Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 432 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 3020 Week
» 32518 Month
» 369364 Year
» 1590929 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Hull Dairycoates


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 12/1899 2004 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1900 2009 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1900 2010 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 03/1902 1002 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 03/1902 130 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 12/1902 1682 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 02/1903 1694 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 09/1903 715 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 09/1903 785 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 03/1904 443 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 05/1904 1173 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 04/1906 726 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 04/1906 740 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 05/1906 760 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1906 763 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1906 768 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 10/1907 1062 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 10/1907 1177 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 11/1907 1215 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 12/1907 645 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 03/1908 652 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 07/1908 744 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 08/1908 746 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 09/1908 748 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 10/1908 749 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 11/1908 751 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1909 755 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 02/1909 758 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T m/e 11/1910 1126 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 07/1911 669 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 09/1911 771 1st Allocation        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 09/1911 773 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 m/e 12/1911 786 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1917 2217 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1917 2218 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1917 2220 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1917 2221 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 08/1918 2233 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 09/1918 2234 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 12/1918 2239 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 12/1918 2241 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 05/1919 2246 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 06/1919 2249 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 07/1919 2250 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 08/1919 2252 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 m/e 10/1919 901 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 m/e 10/1919 902 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 m/e 11/1919 904 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 m/e 11/1919 905 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 04/1920 2270 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 05/1920 2272 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 05/1920 2278 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 12/1920 2297 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1921 2301 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/12/1922 2244 Transfer in from:        
Steam N9 0-6-2T by 01/01/1923 1647 Snapshot        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/05/1923 2234 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/05/1923 2301 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 24/10/1923 782 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1924 2001 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1924 2003 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 18/03/1924 625 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/03/1924 624 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 22/03/1924 2233 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 01/04/1924 626 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 03/04/1924 628 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 08/04/1924 629 1st Allocation        
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 16/04/1924 630 1st Allocation        
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 01/05/1924 815 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 31/05/1924 764 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 19/06/1924 1062 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1924 2234 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1924 747 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1924 746 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 26/08/1924 1002 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 26/08/1924 645 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 22/09/1924 624 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 10/10/1924 443 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 10/10/1924 785 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/12/1924 2252 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 30/01/1925 785 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 30/01/1925 652 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 30/01/1925 715 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 07/02/1925 1128 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 07/02/1925 2111 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 07/02/1925 2112 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 07/02/1925 2113 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 07/02/1925 2114 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 07/02/1925 443 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 07/02/1925 1173 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 27/02/1925 624 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 07/07/1925 1384 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 07/07/1925 2113 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1925 744 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 28/09/1925 2113 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 14/12/1925 652 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 24/12/1925 656 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 m/e 03/1926 1110 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 03/1926 2233 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 24/04/1926 629 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 24/04/1926 902 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 24/04/1926 629 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 24/04/1926 902 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/09/1926 782 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/09/1926 815 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 22/09/1926 782 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 22/09/1926 815 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/10/1926 1451 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/10/1926 1452 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/10/1926 1454 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 1927 1291 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 01/1927 2264 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 752 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 754 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 756 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/02/1927 1247 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/02/1927 2223 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 21/02/1927 1110 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 21/02/1927 785 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/03/1927 1291 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 02/03/1927 629 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 02/03/1927 902 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 04/04/1927 754 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/04/1927 752 Transfer out to: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 24/05/1927 669 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 27/05/1927 2501 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 27/05/1927 2502 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 25/08/1927 2229 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/10/1927 1939 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/10/1927 1976 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/10/1927 6616 Transfer in from:        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/11/1927 925 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1451 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1452 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/11/1927 1454 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 30/11/1927 1962 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 21/01/1928 6578 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 28/01/1928 6583 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/02/1928 6615 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 10/03/1928 6618 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 10/03/1928 6630 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 12/03/1928 443 Transfer out to: TSK Thirsk    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 17/03/1928 6632 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 19/03/1928 1128 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 19/03/1928 1682 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 19/03/1928 1694 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 20/03/1928 2043 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 24/03/1928 6584 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 31/03/1928 6577 Transfer in from:        
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 21/05/1928 2115 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 24/05/1928 630 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 26/05/1928 6581 Transfer in from:        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/06/1928 936 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/06/1928 942 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 15/06/1928 6610 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 15/06/1928 6611 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 30/06/1928 6608 Transfer in from:        
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 30/06/1928 6613 Transfer in from:        
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 19/07/1928 738 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 19/07/1928 744 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 19/07/1928 757 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 624 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 625 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 626 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 628 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 901 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 904 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam Q7 0-8-0 on 19/07/1928 905 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/08/1928 6612 Transfer in from:        
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 29/08/1928 2004 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 22/09/1928 6609 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 22/10/1928 2501 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 22/10/1928 2502 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 16/04/1929 763 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 25/05/1929 768 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/05/1929 1371 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/05/1929 1374 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/05/1929 2380 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 19/06/1929 2115 Condemned      
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 01/07/1929 2111 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 06/07/1929 2501 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 22/07/1929 788 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 22/07/1929 823 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/08/1929 928 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 09/08/1929 933 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/08/1929 1376 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/08/1929 909 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/09/1929 1375 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/09/1929 6581 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/09/1929 6613 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 09/10/1929 1378 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 23/10/1929 2500 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 23/10/1929 2510 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/10/1929 6612 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/10/1929 6614 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 12/11/1929 2512 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 1362 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 2224 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 2226 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 2251 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 2273 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/11/1929 2283 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6577 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6578 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6584 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6609 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6615 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 18/11/1929 6618 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/01/1930 1276 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/01/1930 1361 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/01/1930 6607 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/01/1930 6608 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 24/03/1930 6583 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 24/03/1930 6616 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 07/04/1930 2503 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 07/04/1930 6630 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 07/04/1930 6632 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 15/04/1930 749 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 12/05/1930 758 Condemned      
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 17/10/1930 2113 Condemned      
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 17/10/1930 2114 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/11/1930 1385 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/11/1930 840 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/11/1930 841 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/11/1930 842 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/12/1930 2248 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/12/1930 2255 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 29/12/1930 2511 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 29/12/1930 2503 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/00/1931 652 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 01/01/1931 2500 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 01/01/1931 2501 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 02/01/1931 2510 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 26/03/1931 760 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 2367 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 2369 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 2379 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 930 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 934 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/03/1931 937 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B14 4-6-0 on 14/04/1931 2112 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 27/04/1931 2500 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 02/05/1931 2500 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 10/06/1931 2001 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 18/06/1931 130 Transfer out to: HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1931 2003 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1931 2009D Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1931 2010 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 30/07/1931 2510 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 06/08/1931 2501 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 06/08/1931 2510 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 08/08/1931 2511 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 13/08/1931 2501 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 18/09/1931 2511 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 01/10/1931 2511 Condemned      
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 01/10/1931 2512 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 21/10/1931 1177 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 21/10/1931 1215 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 22/10/1931 771 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 24/10/1931 2502 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 28/10/1931 656 Transfer out to: MAR March    
Steam Q10 0-8-0 on 04/11/1931 2502 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 15/12/1931 744 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/02/1932 1177 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/02/1932 1215 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/02/1932 652 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/02/1932 656 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 05/02/1932 771 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 03/05/1932 757 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 04/08/1932 747 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 03/09/1932 740 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/09/1932 1170 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/09/1932 1179 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/09/1932 1195 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/07/1933 6580 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/07/1933 6614 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/07/1933 6615 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/11/1933 2218 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 15/12/1933 2249 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 15/12/1933 773 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/12/1933 2223 Transfer out to: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 m/e 1934 2249 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 01/02/1934 755 Condemned      
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/09/1934 1177 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/09/1934 652 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/09/1934 656 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 20/09/1934 771 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 21/09/1934 756 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 906 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/10/1934 843 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 18/10/1934 846 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 15/04/1935 764 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 06/06/1935 1179 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Q5 0-8-0 on 13/06/1935 1215 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/10/1935 2249 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 21/10/1935 753 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/12/1935 6614 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 22/02/1936 2233 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/04/1936 1247 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/04/1936 2224 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/05/1936 751 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/05/1936 2273 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 13/06/1936 754 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/06/1936 2249 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 30/10/1936 6580 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 26/12/1936 726 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 26/12/1936 754 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/12/1936 922 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 19/01/1937 1373 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/02/1937 2262 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/02/1937 2239 Transfer out to: EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/03/1937 1262 Transfer in from: EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/03/1937 943 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/05/1937 2249 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 06/05/1937 759 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 22/06/1937 1113 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/08/1937 6615 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 02/09/1937 788 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 18/09/1937 786 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/09/1937 2377 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/09/1937 817 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/09/1937 2365 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/10/1937 1487 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 23/10/1937 1179 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/10/1937 1470 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 28/10/1937 690 Transfer in from: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 01/11/1937 686 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 02/11/1937 688 Transfer in from: WBY Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/12/1937 1508 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 14/01/1938 1114 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/01/1938 1509 1st Allocation        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/02/1938 2262 Transfer out to: EHL East Hartlepool    
Steam A6 4-6-2T m/e 06/1938 686 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam A6 4-6-2T m/e 06/1938 690 Transfer out to: MID Middlesbrough    
Steam A6 4-6-2T on 07/06/1938 688 Transfer out to: WBY Whitby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/07/1938 1534 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 30/07/1938 738 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/10/1938 1534 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 22/10/1938 748 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 22/10/1938 753 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 22/10/1938 759 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 30/03/1939 795 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 30/03/1939 796 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 30/03/1939 798 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 30/03/1939 825 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 10/04/1939 1185 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/04/1939 2261 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 12/04/1939 2287 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/04/1939 2291 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 27/05/1939 934 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/06/1939 925 Transfer out to: SCA Scarborough    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/06/1939 1373 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/06/1939 2379 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 08/06/1939 1182 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 10/06/1939 1191 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/06/1939 2248 Transfer out to: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/07/1939 2249 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/07/1939 2272 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/08/1939 2219 Transfer in from: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/10/1939 2221 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/10/1939 2249 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/01/1940 1262 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/01/1940 2261 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2217 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2220 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2229 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2244 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2264 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/01/1940 2283 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/03/1940 2291 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 820 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 821 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 1375 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 06/03/1940 928 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 25/03/1940 2250 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 25/03/1940 943 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/05/1940 1371 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/05/1940 1362 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 27/05/1940 796 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/05/1940 2369 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/05/1940 942 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 01/06/1940 1126 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/06/1940 1385 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/06/1940 843 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/06/1940 922 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 06/07/1940 1114 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 06/07/1940 1195 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/07/1940 2234 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/11/1940 1470 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 26/08/1941 906 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/08/1941 1382 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/04/1942 933 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2234 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2275 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 28/03/1943 2291 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 787 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 796 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 813 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 819 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 822 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 824 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1374 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1376 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1378 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1382 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1384 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1487 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1508 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1509 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 2365 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 2367 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 2377 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 2380 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 840 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 841 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 842 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 846 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 909 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 930 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 936 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/03/1943 937 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/10/1943 1276 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/10/1943 2219 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/10/1943 2241 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 05/02/1944 822 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 26/02/1944 825 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 18/03/1944 813 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/03/1944 2251 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/03/1944 2278 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/03/1944 2287 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/05/1944 1276 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/05/1944 2219 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/05/1944 2241 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/05/1944 2278 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/05/1944 2246 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q1 0-8-0T on 17/09/1944 5087 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/10/1944 823 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 22/10/1944 1113 Transfer out to: SBK Starbeck    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/11/1944 1257 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/11/1944 2228 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/11/1944 2235 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/11/1944 2242 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q1 0-8-0T on 13/12/1944 5087 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 05/03/1945 6265 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 05/03/1945 6566 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 05/03/1945 6584 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 05/03/1945 6608 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 05/03/1945 6612 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 1257 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 1361 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 2226 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 2235 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 2270 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 2278 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/03/1945 2297 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/03/1945 1113 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/03/1945 1129 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 04/06/1945 6350 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 16/10/1945 798 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 08/12/1945 795 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 18/12/1945 796 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 31/03/1946 6566 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/04/1946 1320 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 06/04/1946 1694 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 27/04/1946 1326 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 27/04/1946 1698 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/04/1946 5008 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/04/1946 5404 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/04/1946 6211 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/04/1946 6581 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/04/1946 6606 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 28/07/1946 9772 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 28/07/1946 9778 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 28/07/1946 9780 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 28/07/1946 9783 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 28/07/1946 9788 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/07/1946 2246 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 26/08/1946 6350 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/09/1946 2287 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/09/1946 3408 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/09/1946 6616 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam K5 2-6-0 on 27/10/1946 1863 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 02/11/1946 1697 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/12/1946 1313 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/12/1946 1314 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/12/1946 1691 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/12/1946 1692 Condemned      
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 21/12/1946 1695 Condemned      
Steam K5 2-6-0 on 15/01/1947 1863 Transfer out to: STM St Margarets    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 31/05/1947 1693 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3353 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3376 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3385 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3391 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3398 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3403 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3412 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3444 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1947 3448 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3399 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/07/1947 3432 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/10/1947 3408 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B15 4-6-0 on 27/12/1947 1696 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/12/1947 4867 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/12/1947 4914 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1813 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1814 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1819 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1871 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1872 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1874 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1883 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1892 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1899 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1902 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1903 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1920 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1922 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1923 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1927 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1932 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1934 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1935 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1941 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1945 Snapshot        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1965 Snapshot        
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5647 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5660 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5663 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5666 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5671 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5679 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5690 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5698 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5699 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5705 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5712 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5713 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 65651 Snapshot 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T on 01/01/1948 68137 Snapshot        
Steam Y1 0-4-0T on 01/01/1948 68139 Snapshot        
Steam F4 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7171 Snapshot        
Steam F4 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 7175 Snapshot        
Steam Y1 0-4-0T on 01/01/1948 8140 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8232 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8242 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8252 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8277 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8288 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8304 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8311 Snapshot        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8316 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8673 Snapshot        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8676 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9094 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9096 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9098 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9104 Snapshot        
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9108 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9373 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9374 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9375 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9376 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9377 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9379 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9381 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9382 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9383 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9385 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9386 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9389 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9391 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9392 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9393 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9396 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9397 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9398 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9399 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9401 Snapshot        
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9419 Snapshot HAV Haverton Hill    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9777 Snapshot SHI Shildon    
Steam T1 4-8-0T on 01/01/1948 9912 Snapshot        
Steam T1 4-8-0T on 01/01/1948 9915 Snapshot        
Steam T1 4-8-0T on 01/01/1948 9920 Snapshot        
Steam T1 4-8-0T on 01/01/1948 9922 Snapshot        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4864 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4897 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4931 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4939 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/02/1948 4870 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/03/1948 4928 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/03/1948 4978 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 31/03/1948 61304 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/04/1948 61305 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 05/04/1948 61306 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4926 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4927 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/05/1948 4941 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 1068 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 1080 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61060 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61074 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61304 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61305 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 16/05/1948 61306 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 04/10/1948 9399 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3753 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3754 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3769 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3845 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 3857 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63603 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63828 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63835 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/02/1949 63881 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 03/1949 69374 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 03/1949 69375 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/03/1949 4978 Transfer out to: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 08/1949 69383 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 08/1949 69396 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 08/1949 69397 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 3437 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63348 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63358 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63395 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63431 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/09/1949 63448 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64705 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64812 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/09/1949 64858 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1416 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1419 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1426 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1450 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1452 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1456 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1458 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 1466 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61404 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61408 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61430 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61441 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61443 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61451 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61459 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61460 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61462 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/09/1949 61465 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63673 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63676 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63712 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63732 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63740 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63755 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63760 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63849 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 11/09/1949 63874 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64705 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64812 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/10/1949 64858 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 16/10/1949 63849 Transfer out to: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 22/10/1949 63856 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/11/1949 63348 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/11/1949 63431 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 24/11/1949 63448 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 12/1949 69010 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 12/1949 69011 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90006 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90008 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90021 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90026 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90272 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90378 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90382 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90450 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90478 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90571 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90661 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90677 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 12/1949 90695 Transfer in from:        
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/12/1949 3437 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/12/1949 63395 Transfer out to: SEL Selby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1416 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1419 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1426 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1450 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1456 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1458 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 1466 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61404 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61408 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61430 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61441 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61443 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61451 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61452 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61459 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61460 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61462 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 04/12/1949 61465 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/12/1949 63673 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/12/1949 63732 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/12/1949 63754 Transfer out to: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/12/1949 63358 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 02/1950 69376 Condemned      
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63676 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63712 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63740 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63755 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63760 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63856 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 05/02/1950 63874 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 03/1950 69373 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/03/1950 69771 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63673 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63676 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63712 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63732 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63740 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63754 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63755 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63760 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63856 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 21/05/1950 63874 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/06/1950 90378 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/06/1950 90478 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/06/1950 90571 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/06/1950 90661 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/06/1950 90677 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 20/08/1950 63843 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam J25 0-6-0 m/e 09/1950 65651 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 04/10/1950 43076 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 11/10/1950 43077 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 19/10/1950 43078 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 20/10/1950 43079 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 90007 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 90378 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 5698 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 90382 Transfer out to: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/10/1950 90695 Transfer out to: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/11/1950 63754 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/11/1950 63845 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/11/1950 63857 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 77175 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 79264 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 90047 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 90435 Transfer in from:        
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 65712 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 25/11/1950 68277 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 25/11/1950 68288 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1950 64864 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1950 64939 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 65647 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 65671 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 23/12/1950 69920 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 90008 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/12/1950 64870 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/12/1950 64897 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/12/1950 64931 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 01/01/1951 63620 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 01/01/1951 63843 Transfer in from: 53E Cudworth    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 65647 Transfer in from: 53E Cudworth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 90001 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 90072 Transfer in from:        
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 65690 Transfer out to: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 65705 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/01/1951 69391 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/01/1951 90450 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/02/1951 64926 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/02/1951 64927 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 90210 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 90272 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 65699 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 65713 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 90026 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 17/02/1951 90272 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 28/02/1951 43100 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 28/02/1951 43101 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 02/03/1951 43102 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 09/03/1951 43103 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 68673 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/03/1951 68673 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 15/04/1951 63753 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 15/04/1951 63770 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 90233 Transfer in from:        
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 5663 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65647 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 90001 Transfer out to: 38B Annesley    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 22/04/1951 63667 Transfer in from: CUD Cudworth    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 13/05/1951 63772 Transfer out to: 53E Cudworth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90008 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90030 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90427 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90479 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90674 Transfer in from:        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/05/1951 64867 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/05/1951 64941 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 31/05/1951 65679 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 17/06/1951 69780 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 21/07/1951 69919 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/07/1951 68673 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 21/07/1951 69915 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/07/1951 90427 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J71 0-6-0T m/e 08/1951 68311 Condemned      
Steam F4 2-4-2T on 01/08/1951 67171 Condemned      
Steam F4 2-4-2T on 01/08/1951 67175 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 21/08/1951 43122 1st Allocation        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 28/08/1951 69401 Condemned      
Steam Y1 0-4-0T m/e 09/1951 68139 Condemned      
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63620 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63628 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63673 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63816 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63823 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63835 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63881 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64713 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64725 Transfer in from: LIN Lincoln    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64730 Transfer in from: 40A Lincoln    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 02/09/1951 64910 Transfer in from: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63603 Transfer out to: 40E Langwith Junction    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63620 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63628 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63664 Transfer out to: 40E Langwith Junction    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63667 Transfer out to: 40E Langwith Junction    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63673 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63676 Transfer out to: 38B Annesley    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63712 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63732 Transfer out to: 40E Langwith Junction    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63740 Transfer out to: 38B Annesley    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63755 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63760 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63764 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63769 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63816 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63823 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63828 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63835 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63843 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63855 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63856 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam O1 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63874 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 02/09/1951 63881 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 02/09/1951 69784 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 16/09/1951 63620 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 16/09/1951 63823 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 16/09/1951 63881 Transfer out to: 40B Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 20/09/1951 63812 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 20/09/1951 63812 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 61844 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 61846 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 61847 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 61869 Transfer in from: NWE New England    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 61893 Transfer in from: MAR March    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 77283 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 77497 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90022 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90061 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90078 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90089 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90099 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90382 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90423 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90430 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90449 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90450 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90458 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90482 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90609 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/09/1951 90695 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/09/1951 63628 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/09/1951 63673 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/09/1951 63812 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/09/1951 63816 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/09/1951 63835 Transfer out to: 38A Colwick    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 30/09/1951 43124 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 30/09/1951 43125 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 12/10/1951 43127 1st Allocation        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 15/10/1951 69398 Condemned      
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 4w/e 20/10/1951 8183 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 90235 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 90432 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 90233 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1951 90704 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 31/10/1951 43128 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/11/1951 64730 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 18/11/1951 64910 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 05/12/1951 43126 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/02/1952 64709 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/02/1952 64947 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 43015 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 43038 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90007 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90235 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90423 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90432 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90449 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90674 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 04/04/1952 69775 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 43069 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 43127 Transfer out to: 34E Neasden    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 12/05/1952 69777 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 43101 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 43102 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/07/1952 64703 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 06/07/1952 64904 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam N8 0-6-2T w/e 07/07/1952 69389 Condemned      
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 17/07/1952 69382 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 19/07/1952 12113 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 19/07/1952 12114 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 23/08/1952 12115 1st Allocation        
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 14/09/1952 69783 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 20/09/1952 12116 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 20/09/1952 12117 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 20/09/1952 12118 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 20/09/1952 12119 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 20/09/1952 12120 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 61927 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 20/09/1952 61932 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69912 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69919 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69922 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 18/10/1952 12121 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 18/10/1952 12122 1st Allocation        
Steam N8 0-6-2T w/e 20/10/1952 69379 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 26/10/1952 64928 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam N8 0-6-2T w/e 27/10/1952 69393 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/11/1952 90435 Transfer out to: 51B Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 30/11/1952 64713 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 12/1952 76022 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/12/1952 64703 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 07/12/1952 64904 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 61899 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1953 65660 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/02/1953 68316 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 15/02/1953 69781 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 15/02/1953 69787 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 68402 Transfer in from:        
Steam J77 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 68413 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69010 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69011 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69377 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 5w/e 21/03/1953 69392 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 10/05/1953 69787 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 61884 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/06/1953 68281 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 43126 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 43128 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 90047 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 21/11/1953 13071 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 23/11/1953 68281 Condemned      
Steam Y1 0-4-0T m/e 12/1953 68137 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1953 13072 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1953 13073 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/12/1953 13074 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/12/1953 68743 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/12/1953 68747 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 19/12/1953 12114 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 19/12/1953 12115 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/01/1954 13075 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/01/1954 13076 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/01/1954 13077 1st Allocation        
Steam Y1 0-4-0T 4w/e 23/01/1954 68148 Transfer in from: BRI Bridlington    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 12113 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/01/1954 68413 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/02/1954 61068 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 20/02/1954 13080 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 20/02/1954 13081 1st Allocation        
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/02/1954 68284 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/02/1954 68429 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/02/1954 13071 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 20/02/1954 13072 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/02/1954 68743 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/02/1954 68747 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/03/1954 68751 Transfer in from:        
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 21/03/1954 69776 Transfer in from: HLS Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 24/04/1954 90061 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/04/1954 64947 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 02/05/1954 69776 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 13070 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68670 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68718 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68741 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68753 Transfer in from:        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 12116 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 12117 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 12118 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 12119 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 12120 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 43125 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68402 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T w/e 31/05/1954 68140 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64819 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64864 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64904 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/06/1954 64949 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 5w/e 24/07/1954 68182 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 03/10/1954 69771 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 03/10/1954 69778 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 03/10/1954 69781 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/10/1954 64725 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/10/1954 64904 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam A7 4-6-2T w/e 13/10/1954 69770 Condemned      
Steam Y1 0-4-0T 4w/e 23/10/1954 68151 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/10/1954 68429 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam N8 0-6-2T w/e 27/10/1954 69385 Condemned      
Steam Y1 0-4-0T w/e 08/11/1954 68151 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 09/11/1954 68304 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T w/e 30/11/1954 69779 Condemned      
Steam N10 0-6-2T 5w/e 22/01/1955 69098 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 28/02/1955 69386 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 06/03/1955 69782 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 13071 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 13072 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 12121 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1955 12122 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 23/03/1955 69773 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 23/04/1955 68242 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 08/06/1955 13142 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 on 08/06/1955 13143 1st Allocation        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 43038 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 43122 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 43124 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 28/06/1955 69381 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65655 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65693 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65695 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 65726 Transfer in from: 51J Northallerton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 43015 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T 4w/e 20/08/1955 68145 Transfer in from: AUK West Auckland    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 17/09/1955 61899 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 10/10/1955 68284 Condemned      
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 16/10/1955 69788 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 61904 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 61932 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 68160 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 22/10/1955 68230 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 22/10/1955 90352 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 27/11/1955 69772 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 90021 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 17/12/1955 90210 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T on 19/12/1955 68148 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 29/12/1955 13230 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 30/12/1955 13231 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/01/1956 13232 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/01/1956 13233 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 25/01/1956 13234 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/02/1956 13235 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/02/1956 13236 1st Allocation        
Diesel 10 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 13142 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 10 0-6-0 4w/e 18/02/1956 13143 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 13232 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 13233 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 13234 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 13235 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1956 13236 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam A7 4-6-2T on 25/03/1956 69786 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 65677 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam Y1 0-4-0T 4w/e 25/05/1956 68145 Transfer out to: 53D Bridlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64910 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64939 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/06/1956 64940 Transfer in from: 54A Sunderland    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 43122 Transfer in from: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 3w/e 16/06/1956 68182 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 76022 Transfer out to: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 90100 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 90670 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 61844 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 61869 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 13/11/1956 13323 1st Allocation        
Steam Y3 0-4-0T 4w/e 17/11/1956 57 Transfer out to:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 90378 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 19/01/1957 90482 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 04/02/1957 68232 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/02/1957 61060 Transfer out to: 35B Grantham    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/02/1957 61074 Transfer out to: 35B Grantham    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 61854 Transfer in from: CAR Carlisle Canal    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 61857 Transfer in from: STM St Margarets    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 16/03/1957 61897 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 15/04/1957 68252 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/04/1957 68251 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/04/1957 68672 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 18/05/1957 68264 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/06/1957 64864 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/06/1957 64939 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 16/06/1957 64949 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 01/07/1957 69094 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65654 Transfer in from: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65663 Transfer in from: 50G Whitby    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65685 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 65691 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 5w/e 20/07/1957 68042 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 69918 Transfer in from: SKN Stockton    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 69921 Transfer in from: 51E Stockton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 5w/e 20/07/1957 68251 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 30/07/1957 69108 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 68746 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 68752 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 68672 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 68741 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 69918 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 5w/e 24/08/1957 69921 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 65663 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 65685 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90089 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90100 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/09/1957 90382 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Steam J71 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/10/1957 68251 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 65695 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/12/1957 61080 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 27/12/1957 69096 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/01/1958 13078 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/01/1958 13079 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 90378 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 90677 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/03/1958 68912 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam N10 0-6-2T on 17/03/1958 69104 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 05/05/1958 65654 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 10/05/1958 90378 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 10/05/1958 90677 Transfer out to: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/06/1958 64947 Transfer in from: 56F Low Moor    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67280 Transfer in from: 53D Bridlington    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67341 Transfer in from: 53D Bridlington    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 61854 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 61934 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J25 0-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 65726 Transfer out to: 50B Neville Hill    
Steam J50 0-6-0T 5w/e 14/06/1958 68912 Transfer out to: 53E Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90430 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 90479 Transfer out to: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 30/06/1958 68718 Condemned      
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68409 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 19/07/1958 68425 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J25 0-6-0 4w/e 19/07/1958 65666 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/09/1958 61065 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/09/1958 61256 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/10/1958 68011 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/10/1958 68414 Transfer in from: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 61884 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 61923 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 14/10/1958 65677 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 06/11/1958 67341 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 90217 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 5w/e 15/11/1958 90571 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 01/12/1958 77000 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 01/12/1958 77010 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J25 0-6-0 on 02/12/1958 65655 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/12/1958 13232 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J73 0-6-0T w/e 06/12/1958 68360 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J73 0-6-0T w/e 06/12/1958 68361 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90011 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90233 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90352 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90378 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90427 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90482 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90503 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90511 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90586 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90623 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90677 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/12/1958 90688 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 15/12/1958 68746 Condemned      
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 22/12/1958 67280 Condemned      
Steam J77 0-6-0T on 24/12/1958 68414 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/12/1958 69008 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam Y3 0-4-0T m/e 01/1959 8 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 12/01/1959 68251 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/01/1959 64943 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 27/01/1959 D2051 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 04/02/1959 D2052 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/02/1959 68672 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 07/02/1959 68741 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/04/1959 D2053 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/04/1959 D2054 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/05/1959 64831 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 10/05/1959 64833 Transfer in from: 37A Ardsley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/05/1959 43103 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/05/1959 43122 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 18/05/1959 68751 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61010 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61080 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61215 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61289 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61306 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 14/06/1959 77001 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62701 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62707 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62710 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62717 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62720 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62722 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62723 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 20/06/1959 62760 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67635 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67638 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67640 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67663 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67677 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67682 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67684 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 67686 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J73 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1959 68363 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1959 84009 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 43100 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90011 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 90233 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 22/06/1959 68741 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43097 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43098 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 43123 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62727 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62740 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62759 Transfer in from: 50D Starbeck    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62763 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 w/e 19/09/1959 62765 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 24/09/1959 62701 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 06/10/1959 62707 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 06/10/1959 62720 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 20/10/1959 62722 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 21/10/1959 62760 Condemned      
Steam J73 0-6-0T on 26/10/1959 68363 Condemned      
Steam J77 0-6-0T on 06/11/1959 68409 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 14/11/1959 68705 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/11/1959 64904 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 13/12/1959 64833 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 09/01/1960 68716 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J77 0-6-0T on 11/01/1960 68425 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/01/1960 47580 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 61869 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 61875 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 61923 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 61927 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 25/01/1960 68230 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 25/01/1960 68264 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 25/01/1960 68670 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 30/01/1960 47632 Transfer in from: 56D Mirfield    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 01/02/1960 68752 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 06/02/1960 41262 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90022 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90072 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90503 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90511 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam J73 0-6-0T w/e 08/02/1960 68360 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/02/1960 90160 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 47334 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 69020 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1960 69008 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 05/03/1960 47589 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 20/03/1960 61305 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/03/1960 D3944 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/03/1960 D3945 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/06/1960 47589 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 D2151 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D2064 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D2268 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D3070 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 D3071 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/07/1960 61012 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 01/08/1960 62740 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 15/08/1960 68753 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/08/1960 D2101 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/08/1960 D2156 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 D2100 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 D2102 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 D2155 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 D2157 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 09/09/1960 68676 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64904 Transfer out to: 50E Scarborough    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64910 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 11/09/1960 64947 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Steam J73 0-6-0T m/e 10/1960 68361 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 03/10/1960 62710 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/10/1960 64904 Transfer in from: 50E Scarborough    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 08/11/1960 D2168 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 10/11/1960 68705 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 15/11/1960 D2169 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 68673 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 68745 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 69009 Transfer in from:        
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 69010 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 19/11/1960 69011 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 21/11/1960 D2170 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 61901 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 61985 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 28/11/1960 D2171 1st Allocation        
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 06/12/1960 D2172 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 D3233 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 D3675 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 D3676 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 14/12/1960 D2173 1st Allocation        
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 65691 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 31/12/1960 D2174 1st Allocation        
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 07/01/1961 68011 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 13/01/1961 62717 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 13/01/1961 62759 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 16/01/1961 62723 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 16/01/1961 62727 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 16/01/1961 62763 Condemned      
Steam Shire/Hunt 4-4-0 on 16/01/1961 62765 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 20/02/1961 68716 Condemned      
Steam J25 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1961 65693 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 D3073 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 D3076 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 22/04/1961 D2155 Transfer out to: DG Danygraig    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 08/05/1961 68673 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 13/05/1961 D2151 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 13/05/1961 D2268 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1961 D3072 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 22/05/1961 61874 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 05/06/1961 61904 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 43096 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61818 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 61986 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 43123 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/06/1961 64831 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/07/1961 61902 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/07/1961 61927 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 21/07/1961 64914 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 22/07/1961 61906 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/07/1961 13078 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 31/07/1961 61941 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 61884 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 61987 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 04/09/1961 68745 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61854 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61952 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90030 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90078 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90217 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90571 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 90623 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 18/09/1961 61920 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 26/09/1961 47334 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 26/09/1961 47580 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 26/09/1961 47632 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 16/10/1961 D6730 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 22/10/1961 64904 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 23/10/1961 D6731 1st Allocation        
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 23/10/1961 68672 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 30/10/1961 61892 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 23/11/1961 61903 Condemned      
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 67635 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam V1 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 67640 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 25/11/1961 67682 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 27/12/1961 61814 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 27/12/1961 61901 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 61930 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 61962 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 61969 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 12/02/1962 61932 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 25/02/1962 64850 Transfer in from: 50F Malton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 26/02/1962 61945 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2100 Transfer out to: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2170 Transfer out to: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 D2174 Transfer out to: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/03/1962 61255 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/03/1962 61303 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 05/03/1962 61818 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 09/03/1962 D6732 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 19/03/1962 61987 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 20/03/1962 D6733 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 26/03/1962 D6734 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 01/04/1962 D6735 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 09/04/1962 61813 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/04/1962 90435 Transfer in from: 50D Goole    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 77001 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 77010 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 25/04/1962 D6736 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 30/04/1962 61923 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 04/05/1962 D6737 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 07/05/1962 61922 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 11/05/1962 D6738 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 18/05/1962 D6739 1st Allocation        
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 26/05/1962 12122 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/05/1962 D3234 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/05/1962 D3236 Transfer in from: 53C Hull Springhead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 28/05/1962 61986 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 01/06/1962 D6740 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 07/06/1962 D6741 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/07/1962 61884 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 23/07/1962 61935 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/07/1962 43096 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/08/1962 43097 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 12/09/1962 64819 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 D2268 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 D3318 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 D2173 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam V3 2-6-2T on 01/10/1962 67677 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 01/10/1962 69010 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 29/10/1962 61854 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 06/11/1962 D6779 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 14/11/1962 D6780 1st Allocation        
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 22/11/1962 D6781 1st Allocation        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/11/1962 64709 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/11/1962 61215 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 29/11/1962 D6782 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61418 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61420 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61435 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61437 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61438 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61444 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61453 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61463 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61467 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 02/12/1962 61472 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61857 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61869 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61871 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61872 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61883 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 03/12/1962 61965 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64850 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co on 05/12/1962 D6783 1st Allocation        
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 06/12/1962 61952 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 08/12/1962 84009 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 10/12/1962 61847 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 10/12/1962 61875 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61819 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61846 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61893 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61897 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61906 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61930 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 17/12/1962 61969 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/12/1962 64940 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/12/1962 64943 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 18/12/1962 61899 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 19/12/1962 61962 Condemned      
Steam K3 2-6-0 on 21/12/1962 61985 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1963 77002 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 05/01/1963 77000 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 13/01/1963 61475 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 D3235 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 26/01/1963 69009 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 26/01/1963 69011 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam B16 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1963 61475 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D2098 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D3230 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 D3235 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D2081 Transfer in from: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3231 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6780 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6781 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6782 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/06/1963 D6783 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 17/06/1963 61453 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 17/08/1963 90609 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90091 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 24/08/1963 90462 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90092 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 31/08/1963 90172 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 02/09/1963 90006 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 02/09/1963 90435 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 77002 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 23/09/1963 61420 Condemned      
Steam V3 2-6-2T on 23/09/1963 67663 Condemned      
Steam V3 2-6-2T on 23/09/1963 67686 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 21/10/1963 61305 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/11/1963 41262 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90044 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90262 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90265 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90478 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90704 Transfer in from: 53E Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90091 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90092 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90099 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90172 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90427 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/12/1963 61032 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 15/12/1963 61176 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90057 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 21/12/1963 90452 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 21/12/1963 67638 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V3 2-6-2T w/e 21/12/1963 67684 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 23/12/1963 68042 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 28/12/1963 69020 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 25/01/1964 D2065 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 43138 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 43141 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 21/03/1964 D2065 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 30/03/1964 61080 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 20/04/1964 61472 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 D3313 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1964 D2054 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/06/1964 D6775 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 06/06/1964 D6783 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 08/06/1964 61467 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 13/06/1964 D6781 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 13/06/1964 D6782 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/06/1964 90092 Transfer in from: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/06/1964 90213 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1964 43141 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/06/1964 61418 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/06/1964 61437 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/06/1964 61438 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/06/1964 61444 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/06/1964 61463 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 21/07/1964 61435 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/07/1964 90482 Transfer out to: 56A Wakefield    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/08/1964 D6758 Transfer in from: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co w/e 15/08/1964 D6779 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/09/1964 61065 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/09/1964 61176 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/09/1964 61256 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/09/1964 61303 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D3070 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 D3071 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 43138 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1965 90030 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 06/06/1965 61002 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D2081 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D3071 Transfer out to: 56G Bradford Hammerton Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 43069 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 21/06/1965 90452 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 14/08/1965 43077 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1965 43076 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1965 43078 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1965 43079 Transfer out to: 55D Royston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1965 43098 Transfer out to: 55E Normanton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 11/10/1965 90092 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 31/10/1965 61322 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 90240 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/11/1965 90030 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 07/11/1965 61010 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 4w/e 06/12/1965 77001 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 4w/e 06/12/1965 77012 Transfer in from: 55F Manningham    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1966 77001 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 4w/e 01/01/1966 77012 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 13/02/1966 90213 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 13/02/1966 90586 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 20/02/1966 61322 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1966 90016 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1966 90479 Transfer in from: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1966 D2100 Transfer in from: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1966 D2052 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1966 D2053 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 11/09/1966 90479 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 27/11/1966 61032 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 01/12/1966 90044 Condemned      
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 03/12/1966 D6835 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 03/12/1966 D6836 Transfer in from: 91N To North Eastern Region    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 18/12/1966 61012 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 29/12/1966 D9503 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 29/12/1966 D9504 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 29/12/1966 D9505 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 29/12/1966 D9516 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90016 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90057 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1966 90704 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 09/01/1967 D9525 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 09/01/1967 D9546 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 09/01/1967 D9547 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 09/01/1967 90240 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 12/01/1967 D9551 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 12/01/1967 D9552 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 18/01/1967 D9541 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 18/01/1967 D9548 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 18/01/1967 D9549 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 18/01/1967 D9550 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 20/01/1967 D9512 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 20/01/1967 D9523 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 23/01/1967 D9520 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 23/01/1967 D9542 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 23/01/1967 D9553 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 23/01/1967 D9554 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 23/01/1967 90462 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 D2101 Transfer out to: 55H Neville Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1967 D2102 Transfer out to: 55F Manningham    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6785 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6786 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6787 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6788 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6789 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/02/1967 D6790 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/03/1967 D6791 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/03/1967 D6792 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/03/1967 D6793 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/03/1967 D6794 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 25/03/1967 D6795 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/04/1967 90008 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/04/1967 90352 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 07/05/1967 D9511 Reinstated 98S      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9507 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9510 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9529 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9533 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9534 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9537 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 D9539 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6785 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6786 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 20/05/1967 D6787 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 90272 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 90458 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 90670 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/05/1967 90688 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9507 To Store      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9510 To Store      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9529 To Store      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9534 To Store      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9532 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9533 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9534 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9535 Transfer in from: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9537 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9539 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9507 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9510 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9529 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9533 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9534 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 31/05/1967 D9534 Transfer out to: 91E To Eastern Region    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9537 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 2w/e 31/05/1967 D9539 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 17/06/1967 D6784 Transfer in from: 56B Healey Mills    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 D9532 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 D9543 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 D9544 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1967 D9532 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/06/1967 61002 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/06/1967 61255 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/06/1967 61289 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 24/06/1967 90262 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 24/06/1967 90265 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 on 24/06/1967 90450 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/06/1967 61306 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 m/e 30/06/1967 D9540 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 D9540 Transfer in from: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 D9545 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90378 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90478 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90627 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90677 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 90695 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 4w/e 15/07/1967 D9540 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1967 D2268 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D2155 Transfer in from: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D2170 Transfer in from: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1967 D2174 Transfer in from: 50C Hull Botanic Gardens    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 08/01/1968 D9515 Transfer in from: 86A Cardiff Canton    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/01/1968 D6758 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 37 Co-Co 4w/e 27/01/1968 D6775 Transfer out to: 51L Thornaby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2064 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1968 D2155 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9503 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9504 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9505 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9511 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9512 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9515 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9516 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9520 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9523 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9525 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9532 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9533 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9534 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9537 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9539 Condemned      
Diesel 14 0-6-0 on 01/04/1968 D9540 Condemned