Depot: Dalry Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1176 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1183 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2882 | Transfer in from: | 29G | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1177 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1178 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1183 | Snapshot | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15125 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15166 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15177 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15189 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15210 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15229 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 15233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2268 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2270 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2272 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2273 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2804 | Snapshot | 27J | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2807 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2882 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4931 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5029 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 60 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 54644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56236 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56253 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56312 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56313 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56329 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57645 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57674 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7163 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8163 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 911 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4931 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 4931 | Transfer out to: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5492 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 60 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1948 | 54644 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 42830 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8163 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8321 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1948 | 57578 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 55125 | Transfer out to: | 12H | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 14507 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 47162 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 44931 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 64536 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 44318 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 5271 | Transfer in from: | BGT | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 57659 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 64591 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45362 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45362 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1950 | 45362 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 12/07/1950 | 55233 | Transfer out to: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 11/09/1950 | 55233 | Transfer in from: | 68D | Beattock | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 55233 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 55233 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 45085 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45085 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45085 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 45036 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 54452 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61002 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61354 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45085 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61002 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61002 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 61356 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 54452 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61356 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 45029 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 45362 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/04/1951 | 61356 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 64547 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65311 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61002 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 45127 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45127 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45127 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61242 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61354 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1951 | 61356 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45023 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45086 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45161 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45183 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45183 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 45183 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44994 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 55189 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 879 | 0-4-4T | on | 18/08/1952 | 55139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1952 | 65271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 57603 | Transfer in from: | 31D | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 57679 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 57681 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 64547 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65311 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 11/12/1952 | 40911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 41147 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 64495 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 64500 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 57553 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 57603 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 42734 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 42755 | Transfer in from: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 44994 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42734 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 42755 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44994 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 30/09/1953 | 55166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 31/12/1953 | 41178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 64517 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/05/1954 | 64527 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 41176 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 42695 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 30/06/1955 | 55177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 64528 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 57576 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Oban | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 57576 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Oban | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 64528 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | on | 14/09/1955 | 54451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 41147 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 41177 | Transfer out to: | 68C | Stranraer | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 45030 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 42804 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 42830 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1956 | 61246 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/01/1956 | 61407 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 64612 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 64554 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 64561 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 64574 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 42269 | Transfer out to: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1957 | 45007 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1957 | 57560 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 43 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1957 | 54452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/08/1957 | 56329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1958 | 61246 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 45155 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1958 | 64495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 42268 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 42695 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 45007 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | 45161 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64946 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64963 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1958 | 64986 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1958 | 56283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64536 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64574 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64591 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 64612 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1958 | 64517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 12/1958 | 56253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 29 | 0-6-0T | on | 02/12/1958 | 56236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 55165 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/01/1959 | 42271 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64497 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64501 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 64569 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 57576 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 57681 | Transfer out to: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/05/1959 | D3737 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1959 | D3739 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1959 | D3738 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1959 | D3740 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1959 | D3741 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/06/1959 | D3742 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | 55165 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/07/1959 | D3740 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 67668 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 42270 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | 64501 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/08/1959 | D3742 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3560 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3561 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3738 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | D3739 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/04/1960 | 61260 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 28/04/1960 | D2754 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 02/05/1960 | D2745 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 80086 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/05/1960 | D2755 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3877 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | D3741 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/06/1960 | 64963 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1960 | 61007 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1960 | 61244 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1960 | 61146 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 47163 | Transfer out to: | 66D | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45360 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45367 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 80086 | Transfer out to: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1960 | 61146 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 56312 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/01/1961 | 55202 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/03/1961 | 55233 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Oban | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 42807 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 56313 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 64527 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 64561 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/04/1961 | D2745 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 42172 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 64497 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 67668 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | D3732 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | D3733 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/06/1961 | 57591 | Transfer in from: | 60B | Aviemore | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1961 | 64500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1961 | 57591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45053 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45477 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80122 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/07/1961 | 54478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 13/07/1961 | 55210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/08/1961 | 61324 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1961 | 64946 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 19 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 23/09/1961 | 55124 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | on | 29/09/1961 | 55229 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 439 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/1961 | 55165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61007 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61244 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1961 | 61260 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57559 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1961 | 57560 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45170 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45476 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45483 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | 45492 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1961 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1961 | 64986 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76105 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76106 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 64554 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 64569 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1962 | 57654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42168 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80122 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 45469 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1962 | 44976 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 29/09/1962 | 44975 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1962 | 61324 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1962 | 57674 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 57645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 42172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/12/1962 | 42272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 45086 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 57550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 812 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 57565 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3734 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3742 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3732 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | D3733 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 57634 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1963 | 57634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 44702 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 45168 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60012 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1963 | 60024 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61081 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61178 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61221 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1963 | 61245 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1963 | 45023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | 65243 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61081 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61178 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1963 | 61221 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 45367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 300 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45358 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1963 | 61245 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/12/1963 | 60024 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 45358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/01/1964 | 60012 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65243 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1964 | 44976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 76105 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 76106 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 31/03/1964 | 42168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1964 | 45170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61242 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1964 | 61351 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1964 | 44994 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1964 | 61351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1964 | 61242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1964 | 61134 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1964 | 61347 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1964 | 61400 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 45162 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1964 | 45476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1964 | 61400 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 61245 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | 61308 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | D2754 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 12/10/1964 | D2755 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1964 | 45183 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 65912 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/10/1964 | 65920 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1964 | 45155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 65912 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J38 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 65920 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 44702 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/07/1965 | 61245 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1965 | 45360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1965 | 44975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1965 | 44925 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1965 | 45047 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61308 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1965 | 61347 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1965 | 61134 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3560 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3561 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3734 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3737 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3742 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3877 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 42273 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 44925 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45047 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45053 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45127 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45162 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45168 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45469 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45477 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | 45483 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/08/1966 | 61407 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction |