Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 526 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6310 Week
» 27699 Month
» 147226 Year
» 3174079 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Southport
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Southport |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23C | 01/01/1923 | 31/05/1950 | 27C | 01/06/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 8M | 01/09/1963 | 06/06/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
03/1890 |
Date Closed |
06/06/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LYR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of Southport Chapel
Street Station. The yard is not, visible from the line.
Turn right outside Southport Chapel Street Station into Chapel
Street, and first right into London Street. Turn left into Derby Road.
The goods yard entrance is on the right hand side, and a path leads to
the shed from this entrance. Walking time 10 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 03/1890 | Depot opened | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 23C | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 27C | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 8M | 06/06/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|