Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 608 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19519 Week
» 84473 Month
» 287137 Year
» 3313990 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Westhouses
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Westhouses |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 18B | 1875 | 31/08/1963 | 16G | 01/09/1963 | 03/10/1966 | WU | 06/05/1973 | 04/01/1975 | WT | 05/01/1975 | |
|
Date Opened |
1890 |
Date Closed |
03/10/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
MR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line, south of the station, adjacent
to the Blackwell Colliery Branch. The yard is parfially visible from
the main line.
Turn left outside Westhouses and Blackwell Station along the main
road. Turn left again after a short distance along a rough path. This
leads under the main line and the Blackwell Colliery branch to the
shed. Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 18B | 1890 | Depot opened | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 16G | 03/10/1966 | Depot closed | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to WU | 05/01/1975 | Change of code to WT |
|
|
|