Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1442 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19245 Week
» 72261 Month
» 191788 Year
» 3218641 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Margam
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Margam |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 87B | 01/03/1964 | 05/05/1973 | MG | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
03/1964 |
Date Closed |
17/09/2009 |
British Railways Region |
WR |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 03/1964 | Depot opened | 01/03/1964 | Change of code to 87B | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to MG | 17/09/2009 | Depot closed |
|
|
|