Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 376 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 1475 Week
» 7609 Month
» 235493 Year
» 1457058 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Sheffield Grimesthorpe


Depot Details
Depot Name Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
25187531/12/1922
M2501/01/192331/01/1935
19A01/02/193531/01/1958
41B01/02/195825/04/1964
Date Opened 1877
Date Closed 11/09/1961
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line north of Attercliffe Road Station. The yard is visible from the line.

Bear sharp left outside Brightside Station into Station Lane. Turn right at the end into Meadowhall Road, and continue into Brightside Lane. The shed entrance is on the right hand side, just before Newhall Road. Walking time 10 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
1875Change of code to 25
1877Depot opened
01/01/1923Change of code to M25
01/01/1935Change of code to 19A
01/02/1958Change of code to 41B
11/09/1961Depot closed