Depot: Fleetwood
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 11488 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 12252 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 12521 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2867 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2734 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2843 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10640 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10675 | Snapshot | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10720 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10765 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10802 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10812 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11477 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11488 | Snapshot | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11498 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12240 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12252 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12521 | Snapshot | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2723 | Snapshot | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2734 | Snapshot | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2840 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2841 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2842 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2843 | Snapshot | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2867 | Snapshot | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2867 | Snapshot | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4948 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10872 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50823 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50875 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10675 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10703 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 10705 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 4948 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 22/05/1948 | 50875 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 12215 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 10765 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/12/1948 | 50823 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 12215 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 42712 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 50872 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 10840 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 06/1949 | 50732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 50743 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 12458 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 52439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 50749 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 50766 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 51348 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 50642 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 50646 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 51348 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 10850 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 12458 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 50806 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 10850 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12458 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 50647 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 50806 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 10850 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 12458 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 50806 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 50752 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 46436 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 50752 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 50752 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 50781 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 50748 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50748 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50748 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 50647 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 52240 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 50798 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 20/05/1950 | 50844 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 06/1950 | 50743 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 42729 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 42844 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 52290 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 52588 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45107 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45214 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42729 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42844 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 50798 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 52290 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 52588 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42729 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 42844 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 50798 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 52290 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 52588 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 07/1950 | 50798 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 50748 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 50749 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 46436 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 50844 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 51481 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 50752 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 51376 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 51481 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 51481 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 41280 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 41281 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 41282 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 50781 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 50806 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 45107 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 45214 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 42729 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45107 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45214 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 52240 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45107 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45214 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52240 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52240 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 51423 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 50646 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 50840 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 51423 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 50777 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50777 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50777 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 52588 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 41281 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 50640 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 52368 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 52368 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 52368 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 41281 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41281 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 51338 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 41281 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 50720 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 50850 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 42765 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50766 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42765 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 42765 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45099 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45214 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 51338 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 50777 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 50752 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52458 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/05/1952 | 50812 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 52368 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 05/07/1952 | 50802 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42843 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50788 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45206 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 42843 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 50752 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 42718 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 52240 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42718 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 52240 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/11/1953 | 51514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42843 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 52240 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84016 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84017 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84018 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 84019 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41280 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 41260 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 41261 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 41281 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 41282 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 52290 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 51419 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 51498 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 51477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 84015 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 51524 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 84019 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90556 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 51481 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/08/1956 | 50788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 42732 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 90556 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41205 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41283 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 84015 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 84016 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 08/02/1958 | 51321 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 51336 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 84016 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 43502 | Transfer in from: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 84010 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 41283 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1959 | 43502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42707 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 42722 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 45377 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 45442 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 45226 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44982 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44988 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45377 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45442 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 51524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 42732 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 51336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 41205 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84011 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84012 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41260 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 41261 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | D2860 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 51419 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/10/1961 | D2861 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | on | 14/10/1961 | D2862 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | on | 18/10/1961 | D2863 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 47165 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42187 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 42434 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 90335 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 90367 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 90681 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 90689 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42867 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 42707 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44889 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 44894 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90413 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90658 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90725 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42187 | Transfer out to: | 12H | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42434 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 84012 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 42843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 42832 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 90367 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42926 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 42940 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44889 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 44894 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45226 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 47666 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 47161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45035 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45347 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45397 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 42926 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 84017 | Transfer out to: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 42722 | Transfer out to: | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 45026 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 45227 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 45274 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 90392 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 90335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 45077 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48099 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48211 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48223 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48224 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48319 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48377 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48413 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 48639 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90392 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90413 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90658 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90681 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 90689 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48224 | Transfer out to: | 9M | Bury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 45402 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 47202 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 42081 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 47602 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 48618 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 90725 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 42765 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42832 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42840 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42841 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42842 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42844 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42940 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48639 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 44729 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 45421 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | D2868 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 47468 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 42081 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 48199 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 45212 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 45227 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 47602 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 48176 | Transfer in from: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D2862 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | D2868 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 17/10/1964 | D2867 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 48176 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 45035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45444 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45026 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45077 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45397 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 45402 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 42494 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 47468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 42460 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 47577 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 44675 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D2867 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 47577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 47317 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 24/04/1965 | 84011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 24/04/1965 | 84018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42494 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 42431 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44894 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44940 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45218 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48211 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48223 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48618 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 84016 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 84016 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 44894 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 45206 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48005 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48310 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48338 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 42224 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 28/08/1965 | 42460 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1965 | 47666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 48223 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 44982 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 45218 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 45274 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 44675 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 47202 | Transfer out to: | 9J | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 47599 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1965 | 48413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 48668 | Transfer in from: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 84010 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 84016 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 48668 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 47201 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D2860 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D2861 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D2863 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 42224 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 42431 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 44729 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 44940 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 44988 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45107 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45347 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 45444 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 47201 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 47599 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48005 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48199 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48223 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48310 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48319 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48338 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 48377 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 45421 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall |