Depot: Dawsholm
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 262 | 0-4-2ST | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 15001 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 262 | 0-4-2ST | m/e | 04/1947 | 15001 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15136 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15145 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15240 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 16030 | Snapshot | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 16038 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 16039 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16154 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16168 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16170 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16171 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16297 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17245 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17259 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17296 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17336 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17346 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17366 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17429 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17472 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 176 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 177 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 185 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 189 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 56026 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56302 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56315 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56344 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57371 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57427 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57456 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57469 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57471 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8155 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8155 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1948 | 57371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1948 | 57471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 40154 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 40158 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1948 | 57469 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 15136 | Transfer out to: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 15174 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 57273 | Transfer in from: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 57452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 57427 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 57261 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 55240 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 14507 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 57261 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 57373 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 17366 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 55129 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 153 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 55145 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 16029 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | m/e | 06/1950 | 56026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1950 | 77080 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/08/1950 | 90440 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1950 | 43883 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 43883 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 16030 | Transfer out to: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 16039 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 43883 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 68333 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69163 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69176 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69177 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69184 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69203 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69205 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69208 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 68333 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69163 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69176 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69177 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69184 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69203 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69205 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69208 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 68333 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69163 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69176 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69177 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69184 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69203 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69205 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69208 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 16029 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 16029 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 56169 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 16029 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 16029 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1951 | 57306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90193 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90313 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90313 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 16029 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 16029 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 68511 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90114 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 90493 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1952 | 57372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45487 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 43883 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69509 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69511 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69553 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 55168 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 57373 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 57426 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40185 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 90436 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 45487 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 57322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 56327 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 57554 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 57258 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 56327 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 56327 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 56327 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 56030 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1954 | 56250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/03/1954 | 77005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 56167 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 64520 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/04/1954 | 77005 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 69163 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 40200 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/12/1954 | 56300 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 40159 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68331 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68331 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 56029 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 56029 | Transfer in from: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/12/1955 | 68344 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1956 | 57456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 56275 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 56030 | Transfer out to: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 68344 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/08/1956 | 56339 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/12/1956 | 68511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 90039 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 90387 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 90596 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 56300 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 90039 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/06/1957 | 90060 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 42694 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 69217 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 90320 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 90640 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 40159 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 40186 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 64520 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1957 | 57346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 90077 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 90198 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69509 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/11/1957 | 56297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1958 | 90060 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 69126 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 56302 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 90387 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | on | 21/03/1958 | 68333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/03/1958 | 56275 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3416 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40159 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 40186 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 68344 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 90039 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 56344 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68114 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 90320 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 90596 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/05/1958 | 56315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/06/1958 | 69203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | 56336 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | D3416 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90039 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90077 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90198 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90549 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 90640 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/09/1958 | 56238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | D3532 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/11/1958 | 56161 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 56170 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 56158 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 56167 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | D3413 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | D3414 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | D3415 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | Y9 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 09/05/1959 | 68114 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | on | 19/05/1959 | 56038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 06/1959 | 56154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 40151 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 56029 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/08/1959 | 69176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 57612 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/10/1959 | 69217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 56029 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42131 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42195 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42197 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 42201 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 40151 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 56029 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1959 | 57336 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/11/1959 | 69208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/12/1959 | 69553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1960 | 57273 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/02/1960 | 69205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1960 | 57554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 67604 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/08/1960 | 69177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1960 | 64975 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 13/09/1960 | D2771 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 23/09/1960 | D2772 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 57691 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 57429 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 68336 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 68344 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D3903 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67623 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2771 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | D2772 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 67604 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/11/1960 | 69184 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/12/1960 | 69511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 65335 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67633 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 76102 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67623 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 67633 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1961 | 76100 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 03/1961 | 56171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56039 | Transfer in from: | 65G | Yoker | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56151 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56168 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 57259 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 56168 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 57259 | Transfer out to: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 04/1961 | 56168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 69218 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 498 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/09/1961 | 56151 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1961 | 57472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57245 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 43135 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 43136 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 90134 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 43140 | Transfer in from: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/11/1961 | 69218 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 54507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90049 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90489 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | D3903 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 90134 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/01/1962 | 40154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 08/01/1962 | 40158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 256 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 42199 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 69126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1962 | 57314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 40186 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 40187 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 68335 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | 90049 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 65335 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/05/1962 | 68336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/06/1962 | 90436 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 56336 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 57296 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 57341 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 57691 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 90440 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 90493 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1962 | 90193 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 264 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 56039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 57259 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J88 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1962 | 68335 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/11/1962 | D3532 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 12/1962 | 40159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Glen | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1962 | 256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 40200 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 64975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 57652 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90114 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1963 | 57607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 16/03/1963 | 44440 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1963 | 65325 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 65285 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 44440 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 43135 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 43140 | Transfer out to: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 44718 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76046 | Transfer in from: | 51F | West Auckland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 76103 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 78050 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 78051 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 43136 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 65285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 65325 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 76074 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 90489 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3413 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3414 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D3415 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/06/1964 | 44718 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1964 | 42201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 42694 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 78050 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 78051 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 80004 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 76100 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42131 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42195 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42197 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42199 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76046 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76074 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76102 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 76103 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 80004 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 48153 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley |