Depot: Farnley Junction
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 2715 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 195 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 196 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 197 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2715 | Snapshot | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2729 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2730 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2731 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2844 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4896 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5063 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5075 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5076 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5077 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5078 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5080 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5340 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5671 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6405 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6406 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7567 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7571 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8735 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8739 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8754 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8755 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9389 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9392 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9394 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9551 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9552 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9598 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9672 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8755 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 9540 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 5671 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 5671 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 2821 | Transfer out to: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9530 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9646 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 5711 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 5671 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 8447 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9530 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9646 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 49586 | Transfer in from: | 23B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9674 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 48435 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 48470 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 8456 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 8458 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 8459 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 8713 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 49551 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49379 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49382 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49389 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49390 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49392 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 9394 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 48726 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 48730 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49588 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49627 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49631 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49634 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49635 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 49638 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 48713 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 48726 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48435 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48447 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48470 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8456 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8458 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8459 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48713 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48714 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48715 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48726 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 49631 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 49634 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 49635 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 49638 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 41255 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 03/12/1949 | 41256 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 48515 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 45340 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 41257 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 41258 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 24/12/1949 | 41259 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48515 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 46405 | Transfer out to: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 46406 | Transfer out to: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48515 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 90318 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 40196 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 08/01/1950 | 49553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 90316 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 90325 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 90336 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 77165 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 40197 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 40195 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 48714 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 48715 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 49624 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 48726 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 48730 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 48515 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 48713 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 48735 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 48739 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 48754 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 49547 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 49552 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 49674 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 45062 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 70839 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 49672 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 49538 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 49627 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 49673 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 08/05/1950 | 49537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45218 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 42729 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 42844 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 49598 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 90711 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45218 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45218 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 49586 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45218 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90726 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90728 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 41255 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 42730 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 42731 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45079 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90726 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90728 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45062 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90726 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 90728 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45211 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 90666 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45702 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 70839 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90216 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90152 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90267 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90278 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90306 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 90527 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42700 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42712 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42719 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42731 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 42865 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90322 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90216 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90267 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90278 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90306 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90527 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44928 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45077 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 45210 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44928 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45210 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45077 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40691 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 682 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45646 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45581 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45646 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45695 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45646 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45711 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 682 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90316 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45078 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45079 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 45079 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90527 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90325 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 40691 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40691 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 44697 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 45063 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90527 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 45063 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 44697 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90527 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90562 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 90650 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41259 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42865 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 41102 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 41188 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 41193 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 41250 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42862 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42865 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 40691 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41254 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41259 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41188 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41193 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 41250 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 42862 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40581 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40584 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 41102 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 90308 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42719 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42731 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42865 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 40690 | Transfer in from: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 41101 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 41188 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 41188 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 45204 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 41101 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 40690 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42700 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42712 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40584 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40584 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40587 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40680 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 90127 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 90527 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42713 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42766 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42789 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42865 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 42866 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40587 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40680 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45705 | Transfer out to: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45076 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 45341 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 42702 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 41257 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 40581 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90711 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3652 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3653 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 90334 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 42702 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47567 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47571 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 45428 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 90243 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 42866 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42774 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42795 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42866 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90243 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90322 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90336 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90666 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90254 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90318 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42408 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45273 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 41259 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 47419 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1960 | 40584 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 47420 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 90650 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 42408 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1960 | 47568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1960 | 47569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 90308 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 47581 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 47589 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1961 | 47420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1961 | 47570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48542 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48664 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48689 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 90127 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 42795 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 42865 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 41282 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 19/06/1962 | 41256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 42774 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 42789 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 27/09/1962 | 41258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1962 | 42866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 90562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 90726 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | on | 24/11/1962 | 41254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1962 | 42713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1962 | 42766 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 90503 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 41253 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 08/02/1963 | 47581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 41273 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44824 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44826 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44943 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48080 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 45643 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 78010 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 78011 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 78014 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41253 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 41282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 90334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 90728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90254 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90503 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 41273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 47419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 47589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 77001 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 77012 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 45646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 48076 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 44824 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 45079 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 45211 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1964 | 45695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 45647 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 45697 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1964 | 45708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45063 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45204 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 45562 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 45697 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 78011 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 78014 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 78010 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 45273 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 45075 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | D3656 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | D3658 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 48542 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 48689 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 77001 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 77012 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 45643 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1966 | 45581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45080 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 45428 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1966 | 48080 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D3652 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D3653 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D3656 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | D3658 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 44826 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 44896 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 44943 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 45562 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 45647 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 48076 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 48664 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston |