Depot: Gateshead
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1900 | 2111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1901 | 2112 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1901 | 2113 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1901 | 2114 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1901 | 2115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | m/e | 12/1913 | 2153 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | m/e | 12/1913 | 2154 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | m/e | 02/1914 | 2155 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | m/e | 02/1914 | 2156 | 1st Allocation | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | m/e | 05/1920 | 1517 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1920 | 920 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1922 | 2363 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1922 | 2365 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 12/1922 | 2400 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/12/1922 | 2401 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1923 | 2367 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1923 | 2369 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/03/1923 | 2371 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1923 | 2375 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/06/1923 | 2377 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1923 | 2379 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/08/1923 | 2381 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/11/1923 | 1481 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1924 | 2402 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/03/1924 | 2403 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/03/1924 | 2404 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/04/1924 | 1481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/09/1924 | 2568 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/09/1924 | 2569 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/09/1924 | 2570 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/09/1924 | 2571 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/10/1924 | 2572 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1924 | 2112 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1924 | 2114 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1924 | 2573 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1924 | 2574 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/10/1924 | 2575 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/10/1924 | 2576 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/10/1924 | 2577 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2111 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2113 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1924 | 2115 | Transfer out to: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1925 | 2365 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 22/10/1925 | 1712 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/10/1925 | 4419 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 31/10/1925 | 1750 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/12/1925 | 4419 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/12/1925 | 2562 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/02/1926 | 1784 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1926 | 1719 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1926 | 1766 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1926 | 1767 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/07/1926 | 1517 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/07/1926 | 2156 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/09/1926 | 2562 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 02/12/1927 | 2155 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/04/1928 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/05/1928 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 28/05/1928 | 2144 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 28/05/1928 | 2146 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 28/05/1928 | 2148 | Transfer in from: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/05/1928 | 1766 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/05/1928 | 1767 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/05/1928 | 1784 | Transfer out to: | SALT | Saltburn | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1928 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/07/1928 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/09/1928 | 2580 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/08/1929 | 2157 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/08/1929 | 2158 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 21/08/1929 | 2160 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/08/1929 | 1712 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/08/1929 | 1719 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/08/1929 | 1750 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1930 | 2595 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1930 | 2596 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/03/1930 | 2580 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/04/1930 | 2597 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1930 | 2598 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/07/1930 | 2599 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1931 | 2367 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1931 | 2369 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1931 | 2379 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1931 | 2371 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/11/1931 | 2260 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/11/1931 | 2260 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/05/1933 | 631 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/05/1933 | 633 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/02/1934 | 2401 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/04/1934 | 2403 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/05/1934 | 2400 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 19/06/1934 | 2148 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 19/06/1934 | 2160 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/07/1934 | 2501 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 08/08/1934 | 2153 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/08/1934 | 2503 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/08/1934 | 2402 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1934 | 2504 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/11/1934 | 2404 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1934 | 2507 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/04/1935 | 633 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/04/1935 | 633 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 25/05/1935 | 2158 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 06/06/1935 | 1179 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/06/1935 | 1522 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 27/06/1935 | 2157 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/09/1935 | 2156 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 05/10/1935 | 1521 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/11/1935 | 2511 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/11/1935 | 2504 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | H | 12/1935 | 1652 | Transfer in from: | AFP | Annfield Plain | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | H | 12/1935 | 2156 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | H | 12/1935 | 2156 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/01/1936 | 2161 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1936 | 2743 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/03/1936 | 2597 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1936 | 2381 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1936 | 920 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 16/07/1936 | 1521 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/07/1936 | 2597 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/07/1936 | 2743 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/10/1936 | 645 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1936 | 2746 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/11/1936 | 2570 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/11/1936 | 2505 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/11/1936 | 2576 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/12/1936 | 2576 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/12/1936 | 2568 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1936 | 2510 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1936 | 2746 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 31/12/1936 | 1522 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1937 | 2544 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1937 | 2577 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/01/1937 | 2746 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1937 | 2377 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/01/1937 | 2375 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/01/1937 | 2510 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 19/03/1937 | 633 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/03/1937 | 4487 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/04/1937 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1937 | 2363 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/07/1937 | 4493 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/07/1937 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1937 | 4485 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/10/1937 | 2599 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/10/1937 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/10/1937 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/10/1937 | 1179 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/12/1937 | 4463 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/00/1938 | 4493 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/01/1938 | 4465 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1938 | 4485 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/01/1938 | 2599 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/02/1938 | 578 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/02/1938 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/02/1938 | 631 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/02/1938 | 4462 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1938 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1938 | 4487 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/03/1938 | 4469 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/04/1938 | 4499 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/04/1938 | 2569 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/04/1938 | 4500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1938 | 2544 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/06/1938 | 4901 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 09/07/1938 | 2144 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/07/1938 | 2156 | Transfer out to: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/09/1938 | 2144 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/09/1938 | 2149 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/11/1938 | 2144 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/11/1938 | 2149 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 17/01/1939 | 2146 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | H1 | 4-4-4T | on | 18/01/1939 | 2154 | Transfer out to: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 2559 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/03/1939 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A8 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/03/1939 | 2161 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/05/1939 | 4831 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/09/1939 | 2503 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/09/1939 | 2597 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/09/1939 | 4831 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1939 | 2503 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1939 | 2511 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1939 | 2505 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1939 | 2573 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/12/1939 | 2505 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/12/1939 | 2501 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 1467 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1940 | 2544 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1940 | 2578 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1940 | 2582 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1940 | 4462 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/10/1940 | 2582 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/10/1940 | 4463 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/11/1940 | 578 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/11/1940 | 645 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/10/1941 | 3659 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/12/1941 | 4897 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1942 | 4482 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/02/1942 | 3641 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/03/1942 | 3644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/06/1942 | 3649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/06/1942 | 4469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/07/1942 | 3654 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/10/1942 | 3669 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/11/1942 | 3671 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/01/1943 | 2503 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/02/1943 | 3677 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/03/1943 | 3678 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/03/1943 | 3679 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2511 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3642 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3646 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3651 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3675 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 3676 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4463 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4464 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4772 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4773 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4776 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4777 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4778 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4779 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4780 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4781 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4782 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4804 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4806 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4831 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4839 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4854 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4855 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4856 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4857 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4858 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4859 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4862 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4866 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4869 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4881 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4890 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 4894 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1467 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2505 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2571 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2572 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2576 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2595 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2596 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2599 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2746 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/05/1943 | 2503 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/05/1943 | 2599 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/05/1943 | 2511 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/05/1943 | 4463 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1943 | 4493 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1943 | 4499 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/10/1943 | 4499 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/10/1943 | 4493 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/02/1944 | 2596 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/02/1944 | 4890 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/04/1944 | 4890 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1944 | 8309 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/08/1944 | 8309 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1944 | 2579 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/08/1944 | 2596 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/11/1944 | 3675 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/11/1944 | 2597 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/11/1944 | 4465 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/12/1944 | 5044 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 13/12/1944 | 5087 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1945 | 2511 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/01/1945 | 2578 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1945 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/03/1945 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/05/1945 | 2578 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/09/1945 | 2507 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/10/1945 | 4465 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4859 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4869 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4890 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2501 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2505 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2573 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2580 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2595 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 4463 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2579 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 2599 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 3641 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 3649 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 3659 | Transfer out to: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/11/1945 | 4866 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 538 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 539 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 546 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 577 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 708 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 786 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 791 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/05/1946 | 857 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/05/1946 | 500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1946 | 500 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1946 | 511 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/08/1946 | 512 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1946 | 511 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/09/1946 | 512 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1946 | 702 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1946 | 844 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1946 | 866 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1946 | 949 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/11/1946 | 1100 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1946 | 1011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1946 | 1012 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1946 | 1013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1946 | 1014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/12/1946 | 518 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/05/1947 | 521 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1947 | 522 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/07/1947 | 113 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/08/1947 | 36 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/08/1947 | 522 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/09/1947 | 113 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1947 | 36 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1947 | 1238 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1875 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1878 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1881 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1897 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1904 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1928 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1930 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1985 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1986 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2736 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2738 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2739 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2742 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2745 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2747 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2749 | Snapshot | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2750 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2764 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2766 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2771 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 69103 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7689 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7690 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8141 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8146 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8160 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8180 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8247 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8251 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8265 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8267 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8270 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8309 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8674 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8720 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8723 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9090 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9091 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9092 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9093 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9097 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9099 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9100 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9102 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9106 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9109 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/01/1948 | 527 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1948 | 528 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1948 | 531 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 60079 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 7656 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 60091 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 61875 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 61904 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/06/1948 | 60082 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/06/1948 | 60091 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1948 | 60538 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 60082 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 60082 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8265 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2739 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 62749 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/09/1948 | 60115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 9105 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/09/1948 | 9106 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 68732 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 2738 | Transfer out to: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 8234 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 68675 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 68744 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2736 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 68262 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 8267 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1948 | 60132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1948 | 69103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2742 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2745 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 7656 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/11/1948 | 60135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/12/1948 | 60137 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1948 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 62747 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 62771 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/02/1949 | 60142 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60036 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60074 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60081 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60086 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60801 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60805 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60806 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60807 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60809 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60810 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60811 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60833 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60835 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60860 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60868 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60887 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60910 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60952 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60959 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 06/02/1949 | 69931 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 06/02/1949 | 69933 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 9105 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61878 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61881 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61897 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61928 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61985 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 61986 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1949 | 60143 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/03/1949 | 60124 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/03/1949 | 60145 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 67642 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 7653 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/04/1949 | 60147 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1949 | 60527 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1949 | 60528 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/06/1949 | 60151 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/07/1949 | 60150 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 60150 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 60150 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/08/1949 | 60531 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60129 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60084 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 60129 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 60129 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 62764 | Transfer out to: | SCA | Scarborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64701 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64707 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64853 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64871 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/09/1949 | 60154 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 4704 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64701 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64707 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64853 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64871 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 4704 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64701 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64707 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64853 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64871 | Transfer out to: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 69093 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 69099 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 69102 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 69105 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 69107 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/09/1949 | 60155 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 12/1949 | 9092 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 62750 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 62766 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67320 | Transfer in from: | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67325 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67329 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67642 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67682 | Transfer out to: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67320 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67325 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67329 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 7309 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67320 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67325 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 67329 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/07/1950 | 64869 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 68247 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 67647 | Transfer in from: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 67682 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67647 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67682 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67647 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 67682 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/11/1950 | 60884 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/11/1950 | 60885 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/11/1950 | 60926 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/11/1950 | 60942 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68702 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60942 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 64852 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 64865 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 60942 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 64852 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 64865 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 60942 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 64852 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 64865 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 67325 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60802 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60809 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60810 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60860 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60944 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1951 | 60949 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1951 | 61024 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1951 | 61199 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60802 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60809 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60810 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60860 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60944 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60949 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61024 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61199 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 67244 | Transfer in from: | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60802 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60809 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60810 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60860 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60944 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 60949 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61024 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61199 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 67647 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67244 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67244 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61024 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60122 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60810 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60860 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60942 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60944 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 60122 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 67309 | Transfer out to: | 52c | Alston | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 67647 | Transfer in from: | 51E | Stockton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 67647 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 67647 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 61930 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1952 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1952 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1952 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/01/1952 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 04/02/1952 | 68141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/03/1952 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/03/1952 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67252 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67270 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 67252 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 67270 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 67252 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 67270 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60515 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60516 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60868 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60885 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60886 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60887 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60945 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60947 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60952 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1952 | 60957 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1952 | 61021 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1952 | 61023 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60868 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60885 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60886 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60887 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60945 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60947 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60952 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60957 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61021 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61023 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69095 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60868 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60885 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60886 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60887 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60945 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60947 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60952 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 60957 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61021 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61023 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67252 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67270 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67647 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69095 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69095 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/08/1952 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/08/1952 | 60075 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/09/1952 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/09/1952 | 60082 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61021 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61023 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 67296 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67296 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67296 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 17/11/1952 | 67244 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/11/1952 | 60965 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/12/1952 | 60515 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1953 | 76024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1953 | 64929 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1953 | 64707 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1953 | 60075 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/02/1953 | 60038 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/03/1953 | 60887 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 76024 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/03/1953 | 60082 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/03/1953 | 60042 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60801 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/06/1953 | 60807 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62349 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62360 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62371 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62375 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1953 | 61022 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/08/1953 | 60038 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/08/1953 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1953 | 60042 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1953 | 60040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 10/1953 | 68154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/10/1953 | 64853 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62349 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62360 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62371 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 62375 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1953 | 60801 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1953 | 60885 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1953 | 60886 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1953 | 60945 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1953 | 60952 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 68272 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 68251 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1954 | 61019 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1954 | 61014 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/02/1954 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/02/1954 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/03/1954 | 60045 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/03/1954 | 60042 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 67296 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/03/1954 | 60040 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/03/1954 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 05/04/1954 | 68146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 67259 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 67315 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 67320 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 67329 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 68159 | Transfer in from: | NLN | Northallerton | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62352 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62360 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62375 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62380 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62396 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/06/1954 | 62352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 67315 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 68180 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/09/1954 | 60042 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/09/1954 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/09/1954 | 62380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67265 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 62360 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 62375 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | D20 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 62396 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/10/1954 | 60045 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/10/1954 | 60075 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 42072 | Transfer in from: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 42073 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 42093 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 42094 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67320 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67259 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67687 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67682 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/02/1955 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/02/1955 | 60078 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1955 | 76046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 67265 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 67320 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1955 | 76049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/05/1955 | 60075 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/05/1955 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/05/1955 | 60833 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 76049 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 76046 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/08/1955 | 60078 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/08/1955 | 60040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/09/1955 | 60887 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 61199 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67254 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67318 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68160 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/10/1955 | 69095 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68267 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1955 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/11/1955 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/11/1955 | 68270 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67634 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67683 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 76045 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 76049 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/02/1956 | 60040 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/02/1956 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1956 | 60802 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1956 | 60809 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1956 | 60883 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1956 | 60957 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/05/1956 | 60883 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/05/1956 | 60082 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/05/1956 | 60045 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/05/1956 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43055 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43075 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43101 | Transfer in from: | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76045 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 76049 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/08/1956 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/08/1956 | 60038 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60848 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1956 | 60883 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1956 | 61011 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1956 | 61013 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/11/1956 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/11/1956 | 60042 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/11/1956 | 69090 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/11/1956 | 69091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 43055 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 43075 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 43101 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1957 | 73161 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 61019 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 61100 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 61238 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 68731 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/02/1957 | 60038 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/02/1957 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 04/03/1957 | 68159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 05/03/1957 | 67318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67639 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67657 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67673 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 67687 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/05/1957 | 60042 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/05/1957 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/05/1957 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/05/1957 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60805 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60809 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60860 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60942 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 64929 | Transfer out to: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1957 | 64701 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1957 | 64871 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 42072 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 42073 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 42093 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 42094 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60053 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60058 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61065 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/09/1957 | 61256 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60848 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60887 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 73161 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1957 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/11/1957 | 60040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 67645 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/11/1957 | 68267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/11/1957 | 69100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1957 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1957 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 03/12/1957 | 67254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 65687 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 69102 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1958 | 60051 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1958 | 60052 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68263 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1958 | 60040 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1958 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60904 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60929 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60934 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60952 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60051 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/07/1958 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/07/1958 | 60979 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61065 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61256 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67645 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67673 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/11/1958 | 60045 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/11/1958 | 60058 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/12/1958 | 60051 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/12/1958 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65675 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1958 | D2048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 65687 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 67637 | Transfer in from: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 69027 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68272 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/02/1959 | 69102 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 69001 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 68732 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1959 | 65675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65656 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 65700 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 68309 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/05/1959 | D2055 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 69101 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 69105 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 68263 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1959 | D2056 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1959 | D2057 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1959 | D2058 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1959 | D2059 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1959 | 60053 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1959 | 60058 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1959 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/06/1959 | 60091 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1959 | D2060 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61014 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61238 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64700 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64707 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64710 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64713 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64812 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64814 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64846 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64851 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64854 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64921 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 64936 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1959 | D2061 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 13324 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D3455 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 65702 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 65712 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 65728 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68694 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68695 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68697 | Transfer in from: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68705 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68728 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68730 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 68737 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 69017 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 76024 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 68744 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 69017 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/07/1959 | 68283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1959 | 65656 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 68705 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 68730 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 68731 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | 65700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1959 | 64978 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1959 | 64860 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1959 | 64938 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Selby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D2048 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/09/1959 | 77011 | Transfer in from: | 52c | Alston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/09/1959 | 77014 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1959 | 65702 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/10/1959 | D237 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/10/1959 | D238 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/10/1959 | D239 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/10/1959 | D240 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/10/1959 | D241 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61019 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 61100 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 64700 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 64704 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1959 | 64710 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/11/1959 | D242 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/11/1959 | D243 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/11/1959 | D244 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/11/1959 | D245 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/11/1959 | D246 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/11/1959 | D247 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/11/1959 | 68694 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/11/1959 | D248 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 76024 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/11/1959 | D249 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1959 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1959 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1959 | 60040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1959 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/12/1959 | D250 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | D248 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/12/1959 | 60809 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/12/1959 | 60940 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60805 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60807 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60833 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60860 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60868 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/01/1960 | 60904 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 68314 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/02/1960 | 68697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/02/1960 | 60038 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/02/1960 | 60518 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D256 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D257 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/04/1960 | D5096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/04/1960 | D270 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/04/1960 | D271 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/04/1960 | D272 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/05/1960 | D273 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/05/1960 | D5097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/05/1960 | D274 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 68720 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1960 | 60132 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1960 | 60137 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1960 | 60143 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1960 | 60151 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1960 | 60516 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1960 | 60521 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/05/1960 | 60538 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/06/1960 | D278 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | D277 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60070 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60967 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/06/1960 | D279 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1960 | D280 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 43126 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1960 | 60040 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1960 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1960 | 60051 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1960 | 60052 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/06/1960 | D5100 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/07/1960 | D5101 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/07/1960 | D5102 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D2147 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D2148 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D2149 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D3938 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1960 | 61012 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/07/1960 | D286 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/08/1960 | D5103 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 65712 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/08/1960 | D5104 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/09/1960 | D5105 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60124 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60129 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60142 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60147 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/09/1960 | 60155 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61019 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 64854 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 77011 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 43126 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68675 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 68737 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 77014 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1960 | D5106 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65726 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 65645 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/10/1960 | D5107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | D250 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | D251 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/10/1960 | D5108 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/11/1960 | D5109 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D2162 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1960 | 64707 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/11/1960 | D5110 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2104 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60115 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60135 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60145 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60150 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1960 | 60154 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/11/1960 | D5111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D2104 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/12/1960 | D5147 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1960 | 60051 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1960 | 60052 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1960 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/12/1960 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1960 | D2310 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/12/1960 | D5148 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1960 | D2311 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1960 | D5112 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1961 | D2312 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 61016 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 61038 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 61237 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | D2310 | Transfer out to: | SBH | Blyth (South) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 64713 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 64814 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | 64846 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1961 | D2313 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1961 | D2314 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/01/1961 | D5113 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1961 | D2311 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1961 | D2312 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1961 | D2313 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1961 | D2314 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/02/1961 | D5149 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1961 | 64812 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1961 | 64851 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/02/1961 | 64921 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/02/1961 | D5150 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 19/03/1961 | D9002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D2615 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D2616 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D2055 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | D3073 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1961 | D2325 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 46471 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 46473 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1961 | 61038 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1961 | 61237 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D3072 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 25/05/1961 | D9005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 43126 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/06/1961 | 69105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67637 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67690 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1961 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1961 | 60076 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1961 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/06/1961 | 60075 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1961 | D2330 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 07/07/1961 | D9008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | D248 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1961 | D2333 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 68736 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1961 | D2616 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1961 | 61016 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/08/1961 | 61100 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 24/08/1961 | D9011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/08/1961 | 68693 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | D3076 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | 43126 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | D14 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/09/1961 | D18 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D14 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D18 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60929 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60934 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60947 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60949 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61014 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61022 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61238 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D24 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D30 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D22 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 29/09/1961 | D9014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/10/1961 | 68728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1961 | 64869 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/10/1961 | 68674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/10/1961 | 68680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1961 | 64852 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 09/11/1961 | D9017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | D278 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D2594 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D5156 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D5157 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D2615 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D5112 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D5113 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/12/1961 | 60053 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/12/1961 | 60075 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/12/1961 | 60058 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/12/1961 | 60091 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/12/1961 | D146 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D148 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 46471 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 46473 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 68016 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 68054 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 68059 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/03/1962 | 60082 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 69004 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 69025 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/04/1962 | 68695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 68031 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 68053 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 68016 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/04/1962 | 69097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/04/1962 | 69101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/04/1962 | 69109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1962 | 65645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1962 | 65728 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D5100 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62006 | Transfer in from: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62021 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62024 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62026 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62028 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62029 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/05/1962 | 62030 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/05/1962 | D166 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D5100 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D146 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/05/1962 | 62010 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/05/1962 | 62025 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/05/1962 | D392 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1962 | D167 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1962 | D168 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/06/1962 | D169 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/06/1962 | D393 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/06/1962 | D394 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1962 | 65726 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/06/1962 | D170 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 68029 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D148 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D22 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D24 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D30 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/06/1962 | 60058 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/06/1962 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/06/1962 | 60040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/06/1962 | 60075 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/06/1962 | D395 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/07/1962 | D172 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/07/1962 | D396 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/07/1962 | D171 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/07/1962 | D173 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/07/1962 | D174 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/07/1962 | D397 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/08/1962 | D175 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | D173 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/08/1962 | D176 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/08/1962 | D398 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/08/1962 | D177 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/09/1962 | D399 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60042 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60051 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60052 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60058 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60060 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60071 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60076 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60078 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60082 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60091 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/09/1962 | D178 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/09/1962 | D180 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D173 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D3072 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 68029 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 68031 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 68054 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/09/1962 | D179 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/09/1962 | D181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 62006 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 62025 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 27/09/1962 | D182 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | D398 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | D399 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/10/1962 | 60979 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/10/1962 | D183 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/10/1962 | D184 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/10/1962 | D185 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 22/10/1962 | 67639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 22/10/1962 | 69027 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/11/1962 | 62030 | Transfer out to: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/11/1962 | D186 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1962 | 64938 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/11/1962 | D187 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/11/1962 | 62021 | Transfer out to: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60923 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60942 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60952 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64860 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64865 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64936 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1962 | 64978 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67657 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67687 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67688 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 67689 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/12/1962 | D6784 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/12/1962 | D188 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/12/1962 | D6785 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/12/1962 | D6786 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 67628 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 67643 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 67662 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 67678 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1962 | D6787 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1963 | D6788 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/01/1963 | 67662 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 18/01/1963 | D6789 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/01/1963 | D189 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/01/1963 | D190 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/01/1963 | D191 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/01/1963 | D192 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/01/1963 | D193 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 67645 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 67654 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1963 | D6790 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/1963 | D6791 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/02/1963 | D5179 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/02/1963 | D6792 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/02/1963 | D5180 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 20/02/1963 | D6793 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D5096 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/02/1963 | D6794 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/03/1963 | D5181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/03/1963 | D6795 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/03/1963 | 60812 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | D397 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/03/1963 | D5182 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/03/1963 | D5100 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | D392 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | D393 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | D394 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D395 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 04/05/1963 | D396 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | D251 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | D256 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D2164 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D2247 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3072 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3241 | Transfer in from: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3316 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3317 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3321 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3943 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D2333 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3324 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/06/1963 | D3938 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D250 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D251 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D256 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D392 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D393 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D394 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D395 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D396 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D397 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D398 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D399 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D5177 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/06/1963 | D5178 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | D2314 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60036 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60040 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60045 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60052 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60060 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60071 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60073 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60082 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60083 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60085 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60088 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60091 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60092 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60835 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60865 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60868 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60891 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60904 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60910 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60913 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60922 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60940 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60944 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60962 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60976 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61019 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61022 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61035 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61038 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61322 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1963 | 60018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3940 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67620 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67636 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67642 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67646 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67651 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67652 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67656 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67658 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67683 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67690 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 67691 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 69008 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 69024 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 69028 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D189 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D190 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D191 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D192 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3076 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 68053 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 68059 | Transfer out to: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/06/1963 | 60835 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/08/1963 | 60073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | D2615 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/08/1963 | D2594 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/08/1963 | 60052 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/09/1963 | 60082 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 62010 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 62028 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 62029 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | D2103 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | D2110 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | D2163 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/09/1963 | 60060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 23/09/1963 | 67654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 23/09/1963 | 67658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 23/09/1963 | 67683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 68723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 69001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 69004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 23/09/1963 | 69024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 67640 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/10/1963 | 68736 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/10/1963 | 60088 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60005 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60016 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60019 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/10/1963 | 60023 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1963 | D169 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/12/1963 | 60070 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/12/1963 | 60080 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/12/1963 | 60084 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 69008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60051 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60075 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60036 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60045 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 67638 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 67684 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | D2149 | Transfer out to: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 67652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 67656 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/12/1963 | 69025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 69016 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/01/1964 | 60075 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 89 | Transfer out to: | XX | |||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2249 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D3073 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/03/1964 | 60020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/04/1964 | 60910 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/04/1964 | D1575 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/04/1964 | D1574 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/04/1964 | D1576 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/04/1964 | D1577 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D189 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D190 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D191 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D192 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D394 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D395 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D396 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D397 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D398 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D399 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1964 | D1579 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1964 | 61038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/05/1964 | D1578 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1964 | 60002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1964 | 60070 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/05/1964 | D1580 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/05/1964 | 60964 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/05/1964 | D8592 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/05/1964 | D1581 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/05/1964 | D1582 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/05/1964 | 60083 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 19/05/1964 | 67651 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | D2249 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | D2330 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/05/1964 | D8593 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 04/06/1964 | 67642 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D5112 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D5113 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D6755 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/06/1964 | D6756 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/07/1964 | D8594 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/07/1964 | 60859 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/07/1964 | 60946 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/07/1964 | 60952 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/07/1964 | 60040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/07/1964 | 60812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/07/1964 | 60904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/07/1964 | 60922 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/07/1964 | D2311 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2047 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2330 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2247 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/07/1964 | D8595 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/07/1964 | D8597 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/07/1964 | D8596 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/08/1964 | D8598 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/08/1964 | D8600 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/08/1964 | D8599 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/09/1964 | D8601 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/09/1964 | D8603 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/09/1964 | D8602 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D5156 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D5157 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D6755 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/09/1964 | D6756 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D392 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D393 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D394 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D395 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D237 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D240 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D246 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D273 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D392 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D393 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D3940 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60071 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60085 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60891 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/10/1964 | 60913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1964 | 60116 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1964 | 60127 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1964 | 60151 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 67690 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/10/1964 | 60142 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/10/1964 | 69016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/10/1964 | 69028 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67638 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67640 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67643 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 02/11/1964 | 67684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/11/1964 | 60051 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/11/1964 | 60084 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 24/11/1964 | 67620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 24/11/1964 | 67628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 24/11/1964 | 67646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 24/11/1964 | 67691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1964 | 60117 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1964 | 60129 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1964 | 60132 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/12/1964 | 60148 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/12/1964 | 60901 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/01/1965 | 60117 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/01/1965 | 60148 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | D2312 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1965 | D2334 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1965 | 61022 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/02/1965 | D1574 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/02/1965 | 62024 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/02/1965 | 62026 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D390 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D391 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D396 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D397 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D398 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D238 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | D239 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D174 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 22/05/1965 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/05/1965 | D1547 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1965 | D1575 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60865 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60901 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D174 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D1543 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1576 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/07/1965 | 60129 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/07/1965 | 60151 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D1889 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3073 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3243 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3674 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3316 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3321 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | D3455 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | D3322 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1965 | D3241 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1965 | 60859 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1965 | 60944 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1965 | 60962 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D1889 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 61019 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1965 | 61035 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3875 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | D397 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | D398 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/10/1965 | 60868 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/10/1965 | 60976 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/10/1965 | 60940 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/10/1965 | 60946 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/10/1965 | 60952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/10/1965 | 61322 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | D3875 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5177 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5178 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/12/1965 | D1978 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1965 | D1977 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1965 | D1979 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/12/1965 | D1980 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/12/1965 | D1981 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/12/1965 | D1982 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/12/1965 | D1983 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/01/1966 | D1984 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/01/1966 | D1985 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1966 | D1986 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/01/1966 | D1987 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3078 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D243 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D244 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D271 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3072 | Transfer out to: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D392 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D394 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D395 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1966 | D396 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/02/1966 | D1988 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/02/1966 | D1989 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D241 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D249 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D270 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D280 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 26/02/1966 | D286 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1966 | D2310 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1966 | D2313 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5108 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5182 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1573 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1765 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1766 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D8588 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D8589 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D8590 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D8591 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6784 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6785 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6786 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6787 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6788 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6789 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6790 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6793 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6795 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6819 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6820 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6823 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6824 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6825 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6826 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6827 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6828 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | D6830 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1966 | D2313 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1989 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6831 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6832 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6833 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | D6791 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | D6792 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | D2058 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | D2059 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D6829 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D6873 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D6893 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D242 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D245 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D390 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D391 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D393 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D5179 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D5180 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D5181 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1967 | D2313 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/02/1967 | D2313 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2108 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D6874 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2061 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2148 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2162 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2164 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2325 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1100 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1989 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1990 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1991 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1992 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1993 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1998 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D1999 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2052 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2053 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2071 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2074 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2230 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2232 | Transfer in from: | 51C | West Hartlepool | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D249 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D250 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D278 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D280 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D281 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D282 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D283 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D284 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D285 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D286 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6894 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6895 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6896 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D256 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D257 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D272 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D274 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D277 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6794 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6829 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6832 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6833 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6894 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6895 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6896 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6894 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6895 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6896 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6894 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6895 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6896 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6894 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6895 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6896 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6897 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6898 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6899 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6900 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6901 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D6902 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D250 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D247 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D248 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D249 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D250 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | D6787 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8028 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8604 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 24/06/1967 | D8605 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D5166 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D5167 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D5168 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D5169 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D6780 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D6786 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D8020 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | D8027 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/07/1967 | D8022 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/07/1967 | D8025 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 08/1967 | D6945 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8021 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 26/08/1967 | D8029 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8045 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8046 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8047 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D8048 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | D250 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | D251 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | D278 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6799 | Transfer in from: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6796 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6797 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6798 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8023 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8024 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D8026 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8045 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8046 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8047 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8048 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8045 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8046 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8047 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D8048 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6796 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D1101 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D1102 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5151 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D190 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D191 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D192 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D193 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D285 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D286 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5097 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5101 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5112 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D6780 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D6786 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D6787 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1765 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1766 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D1103 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D1104 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D5172 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D6821 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D6822 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D2057 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D5113 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D6797 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 04/11/1967 | D6798 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D8045 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D8046 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D8047 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D8048 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6798 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6832 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6833 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6834 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D189 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D3943 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5147 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5151 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5166 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5167 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5168 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5169 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/12/1967 | D5172 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D8604 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D8605 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6796 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6797 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6829 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D6945 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1968 | D2311 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1968 | D2312 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1968 | D2314 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D1979 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D2334 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D8601 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | D8602 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1968 | D2230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1968 | D2232 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D368 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D368 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D8599 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D8600 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D8603 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1968 | D6820 | Transfer out to: | CF | |||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D237 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D238 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D239 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D285 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D286 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D3926 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D6871 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D6872 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1103 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1104 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D166 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D167 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | D3915 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | D8018 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2066 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2094 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2222 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2229 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2237 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2243 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2298 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2299 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1101 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1102 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2047 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3915 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/08/1968 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3915 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D2317 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D2078 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D6794 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D6795 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D2243 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D6821 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/09/1968 | D6831 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D7586 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D7593 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D7596 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D5148 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D5149 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D5150 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1108 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1109 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1969 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1970 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1971 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1972 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1973 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D277 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D278 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D6791 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D6793 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1573 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1577 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1578 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1580 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1581 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D188 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D239 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D6824 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6711 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6825 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D6792 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D6911 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D6711 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1968 | D2222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1529 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1539 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1572 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1574 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1977 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1978 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1980 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1981 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1998 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1999 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6822 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6823 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/11/1968 | D6951 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/11/1968 | D6952 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/11/1968 | D6827 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1968 | D8591 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1968 | D8595 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1968 | D8596 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D2156 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D6787 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D6829 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1968 | D2298 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | D2049 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1102 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1582 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1969 | D1101 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1969 | D1579 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1969 | D2310 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/02/1969 | D6818 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/02/1969 | D6819 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D8599 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D8600 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1982 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1983 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1984 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1969 | D6785 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1969 | D6872 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D1110 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D1111 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D164 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D2049 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D6711 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D6712 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D6832 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D6834 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/04/1969 | D6780 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/04/1969 | D6874 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D1984 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D6779 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D6826 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D6871 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/06/1969 | D1529 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/1969 | D2330 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/07/1969 | D6786 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/07/1969 | D3317 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/07/1969 | D6830 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6832 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6871 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6874 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6912 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6935 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6779 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6780 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6785 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/08/1969 | D1995 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/08/1969 | D1996 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/08/1969 | D1997 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/08/1969 | D1998 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/08/1969 | D1999 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/08/1969 | D2095 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/08/1969 | D2170 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1969 | D2317 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D239 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D240 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D270 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D273 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D345 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1108 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1109 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1110 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1111 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1539 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1969 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1970 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1971 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1972 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1973 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1969 | D2237 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D346 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D347 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D353 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D277 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D278 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D279 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D2064 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1969 | D2229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1573 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1970 | D2299 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6748 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6757 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6758 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6759 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6760 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6761 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6762 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6763 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6764 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6765 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6766 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6768 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6772 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6820 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6917 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6928 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6711 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6712 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6786 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6791 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6798 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6828 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6832 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6871 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6874 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6893 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6894 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6895 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6897 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6898 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6899 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6902 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6911 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6935 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1970 | D3729 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D355 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D6712 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D6756 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D240 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D3638 | Reinstated | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1103 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1104 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1105 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1106 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1107 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D8601 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1984 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1985 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1986 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1987 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1988 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6767 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6770 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6771 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6794 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6896 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D6913 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D8029 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D8602 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D8603 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D8604 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/05/1970 | D352 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/05/1970 | D281 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/06/1970 | D8027 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D8031 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/06/1970 | D8024 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/07/1970 | D8589 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D139 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D148 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D153 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D160 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D190 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D192 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1106 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1107 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1572 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1573 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1574 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/07/1970 | D170 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D181 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D183 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D184 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D185 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D186 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D187 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1970 | D3677 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1970 | D2095 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D170 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D240 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D271 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6741 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6746 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D174 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D179 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6712 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6820 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8018 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8020 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8021 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8022 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8023 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8025 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8026 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8028 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8031 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D1106 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D3195 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D6742 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D6745 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D1100 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D3078 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 31/10/1970 | D176 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D166 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1970 | D3638 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1970 | D6901 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D2102 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D3648 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D257 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D6804 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D6860 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1971 | D3648 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D350 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D6828 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D6829 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/02/1971 | D6830 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/03/1971 | D176 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1971 | D2060 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8590 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D6830 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1971 | D3073 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D6917 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8588 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8599 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8600 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8602 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D8603 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D183 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5019 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5090 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5096 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D282 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D283 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D355 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6741 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6756 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6797 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1971 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D5548 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8594 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8597 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D8598 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8592 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8593 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8601 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D8604 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1971 | D3322 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1705 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D174 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D179 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D256 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D258 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3934 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5527 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5529 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5531 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5532 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5696 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6806 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6807 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1105 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1106 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D347 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3677 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6828 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6829 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6833 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6860 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7586 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7593 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7596 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5019 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5090 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5096 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3911 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3919 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3934 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5168 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5171 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5529 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5532 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6759 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D193 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D166 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D2103 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1936 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7586 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7593 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7596 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1104 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D168 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1705 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5548 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5696 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6913 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1972 | D3243 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/03/1972 | D5691 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/03/1972 | D7586 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5169 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5170 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D7593 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D7596 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D166 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D167 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D168 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1775 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1970 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1986 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1987 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1988 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D2061 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5856 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D6741 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D240 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D258 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D270 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D271 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D273 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D284 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D285 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D286 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5168 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1972 | D2052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1972 | D2053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1972 | D2071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1972 | D2074 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1972 | D1577 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1972 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1578 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1581 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1936 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D280 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D6768 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3182 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3214 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3215 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3216 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5807 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5169 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5172 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5173 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5174 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6731 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D192 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D193 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D237 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D238 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D256 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5527 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5531 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5807 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6760 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6818 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1580 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1775 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D3214 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D3911 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D3919 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5811 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5821 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1986 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5171 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5174 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D1520 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D1988 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1100 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1542 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6708 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6715 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6716 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6784 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6785 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6794 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1989 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1990 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1991 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1992 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5170 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5172 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5173 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5811 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6731 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1988 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6777 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6935 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6938 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D139 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D148 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D153 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D160 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6764 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6951 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D6952 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1104 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1105 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1534 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1987 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1993 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1995 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D351 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D354 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6794 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6799 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6794 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6796 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D6799 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1541 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1996 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1550 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6709 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6710 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6732 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6768 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6776 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1997 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6770 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6772 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6777 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6795 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D6873 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1527 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1525 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1998 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D1518 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D1519 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D6794 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D187 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D191 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D239 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D349 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D355 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D181 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D192 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D193 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1998 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D257 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D355 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D6741 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D6757 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D6767 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D1965 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D1999 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1512 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1513 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1514 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1515 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1516 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1517 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1521 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1522 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1526 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1528 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1963 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6730 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6731 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1102 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1103 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1104 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1105 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1577 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1578 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1580 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1581 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6708 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6709 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6715 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6716 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6799 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6900 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6912 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D5820 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D5856 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D6804 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37242 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37228 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31173 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31178 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37035 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37053 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37054 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37079 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37082 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37100 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D5590 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D5595 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 24111 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37032 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37048 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37085 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37106 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37107 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47263 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47265 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 24107 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 24109 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31278 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31287 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31290 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 40176 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47411 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47412 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24102 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24103 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24104 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24105 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24106 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 24110 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37010 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37238 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37242 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1974 | 08004 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37048 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | 37235 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 40147 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47519 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47520 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47521 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47522 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47542 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47411 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47412 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47435 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1974 | 37238 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1974 | 37250 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1974 | 37092 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/10/1974 | 37093 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47524 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47002 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47525 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47001 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47006 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47025 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47133 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47259 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/12/1974 | 08004 | Transfer out to: | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37080 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 40050 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47051 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47052 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47255 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47528 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31278 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31290 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37084 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37087 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47025 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47133 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47259 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47413 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47414 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47415 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47542 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/01/1975 | 40155 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/01/1975 | 37082 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1975 | 37028 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1975 | 37054 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 01/03/1975 | 37083 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 01/03/1975 | 37035 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37099 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37101 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37102 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37106 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37119 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37249 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40053 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40054 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40056 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40057 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40058 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40059 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40067 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40068 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40069 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 40070 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31171 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31173 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37031 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47052 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47255 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | KY | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47296 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47298 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47520 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47521 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47522 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47524 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47525 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47528 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37082 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 40052 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47050 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47052 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31287 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47003 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47004 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47005 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1975 | 03107 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08274 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08325 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47052 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 08274 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/07/1975 | 08325 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1975 | 03147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 08054 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 08087 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1975 | 08081 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08044 | Transfer in from: | HI | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40047 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40048 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40071 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40074 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 40077 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37101 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37102 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37119 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47518 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47519 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 08001 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37195 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37199 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37216 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37242 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37079 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37080 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37100 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1975 | 37249 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08888 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1975 | 08217 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1975 | 03156 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08671 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08758 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 08872 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 37073 | Transfer in from: | MC | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 37078 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 37042 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 37045 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1976 | 03163 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 03069 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 40048 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/02/1976 | 03110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1976 | 03102 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | 03079 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 47050 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 47051 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40086 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40059 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40070 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40145 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40146 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 40176 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47430 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47431 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31418 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37057 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37059 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47415 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47430 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47431 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31288 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31411 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/06/1976 | 40053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46047 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46048 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46049 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46051 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 46052 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 37238 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1976 | 03111 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1976 | 03108 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08544 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31298 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47410 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47411 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47412 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47413 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31175 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31178 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 40052 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 40054 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 40056 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 05/1977 | 40057 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47426 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31298 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1977 | 40058 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1977 | 40067 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1977 | 40068 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1977 | 40069 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1977 | 47410 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1977 | 47411 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 08512 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37032 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37055 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37056 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 40057 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47411 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47518 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47519 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47520 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47521 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47522 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 40152 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 40153 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47431 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1977 | 08053 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1978 | 08044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1978 | 40150 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1978 | 40151 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 40152 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 40153 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47410 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 37055 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31184 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31186 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31187 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31237 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37028 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37046 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37048 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37053 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37057 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/03/1978 | 40036 | Transfer in from: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/1978 | 08001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 11/1978 | 46027 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1979 | 08087 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/02/1980 | 08054 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/04/1980 | 08081 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1980 | 03056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1980 | 03111 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1980 | 08127 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/09/1980 | 40071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/09/1980 | 40147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1980 | 03061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/10/1980 | 46040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/11/1980 | 46034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/11/1980 | 46037 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/12/1980 | 47045 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 08/02/1981 | 55005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/02/1981 | 46053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1981 | 08053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1981 | 03064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1981 | 37076 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1981 | 37076 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37076 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37078 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1981 | 03107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/08/1981 | 40149 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 37099 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47421 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/09/1981 | 46001 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/09/1981 | 46048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1981 | 47421 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47213 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47215 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47217 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47446 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47473 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1981 | 47536 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47295 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47552 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47557 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1981 | 46030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1981 | 46041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1981 | 46042 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1981 | 03170 | Transfer out to: | BC | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 08/11/1981 | 55011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/11/1981 | 46043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/11/1981 | 46006 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/11/1981 | 46007 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 56075 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 56076 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 55014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46010 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46017 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46018 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46021 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46022 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46025 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46038 | Reinstated | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46050 | Reinstated | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46054 | Reinstated | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46038 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46050 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 29/11/1981 | 46054 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1981 | 55008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1981 | 55017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 55 | Co-Co | on | 02/01/1982 | 55002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/01/1982 | 40154 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/01/1982 | 46054 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/01/1982 | 40036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/01/1982 | 46006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/02/1982 | 46007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/03/1982 | 46022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/03/1982 | 46038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1982 | 08217 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/05/1982 | 46036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1982 | 08116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/10/1982 | 46050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/10/1982 | 46055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/10/1982 | 46056 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/12/1982 | 46049 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/01/1983 | 46021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/01/1983 | 46029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/04/1983 | 46031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 17/06/1983 | 40077 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 19/06/1983 | 46033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1983 | 08147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/08/1983 | 40050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/09/1983 | 40153 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/10/1983 | 46039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1983 | 03069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/12/1983 | 46051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/12/1983 | 46018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 09/03/1984 | 40074 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/03/1984 | 40085 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1984 | 08148 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/04/1984 | 46044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/04/1984 | 46017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 29/04/1984 | 56131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 06/05/1984 | 46046 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 10/06/1984 | 56132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/07/1984 | 40057 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 02/09/1984 | 46047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/09/1984 | 46052 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1984 | 46035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/11/1984 | 46045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/11/1984 | 46010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 13/11/1984 | 40047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/11/1984 | 46025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/01/1985 | 40152 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 22/01/1985 | 40155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 23/01/1985 | 40086 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/03/1986 | 47416 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/01/1987 | 47429 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/02/1987 | 47419 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/04/1987 | 47415 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/05/1987 | 47412 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1987 | 47410 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1987 | 47420 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1987 | 97409 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1987 | 97410 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1987 | 97411 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1987 | 97412 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 09/1987 | 97413 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08421 | Transfer in from: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08507 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08515 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31289 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37058 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37059 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47213 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47215 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47295 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47473 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47518 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47536 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47557 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47568 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56131 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56132 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/01/1988 | 03066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/01/1988 | 03078 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/01/1988 | 03094 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47411 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47413 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47417 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47418 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47421 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47422 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47423 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47519 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47522 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47552 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97409 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97410 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97411 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97412 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97413 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/06/1988 | 31184 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1988 | 56075 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 37250 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1988 | 08671 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/01/1989 | 47428 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1989 | 37062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1990 | 08747 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1992 | 08515 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/02/1992 | 47430 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/02/1992 | 47446 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1992 | 08544 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/08/1993 | 08507 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1994 | 08562 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/03/1994 | 37032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/04/1995 | 47521 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 06/10/1995 | 31418 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1996 | 97805 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/08/1997 | 37066 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1998 | 47520 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/1999 | 37063 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1999 | 37701 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 03/03/2000 | 31187 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/06/2000 | 31237 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/2000 | 37083 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2000 | 37376 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/2000 | 37513 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/03/2003 | 37073 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2004 | 37071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/2005 | 37068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 47217 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2006 | 37242 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 37216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 37065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 09/2008 | 56076 | Condemned |