Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 475 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4335 Week
» 6917 Month
» 271550 Year
» 1493115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Lees (Oldham)


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 12 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12248 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12326 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12378 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12387 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12389 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12464 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 12569 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 01/01/1948 2550 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52545 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52586 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 01/01/1948 52607 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 56 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 57 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 59 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 60 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 61 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 01/01/1948 62 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9509 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9548 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9593 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 01/01/1948 9668 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 13/11/1948 52545 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 m/e 04/1949 52586 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 m/e 09/1949 52607 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 52416 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 27 0-6-0 31/12/1949 52326 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52569 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 49598 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 41281 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49618 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 52387 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 26/05/1951 49593 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 49536 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 49608 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 41281 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52378 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42551 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52360 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52615 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52416 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52464 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 16/01/1952 49548 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 49563 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52389 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 06/1952 49563 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 49662 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 28 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52549 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52108 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52108 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 52549 Transfer out to: 26E Bacup    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 52360 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1953 52615 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 04/07/1953 49608 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 52569 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42114 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42115 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 52427 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 52388 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 49578 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/08/1954 41280 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/08/1954 40056 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 41281 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 41282 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40012 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40057 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40059 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40060 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40061 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/09/1954 84010 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/09/1954 84015 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 84012 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 28 0-6-0 w/e 09/04/1955 52569 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1955 52293 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/05/1955 42657 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 84012 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 84015 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 40062 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 84013 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 84014 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 84019 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 41280 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 41281 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 41282 Transfer out to: 20C Royston    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 49505 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 12113 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 52410 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 12113 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 12113 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 12115 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 12113 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 12115 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1956 41280 Transfer in from: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/05/1956 84010 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/04/1957 42550 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41206 Transfer in from: 20G Hellifield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 90671 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41280 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 21/09/1957 52293 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 52240 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 18/10/1957 49536 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 90140 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90123 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90141 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90271 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90306 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90402 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 90589 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49505 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49509 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49578 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49618 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49662 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49668 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 15/03/1958 52388 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 52183 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 84019 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 06/1958 52427 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 52269 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90525 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90708 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90271 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90589 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 52322 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 17/01/1959 49598 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 52466 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 21/02/1959 84014 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 02/05/1959 41206 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 02/05/1959 84013 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42657 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42551 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 90226 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 52183 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 52269 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 28/11/1959 90718 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 28/11/1959 90226 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 52410 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 52207 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 06/08/1960 52322 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/08/1960 42287 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 20/08/1960 52275 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 22/10/1960 52466 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 17/12/1960 90194 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 52456 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 15/04/1961 52240 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 05/1961 52207 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 52271 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 52271 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 23/09/1961 90331 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 90306 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 52248 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 46484 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 46485 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 46486 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46419 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90140 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90141 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90331 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 52275 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 52456 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42079 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42183 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42114 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/05/1963 42287 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/09/1963 90671 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 46449 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 46487 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/09/1963 90564 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 46452 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/02/1964 90402 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/02/1964 90564 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/03/1964 90194 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90525 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90708 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/04/1964 90398 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42079 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42115 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42183 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46419 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46449 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46452 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46484 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46485 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46486 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46487 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90123 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90398 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90718 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath