Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4137 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 18180 Week
» 83134 Month
» 285798 Year
» 3312651 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Lees (Oldham)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Lees (Oldham) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 26F | 1875 | 30/09/1955 | 26E | 01/10/1955 | 31/08/1963 | 9P | 01/09/1963 | 16/05/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the north side of Lees Station. The yard is partially
visible from the line.
Go straight ahead outside Lees Station, and turn right almost
immediately into Victoria Street. Turn right into St. John Street, and
cross the railway bridge. A cinder path leads to the shed from the
right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 26F | 01/10/1955 | Change of code to 26E | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 9P |
|
|
|