Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 1975 Today
» 5000 Yesterday
» 28009 Week
» 126654 Month
» 329318 Year
» 3356171 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Huddersfield Hillhouse
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 20 | 02/1870 | 31/12/1922 | W20 | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 25B | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1957 | 55G | 01/02/1957 | 31/12/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
1849 |
Date Closed |
02/01/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line north of the station. The
yard is partially visible from the line.
Go straight across St. George’s Square outside the station, and
continue into Northumberland Street. Turn left into Northgate, and
continue into Bradford Road. Bear left under the railway viaduct into
Alder Street. A path leads, over a footbridge to the shed from the
righthand side of this road. Walking time 25 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 25B | 01/02/1957 | Change of code to 55G |
|
|
|