfer out to: |
KD |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
20/11/1977 |
25141 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
02/1978 |
40088 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
06/02/1978 |
08635 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
05/03/1978 |
40003 |
Transfer out to: |
HM |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
25154 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
25184 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
25206 |
Transfer out to: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
25207 |
Transfer out to: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
2w/e |
12/03/1978 |
40020 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/04/1978 |
08635 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
08915 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
08915 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/05/1980 |
25102 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
24/08/1980 |
40026 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25197 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
14/12/1980 |
40042 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/02/1981 |
25100 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/03/1981 |
08298 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
12/04/1981 |
40098 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
03/05/1981 |
40111 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
31/05/1981 |
40125 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
31/05/1981 |
40144 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
31/05/1981 |
40175 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1981 |
25221 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
07/1981 |
40009 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1981 |
25088 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25184 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40061 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40064 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40148 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40159 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40167 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
40168 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25106 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25154 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
25184 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
14/09/1981 |
40095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25141 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25205 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/04/1982 |
25105 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
11/04/1982 |
40064 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
04/08/1982 |
40148 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
16/08/1982 |
40087 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/09/1982 |
25141 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/09/1982 |
25104 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
21/03/1983 |
40159 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
21/04/1983 |
40106 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
12/06/1983 |
40061 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/08/1983 |
25184 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/01/1984 |
25221 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
09/02/1984 |
40167 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1984 |
25316 |
Reinstated |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/05/1984 |
25208 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/05/1984 |
25242 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
13/06/1984 |
40024 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/10/1984 |
40013 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
18/10/1984 |
40028 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
07/11/1984 |
40009 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
29/11/1984 |
40168 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
22/01/1985 |
40135 |
Transfer out to: |
98W |
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
22/01/1985 |
40044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
22/01/1985 |
40104 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
08/02/1985 |
40012 |
Transfer out to: |
98W |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/06/1985 |
25194 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/06/1985 |
25195 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/09/1985 |
25051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/12/1985 |
25209 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/02/1986 |
25198 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/02/1986 |
08283 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/02/1986 |
25089 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/03/1986 |
25196 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/03/1986 |
08602 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/05/1986 |
25205 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/09/1986 |
25911 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/02/1987 |
25199 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/02/1990 |
08820 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/11/1991 |
08686 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/07/1993 |
08604 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/02/2004 |
08915 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/06/2005 |
08914 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/08/2005 |
08906 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/12/2007 |
08599 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|