Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1786 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19589 Week
» 72605 Month
» 192132 Year
» 3218985 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Plodder Lane
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Plodder Lane |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 25P | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W25P | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 10D | 01/01/1923 | 10/10/1954 |
|
Date Closed |
10/10/1954 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station. The yard
is visible from the line.
A cinder path runs to the shed parallel to the line from the opposite
side of Plodder Lane to the station entrance. Walking time 5 minutes.
From Bolton.
A Townleys Bus should be boarded in Bolton. Alight at the
terminus, and go under the railway bridge. Turn left along a cinder
path just the other side of the bridge. This leads to the shed. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 10D |
|
|
|