Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 82 Today
» 1161 Yesterday
» 6058 Week
» 12192 Month
» 240076 Year
» 1461641 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Llandudno Junction


Depot Details
Depot Name Llandudno Junction
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
3804/189931/12/1922
W3801/01/192331/01/1935
7A01/02/193529/02/1952
6G01/03/195203/10/1966
LJ01/01/1987
Date Opened 01/10/1858
Date Closed 03/10/1966
Pre Grouping Company LNWR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information Originally built by the St Georges Harbour & Railway Company
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
01/10/1858Depot opened
04/1899Change of code to 38
01/01/1923Change of code to W38
01/01/1935Change of code to 7A
01/03/1952Change of code to 6G
03/10/1966Depot closed
01/01/1987Change of code to LJ