Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 201 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2316 Week
» 24822 Month
» 328012 Year
» 1549577 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Skipton


Depot Details
Depot Name Skipton
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
30187531/12/1922
M3001/01/192331/01/1935
20F01/02/193531/05/1950
23A01/06/195006/10/1951
20F07/10/195131/01/1957
24G01/02/195731/08/1963
10G01/09/196331/03/1967
Date Opened 1877
Date Closed 03/04/1967
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the south side of the main line west of the station. The yard is visible from the line.

Turn left outside the station. Proceed up the slope (Carleton New Road) on the right hand side of the main road, and turn left over the railway bridge. Almost immediately after crossing the railway turn right into a lane running parallel with the line. The shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 30
1877Depot opened
01/01/1923Change of code to M30
01/01/1935Change of code to 20F
01/06/1950Change of code to 23A
07/10/1951Change of code to 20F
01/02/1957Change of code to 24G
01/09/1963Change of code to 10G
03/04/1967Depot closed