Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 133 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17936 Week
» 70952 Month
» 190479 Year
» 3217332 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Eastfield
Type |
Class |
Wheels |
Period |
Date |
Number |
Event |
Code |
Depot |
Length of Stay |
Notes |
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
25/11/1924 |
1703 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
22/12/1924 |
4695 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
22/12/1924 |
4698 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
22/12/1924 |
4700 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
22/12/1924 |
4704 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
05/01/1925 |
1703 |
Transfer out to: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
20/02/1925 |
4704 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/02/1925 |
4691 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
02/03/1925 |
4696 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
12/03/1925 |
4701 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/03/1925 |
4692 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1925 |
4697 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1925 |
4699 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/06/1925 |
4694 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1925 |
4692 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
03/07/1925 |
4703 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/07/1925 |
4693 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
20/08/1925 |
4702 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
4702 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
4703 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
1927 |
4704 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
31/07/1927 |
4694 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/08/1927 |
4695 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/11/1927 |
4696 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
1928 |
4692 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/05/1929 |
2732 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
31/05/1929 |
2731 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/07/1929 |
2738 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/02/1930 |
2788 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/02/1930 |
2787 |
Transfer in from: |
HTN |
Heaton |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
29/10/1931 |
4682 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/10/1931 |
2733 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/10/1931 |
2734 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/10/1931 |
4685 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/11/1931 |
2740 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
17/11/1931 |
4684 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/12/1931 |
4674 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/05/1932 |
2977 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/06/1932 |
2978 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1932 |
2979 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/06/1932 |
2980 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/02/1933 |
2740 |
Transfer out to: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1933 |
2734 |
Transfer out to: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
12/1935 |
9029 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1935 |
9139 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/05/1936 |
2565 |
Transfer in from: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
09/06/1936 |
2565 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/02/1937 |
2566 |
Transfer in from: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
07/02/1937 |
2567 |
Transfer in from: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
15/02/1937 |
2564 |
Transfer in from: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
28/03/1937 |
2565 |
Transfer in from: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
27/11/1937 |
2563 |
Transfer in from: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
19/07/1938 |
2796 |
Transfer in from: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
19/07/1938 |
2563 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/08/1938 |
4674 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/11/1938 |
2797 |
Transfer in from: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/11/1938 |
2567 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1939 |
4682 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/01/1939 |
4701 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/01/1939 |
4704 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4692 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4693 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4697 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4698 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4699 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1939 |
4700 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1940 |
4684 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/02/1940 |
2556 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/02/1940 |
2567 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/02/1940 |
2566 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
02/02/1940 |
2797 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/03/1940 |
4701 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/07/1940 |
4704 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/07/1940 |
4701 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
05/10/1940 |
2796 |
Transfer out to: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
11/10/1940 |
2563 |
Transfer in from: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
19/11/1940 |
2565 |
Transfer out to: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/11/1940 |
2564 |
Transfer out to: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
20/11/1940 |
2567 |
Transfer out to: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/12/1940 |
2556 |
Transfer out to: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
A1 |
4-6-2 |
on |
04/12/1940 |
2563 |
Transfer out to: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/05/1941 |
1880 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1941 |
1863 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
V4 |
2-6-2 |
on |
12/09/1941 |
3402 |
Transfer in from: |
DON |
Doncaster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1942 |
4684 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1942 |
4682 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/09/1942 |
1804 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
4686 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
4694 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
4695 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1942 |
4696 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/10/1942 |
4702 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/12/1942 |
4674 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/12/1942 |
4695 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/01/1943 |
1804 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
31/03/1943 |
6139 |
Transfer in from: |
LNG |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
13/04/1943 |
2977 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
1804 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2731 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2732 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2733 |
Transfer out to: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2978 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2979 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/04/1943 |
2980 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
21/04/1943 |
6139 |
Transfer out to: |
LNG |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/04/1943 |
4689 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/04/1943 |
4695 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/04/1943 |
4703 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
02/06/1943 |
3683 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
01/07/1943 |
3684 |
1st Allocation |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/07/1943 |
2788 |
Transfer out to: |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/07/1943 |
1804 |
Transfer out to: |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
1863 |
Transfer out to: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/08/1943 |
2738 |
Transfer out to: |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
26/08/1943 |
5058 |
Transfer in from: |
LNG |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
26/08/1943 |
6139 |
Transfer in from: |
LNG |
Langwith Junction |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
28/08/1943 |
1880 |
Transfer out to: |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
J39 |
0-6-0 |
on |
23/09/1943 |
2787 |
Transfer out to: |
DAR |
Darlington |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
3684 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
3684 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
V4 |
2-6-2 |
on |
23/10/1943 |
3401 |
Transfer in from: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
05/11/1944 |
3682 |
Transfer in from: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
20/08/1945 |
3682 |
Transfer out to: |
ABD |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
20/08/1945 |
3683 |
Transfer out to: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
20/08/1945 |
3684 |
Transfer out to: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1945 |
4639 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/08/1946 |
3445 |
Transfer in from: |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/08/1946 |
1070 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/08/1946 |
1071 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
30/08/1946 |
1071 |
Transfer out to: |
HLB |
Hull Botanic Gardens |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/09/1946 |
3445 |
Transfer out to: |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
06/09/1946 |
1073 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1946 |
1072 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/09/1946 |
1070 |
Transfer out to: |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/09/1946 |
1073 |
Transfer out to: |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/09/1946 |
1072 |
Transfer out to: |
HAY |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/01/1947 |
1116 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/01/1947 |
1117 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/05/1947 |
1197 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1947 |
1172 |
Transfer in from: |
GOR |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
30/06/1947 |
1180 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
14/10/1947 |
1243 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/11/1947 |
1260 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/11/1947 |
1261 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
14/12/1947 |
1729 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1993 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1994 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1998 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D33 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2460 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D33 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2462 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2469 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2472 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2474 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2477 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2479 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2482 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2489 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2493 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2496 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2497 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2498 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2671 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2672 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2673 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2674 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2675 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2676 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2680 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2681 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2682 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2684 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2686 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2687 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2688 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2689 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4540 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4541 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4558 |
Snapshot |
TWD |
Tweedmouth |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4559 |
Snapshot |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4578 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4579 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4580 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4581 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4583 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4601 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4610 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4611 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4622 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4623 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4632 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4633 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4638 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4639 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5221 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5227 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5228 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5270 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5273 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5296 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5300 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5308 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5315 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5335 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5337 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5339 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
62473 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
62481 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
68103 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
68109 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7456 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7460 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7467 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7482 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7485 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7500 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7501 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7502 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7600 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7601 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7602 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8118 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8124 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8326 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8327 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8330 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8331 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8333 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8336 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8345 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8347 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8349 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8447 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8468 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8475 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8476 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8479 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8480 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J69 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8551 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J69 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8552 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J72 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8709 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J72 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8733 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8953 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8954 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8955 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8956 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8957 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8958 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N14 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9120 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N14 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9124 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9126 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9127 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9131 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9138 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9163 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9165 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9166 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9170 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9176 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9177 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9178 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9179 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9180 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9181 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9182 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9183 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9184 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9188 |
Snapshot |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9188 |
Snapshot |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9189 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9191 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9203 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9205 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9208 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9222 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
2470 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
2480 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
5300 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1948 |
5337 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
7603 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
7488 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
D29 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
62411 |
Transfer in from: |
POL |
Polmont |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
7600 |
Transfer in from: |
KPS |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
8331 |
Transfer out to: |
KPS |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
27/11/1948 |
61340 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
F4 |
2-4-2T |
on |
16/12/1948 |
7676 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/12/1948 |
7681 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/12/1948 |
61341 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
7644 |
Transfer in from: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
F4 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
7676 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
7681 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
F4 |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
7676 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
7681 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
03/01/1949 |
61342 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
67661 |
Transfer in from: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
7680 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/01/1949 |
61341 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J15 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
7681 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
67618 |
Transfer in from: |
STG |
Stirling |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
8345 |
Transfer out to: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/03/1949 |
61344 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
64610 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
65335 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
62473 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/08/1949 |
61064 |
Transfer in from: |
KEI |
Keith |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
62481 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
61064 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
61064 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/09/1949 |
61148 |
Transfer in from: |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
61148 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
61148 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
64628 |
Transfer in from: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
67502 |
Transfer out to: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
13/11/1949 |
61997 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
61997 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
61997 |
Transfer out to: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
20/11/1949 |
61772 |
Transfer out to: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
D29 |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
62411 |
Transfer out to: |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
62482 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
62498 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/01/1950 |
61148 |
Transfer out to: |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
45007 |
Transfer in from: |
29A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
45010 |
Transfer in from: |
29A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
45011 |
Transfer in from: |
29A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
67455 |
Transfer in from: |
PTH |
Perth (LNER) |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
67455 |
Transfer out to: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1950 |
67667 |
Transfer in from: |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1950 |
67671 |
Transfer in from: |
KL |
Kings Lynn |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/07/1950 |
45007 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/07/1950 |
45011 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
N14 |
0-6-2T |
on |
03/11/1950 |
69124 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
67475 |
Transfer in from: |
KPS |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
67467 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
67618 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
68333 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69163 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69165 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69166 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69176 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69177 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69184 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69203 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69205 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
25/11/1950 |
69208 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
67475 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
67475 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
14/01/1951 |
61733 |
Transfer in from: |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
14/01/1951 |
61735 |
Transfer in from: |
NWE |
New England |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
14/01/1951 |
61770 |
Transfer in from: |
BOS |
Boston |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
21/01/1951 |
61733 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
21/01/1951 |
61735 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
28/01/1951 |
61741 |
Transfer in from: |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
61741 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
61741 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/02/1951 |
61755 |
Transfer in from: |
BOS |
Boston |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
17/02/1951 |
8124 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
04/03/1951 |
61067 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/03/1951 |
61722 |
Transfer in from: |
IMM |
Immingham |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/03/1951 |
61277 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/03/1951 |
61067 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
8124 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
45010 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
64601 |
Transfer out to: |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
61722 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
G4 |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
8124 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
61722 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
68118 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/04/1951 |
61758 |
Transfer in from: |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
61758 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
61758 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
J69 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/04/1951 |
68551 |
Transfer out to: |
65G |
Yoker |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
64579 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
J69 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
68552 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
8124 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
68118 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
8124 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
20/05/1951 |
61769 |
Transfer in from: |
CLK |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/05/1951 |
61769 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
03/06/1951 |
61721 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
03/06/1951 |
61734 |
Transfer in from: |
STR |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
61721 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
09/06/1951 |
61734 |
Transfer out to: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
64583 |
Transfer out to: |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1951 |
65308 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1951 |
43137 |
Transfer in from: |
31D |
South Lynn |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1951 |
43137 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1951 |
43137 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
20/07/1951 |
43138 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
69185 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
69197 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
69218 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
90313 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
D33 |
4-4-0 |
on |
24/08/1951 |
62460 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
44921 |
Transfer in from: |
24A |
Accrington |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45214 |
Transfer in from: |
28B |
Fleetwood |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69185 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69197 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69218 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
90313 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69185 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69197 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
69218 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
90313 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
67501 |
Transfer out to: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/11/1951 |
43133 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/11/1951 |
43134 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45112 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45281 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45400 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
67454 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
67480 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
67482 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/12/1951 |
61741 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45112 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45281 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45112 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
45281 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
69185 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1951 |
43135 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1951 |
43136 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
90313 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1952 |
45400 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1952 |
45400 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1952 |
61770 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
09/01/1952 |
61755 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
17/01/1952 |
61758 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45400 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
68952 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
45400 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
10/02/1952 |
62011 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
10/02/1952 |
62012 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
17/02/1952 |
62031 |
Transfer in from: |
MAR |
March |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
17/02/1952 |
62034 |
Transfer in from: |
MAR |
March |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
17/02/1952 |
62052 |
Transfer in from: |
MAR |
March |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/02/1952 |
61396 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/02/1952 |
61722 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
69171 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
69214 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
69171 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
69214 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
69171 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
69214 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44921 |
Transfer out to: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
45112 |
Transfer out to: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
68336 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/05/1952 |
61140 |
Transfer in from: |
NEA |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/05/1952 |
61116 |
Transfer out to: |
34E |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1952 |
61782 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1952 |
61789 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1952 |
62011 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/06/1952 |
62012 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61140 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61782 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61789 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
67664 |
Transfer in from: |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
68336 |
Transfer in from: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61140 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61782 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
61789 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
67488 |
Transfer in from: |
EFD |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
67488 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
68118 |
Transfer out to: |
65G |
Yoker |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
69222 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/09/1952 |
61793 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
05/10/1952 |
61779 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
05/10/1952 |
61782 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
05/10/1952 |
61792 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
D33 |
4-4-0 |
on |
12/11/1952 |
62462 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
67454 |
Transfer out to: |
63B |
Stirling |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
67456 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/02/1953 |
61133 |
Transfer in from: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
22/02/1953 |
61134 |
Transfer in from: |
KIT |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
8w/e |
21/03/1953 |
67454 |
Transfer in from: |
63B |
Stirling |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
21/03/1953 |
62479 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
21/03/1953 |
62489 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
21/03/1953 |
62493 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
62469 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/04/1953 |
61783 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/04/1953 |
61788 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/04/1953 |
61790 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
27/04/1953 |
61791 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
43133 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
43135 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
43137 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/05/1953 |
61133 |
Transfer out to: |
SR |
To Southern Region |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
13/06/1953 |
62497 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/06/1953 |
61133 |
Transfer in from: |
SR |
To Southern Region |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
06/07/1953 |
61783 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
06/07/1953 |
61788 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
06/07/1953 |
61790 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
06/07/1953 |
61791 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43132 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43133 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43135 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1953 |
43137 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
05/09/1953 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
8w/e |
05/09/1953 |
68103 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/09/1953 |
61294 |
Transfer in from: |
BFD |
Bradford Hammerton Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
45281 |
Transfer out to: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
62470 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
62480 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
N14 |
0-6-2T |
on |
25/03/1954 |
69120 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
17/04/1954 |
43138 |
Transfer out to: |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
19/04/1954 |
61333 |
Transfer in from: |
64F |
Bathgate |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
22/04/1954 |
67475 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
22/04/1954 |
68109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
15/05/1954 |
68336 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V4 |
2-6-2 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
61700 |
Transfer out to: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
V4 |
2-6-2 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
61701 |
Transfer out to: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
61997 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
62031 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
62034 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K1 |
2-6-0 |
on |
24/05/1954 |
62052 |
Transfer out to: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/06/1954 |
61294 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/06/1954 |
61333 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
10/06/1954 |
67454 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
44968 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
45011 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
45119 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
45396 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
61995 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
61996 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/06/1954 |
69163 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
13/08/1954 |
69925 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
25/09/1954 |
67474 |
Transfer in from: |
CAR |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
90049 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/11/1954 |
90489 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
44956 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
44957 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
44995 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
44996 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
45119 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
45214 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
45396 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1954 |
45400 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/04/1955 |
43136 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/05/1955 |
73077 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/05/1955 |
43136 |
Transfer in from: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/05/1955 |
44787 |
Transfer in from: |
27A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/05/1955 |
61064 |
Transfer out to: |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/05/1955 |
73078 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/06/1955 |
61180 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/07/1955 |
45011 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
06/08/1955 |
68124 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
498 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
56152 |
Transfer in from: |
31D |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
01/10/1955 |
68326 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/10/1955 |
44707 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Oban |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
29/10/1955 |
67488 |
Transfer out to: |
64E |
Polmont |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1955 |
61117 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1955 |
73106 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1955 |
73108 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1956 |
73109 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/01/1956 |
44995 |
Transfer out to: |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/01/1956 |
61134 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/01/1956 |
67603 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/01/1956 |
13207 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
27/01/1956 |
61172 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/02/1956 |
13208 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/02/1956 |
13209 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
18/02/1956 |
68110 |
Transfer in from: |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
22/02/1956 |
67480 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
16/03/1956 |
68476 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/03/1956 |
67603 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/03/1956 |
43132 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/03/1956 |
43134 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
09/04/1956 |
61787 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
09/04/1956 |
61788 |
Transfer in from: |
63D |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-8-0T |
on |
18/04/1956 |
69927 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Y9 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
12/05/1956 |
68110 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/10/1956 |
13275 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/10/1956 |
13276 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
22/12/1956 |
13275 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
22/12/1956 |
43133 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/03/1957 |
61260 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/03/1957 |
61261 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/04/1957 |
44702 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/04/1957 |
44967 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
04/05/1957 |
61277 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
13210 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
13211 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
44970 |
Transfer in from: |
31A |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/05/1957 |
68953 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
11/05/1957 |
68958 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
21/05/1957 |
61784 |
Transfer out to: |
65J |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
65237 |
Transfer in from: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
69212 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
65270 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
69138 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
69163 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
69189 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
73106 |
Transfer out to: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
64548 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
69163 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
69126 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
69127 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
31/08/1957 |
69180 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/09/1957 |
D3386 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/09/1957 |
D3387 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
04/10/1957 |
D3388 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/10/1957 |
D3389 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/10/1957 |
D3390 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/10/1957 |
D3391 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/10/1957 |
D3392 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/10/1957 |
D3393 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/10/1957 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/10/1957 |
64628 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/10/1957 |
61344 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/10/1957 |
D3394 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/11/1957 |
D3395 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/11/1957 |
D3396 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/11/1957 |
D3386 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/12/1957 |
D3394 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/12/1957 |
D3395 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/01/1958 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
15/02/1958 |
13276 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J72 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
15/02/1958 |
68709 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
J72 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
15/02/1958 |
68733 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
10/03/1958 |
68475 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
D3418 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
68470 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
69160 |
Transfer in from: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
D3387 |
Transfer out to: |
65G |
Yoker |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
65273 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
12/04/1958 |
68349 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
16/04/1958 |
61774 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1958 |
61775 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
10/05/1958 |
68470 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/07/1958 |
69180 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
08/07/1958 |
68327 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
14/08/1958 |
69160 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
15/08/1958 |
68330 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
on |
25/08/1958 |
68347 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
27/09/1958 |
68345 |
Transfer in from: |
DFU |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
12/12/1958 |
61781 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
65237 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
498 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
17/01/1959 |
56158 |
Transfer in from: |
31E |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
24/01/1959 |
61355 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/01/1959 |
61261 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/01/1959 |
61333 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
12/03/1959 |
61333 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
12/03/1959 |
68480 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/03/1959 |
65221 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/03/1959 |
65227 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/03/1959 |
61776 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
498 |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
04/1959 |
56152 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/04/1959 |
68352 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
498 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/04/1959 |
56158 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/04/1959 |
69180 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/04/1959 |
61785 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
07/05/1959 |
69214 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
09/05/1959 |
68325 |
Transfer in from: |
STM |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/05/1959 |
61993 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/05/1959 |
61996 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
18/06/1959 |
68468 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/07/1959 |
90128 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/07/1959 |
62673 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/1959 |
62472 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
02/09/1959 |
69182 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/09/1959 |
61789 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
22/10/1959 |
67500 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
28/10/1959 |
62477 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
29/10/1959 |
61787 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
29/10/1959 |
62675 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
29/10/1959 |
62676 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
29/10/1959 |
62684 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
D6130 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/12/1959 |
61786 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
08/12/1959 |
68955 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
18/12/1959 |
69197 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
61994 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
61995 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
K4 |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/12/1959 |
61998 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
06/01/1960 |
69170 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
13/02/1960 |
62689 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
01/04/1960 |
67460 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/04/1960 |
61403 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
09/04/1960 |
D6130 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
C15 |
4-4-2T |
on |
12/04/1960 |
67474 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/04/1960 |
61401 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
D6102 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
D6107 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/04/1960 |
D6109 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/04/1960 |
61134 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/04/1960 |
D6104 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/04/1960 |
D6105 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/04/1960 |
D6108 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D6100 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D6103 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D6106 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D6125 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/04/1960 |
D6130 |
Transfer in from: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
07/05/1960 |
D6101 |
Transfer in from: |
34B |
Hornsey |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
D6124 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/05/1960 |
D6126 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
19/05/1960 |
D2756 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
21/05/1960 |
D6133 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/05/1960 |
D6128 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/05/1960 |
D2757 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
01/06/1960 |
D2758 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/06/1960 |
D6123 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/06/1960 |
D6132 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
04/06/1960 |
D6133 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
04/06/1960 |
D6133 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
06/06/1960 |
D2759 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/06/1960 |
D6113 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
16/06/1960 |
D2760 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
16/06/1960 |
69171 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
D6129 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/06/1960 |
D6131 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
23/06/1960 |
D2761 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/06/1960 |
D2762 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1960 |
D6127 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
02/07/1960 |
D6113 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
D6121 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
02/07/1960 |
62689 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/07/1960 |
65218 |
Transfer in from: |
THJ |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
02/07/1960 |
D6113 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/07/1960 |
D2763 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
07/07/1960 |
67671 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
08/07/1960 |
D2764 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
11/07/1960 |
D2765 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
11/07/1960 |
60818 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
11/07/1960 |
60836 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
11/07/1960 |
60931 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
11/07/1960 |
60933 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
15/07/1960 |
D2766 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/07/1960 |
D6134 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/07/1960 |
D6135 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/07/1960 |
D6136 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
29/07/1960 |
61794 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/07/1960 |
D6117 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
30/07/1960 |
D6137 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
43135 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/07/1960 |
43136 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
D6120 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/08/1960 |
D6122 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
17/08/1960 |
D2767 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
17/08/1960 |
68952 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
17/08/1960 |
68956 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
18/08/1960 |
68954 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
D6116 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
D6118 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J50 |
0-6-0T |
on |
24/08/1960 |
68957 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
D6119 |
Transfer in from: |
32B |
Ipswich |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
29/08/1960 |
D2756 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/09/1960 |
D6112 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/09/1960 |
D6115 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D6110 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D6111 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
D6114 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
68325 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
24/09/1960 |
68345 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
29/09/1960 |
69179 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
24/10/1960 |
60836 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
24/10/1960 |
60931 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
17/11/1960 |
60818 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
V2 |
2-6-2 |
on |
17/11/1960 |
60933 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3894 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3895 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3896 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D3897 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
D5117 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67605 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67609 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67618 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67627 |
Transfer in from: |
KPS |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67630 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/11/1960 |
67676 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
17/12/1960 |
67661 |
Transfer out to: |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
03/01/1961 |
61401 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
03/01/1961 |
61403 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
30/01/1961 |
61340 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
on |
24/02/1961 |
68447 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
27/02/1961 |
D2756 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/03/1961 |
65339 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/03/1961 |
D2780 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
65313 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
D8030 |
Transfer in from: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
43137 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67605 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67609 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67618 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67627 |
Transfer out to: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67630 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
67676 |
Transfer out to: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/03/1961 |
65313 |
Transfer out to: |
63B |
Fort William |
|
|
Steam |
C16 |
4-4-2T |
on |
03/04/1961 |
67485 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/04/1961 |
D5117 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/04/1961 |
D5117 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/04/1961 |
D8030 |
Transfer out to: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
05/1961 |
62474 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
11/05/1961 |
62671 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
06/1961 |
D5117 |
Transfer out to: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
26/06/1961 |
61788 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/06/1961 |
D8070 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
69178 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1961 |
D8071 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1961 |
D8072 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
13/07/1961 |
62681 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
13/07/1961 |
62689 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/07/1961 |
D8073 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/07/1961 |
D8074 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
19/07/1961 |
62674 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/07/1961 |
D8075 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/07/1961 |
D8076 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/07/1961 |
D5349 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/07/1961 |
D8077 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/07/1961 |
D8078 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
28/07/1961 |
62686 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
28/07/1961 |
62688 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
D5347 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/07/1961 |
D5348 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
29/07/1961 |
62682 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
02/08/1961 |
62687 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/08/1961 |
D5350 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/08/1961 |
69218 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/08/1961 |
D8079 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/08/1961 |
D8080 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/08/1961 |
D4096 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/08/1961 |
D5351 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/08/1961 |
D8081 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/08/1961 |
D8082 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/09/1961 |
D5352 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
K2 |
2-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1961 |
61764 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
08/09/1961 |
62672 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large/Scottish Director |
4-4-0 |
on |
08/09/1961 |
62680 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/09/1961 |
D8083 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/09/1961 |
D8084 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/09/1961 |
D5353 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/09/1961 |
D8085 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/09/1961 |
D8086 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/09/1961 |
D5354 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/09/1961 |
D4096 |
Transfer out to: |
63B |
Fort William |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/09/1961 |
D8087 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/09/1961 |
D8088 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/09/1961 |
D5355 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/09/1961 |
D8090 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/10/1961 |
D8089 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/10/1961 |
D8091 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/10/1961 |
D8092 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/10/1961 |
D5356 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/10/1961 |
D8093 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/10/1961 |
D8094 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/10/1961 |
D5357 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
67608 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
67675 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8071 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8072 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8073 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8074 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8081 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8083 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8084 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8071 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8072 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8073 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8074 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8081 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8083 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/10/1961 |
D8084 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
25/10/1961 |
D5358 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/10/1961 |
D8095 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/10/1961 |
D8096 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/11/1961 |
D5359 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/11/1961 |
D8097 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/11/1961 |
D8098 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
on |
13/11/1961 |
69183 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/11/1961 |
D8099 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/11/1961 |
D5360 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
18/11/1961 |
67604 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
18/11/1961 |
67628 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
18/11/1961 |
69218 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
Glen |
4-4-0 |
on |
20/11/1961 |
62496 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/11/1961 |
D5361 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/11/1961 |
D8100 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/11/1961 |
D8101 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/11/1961 |
D5362 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1961 |
D8102 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1961 |
D8103 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/12/1961 |
D5363 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/12/1961 |
D8104 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/12/1961 |
D8105 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/12/1961 |
D8106 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/12/1961 |
D5364 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/12/1961 |
D8107 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/12/1961 |
D8108 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/12/1961 |
D8109 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1961 |
D5365 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
90049 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
90128 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
6w/e |
30/12/1961 |
90489 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/01/1962 |
D5366 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/01/1962 |
D5367 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/01/1962 |
D8110 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/01/1962 |
D5368 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/01/1962 |
D5369 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/01/1962 |
D8111 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
22/01/1962 |
67601 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/01/1962 |
D8112 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/02/1962 |
D8113 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/02/1962 |
D8114 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/02/1962 |
D8115 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
69131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
69163 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
12/02/1962 |
69181 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/02/1962 |
D8116 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1962 |
65296 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
D3390 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
D3896 |
Transfer out to: |
60B |
Aviemore |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
64611 |
Transfer out to: |
65K |
Polmont |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
67664 |
Transfer out to: |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
67667 |
Transfer out to: |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
04/1962 |
D6127 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
02/04/1962 |
67603 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
64541 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1962 |
65315 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
07/05/1962 |
67602 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
07/05/1962 |
67644 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
64578 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J88 |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
07/1962 |
68352 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1962 |
61064 |
Transfer in from: |
68E |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
12/08/1962 |
61064 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
D8085 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
29/09/1962 |
D3390 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
29/09/1962 |
D8117 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
29/09/1962 |
D8118 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
29/09/1962 |
D8086 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
69188 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
69191 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
69212 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N15 |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
69218 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
65218 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J83 |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/10/1962 |
68479 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/10/1962 |
D3530 |
Transfer in from: |
65E |
Kipps |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D2768 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3212 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3213 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3214 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3277 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3410 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3532 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/11/1962 |
D3562 |
Transfer in from: |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
67628 |
Transfer out to: |
52B |
Heaton |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
61007 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64559 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64563 |
Transfer in from: |
PKD |
Parkhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
29/12/1962 |
80057 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64540 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64581 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64622 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64638 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
64639 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J36 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/12/1962 |
65228 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V1 |
2-6-2T |
on |
29/12/1962 |
67600 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
on |
29/12/1962 |
67604 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
on |
29/12/1962 |
67608 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
V3 |
2-6-2T |
on |
29/12/1962 |
67675 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
60090 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
60094 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61134 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61197 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61243 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61261 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61355 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
31/12/1962 |
61396 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
14/01/1963 |
60090 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
A3 |
4-6-2 |
on |
14/01/1963 |
60094 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42194 |
Transfer in from: |
67D |
Ardrossan |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42269 |
Transfer in from: |
68B |
Dumfries |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
42690 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
80004 |
Transfer in from: |
68D |
Beattock |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
80027 |
Transfer in from: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
80056 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
90114 |
Transfer in from: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
90199 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44702 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44707 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44787 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44956 |
Transfer out to: |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44957 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44967 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44968 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
44996 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/01/1963 |
73077 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/01/1963 |
61007 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
10/03/1963 |
61116 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/03/1963 |
61008 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/11/1963 |
64548 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/11/1963 |
64559 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
64558 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
64632 |
Transfer out to: |
65K |
Polmont |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
90114 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
90199 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
64632 |
Transfer in from: |
65K |
Polmont |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1963 |
64623 |
Transfer out to: |
65K |
Polmont |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
D3214 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
D8118 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1964 |
D2738 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1964 |
D8113 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1964 |
D8114 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1964 |
D8115 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1964 |
D8116 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1964 |
D8117 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/06/1964 |
64633 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/06/1964 |
D3277 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/06/1964 |
64580 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/07/1964 |
D2738 |
Transfer out to: |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/07/1964 |
D2761 |
Transfer out to: |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/07/1964 |
D3207 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/07/1964 |
D3208 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/08/1964 |
D2740 |
Transfer in from: |
63B |
Stirling |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
22/08/1964 |
D2742 |
Transfer in from: |
63B |
Stirling |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/08/1964 |
64632 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
06/09/1964 |
D2779 |
Transfer in from: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/09/1964 |
44970 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/09/1964 |
64563 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
26/09/1964 |
80004 |
Transfer out to: |
65D |
Dawsholm |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
42194 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
42269 |
Transfer out to: |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
10/10/1964 |
80056 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/10/1964 |
73109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
J37 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/10/1964 |
64563 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
26/12/1964 |
80027 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
30/01/1965 |
D2774 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
18/02/1965 |
80057 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
27/02/1965 |
42690 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
D2742 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/06/1965 |
44970 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/09/1965 |
44970 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D2730 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D2734 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D2735 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D2739 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3214 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3278 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3279 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3386 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3387 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3408 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/12/1965 |
D3417 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/12/1965 |
73145 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/01/1966 |
D3409 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/01/1966 |
73146 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/01/1966 |
73078 |
Transfer out to: |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/01/1966 |
73108 |
Transfer out to: |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1966 |
D3562 |
Transfer out to: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/04/1966 |
D7611 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/04/1966 |
D7612 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/04/1966 |
D7613 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/06/1966 |
D7614 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/06/1966 |
D7615 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
13/06/1966 |
61008 |
Transfer out to: |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/06/1966 |
D7616 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
8w/e |
25/06/1966 |
D2731 |
Transfer in from: |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
8w/e |
25/06/1966 |
D2738 |
Transfer in from: |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
8w/e |
25/06/1966 |
D2761 |
Transfer in from: |
67E |
Dumfries |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
25/06/1966 |
D3209 |
Transfer out to: |
67B |
Hurlford |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/06/1966 |
61116 |
Transfer out to: |
66E |
Carstairs |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/08/1966 |
D7617 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/08/1966 |
D7618 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/08/1966 |
D7619 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/08/1966 |
D7620 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/08/1966 |
D7621 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/09/1966 |
D7622 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/09/1966 |
61133 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/09/1966 |
D7623 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/09/1966 |
73145 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5050 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5051 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5052 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5053 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5054 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5055 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D5056 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D7598 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D7599 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D7600 |
Transfer in from: |
34G |
Finsbury Park |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
D7601 |
Transfer in from: |
41E |
Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
D3210 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
D3410 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
D3530 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/11/1966 |
D3897 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
10/11/1966 |
61140 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Steam |
B1 |
4-6-0 |
on |
10/11/1966 |
61342 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D2736 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D2737 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D2772 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D2773 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3533 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3536 |
Transfer in from: |
63B |
Stirling |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3898 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3899 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3900 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3901 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3903 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3904 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
44703 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3214 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
73146 |
Transfer out to: |
66B |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
26/11/1966 |
D3533 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
44703 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D6840 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D5050 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8072 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8075 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8076 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8077 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8106 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/12/1966 |
D8110 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1967 |
D2776 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2735 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2736 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2737 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2739 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2740 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2762 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2765 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2766 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
04/03/1967 |
D2772 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/03/1967 |
D8077 |
Transfer in from: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/03/1967 |
D3409 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/06/1967 |
D2422 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
D2738 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
D2763 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
D2767 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
24/06/1967 |
D2774 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/07/1967 |
D2757 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2439 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D2440 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D8085 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D3903 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/08/1967 |
D6840 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7576 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7578 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7579 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7581 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7583 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7584 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7598 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7599 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7600 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7601 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7611 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/09/1967 |
D7612 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
16/09/1967 |
D2734 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D2432 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D2436 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D6140 |
Transfer in from: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D6152 |
Transfer in from: |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D8085 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/09/1967 |
D8111 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/10/1967 |
D2730 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/10/1967 |
D2731 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/10/1967 |
D2759 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/10/1967 |
D2761 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
09/10/1967 |
D2776 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D3547 |
Transfer in from: |
64H |
Leith Central |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D8078 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/10/1967 |
D8081 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/11/1967 |
D3561 |
Transfer in from: |
64H |
Leith Central |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/12/1967 |
D5051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/12/1967 |
D3554 |
Transfer in from: |
64H |
Leith Central |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6104 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6118 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6120 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6122 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6125 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6128 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6131 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6134 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6135 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6136 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/12/1967 |
D6140 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D2410 |
Transfer in from: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8320 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8321 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3279 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3386 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3532 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3554 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3561 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D3898 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8074 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8089 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8092 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8096 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1968 |
D8098 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2756 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2758 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2760 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2764 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2768 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2773 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2779 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
on |
03/02/1968 |
D2780 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/02/1968 |
D3390 |
Transfer out to: |
16C |
Derby |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D2425 |
Transfer in from: |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D2426 |
Transfer in from: |
66D |
Greenock Ladyburn |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D3279 |
Transfer in from: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D8322 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D3278 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1968 |
D8323 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/03/1968 |
D5065 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/03/1968 |
D5066 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5052 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5053 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5054 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/04/1968 |
D5055 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/04/1968 |
D6109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/04/1968 |
D6126 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/04/1968 |
D6110 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D6936 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D6937 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D8325 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D8326 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D2426 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D2439 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D2440 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D3396 |
Transfer out to: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/04/1968 |
D8095 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/05/1968 |
D5056 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5065 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1968 |
D5066 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D2427 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D6904 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D6905 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D6919 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D7580 |
Transfer in from: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D8316 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D8317 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D8318 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/06/1968 |
D8319 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
08/06/1968 |
D2425 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/06/1968 |
D6105 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/06/1968 |
D6115 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/06/1968 |
D7616 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
17/06/1968 |
D3901 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
3w/e |
29/06/1968 |
D2434 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
3w/e |
29/06/1968 |
D363 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
3w/e |
29/06/1968 |
D6937 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
29/06/1968 |
D8080 |
Transfer out to: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D5382 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D5394 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D5396 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D5415 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D7620 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D7621 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D7622 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
20/07/1968 |
D7623 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
D5402 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
D5407 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
D7614 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
27/07/1968 |
D7619 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/08/1968 |
D5414 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
03/08/1968 |
D7618 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1968 |
D6111 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1968 |
D6117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1968 |
D6152 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7582 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7590 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7591 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7613 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7615 |
Transfer out to: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/08/1968 |
D7617 |
Transfer out to: |
D10 |
Preston Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/08/1968 |
D3887 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/08/1968 |
D3886 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
28/09/1968 |
D6838 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
28/09/1968 |
D6845 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
28/09/1968 |
D6919 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
28/09/1968 |
D6936 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D6843 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D6848 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D6849 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D8080 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D3211 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D3212 |
Transfer out to: |
66C |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D3213 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D6904 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D7590 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D7591 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D8100 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D8101 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1968 |
D8102 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D3213 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D3387 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D3388 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D3389 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D6905 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/11/1968 |
D3213 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
15/12/1968 |
D2432 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1968 |
D3279 |
Transfer out to: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1969 |
D2421 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/01/1969 |
D8075 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
02/1969 |
D2410 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D4095 |
Transfer in from: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5403 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5404 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5408 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5410 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5411 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D5412 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D8085 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D8086 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D3904 |
Transfer out to: |
63A |
Perth South |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D8112 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D8317 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/03/1969 |
D8322 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D5405 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D5406 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D5409 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D5413 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D8071 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/03/1969 |
D8091 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/03/1969 |
D3547 |
Transfer out to: |
62A |
Thornton Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/03/1969 |
D8070 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/03/1969 |
D8073 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/03/1969 |
D8077 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/03/1969 |
D8079 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1969 |
D6108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D3728 |
Transfer in from: |
64H |
Leith Central |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8078 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8081 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8102 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8112 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8325 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
31/05/1969 |
D8326 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5392 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5393 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5395 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5398 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5399 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5400 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D5401 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8070 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8073 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8074 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8077 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8079 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D8092 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D2422 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7576 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7578 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7579 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7580 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7581 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/06/1969 |
D7582 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
07/1969 |
D2434 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
05/07/1969 |
D8075 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/07/1969 |
D5397 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/07/1969 |
D5391 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/07/1969 |
D8092 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
30/09/1969 |
D2427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/10/1969 |
D5372 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/10/1969 |
D5386 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/10/1969 |
D8070 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/10/1969 |
D8112 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D5374 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D5375 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D6857 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D8092 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D8083 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/11/1969 |
D8099 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D5378 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D5379 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D5380 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D5387 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D5390 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D8073 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D8087 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/11/1969 |
D8088 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/11/1969 |
D5370 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/11/1969 |
D5373 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
15/11/1969 |
D5389 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D8074 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D8077 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D8078 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D8079 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/11/1969 |
D8080 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5371 |
Transfer in from: |
D15 |
Leicester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5376 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5381 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5384 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5385 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D7576 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D7579 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5347 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D5348 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D8081 |
Transfer out to: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D8082 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D8090 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D8092 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/02/1970 |
D8094 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
D5377 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
07/03/1970 |
D5388 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D5388 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D5388 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D8084 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/03/1970 |
D8093 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
30/05/1970 |
D6850 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1970 |
D8092 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
5w/e |
30/05/1970 |
D363 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
30/05/1970 |
D8320 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/08/1970 |
D4098 |
Transfer in from: |
63B |
Fort William |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/08/1970 |
D3417 |
Transfer out to: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
03/10/1970 |
D5413 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
D6844 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
D6847 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
D6851 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
D6936 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
31/10/1970 |
D8084 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/12/1970 |
D5403 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/12/1970 |
D5411 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5002 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5003 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5004 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5006 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5007 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5008 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/03/1971 |
D5009 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5066 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5392 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5393 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5404 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5407 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5408 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5409 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5410 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5412 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
7w/e |
27/03/1971 |
D5415 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/04/1971 |
D6137 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/05/1971 |
D5066 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/05/1971 |
D5391 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1971 |
D5329 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/07/1971 |
D5176 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
17/07/1971 |
D5177 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/07/1971 |
D6106 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
31/07/1971 |
D5178 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/08/1971 |
D6101 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
07/08/1971 |
D5329 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
21/08/1971 |
D3418 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
21/08/1971 |
D3728 |
Transfer out to: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/09/1971 |
D6123 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
6w/e |
02/10/1971 |
D5415 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1971 |
D6103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1971 |
D6107 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1971 |
D6114 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1971 |
D6130 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6100 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6102 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6113 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6121 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6124 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6129 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/10/1971 |
D6132 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8024 |
Transfer in from: |
55B |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8027 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8030 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8034 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8041 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8046 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8048 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/10/1971 |
D8055 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D5149 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D5150 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D5157 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
30/10/1971 |
D5161 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
26/11/1971 |
D2436 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/12/1971 |
D6112 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/12/1971 |
D6116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/12/1971 |
D6119 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/12/1971 |
D6133 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D5158 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D5159 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/01/1972 |
D5160 |
Transfer in from: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/02/1972 |
D5347 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/02/1972 |
D5348 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/02/1972 |
D5380 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/02/1972 |
D5401 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
03/1972 |
D5001 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D2420 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D2433 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3136 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3182 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3297 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3396 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3418 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3545 |
Transfer in from: |
62B |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3591 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3733 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3906 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3907 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3908 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3909 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3912 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3922 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3923 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5000 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5010 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5011 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5012 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5013 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5014 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5015 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5016 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5017 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5018 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5019 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5073 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5090 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5096 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5097 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5098 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5099 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5100 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5101 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5112 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5113 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5147 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5148 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5380 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5401 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5410 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5412 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6839 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6840 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6841 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6842 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6852 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6853 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6854 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6855 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6856 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6859 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6904 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D6905 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8078 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8079 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8080 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8082 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8089 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8090 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8091 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8093 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8094 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8095 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8096 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8097 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8098 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8099 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8100 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8101 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8106 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8110 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8112 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8113 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8116 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8117 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8118 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8119 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8120 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8121 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8123 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8124 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8125 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8126 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8127 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5347 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D5348 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D8097 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/04/1972 |
D3728 |
Transfer in from: |
67A |
Corkerhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1972 |
D3136 |
Transfer out to: |
36A |
Doncaster |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1972 |
D3909 |
Transfer out to: |
8J |
Allerton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/04/1972 |
D3912 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/04/1972 |
D5113 |
Transfer out to: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1972 |
D3907 |
Transfer out to: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
18/06/1972 |
D2433 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
01/07/1972 |
D3211 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/07/1972 |
D3908 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/07/1972 |
D4098 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/07/1972 |
D3182 |
Transfer out to: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D2413 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D2424 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3860 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D3889 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D5348 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D5349 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
05/08/1972 |
D6839 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1972 |
D5155 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1972 |
D5156 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1972 |
D5176 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
16/09/1972 |
D5177 |
Transfer out to: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/10/1972 |
D5149 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/10/1972 |
D3545 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/10/1972 |
D3545 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
28/10/1972 |
D6840 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1972 |
D6841 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1972 |
D6842 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1972 |
D6859 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/11/1972 |
D6936 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
19/11/1972 |
D2424 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
25/11/1972 |
D6846 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
25/11/1972 |
D6858 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
25/11/1972 |
D6919 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
25/11/1972 |
D6937 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/12/1972 |
D3921 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
30/12/1972 |
D3591 |
Transfer out to: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1973 |
D8318 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
27/01/1973 |
D8319 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D8000 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D8007 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D5101 |
Transfer out to: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/02/1973 |
D5101 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1973 |
D4095 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/04/1973 |
D8000 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/04/1973 |
D8007 |
Transfer out to: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D8091 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D8092 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/05/1973 |
D8127 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
19/05/1973 |
D5347 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
19/05/1973 |
D5349 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
19/05/1973 |
D5155 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
16/06/1973 |
D8179 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
16/06/1973 |
D8184 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
16/06/1973 |
D8086 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
16/06/1973 |
D8316 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D5235 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D5236 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D7583 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
25/08/1973 |
D7584 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8011 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8015 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8036 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8041 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8082 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/09/1973 |
D8084 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5233 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5234 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D5412 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
08/09/1973 |
D8085 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7576 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
06/10/1973 |
D7579 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D5233 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D5234 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D5235 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D6919 |
Transfer out to: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
13/10/1973 |
D8119 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1973 |
D3932 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
03/11/1973 |
D5113 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8114 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8115 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8122 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D5236 |
Transfer out to: |
KM |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8090 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8097 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
10/11/1973 |
D8113 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1973 |
D4097 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1973 |
D3932 |
Transfer out to: |
AB |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D3241 |
Transfer in from: |
67C |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D5151 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D5412 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D8316 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D3545 |
Transfer out to: |
AY |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/12/1973 |
D5374 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/01/1974 |
D7566 |
Transfer in from: |
D01 |
London Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/01/1974 |
D7567 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/02/1974 |
D4019 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/02/1974 |
D5112 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/02/1974 |
D5113 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/02/1974 |
D5151 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
D5244 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
09/03/1974 |
D5246 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1974 |
D4020 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/03/1974 |
D3408 |
Transfer out to: |
AY |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
24107 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
24108 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
24109 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
24111 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
25006 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
25009 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/04/1974 |
D5157 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
08621 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
20083 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
20137 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
20138 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
24105 |
Transfer in from: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
24106 |
Transfer in from: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47141 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47143 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47144 |
Transfer in from: |
HO |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47197 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47206 |
Transfer in from: |
CE |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47207 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47208 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47210 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47211 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47269 |
Transfer in from: |
52A |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47317 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47318 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47319 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47359 |
Transfer in from: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47360 |
Transfer in from: |
51L |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47466 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
47467 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/05/1974 |
D8002 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
18/05/1974 |
47197 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25010 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25011 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25028 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25094 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25096 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25216 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
25/05/1974 |
25217 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/06/1974 |
D3417 |
Transfer in from: |
65B |
St Rollox (Balornock) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
29/06/1974 |
47471 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
29/06/1974 |
D3886 |
Transfer out to: |
FW |
Fort William |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
20030 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
37138 |
Transfer out to: |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
37143 |
Transfer out to: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
47319 |
Transfer out to: |
KY |
Knottingley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
47360 |
Transfer out to: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
12/10/1974 |
47471 |
Transfer out to: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1974 |
47053 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1974 |
20024 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1974 |
20027 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
26/10/1974 |
20034 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
26/10/1974 |
47466 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
30/11/1974 |
47139 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
30/11/1974 |
47359 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/1974 |
47144 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
47424 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
47427 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
07/12/1974 |
47143 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/12/1974 |
47144 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1974 |
06004 |
Transfer out to: |
DT |
Dunfermline Townhill |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
28/12/1974 |
24111 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24001 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24004 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
24005 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
11/01/1975 |
47144 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
24001 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
08/02/1975 |
24004 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
15/02/1975 |
25008 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
08/03/1975 |
47059 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/03/1975 |
08855 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/03/1975 |
08322 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/03/1975 |
08505 |
Transfer in from: |
60A |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/03/1975 |
24111 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/03/1975 |
08851 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/04/1975 |
08938 |
Transfer in from: |
AY |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/05/1975 |
08952 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20024 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20027 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20034 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20039 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20085 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
24065 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25230 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25232 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25233 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25234 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25237 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25240 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25241 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
25246 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
08505 |
Transfer out to: |
GM |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20179 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20184 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20216 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20221 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
24/05/1975 |
20223 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08853 |
Transfer in from: |
86B |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/06/1975 |
08323 |
Transfer out to: |
EJ |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
08952 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
20024 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
20027 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
20039 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
20085 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
47141 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
47207 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
47208 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
47317 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
21/06/1975 |
47318 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1975 |
24001 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25001 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25002 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25003 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25004 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25089 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25090 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25091 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25108 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25150 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25151 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
12/07/1975 |
25213 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24002 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24003 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24004 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24006 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24007 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24008 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24010 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24011 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24012 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24013 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24014 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24015 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24016 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24017 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24018 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24019 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
24065 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
27012 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
08851 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
25101 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
25111 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/07/1975 |
08855 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25235 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25089 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25090 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25091 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
02/08/1975 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
09/08/1975 |
25005 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
09/08/1975 |
25006 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
09/08/1975 |
25007 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
09/08/1975 |
25008 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1975 |
24096 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/08/1975 |
24098 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24009 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24073 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24090 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24097 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24099 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24100 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24101 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24105 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24148 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
20024 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
20027 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
20039 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
20085 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25014 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25034 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25062 |
Transfer in from: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25083 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25086 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25087 |
Transfer in from: |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25244 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24106 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24107 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24108 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24109 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24111 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24147 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
24 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
23/08/1975 |
24150 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25150 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
23/08/1975 |
25151 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/09/1975 |
27039 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
27/09/1975 |
27012 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/10/1975 |
08566 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
25/10/1975 |
47269 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
15/11/1975 |
08732 |
Transfer out to: |
HN |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/01/1976 |
27006 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/02/1976 |
25014 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
25018 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
25019 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
25021 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
25023 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
01/02/1976 |
25025 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
07/02/1976 |
47207 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
06/03/1976 |
20146 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
06/03/1976 |
20149 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
06/03/1976 |
20048 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
06/03/1976 |
25237 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/03/1976 |
08143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
10/04/1976 |
47464 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
5w/e |
01/05/1976 |
47469 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
02/05/1976 |
47045 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/05/1976 |
47472 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
08952 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25030 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25031 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25093 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25096 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25231 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
47141 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
47208 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
29/05/1976 |
25062 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
25030 |
Transfer out to: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
12/06/1976 |
25031 |
Transfer out to: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1976 |
08828 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25009 |
Reinstated |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25013 |
Transfer in from: |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25068 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25239 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
03/07/1976 |
25083 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20200 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20201 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20202 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20203 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20078 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20079 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
2w/e |
04/07/1976 |
20098 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/07/1976 |
27013 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
24/07/1976 |
20046 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
24/07/1976 |
20046 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
24/07/1976 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
24/07/1976 |
25093 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
07/08/1976 |
47059 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/08/1976 |
25003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
06001 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
25093 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
25094 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
25098 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
47268 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
47269 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
04/09/1976 |
08755 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/09/1976 |
25004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/09/1976 |
27035 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1976 |
08827 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25037 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25044 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25049 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25072 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25078 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25082 |
Transfer in from: |
D09 |
Manchester Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
LO |
Longsight |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25094 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25096 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25101 |
Transfer out to: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25111 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1976 |
25213 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
09/10/1976 |
25077 |
Transfer in from: |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
3w/e |
09/10/1976 |
25227 |
Transfer in from: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1976 |
25018 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
11/12/1976 |
25301 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20204 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20205 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20206 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20207 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20034 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20055 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
w/e |
12/12/1976 |
20100 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/12/1976 |
08443 |
Transfer in from: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/12/1976 |
08828 |
Transfer out to: |
AB |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
01/1977 |
27015 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
01/1977 |
47470 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1977 |
08321 |
Transfer out to: |
HN |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
01/1977 |
20203 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/04/1977 |
25025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
20100 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
05/1977 |
47038 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25034 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25037 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25068 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25231 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25233 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1977 |
25234 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
02/05/1977 |
20024 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
06/1977 |
25002 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
08441 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
08764 |
Transfer in from: |
AB |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
08421 |
Transfer out to: |
DE |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1977 |
08853 |
Transfer out to: |
HN |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
06/1977 |
25002 |
Reinstated |
98S |
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1977 |
08421 |
Transfer in from: |
DE |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
20020 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
20049 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
20091 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1977 |
20119 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1977 |
08441 |
Transfer out to: |
DE |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1977 |
20003 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1977 |
20007 |
Transfer in from: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25031 |
Transfer in from: |
SP |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25090 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25092 |
Transfer in from: |
CW |
Cricklewood East |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25096 |
Transfer in from: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
10/1977 |
25096 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/10/1977 |
25031 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/11/1977 |
08445 |
Transfer in from: |
62C |
Dunfermline Townhill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/12/1977 |
08882 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/12/1977 |
08738 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1978 |
08326 |
Transfer out to: |
HN |
Hamilton (West) |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/01/1978 |
37108 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/01/1978 |
37111 |
Transfer in from: |
MR |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/01/1978 |
37204 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
08/01/1978 |
37205 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
w/e |
22/01/1978 |
47546 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1978 |
08442 |
Transfer in from: |
65F |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
02/1978 |
47465 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
02/1978 |
47466 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
02/1978 |
25049 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
02/1978 |
25086 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
02/1978 |
25087 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
02/1978 |
25235 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
02/1978 |
47269 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
25109 |
Transfer in from: |
D08 |
Liverpool Division |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
5w/e |
26/02/1978 |
25301 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/05/1978 |
25077 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/05/1978 |
27031 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/09/1978 |
20091 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/10/1978 |
25098 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
20096 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
20112 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
25092 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1978 |
25093 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/12/1978 |
08173 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
17/02/1979 |
37028 |
Transfer in from: |
HM |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
2w/e |
17/02/1979 |
37046 |
Transfer in from: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37028 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37046 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
47149 |
Transfer in from: |
D02 |
Birmingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37028 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37046 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37156 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
4w/e |
03/03/1979 |
37157 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/08/1979 |
20200 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
47208 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
47470 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
08421 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
08883 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
31/10/1979 |
47470 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
01/1980 |
25008 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/04/1980 |
27043 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1980 |
25006 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
05/1980 |
25007 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/07/1980 |
25009 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/07/1980 |
27044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/07/1980 |
27009 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/09/1980 |
25019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/09/1980 |
25021 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/09/1980 |
25001 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/09/1980 |
25013 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/09/1980 |
25023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/12/1980 |
08726 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25002 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25005 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/12/1980 |
25232 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
21/12/1980 |
47045 |
Transfer out to: |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
06 |
0-4-0 |
on |
01/02/1981 |
06003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/03/1981 |
27011 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/05/1981 |
25241 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/05/1981 |
25082 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/06/1981 |
08736 |
Transfer in from: |
62B |
Dundee West |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
07/06/1981 |
37025 |
Transfer in from: |
MR |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
07/1981 |
27203 |
Reinstated |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/07/1981 |
37153 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/07/1981 |
20003 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/07/1981 |
20011 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/07/1981 |
27027 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/08/1981 |
25226 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/08/1981 |
08442 |
Transfer out to: |
AY |
Ayr |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/08/1981 |
20110 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
17/08/1981 |
20100 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
08738 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
09/1981 |
37148 |
Transfer in from: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
08347 |
Transfer out to: |
GM |
Grangemouth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1981 |
08764 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20007 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20020 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20085 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20121 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20126 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20137 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20138 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20201 |
Transfer out to: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
m/e |
09/1981 |
37148 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
09/1981 |
20020 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
06/09/1981 |
37017 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
06/09/1981 |
37099 |
Transfer in from: |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
06/09/1981 |
37262 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1981 |
27002 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1981 |
27106 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1981 |
27109 |
Transfer out to: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/10/1981 |
25246 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/10/1981 |
27014 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
25044 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/11/1981 |
37190 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/11/1981 |
37191 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/11/1981 |
37192 |
Transfer in from: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/11/1981 |
37099 |
Transfer out to: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/11/1981 |
20197 |
Reinstated |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
29/11/1981 |
20109 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/07/1982 |
08348 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/12/1982 |
20027 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1983 |
27057 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/05/1983 |
25090 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/06/1983 |
25227 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/07/1983 |
20207 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/08/1983 |
25240 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/11/1983 |
08227 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/04/1984 |
27016 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/05/1984 |
27019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/06/1984 |
20036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/07/1984 |
27034 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/08/1984 |
27028 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/11/1984 |
25239 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/01/1985 |
27007 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/01/1985 |
27022 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/05/1985 |
27032 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/06/1985 |
27021 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/06/1985 |
25226 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/07/1985 |
08443 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/09/1985 |
25078 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/12/1985 |
25072 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/01/1986 |
27029 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/01/1986 |
27040 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/02/1986 |
27033 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/03/1986 |
27206 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/03/1986 |
27037 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/04/1986 |
27010 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/04/1986 |
27020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/04/1986 |
27030 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/04/1986 |
27036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1986 |
27048 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/05/1986 |
27012 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/05/1986 |
27041 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/05/1986 |
27004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/05/1986 |
27017 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/05/1986 |
27018 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/05/1986 |
27023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/07/1986 |
25244 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/08/1986 |
25230 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/09/1986 |
20039 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
23/09/1986 |
20125 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
02/10/1986 |
47464 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/01/1987 |
20115 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1987 |
20116 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/01/1987 |
27003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/02/1987 |
27056 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/02/1987 |
27038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
11/03/1987 |
25109 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/04/1987 |
27049 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
27/04/1987 |
20089 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
30/04/1987 |
20123 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1987 |
20049 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/06/1987 |
27025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27024 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27046 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27052 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27054 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27055 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27059 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/07/1987 |
27066 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/07/1987 |
27026 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/07/1987 |
27042 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/07/1987 |
27001 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1987 |
27005 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/07/1987 |
20015 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
27 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/08/1987 |
27008 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
20217 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
20228 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37113 |
Transfer in from: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37160 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37170 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47701 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47702 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47703 |
Transfer in from: |
D05 |
Stoke Division |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47704 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47705 |
Transfer in from: |
BS |
Bescot |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47706 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47707 |
Transfer in from: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47708 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47709 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47710 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47711 |
Transfer in from: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47712 |
Transfer in from: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47713 |
Transfer in from: |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47714 |
Transfer in from: |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47715 |
Transfer in from: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47716 |
Transfer in from: |
OC |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
20146 |
Transfer out to: |
TO |
Toton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37025 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37146 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
37158 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47207 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47211 |
Transfer out to: |
TI |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47466 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47472 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/10/1987 |
47564 |
Transfer out to: |
BR |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
12/10/1987 |
08736 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/10/1987 |
47053 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/11/1987 |
20149 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
19/02/1988 |
20002 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/04/1988 |
20171 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/04/1988 |
20228 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/04/1988 |
20228 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20179 |
Transfer in from: |
HA |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20185 |
Transfer in from: |
D16 |
Nottingham Division |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20212 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20213 |
Transfer in from: |
41A |
Tinsley |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20227 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26001 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26002 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26003 |
Transfer in from: |
98Su |
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26004 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26005 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26006 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
26007 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37325 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37326 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47003 |
Transfer in from: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47018 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47053 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47118 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47458 |
Transfer in from: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47482 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47517 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47518 |
Transfer in from: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47524 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47527 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47544 |
Transfer in from: |
YK |
York (North) |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47569 |
Transfer in from: |
IS |
Inverness |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47604 |
Transfer in from: |
64B |
Haymarket |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47622 |
Transfer in from: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47632 |
Transfer in from: |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20083 |
Transfer out to: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20202 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
15/05/1988 |
20204 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37147 |
Transfer out to: |
CF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37154 |
Transfer out to: |
SF |
Stratford |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37160 |
Transfer out to: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37325 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
37326 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
15/05/1988 |
47424 |
Transfer out to: |
CD |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/05/1988 |
20171 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/05/1988 |
20185 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
22/05/1988 |
20228 |
Transfer out to: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
37023 |
Transfer in from: |
31B |
March |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
37025 |
Transfer in from: |
ML |
Motherwell |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
37097 |
Transfer in from: |
TE |
Thornaby |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
37245 |
Transfer in from: |
HM |
Healey Mills |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
47470 |
Transfer in from: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/06/1988 |
47470 |
Transfer out to: |
ED |
Eastfield |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/06/1988 |
20204 |
Transfer in from: |
IM |
Immingham |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/06/1988 |
08621 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/07/1988 |
47713 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/07/1988 |
08827 |
Transfer out to: |
CL |
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/08/1988 |
08852 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/09/1988 |
37229 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/09/1988 |
37240 |
Transfer in from: |
LE |
Landore |
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/09/1988 |
37250 |
Transfer in from: |
GD |
Gateshead |
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
28/02/1989 |
20179 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
19/03/1989 |
47469 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/05/1989 |
20204 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/07/1989 |
20217 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
18/12/1989 |
20205 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
31/01/1990 |
20114 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/02/1990 |
47427 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/02/1990 |
47544 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/02/1990 |
08851 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/07/1990 |
20080 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
25 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
14/07/1990 |
25108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/10/1990 |
20020 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
21/01/1991 |
20107 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/02/1991 |
20099 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/03/1991 |
47118 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
08/03/1991 |
20103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/04/1991 |
20206 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
12/04/1991 |
20213 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
20/05/1991 |
20093 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
07/06/1991 |
20124 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/07/1991 |
20122 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
05/07/1991 |
20212 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
05/07/1991 |
47003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/09/1991 |
20108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
11/11/1991 |
47470 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
14/11/1991 |
47518 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/11/1991 |
08719 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
22/11/1991 |
47018 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
22/11/1991 |
47465 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/06/1992 |
20119 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/10/1992 |
26002 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
24/11/1992 |
26004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/11/1992 |
47527 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
03/03/1993 |
08727 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
26/03/1993 |
08753 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
27/05/1993 |
47458 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/06/1993 |
20046 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
09/06/1993 |
20094 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/07/1993 |
37190 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
06/09/1993 |
26006 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1993 |
26001 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1993 |
26003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1993 |
26005 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
26 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1993 |
26007 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
13/10/1993 |
20106 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
20/10/1993 |
47482 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/01/1994 |
37382 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/04/1995 |
47706 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/04/1995 |
47708 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
14/09/1995 |
37113 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/09/1996 |
37108 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/03/1997 |
47715 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/05/1997 |
47704 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/01/1998 |
47617 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
18/09/1998 |
37111 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/11/1998 |
37901 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/1998 |
37902 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
12/12/1998 |
47467 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/02/1999 |
37025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/06/1999 |
47546 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/06/1999 |
47710 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/1999 |
37152 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/01/2000 |
37892 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/03/2000 |
37897 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
20 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
03/03/2000 |
20118 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/04/2000 |
47702 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/06/2000 |
47711 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/06/2000 |
08693 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/07/2000 |
08938 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/07/2000 |
08952 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/2000 |
37505 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
09/02/2001 |
37191 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
20/07/2001 |
08445 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
31/08/2003 |
37144 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/09/2003 |
47517 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
31/10/2003 |
37262 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/12/2003 |
47701 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
01/06/2004 |
37694 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
30/06/2005 |
08882 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
30/06/2005 |
37170 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
47 |
Co-Co |
on |
28/02/2007 |
47053 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
31/12/2007 |
37023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
31/12/2007 |
37250 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
37 |
Co-Co |
on |
30/09/2008 |
37046 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|