Depot: Fort William
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4692 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4693 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4697 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4698 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4699 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 4700 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1940 | 4701 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1995 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1996 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2480 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5237 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2470 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2480 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1952 | 61782 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/06/1952 | 62011 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/06/1952 | 62012 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/06/1952 | 61789 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62011 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62012 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62011 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62012 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1953 | 61783 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1953 | 61788 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1953 | 61790 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/04/1953 | 61791 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43132 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43133 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43135 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43137 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1953 | 61783 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1953 | 61788 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1953 | 61790 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/07/1953 | 61791 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 43132 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 43133 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 43135 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 43137 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/05/1954 | 61997 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/05/1954 | 62031 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/05/1954 | 62034 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/05/1954 | 62052 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1954 | 61783 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1954 | 61790 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 44820 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 44921 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45047 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45245 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45367 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45487 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 61995 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 61996 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 45049 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 44973 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45367 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44972 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44974 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44975 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44976 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44977 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44820 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 44921 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 45047 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 45049 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 45245 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1954 | 45487 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/04/1956 | 61787 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/04/1956 | 61788 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/05/1957 | 61784 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 65237 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 44255 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/03/1960 | 61791 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42696 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 80061 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42696 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 76001 | Transfer in from: | 63C | Oban | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 65313 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/03/1961 | 61784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1961 | 61997 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1961 | D4095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | D4096 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | D4097 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | D4095 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | D4096 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 44972 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 44973 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 44974 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 44977 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D4098 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1962 | 65313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 44976 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 76001 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/09/1962 | 44975 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 62011 | Transfer out to: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 62012 | Transfer out to: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 44960 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 44255 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 62031 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 62034 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 62052 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 44960 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D4098 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D4098 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Fort William | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 80061 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/06/1968 | D4097 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/08/1970 | D4098 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/06/1974 | D3886 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1981 | 08718 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket |