Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1299 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 9040 Week
» 29482 Month
» 366328 Year
» 1587893 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Consett


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 15/06/1936 1465 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/11/1938 1473 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/07/1939 2736 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 21/12/1939 1285 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1940 1264 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1940 1291 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1940 2215 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 09/09/1940 2232 Transfer in from: AFP Annfield Plain    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/10/1940 2736 Transfer out to: CAR Carlisle Canal    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/10/1940 1896 Transfer in from: CAR Carlisle Canal    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 02/05/1941 2232 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 05/05/1941 2276 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/11/1941 1473 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1465 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/03/1943 1896 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2261 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/06/1943 2298 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/10/1943 2282 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/12/1943 1283 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 1311 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/07/1945 2220 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/01/1946 2247 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 05/08/1946 2154 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam A8 4-6-2T on 20/01/1947 9861 Transfer out to: SUN Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/04/1947 3346 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/04/1947 3379 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/11/1947 3351 Transfer out to: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 29/11/1947 3377 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9384 Snapshot        
Steam N8 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9394 Snapshot        
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9411 Snapshot DAR Darlington    
Steam N9 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9414 Snapshot Dar Barnard Castle    
Steam N8 0-6-2T m/e 03/1949 69384 Condemned      
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 11/1949 9411 Condemned      
Steam N9 0-6-2T m/e 07/1950 9414 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/01/1951 63427 Transfer in from: WHL West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/01/1951 3359 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 20/01/1951 68017 Transfer in from: SCA Scarborough    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 20/01/1951 68019 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST 4w/e 17/02/1951 68017 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/09/1952 69390 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 90045 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 90054 Transfer in from:        
Steam N8 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/02/1954 69390 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam N8 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/02/1954 69394 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 90045 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/02/1955 90054 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/02/1955 63359 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 10/06/1956 63346 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam T1 4-8-0T 3w/e 16/06/1956 69917 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/09/1957 63453 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/05/1958 63361 Transfer out to: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/07/1958 63453 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 18/01/1959 63406 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam T1 4-8-0T w/e 21/02/1959 69917 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam J94 0-6-0ST w/e 02/05/1959 68019 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/05/1959 63345 Transfer in from: 51G Haverton Hill    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63342 Transfer in from: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 14/06/1959 63346 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 27/09/1959 63456 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 01/11/1959 63387 Transfer in from: 54B Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63354 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63437 Transfer in from: TDK Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 13/12/1959 63448 Transfer in from: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 16/05/1960 63372 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1960 63387 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 11/09/1960 63437 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 D3939 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 20/08/1961 63368 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62002 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62022 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62023 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62027 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62050 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 06/05/1962 62060 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63342 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63345 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63365 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63404 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63418 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 06/05/1962 63456 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/09/1962 62023 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63354 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/09/1962 63359 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 12/05/1963 62022 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 D3939 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 16/06/1963 62002 Transfer out to: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 16/06/1963 62060 Transfer out to: SBH Blyth (South)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1963 63406 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/09/1963 63433 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 08/11/1963 63448 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 19/01/1964 63394 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 07/04/1964 63439 Condemned      
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 04/10/1964 63346 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 01/11/1964 62050 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 17/05/1965 63357 Condemned      
Steam K1 2-6-0 on 23/05/1965 62027 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/05/1965 63368 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/05/1965 63379 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/05/1965 63394 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/05/1965 63427 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam Q6 0-8-0 on 23/05/1965 63455 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock