Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 436 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14479 Week
» 79433 Month
» 282097 Year
» 3308950 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Swansea (Upper Bank)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Swansea (Upper Bank) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 6 | 1875 | 31/12/1922 | M6 | 01/01/1923 | 31/12/1928 | 4C | 01/01/1923 | 31/12/1948 | W33UB | 01/01/1929 | 31/01/1935 | 87k | 01/02/1950 | 04/02/1963 |
|
Date Opened |
1893 |
Date Closed |
04/02/1963 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
WR |
Information |
Became a subshed of Swansea Paxton Road in January 1949 |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of Upper Bank Station. The yard is visible from the line. There is a path from the station to the shed. Walking time less than 5 minutes. The Swansea to Neath via Llansamlet bus service passes close to Upper Bank Station. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 6 | 1893 | Depot opened | 01/01/1923 | Change of code to M6 | 01/01/1929 | Change of code to W33UB | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 4C | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 87k | 04/02/1963 | Depot closed |
|
|
|