Depot: Horsham
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1157 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1273 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1730 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2045 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2051 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2055 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2067 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2074 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2286 | Snapshot | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2289 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2300 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2307 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2387 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2389 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2449 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2521 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2571 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2584 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2594 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 540 | Snapshot | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 543 | Snapshot | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 544 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1157 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1273 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2286 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2289 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2496 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1157 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1273 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | P | 02/01/1948 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2286 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2289 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | P | 02/01/1948 | 2496 | Transfer out to: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 542 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 540 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 2594 | Transfer out to: | EBN | Eastbourne | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 531 | Transfer in from: | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 545 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 546 | Transfer in from: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1273 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 544 | Transfer out to: | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | D Tanks | 0-4-2T | m/e | 07/1948 | 2286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | m/e | 07/1948 | 2289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 1157 | Transfer out to: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | m/e | 11/1948 | 2283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 2308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1948 | 2373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 32051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1949 | 32366 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1949 | 32387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 21 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2548 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2554 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 27 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32537 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 47 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 50 | Transfer in from: | BM | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2557 | Transfer out to: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32300 | Transfer out to: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32301 | Transfer out to: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32306 | Transfer out to: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 32307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 32302 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 2554 | Transfer out to: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 32449 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 32482 | Transfer in from: | NHN | Newhaven | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 32496 | Transfer out to: | NHN | Newhaven | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | 32364 | Transfer in from: | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | Scotchmen | 4-4-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 32074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 32380 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 50 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | D1M | 0-4-2T | m/e | 09/1950 | 32252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 32365 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 32379 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 32544 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 30021 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 30531 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 30542 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 30543 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 32584 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32365 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32379 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32544 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32365 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32379 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 32544 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32539 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | C3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32302 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32501 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32537 | Transfer out to: | NHN | Newhaven | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32539 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32399 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32539 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32571 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 32399 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 32548 | Transfer out to: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30049 | Transfer in from: | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 30027 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 30049 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 30049 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 05/05/1951 | 32576 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32522 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32523 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32576 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32045 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32067 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32511 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32539 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32544 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32550 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 32576 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 30048 | Transfer in from: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32463 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32465 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32467 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32583 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32384 | Transfer out to: | 75G | Eastbourne | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 32482 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32463 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32465 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32467 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32463 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32465 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 32467 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1951 | 32055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 30050 | Transfer in from: | 71D | Fratton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32468 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32469 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32470 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32365 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32556 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32583 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32570 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32576 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32515 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32570 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32576 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 32399 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 32401 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 32570 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1952 | 32576 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 32570 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/07/1952 | 32576 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 32570 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 32576 | Transfer in from: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 32570 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 32576 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Horsham | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/1952 | 32364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 32541 | Transfer in from: | 75G | Eastbourne | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1952 | 32379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 30108 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1953 | 32380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 30051 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 30544 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 31725 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 31725 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 32468 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 32570 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | E5X | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 32576 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | m/e | 04/1955 | 32465 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 32165 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 32166 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 20/04/1955 | 32170 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 30547 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 32467 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 30108 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 32521 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 32170 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/02/1956 | 32464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 32480 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 32165 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 32166 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 32526 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 32523 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 32480 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30047 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30048 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30049 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30050 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30051 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30544 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30545 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30546 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 30547 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32463 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32469 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32470 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32522 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32526 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32541 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges |