Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 3894 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17300 Week
» 70316 Month
» 189843 Year
» 3216696 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wadebridge
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wadebridge |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | WAD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72F | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 84E | 01/09/1963 | 30/09/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the north east side of the station. The yard is visible
from the line.
Entrance to the shed is effected from the up platform.
Another entrance to the shed is from a small lane, leading from the
level crossing at the north west end of the station. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to WAD | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72F | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 84E |
|
|
|