Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 476 Today
» 996 Yesterday
» 476 Week
» 15187 Month
» 157141 Year
» 1041522 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Lancaster Green Ayre


Depot Details
Depot Name Lancaster Green Ayre
Depot Codes
CodeFromTo
32187531/12/1922
M3201/01/192331/01/1935
11C01/02/193531/12/1944
20H01/01/194531/05/1950
23C01/06/195006/10/1951
11E07/10/195131/01/1957
24J01/02/195731/08/1963
10J01/09/196318/04/1966
Date Opened 17/11/1849
Date Closed 18/04/1966
Pre Grouping Company MR
Big 4 Company LMS
British Railways Region LMR
Information Water tank facilities were also available at the former LNWR depot which had otherwise closed on 4th February, 1934 (by the LMS)
1947 Directions The shed is on the east side of the line south of Lancaster Green Ayre Station. The yard is visible from the line.

From Lancaster Green Ayre Station.
Go straight ahead outside the station along the approach road. Turn right into Cable Street, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 5 minutes.

From Lancaster Castle Station.
Turn sharp left outside the station into Station Road. Turn left at the end into Meeting House Lane, continue into Market Street, and turn left into Penny Street, continuing into North Road. Turn sharp left into Cable Street, and the shed entrance is on the right hand side. Walking time 15 minutes.
Popup Maps (New Window) Street Map (1:25,000)
Town Map (1:50,000)
Road Map (1:100,000)
Road Map (1:200,000)
County Map (1:500,000)
Regional Map (1:1,000,000)
Chronology
DateEvent
17/11/1849Depot opened
1875Change of code to 32
01/01/1923Change of code to M32
01/01/1935Change of code to 11C
01/01/1945Change of code to 20H
01/06/1950Change of code to 23C
07/10/1951Change of code to 11E
01/02/1957Change of code to 24J
01/09/1963Change of code to 10J
18/04/1966Depot closed