Depot: Dundee Tay Bridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1924 | 6372 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1928 | 6551 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/07/1929 | 2741 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1929 | 2741 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1930 | 2786 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/08/1930 | 2566 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/08/1930 | 2567 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/10/1930 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1930 | 6582 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1931 | 6286 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1931 | 6291 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/08/1931 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1931 | 6286 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/12/1931 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1933 | 2734 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 22/06/1935 | 2002 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/08/1935 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 08/08/1936 | 2005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 04/09/1936 | 2003 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 10/09/1936 | 2002 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1936 | 4775 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/02/1937 | 2566 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/02/1937 | 2567 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/02/1937 | 2797 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1937 | 6291 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/04/1938 | 4800 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1938 | 4807 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/10/1938 | 4809 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/10/1938 | 4800 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/10/1938 | 4811 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1938 | 2797 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/03/1939 | 4822 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/04/1939 | 4822 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1939 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/01/1940 | 2563 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/10/1940 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1940 | 2563 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/12/1940 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/09/1941 | 741 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/03/1942 | 3664 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 2003 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 18/01/1943 | 2005 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/03/1943 | 2556 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/04/1943 | 2556 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/04/1943 | 3681 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1943 | 6372 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/07/1943 | 6582 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1943 | 1863 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1943 | 2739 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 10/1943 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 2979 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/12/1943 | 4815 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1945 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/08/1945 | 3683 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4891 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1946 | 2979 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1946 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/07/1946 | 2734 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1946 | 4784 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/11/1946 | 1101 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1946 | 1102 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1947 | 4822 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4820 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1947 | 4786 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 4784 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1947 | 4790 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1947 | 1263 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2418 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2434 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2485 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2713 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4482 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4485 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4493 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4512 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4548 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4587 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4615 | Snapshot | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5328 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5330 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5333 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62409 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7483 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7484 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7486 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7489 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7498 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7499 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8100 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8107 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8108 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8114 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1948 | 1278 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1948 | 1293 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1948 | 5328 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 77456 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 4548 | Transfer out to: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/06/1948 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1948 | 61292 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1948 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/10/1948 | 62409 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 958 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 958 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 958 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 7493 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1949 | 60527 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1949 | 60528 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60527 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60528 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60527 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60528 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1949 | 61147 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 61147 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 61147 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 63017 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 67502 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 79306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64506 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64512 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64523 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64537 | Transfer out to: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 64593 | Transfer out to: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 62410 | Transfer out to: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 64493 | Transfer out to: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/01/1950 | 60931 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 60931 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D29 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 62412 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1950 | 61263 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 45460 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 65309 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62427 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62436 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62457 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 62466 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1950 | 61263 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61263 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 45460 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61263 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64598 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 64598 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 62418 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 64598 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 61402 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1950 | 61403 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 62466 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | G4 | 0-4-4T | on | 09/10/1950 | 8108 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8108 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8108 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/11/1950 | 60822 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/11/1950 | 60834 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62713 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60822 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60834 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60822 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 60834 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/01/1951 | 60972 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 61132 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 55162 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60972 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61132 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60972 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61132 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 55162 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 46464 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 55162 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 68114 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 68465 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 62457 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68114 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68465 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68465 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 67466 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45330 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45384 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90017 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/10/1951 | 61147 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45330 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 62436 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45384 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45384 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62744 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 55169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62744 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62718 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62744 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 55169 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62744 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 55169 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62744 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64482 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64485 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 55172 | Transfer in from: | 29D | Forfar | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67461 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 67471 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90727 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/10/1952 | 60840 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 28/11/1952 | 55172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40600 | Transfer in from: | 12H | Stranraer | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 62427 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/12/1953 | 68107 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 42733 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 42866 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68103 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 68551 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 67466 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42733 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42866 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 40600 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 68535 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | on | 21/08/1954 | 68103 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1954 | 45486 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 42693 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 42690 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 42691 | Transfer in from: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 42692 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 67493 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 45164 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1955 | 61403 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 46464 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 55162 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1955 | 61180 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 55169 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/08/1955 | 67498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 68108 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | on | 29/08/1955 | 11703 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 67489 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 09/09/1955 | 80123 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 22/09/1955 | 80124 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 68108 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 64634 | Transfer out to: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 02/11/1955 | 67499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/12/1955 | 60804 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/12/1955 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/01/1956 | 60804 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/01/1956 | 60972 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1956 | 61172 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68110 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/03/1956 | 68446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 20/04/1956 | 67483 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/05/1956 | 68455 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 64545 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 64556 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62728 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 62744 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 90600 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1957 | 13347 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/06/1957 | 68551 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64542 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64544 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64585 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 16/07/1957 | 11708 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 12/08/1957 | 68465 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 16/08/1957 | 11709 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 27/08/1957 | 11710 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 11711 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 11712 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69135 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69136 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69150 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69154 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69204 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69224 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 46464 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 13/09/1957 | 11713 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 20/09/1957 | 11714 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 68100 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 03/10/1957 | 11715 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/10/1957 | 11716 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 23/10/1957 | 11717 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 30/10/1957 | 62438 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 46464 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | D2/1 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/11/1957 | 11703 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 67496 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 67501 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 68108 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 68123 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 40054 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 69224 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1958 | 62434 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68114 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68466 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69150 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | on | 27/06/1958 | 68452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 69135 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 69154 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 69164 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 11717 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1958 | 60937 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1958 | 60971 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1958 | 60958 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1958 | 60969 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1959 | 60920 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 42690 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 42693 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/04/1959 | 69164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64790 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1959 | 64792 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 20/08/1959 | 68535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64600 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 64602 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | 62485 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1959 | 65333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1959 | 64530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 40054 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Mansfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64542 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 64544 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 64545 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69136 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 69204 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/01/1960 | 61132 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 64585 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 80090 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 02/03/1960 | 67491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 02/03/1960 | 67496 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1960 | 60527 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5342 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5343 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 42691 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61262 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61277 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 67484 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 67486 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 67490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 67501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/04/1960 | 67502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1960 | 60528 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 80091 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 42692 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45164 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45384 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45486 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D6142 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5342 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 26 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | D5343 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | D6142 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 80091 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 65309 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 65330 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1960 | 60089 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/11/1960 | 60090 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1960 | 60089 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1960 | 60090 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1961 | 60528 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1961 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1961 | 61340 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/07/1962 | 60973 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | D3346 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 11716 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1962 | 64598 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 64556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64631 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1963 | 64615 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1963 | 64631 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 65338 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64557 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64576 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 64577 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D2715 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 65338 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 64541 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 64597 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/07/1963 | 64600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1963 | 64627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/10/1963 | D2745 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1963 | 64557 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D2746 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/11/1963 | 61403 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/11/1963 | 60818 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64558 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64608 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 64624 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/12/1963 | 60804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/12/1963 | 64619 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 20/12/1963 | D2750 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | D3343 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 64575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/01/1964 | 60838 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 64613 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/03/1964 | 60834 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/04/1964 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/04/1964 | 64547 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/04/1964 | 60825 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/04/1964 | 60825 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/05/1964 | 60919 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1964 | 61277 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 61402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1964 | 64587 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1964 | 61081 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 61081 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1964 | 64541 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1964 | 61398 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/07/1964 | 60530 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 64563 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1964 | 64563 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1964 | 61398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 07/12/1964 | 60822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 61221 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/01/1965 | D3558 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2708 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D2711 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1965 | 61221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 27/03/1965 | 80090 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/04/1965 | 61147 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/04/1965 | 80123 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | D2585 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/05/1965 | D3540 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1965 | 60512 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1965 | 60512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1965 | 64558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1965 | 61292 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3734 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2709 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/11/1965 | 60844 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | D2411 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | D2412 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | D2444 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1965 | 61147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1965 | 61172 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1965 | D2584 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1966 | 64624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/01/1966 | 60973 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D2414 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D2415 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 65319 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 80124 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D2710 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | D2712 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 10/04/1966 | D2745 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 10/04/1966 | D2750 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/04/1966 | 60813 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/04/1966 | 60528 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 44722 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 44879 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 45473 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2714 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2746 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 61403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1966 | 61293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1966 | 64577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1966 | 64602 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/08/1966 | 60818 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1966 | 64597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/08/1966 | 64608 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1966 | 61180 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1966 | 46464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1966 | 60919 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 44720 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 45127 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 64620 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/09/1966 | 60813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 27/10/1966 | 44720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1966 | 61072 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1966 | 61180 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61340 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/11/1966 | 61340 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 18/11/1966 | 64623 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 45127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 45473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/11/1966 | 60530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 64623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64569 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64602 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64611 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 64620 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 44722 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 44879 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1966 | 61180 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1966 | 61029 | Transfer in from: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/12/1966 | 60532 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1966 | 61072 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 64569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 31/12/1966 | 60836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 61029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 61101 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/12/1966 | 61263 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 64547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1967 | 61072 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/03/1967 | D2713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | 61180 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2575 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2411 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2444 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | D2574 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/04/1967 | 64576 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61102 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 61354 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 64602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 64611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1967 | 64620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1967 | 61072 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/05/1967 | 61180 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/05/1967 | D2415 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1967 | D2584 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1967 | D2585 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D3734 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2574 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1968 | D2575 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/06/1968 | D2412 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1968 | D3347 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D3343 | Transfer out to: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 06/02/1971 | D2414 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/08/1971 | D3558 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3540 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Townhill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1977 | 08276 | Condemned |