Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1002 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6786 Week
» 28175 Month
» 147702 Year
» 3174555 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Macclesfield
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Macclesfield |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 16M | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W16M | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 9C | 01/01/1923 | 31/05/1961 |
|
Date Closed |
12/06/1961 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the south east side of Hibel Road Station. The yard
is partially visible from the line.
From Hibel Road Station.
Turn left outside the station into Hibel Road, and continue for about
150 yards. Enter the goods yard by the double gates, and the shed is on
the left a few yards further on. Walking time less than 5 minutes.
From Macclesfield Central Station.
Turn right outside the station, and go under the railway bridge.
Continue along Gas Road until Hibel Road is reached, and the goods
yard entrance faces the end of Gas Road. Walking time 10 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 9C | 12/06/1961 | Depot closed |
|
|
|